Banks et al v. Monsanto Company et al
Plaintiff: Estate of Ralph B. Banks and Helen Grace Banks
Defendant: Bayer Corporation, Bayer A.G. and Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv08003
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Eastern District of North Carolina, 4:19-00158 BO, Banks v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:19-cv-08003 VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 170 cc: JPMDL (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2019)
December 6, 2019 Filing 13 Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Eastern; Case Number 4:19-cv-00158. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 5, 2019 Filing 12 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-170) - This case is transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of California for the reasons stated in the order of October 3, 2016, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Vince Chhabria. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (Stouch, L.)
November 18, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Helen Grace Banks, Ralph B. Banks. Bayer Corporation served on 11/13/2019, answer due 12/4/2019. (Karr, Joshua)
November 11, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Helen Grace Banks, Ralph B. Banks. Monsanto Company served on 11/8/2019, answer due 11/29/2019. (Karr, Joshua)
November 6, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Michael L. McGlamry on behalf of Helen Grace Banks, Ralph B. Banks. (McGlamry, Michael)
November 6, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Joshua A. Karr on behalf of Helen Grace Banks, Ralph B. Banks. (Karr, Joshua)
November 5, 2019 Filing 7 Notice filed by Helen Grace Banks, Ralph B. Banks . (Evans, Lynwood)
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Bayer AG, Bayer Corporation, Monsanto Company. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
November 5, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint - Counsel failed to file a JS44 Civil Cover Sheet as required by the Court. Counsel should file a Cover Sheet using the event "Notice-Other" as soon as possible. (Rudd, D.)
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Lynwood P. Evans on behalf of Helen Grace Banks, Ralph B. Banks. (Evans, Lynwood)
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by Helen Grace Banks, Ralph B. Banks (Edwards, Christopher)
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Helen Grace Banks, Ralph B. Banks (Edwards, Christopher)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Christopher S. Edwards on behalf of Helen Grace Banks, Ralph B. Banks. (Edwards, Christopher)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bayer AG, Bayer Corporation, Monsanto Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5169526.), filed by Helen Grace Banks, Ralph B. Banks. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Monsanto Company, #2 Proposed Summons Bayer AG, #3 Proposed Summons Bayer Corporation) (Edwards, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banks et al v. Monsanto Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Ralph B. Banks
Represented By: Christopher S. Edwards
Represented By: Lynwood P. Evans
Represented By: Michael L. McGlamry
Represented By: Joshua A. Karr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Grace Banks
Represented By: Christopher S. Edwards
Represented By: Lynwood P. Evans
Represented By: Michael L. McGlamry
Represented By: Joshua A. Karr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer A.G.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?