Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations et al v. Ross et al
Plaintiff: Institute for Fisheries Resources, Bay.Org d/b/a The Bay Institute, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Golden State Salmon Association, Defenders of Wildlife and Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.
Defendant: Secretary of the Int David Bernhardt, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, National Marine Fisheries Service, Secretary of Commerc Wilbur Ross, Acting Director Margaret Everson and Assistant Administra Chris Oliver
Intervenor: San Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority and Westlands Water District
Case Number: 3:2019cv07897
Filed: December 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 46:1156
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #17 Motion to Intervene. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2020)
January 24, 2020 Filing 36 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MOTION HEARING: The Motion Hearing, which has been noticed for Thursday, January 30, 2020, will be decided on papers submitted without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing is hereby VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2020)
January 22, 2020 Filing 35 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay.Org d/b/a The Bay Institute, Golden State Salmon Association, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Defenders of Wildlife. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Vissers, Elizabeth) (Filed on 1/22/2020)
January 21, 2020 Filing 34 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by San Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority, Westlands Water District.. (O'Hanlon, Daniel) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 17, 2020 Filing 33 REPLY (re #17 MOTION to Intervene ) filed bySan Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority, Westlands Water District. (O'Hanlon, Daniel) (Filed on 1/17/2020)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #31 Stipulation to Extend Federal Defendants' Responsive Pleading Deadline. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 15, 2020 Filing 31 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND FEDERAL DEFENDANTS' RESPONSIVE PLEADING DEADLINE filed by David Bernhardt, Margaret Everson, National Marine Fisheries Service, Chris Oliver, Wilbur Ross, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service. (Lawrence-Hammer, Lesley) (Filed on 1/15/2020)
January 13, 2020 Filing 30 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Intervenors shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 1/21/2020. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2020)
January 10, 2020 Filing 29 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #17 MOTION to Intervene ) filed byBay.Org d/b/a The Bay Institute, Defenders of Wildlife, Golden State Salmon Association, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth Vissers in Support of Response, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Chisholm, Barbara) (Filed on 1/10/2020)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER re #27 Stipulation to Extend Responsive Briefing Deadlines for Motion to Intervene. Responses due by 1/10/2020. Replies due by noon on 1/17/2020. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 1/3/2020. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2020)
January 2, 2020 Filing 27 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Bay.Org d/b/a The Bay Institute, Defenders of Wildlife, Golden State Salmon Association, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.. (Vissers, Elizabeth) (Filed on 1/2/2020)
December 31, 2019 Filing 26 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by David Bernhardt, Margaret Everson, National Marine Fisheries Service, Chris Oliver, Wilbur Ross, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service.. (Lawrence-Hammer, Lesley) (Filed on 12/31/2019)
December 30, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Lesley K. Lawrence-Hammer (Lawrence-Hammer, Lesley) (Filed on 12/30/2019)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Rachel Jacobson representing Westlands Water District. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
December 20, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Rachel Jacobson ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14002409.) filed by Westlands Water District. (O'Hanlon, Daniel) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
December 20, 2019 Filing 22 EXHIBITS re #17 MOTION to Intervene [Proposed] Answer to Complaint filed bySan Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority, Westlands Water District. (Related document(s) #17 ) (O'Hanlon, Daniel) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
December 20, 2019 Filing 21 Proposed Order re #17 MOTION to Intervene by San Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority, Westlands Water District. (O'Hanlon, Daniel) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
December 20, 2019 Filing 20 Declaration of Rebecca L. Harms in Support of #17 MOTION to Intervene filed bySan Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority, Westlands Water District. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Rebecca L. Harms in Support of Motion to Intervene, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Rebecca L. Harms in Support of Motion to Intervene, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Rebecca L. Harms in Support of Motion to Intervene)(Related document(s) #17 ) (O'Hanlon, Daniel) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
December 20, 2019 Filing 19 Declaration of William R. Freeman in Support of #17 MOTION to Intervene filed bySan Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority, Westlands Water District. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration of William R. Freeman in Support of Motion to Intervene)(Related document(s) #17 ) (O'Hanlon, Daniel) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
December 20, 2019 Filing 18 Declaration of Pablo Arroyave in Support of #17 MOTION to Intervene filed bySan Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority, Westlands Water District. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Pablo Arroyave in Support of Motion to Intervene)(Related document(s) #17 ) (O'Hanlon, Daniel) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
December 20, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Intervene filed by San Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority, Westlands Water District. Motion Hearing set for 1/30/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 1/3/2020. Replies due by 1/10/2020. (O'Hanlon, Daniel) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
December 17, 2019 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 12/31/2019. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2019)
December 16, 2019 Filing 15 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bay.Org d/b/a The Bay Institute, Defenders of Wildlife, Golden State Salmon Association, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations.. (Chisholm, Barbara) (Filed on 12/16/2019)
December 16, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE re #5 Notice (Other), by David Bernhardt, Margaret Everson, National Marine Fisheries Service, Chris Oliver, Wilbur Ross, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Smith, Nicole) (Filed on 12/16/2019)
December 16, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Marie Smith (Smith, Nicole) (Filed on 12/16/2019)
December 5, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to David Bernhardt, Margaret Everson, National Marine Fisheries Service, Chris Oliver, Wilbur Ross, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2019)
December 5, 2019 Filing 11 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/27/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/5/2020 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2019)
December 4, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Michelle Vissers (Vissers, Elizabeth) (Filed on 12/4/2019)
December 3, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Hamilton Candee (Candee, Hamilton) (Filed on 12/3/2019)
December 3, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara Jane Chisholm (Chisholm, Barbara) (Filed on 12/3/2019)
December 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Glen Howard Spain (Spain, Glen) (Filed on 12/3/2019)
December 3, 2019 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/17/2019. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2019)
December 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Bay.Org d/b/a The Bay Institute, Defenders of Wildlife, Golden State Salmon Association, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations CORRECTION OF DOCKET #4 (Chisholm, Barbara) (Filed on 12/3/2019)
December 2, 2019 Filing 4 ERRONEOUSLY E-FILED, DISREGARD - SEE DOC #5 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patent by Bay.Org d/b/a The Bay Institute, Defenders of Wildlife, Golden State Salmon Association, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations (Chisholm, Barbara) (Filed on 12/2/2019) Modified on 12/5/2019 (fabS, COURT STAFF).
December 2, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Bay.Org d/b/a The Bay Institute, Defenders of Wildlife, Golden State Salmon Association, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations (Chisholm, Barbara) (Filed on 12/2/2019)
December 2, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Chisholm, Barbara) (Filed on 12/2/2019)
December 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against David Bernhardt, Margaret Everson, National Marine Fisheries Service, Chris Oliver, Wilbur Ross, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13940149.). Filed byBay.Org d/b/a The Bay Institute, Golden State Salmon Association, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Defenders of Wildlife. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chisholm, Barbara) (Filed on 12/2/2019) Modified on 12/3/2019 (ddkS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations et al v. Ross et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of the Int David Bernhardt
Represented By: Lesley K. Lawrence-Hammer
Represented By: Nicole Marie Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service
Represented By: Lesley K. Lawrence-Hammer
Represented By: Nicole Marie Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Marine Fisheries Service
Represented By: Lesley K. Lawrence-Hammer
Represented By: Nicole Marie Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of Commerc Wilbur Ross
Represented By: Lesley K. Lawrence-Hammer
Represented By: Nicole Marie Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director Margaret Everson
Represented By: Lesley K. Lawrence-Hammer
Represented By: Nicole Marie Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assistant Administra Chris Oliver
Represented By: Lesley K. Lawrence-Hammer
Represented By: Nicole Marie Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Institute for Fisheries Resources
Represented By: Barbara Jane Chisholm
Represented By: Glen Howard Spain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bay.Org d/b/a The Bay Institute
Represented By: Barbara Jane Chisholm
Represented By: Elizabeth Michelle Vissers
Represented By: Hamilton Candee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations
Represented By: Barbara Jane Chisholm
Represented By: Glen Howard Spain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Golden State Salmon Association
Represented By: Barbara Jane Chisholm
Represented By: Elizabeth Michelle Vissers
Represented By: Hamilton Candee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Defenders of Wildlife
Represented By: Barbara Jane Chisholm
Represented By: Elizabeth Michelle Vissers
Represented By: Hamilton Candee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.
Represented By: Barbara Jane Chisholm
Represented By: Elizabeth Michelle Vissers
Represented By: Hamilton Candee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: San Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority
Represented By: Daniel Joseph O'Hanlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Westlands Water District
Represented By: Daniel Joseph O'Hanlon
Represented By: Rachel Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?