Engilis, Jr. et al v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Cathy Engilis and Peter Engilis, Jr.
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv07859
Filed: December 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: USDC, Middle District of Florida (Orlando), 6:19-cv-02152-PGB-GJK, Peter Engilis, Jr., et al -v- Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:19-cv-07859-VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-169), MDL No. 2741 cc: JPMDL (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2019)
December 2, 2019 Filing 12 CASE TRANSFERRED in from United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida (Orlando); Case Number 6:19-cv-02152-PGB-GJK. Original File Certified Copy of Transfer Order and Docket Sheet Received.
December 2, 2019 Filing 11 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: Northern District of California. MDL case number: MDL-2741 (MAA)
November 27, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Cathy Engilis, Peter Engilis, Jr.. Related case(s): yes (Haberman, Jeffrey)
November 27, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Cathy Engilis, Peter Engilis, Jr.. (Haberman, Jeffrey)
November 20, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company with Jury Demand. filed by Peter Engilis, Jr., Cathy Engilis.(Haberman, Jeffrey)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 11/15/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 11/15/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed
November 14, 2019 Set/reset deadlines/hearings: Amended Complaint due by 11/22/2019 (RDO)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER dismissing #1 Complaint without prejudice for failure to adequately allege subject matter jurisdiction. On or before Friday, November 22, 2019, Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint. Absent timely compliance with the requirements of this Order, this action will be CLOSED without further notice. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 11/13/2019. (JBS)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Monsanto Company. (RDO)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 POSSIBLE MDL Tag Along case for MDL Case Number 2741, In re: Roundup Product Liability Litigation. Information emailed to MDL Panel on 11/13/19, including cover letter, copy of complaint, and docket sheet. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Docket Sheet) (RDO)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:19-cv-2152-Orl-40GJK. (SJB)
November 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16129360) filed by Peter Engilis, Jr., Cathy Engilis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Haberman, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Engilis, Jr. et al v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Engilis
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Haberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Engilis, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Haberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?