KEEN v. MONSANTO COMPANY
Plaintiff: HORACE CLARK KEEN
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv07856
Filed: December 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Georgia Middle; Case Number 1:19-cv-00147. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 24, 2019 Case Electronically Transferred Out - District Transfer to Northern District of California. All documents, including a certified copy of the docket sheet and pleading were transferred electronically. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**Case Transfer Acknowledgment deadline 11/7/2019. (mdm)
October 24, 2019 Filing 6 MDL TRANSFER ORDER transferring proceedings to the Northern District of California for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. (mdm)
October 14, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by HORACE CLARK KEEN as to MONSANTO COMPANY. (GARRETT, R)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to MONSANTO COMPANY. (mdm)
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to HORACE CLARK KEEN (mdm)
September 3, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #2 Consent to Proceed Form Sent filed by MONSANTO COMPANY ); Case Administrator Deficiency. (mdm)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to MONSANTO COMPANY (mdm)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MONSANTO COMPANY Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3251060, $400 filed by HORACE CLARK KEEN (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(GARRETT, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KEEN v. MONSANTO COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HORACE CLARK KEEN
Represented By: R. Walker Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?