Quakertown Community School District Bucks County, Pennsyvania v. JUUL LABS, INC.
Plaintiff: Quakertown Community School District Bucks County, Penneylvania
Defendant: Juul Labs, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv07998
Filed: December 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: Summons Issued #1 Complaint Do Not Enter Parties in all Capital Letters (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2019)
December 5, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Pennsylvania Eastern, 2:19-cv-05135-RBS, Quakertown Community School District Bucks Country, Pennsyvania v. Juul Labs, Inc., Opened in California Northern District as 3:19-cv-7998-WHO pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 11 cc: JPMDL (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2019)
December 5, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-05135. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 5, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by QUAKERTOWN COMMUNITY SCHOOL DISTRICT BUCKS COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA re: Adam Golden served Summons and Complaint upon JUUL LABS, INC. by Personally serving Agent. JUUL LABS, INC. served on 11/18/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (CORR, STEPHEN)
December 3, 2019 Filing 2 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE U.S.D.C. FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA. 12/4/19 ENTERED. (kw, )
November 1, 2019 1 Summons Issued as to JUUL LABS, INC.. Forwarded To: COUNSEL on 11/1/2019 (bw, )
November 1, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by QUAKERTOWN COMMUNITY SCHOOL DISTRICT BUCKS COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA. (bw, )
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JUUL LABS, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE206137.), filed by QUAKERTOWN COMMUNITY SCHOOL DISTRICT BUCKS COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA.(bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quakertown Community School District Bucks County, Pennsyvania v. JUUL LABS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juul Labs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quakertown Community School District Bucks County, Penneylvania
Represented By: Stephen A Corr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?