Richter v. Ausmus et al
Plaintiff: Julia Richter
Defendant: Todd Mork, Anne Kirkpatrick, Sekou Millington, Lisa Ausmus, Bryan Hubbard and Damon Gilbert
Case Number: 3:2019cv08300
Filed: December 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 2/26/2020. No chambers copy is required. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Parties were notified via email.) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2020)
February 12, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF MOTION, MOTION AND MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support of MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) and (e) filed by Lisa Ausmus, Damon Gilbert, Bryan Hubbard, Anne Kirkpatrick, Sekou Millington, Todd Mork. Motion Hearing set for 3/19/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Responses due by 2/26/2020. Replies due by 3/4/2020. (Burton, Jocelyn) (Filed on 2/12/2020)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Hixson denying #13 Motion in Limine. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2020)
February 3, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Julia Richter re #11 Amended Complaint (Richter, Julia) (Filed on 2/3/2020)
February 3, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Julia Richter. Damon Gilbert served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020. (Richter, Julia) (Filed on 2/3/2020)
February 3, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Julia Richter. Bryan Hubbard served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020. (Richter, Julia) (Filed on 2/3/2020)
February 3, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION in Limine filed by Julia Richter. Motion Hearing set for 3/12/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Responses due by 2/18/2020. Replies due by 2/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Richter, Julia) (Filed on 2/3/2020)
January 22, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Damon Gilbert, Bryan Hubbard. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2020)
January 21, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT For Damages for Violation of Civil Rights against All Defendants. Filed byJulia Richter. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons for Gilbert, #2 Summons Summons for Hubbard)(Richter, Julia) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting #5 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2020)
January 2, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Julia Richter. Sekou Millington served on 12/30/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2020)
January 2, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Julia Richter. Todd Mork served on 12/30/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2020)
January 2, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Julia Richter. Lisa Ausmus served on 12/30/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2020)
January 2, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Julia Richter. Anne Kirkpatrick served on 12/30/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2020)
January 2, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Julia Richter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2020)
January 2, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Julia Richter. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2020)
December 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Lisa Ausmus, Anne Kirkpatrick, Sekou Millington, Todd Mork. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2019)
December 19, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 3/ 12/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/19/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2019)
December 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Lisa Ausmus, Anne Kirkpatrick, Sekou Millington, Todd Mork (Filing fee $ 400; Receipt No. 44611016700). Filed byJulia Richter. Consent/Declination due by 1/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richter v. Ausmus et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Mork
Represented By: Jocelyn Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Kirkpatrick
Represented By: Jocelyn Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sekou Millington
Represented By: Jocelyn Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Ausmus
Represented By: Jocelyn Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Hubbard
Represented By: Jocelyn Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damon Gilbert
Represented By: Jocelyn Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Richter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?