PO RO 1, LLC v. Nob Hill Cleaners, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: PO RO 1, LLC and Po Ro, LLC
Defendant: Richard J. Elkus, Jr., Joon Hyo Kim, Ruth K. Elkus, Nob Hill Cleaners, Inc., Nojet Company, Inc., Cal More Investment Company, Dahl W Stanford, Seung Hee Park, C. W. Swenson, Inc., Nam Sun Park, Estate of Richard J. Elkus, Deceased, Kyong Soo Kim, Estate of Ruth K. Elkus, Deceased, Kyong Soo Kim doing business as Pacific Cleaners and Pacific Avenue Cleaners, Seung Hee Park doing business as Pacific Cleaners and Pacific Avenue Cleaners, Dahl W Stanford doing business as L & S Enterprises doing business as Rich's Dry Cleaners, Joon Hyo Kim doing business as Pacific Cleaners and Pacific Avenue Cleaners, Nam Sun Park doing business as Pacific Cleaners and Pacific Avenue Cleaners and Nob Hill Cleaners, Inc. a suspended California corporation doing business as Nob Hill Cleaners
Case Number: 3:2019cv08301
Filed: December 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Estate of Richard J. Elkus, Deceased (Constantinides, Stratton) (Filed on 2/14/2020)
February 14, 2020 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byEstate of Richard J. Elkus, Deceased. (Constantinides, Stratton) (Filed on 2/14/2020)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #16 TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2020)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #15 Stipulation ALLOWING FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY TO INTERVENE AS AN ALLEGED INSURER OF DEFENDANT NOB HILL CLEANERS, INC. A SUSPENDED CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2020)
February 13, 2020 Filing 18 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Nob Hill Cleaners, Inc... (Costa, Daniel) (Filed on 2/13/2020)
February 13, 2020 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants Nam Sun Park & Seung Hee Park shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 2/27/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2020)
February 11, 2020 Filing 16 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Nam Sun Park, Seung Hee Park. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Boyd, Jesse) (Filed on 2/11/2020)
February 11, 2020 Filing 15 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER ALLOWING FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY TO INTERVENE AS AN ALLEGED INSURER OF DEFENDANT NOB HILL CLEANERS, INC. A SUSPENDED CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed by Nob Hill Cleaners, Inc.. (Costa, Daniel) (Filed on 2/11/2020)
February 7, 2020 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants Joon Hyo Kim, Kyong Soo Kim, Estate of Richard J. Elkus, Deceased, and Estate of Ruth K. Elkus, Deceased shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 2/21/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2020) Modified on 2/7/2020 (ahm, COURT STAFF).
February 7, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION Extending Time for Defendants Joon Hyo Kim and Kyong Soo Kim to Respond to Complaint filed by Joon Hyo Kim. (Herman, Sean) (Filed on 2/7/2020)
February 7, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Griffin Herman Counsel for Defendants Joon Hyo Kim and Kyong Soo Kim (Herman, Sean) (Filed on 2/7/2020)
January 29, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION to Extend Time to File Response to Initial Complaint filed by Estate of Richard J. Elkus, Deceased, Estate of Ruth K. Elkus, Deceased. (Vandenburg, Thomas) (Filed on 1/29/2020)
January 21, 2020 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Entities by PO RO 1, LLC identifying Corporate Parent PO RO 1, LLC, Other Affiliate Hartford Insurance Group, Other Affiliate Sentry Insurance, Other Affiliate Fremont Indemnity Co, Other Affiliate Arnold G. Swenson, Other Affiliate The Travelers Indemnity Company, Other Affiliate State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, Other Affiliate Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd., Other Affiliate Business Alliance Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Manu Shaghafi, Other Affiliate E. Frances Shaghafi, Other Affiliate Carl W. Swenson, Other Affiliate L. R. Swenson, Other Affiliate Michael A. Fowler, Other Affiliate Philip Stephan Mirenda, Other Affiliate William P. Ondrasek, Other Affiliate Charles J. Toeniskoetter, Other Affiliate Brian L. Dawson, Other Affiliate James Wilson Black, Sr., Other Affiliate ProCentury Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Carl N. Swenson, Co., Inc., Other Affiliate Sequoia Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Insurance Company of the West, Other Affiliate Fireman's Fund Insurance Companies for PO RO 1, LLC. (Till, John) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 21, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents . Re: #9 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by PO RO 1, LLC. (mclS, COURT STAFF)
January 17, 2020 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Entities by PO RO 1, LLC (Till, John) (Filed on 1/17/2020)
January 15, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by PO RO 1, LLC.. (Till, John) (Filed on 1/15/2020)
January 13, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR JOON HYO KIM AND KYONG SOO KIM TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT filed by PO RO 1, LLC. (Till, John) (Filed on 1/13/2020)
January 13, 2020 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 1/27/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2020)
December 20, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to C. W. Swenson, Inc., Cal More Investment Company, Estate of Richard J. Elkus, Deceased, Estate of Ruth K. Elkus, Deceased, Joon Hyo Kim, Nob Hill Cleaners, Inc., Nojet Company, Inc., Nam Sun Park, Seung Hee Park, Dahl W Stanford. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
December 20, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/12/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/19/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
December 19, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/2/2020. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2019)
December 19, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Till, John) (Filed on 12/19/2019)
December 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against C. W. Swenson, Inc., Cal More Investment Company, Estate of Richard J. Elkus, Deceased, Estate of Ruth K. Elkus, Deceased, Joon Hyo Kim, Nob Hill Cleaners, Inc., Nojet Company, Inc., Nam Sun Park, Seung Hee Park, Dahl W Stanford (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13997889). Filed by PO RO 1, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Till, John) (Filed on 12/19/2019) Modified on 12/20/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PO RO 1, LLC v. Nob Hill Cleaners, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard J. Elkus, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joon Hyo Kim
Represented By: Samir J. Abdelnour
Represented By: Sean Griffin Herman
Represented By: Melissa Marie Malstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth K. Elkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nob Hill Cleaners, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Paul Costa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nojet Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cal More Investment Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dahl W Stanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seung Hee Park
Represented By: Jesse Abraham Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. W. Swenson, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nam Sun Park
Represented By: Jesse Abraham Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Richard J. Elkus, Deceased
Represented By: Stratton Peter Constantinides
Represented By: Thomas F. Vandenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyong Soo Kim
Represented By: Samir J. Abdelnour
Represented By: Sean Griffin Herman
Represented By: Melissa Marie Malstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Ruth K. Elkus, Deceased
Represented By: Thomas F. Vandenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyong Soo Kim doing business as Pacific Cleaners and Pacific Avenue Cleaners
Represented By: Samir J. Abdelnour
Represented By: Sean Griffin Herman
Represented By: Melissa Marie Malstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seung Hee Park doing business as Pacific Cleaners and Pacific Avenue Cleaners
Represented By: Jesse Abraham Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dahl W Stanford doing business as L & S Enterprises doing business as Rich's Dry Cleaners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joon Hyo Kim doing business as Pacific Cleaners and Pacific Avenue Cleaners
Represented By: Samir J. Abdelnour
Represented By: Sean Griffin Herman
Represented By: Melissa Marie Malstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nam Sun Park doing business as Pacific Cleaners and Pacific Avenue Cleaners
Represented By: Jesse Abraham Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nob Hill Cleaners, Inc. a suspended California corporation doing business as Nob Hill Cleaners
Represented By: Daniel Paul Costa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PO RO 1, LLC
Represented By: John Richard Till
Represented By: Kirk Matthew Tracy
Represented By: Melanie A. Mariotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Po Ro, LLC
Represented By: Kirk Matthew Tracy
Represented By: Melanie A. Mariotti
Represented By: John Richard Till
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?