Communities for A Better Environment v. Corteva, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Citizens for A Better Environment and Communities for A Better Environment
Defendant: Corteva, Inc. and Dow Agrosciences LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv08277
Filed: December 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Communities for A Better Environment.. (Orion, Brian) (Filed on 1/2/2020)
December 24, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Corteva, Inc., Dow Agrosciences LLC. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2019)
December 23, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Orion, Brian) (Filed on 12/23/2019)
December 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Orion (Orion, Brian) (Filed on 12/23/2019)
December 20, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/12/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/19/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/3/2020. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
December 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Corteva, Inc., Dow Agrosciences LLC, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-13996376). Filed by Communities for A Better Environment. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Sproul, Christopher) (Filed on 12/19/2019) Modified on 12/24/2019 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Communities for A Better Environment v. Corteva, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corteva, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dow Agrosciences LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Citizens for A Better Environment
Represented By: Christopher Alan Sproul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Communities for A Better Environment
Represented By: Christopher Alan Sproul
Represented By: Shana D.G. Lazerow
Represented By: Brian Orion
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?