Allen et al v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Mildred Tester, Charlie Lackey, Patricia Mullally, Helen Elizabeth Baumgartner, Robert Hamill, Barbara Dettore, Robert Williams, Kalleen Slind, Bobby Jimenez, Migdalia Crutchfield, Carol E Mozena, Doris Porter, Faithe Frank, Roxana Leal, Christal Buckley, Rita Postlethwait, Marilyn Caraballo, Gerald Joyce, Gary Stastny, Ronald Fowler, John Young, Brenda Dunn, William Hutzel, Trina Allen, Michael Hewett, Charlene Spencer, Bob Yelton, Ellie Horse, Nancy Wilson, Ricky Wriden and Carol Monzena
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv08358
Filed: December 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2020 Filing 10 Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Brian E. Farnan filed by Trina Allen, Helen Elizabeth Baumgartner, Christal Buckley, Marilyn Caraballo, Migdalia Crutchfield, Barbara Dettore, Brenda Dunn, Ronald Fowler, Faithe Frank, Robert Hamill, Michael Hewett, Ellie Horse, William Hutzel, Bobby Jimenez, Gerald Joyce, Charlie Lackey, Roxana Leal, Carol Monzena, Patricia Mullally, Doris Porter, Rita Postlethwait, Kalleen Slind, Charlene Spencer, Gary Stastny, Mildred Tester, Robert Williams, Nancy Wilson, Ricky Wriden, Bob Yelton, John Young. Responses due by 2/24/2020. Replies due by 3/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Prop Order Granting Motion)(Hilliard, Robert) (Filed on 2/10/2020)
February 10, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION to dismiss all but lead plaintiff per PTO 155 filed by Trina Allen, Helen Elizabeth Baumgartner, Christal Buckley, Marilyn Caraballo, Migdalia Crutchfield, Barbara Dettore, Brenda Dunn, Ronald Fowler, Faithe Frank, Robert Hamill, Michael Hewett, Ellie Horse, William Hutzel, Bobby Jimenez, Gerald Joyce, Charlie Lackey, Roxana Leal, Carol Monzena, Patricia Mullally, Doris Porter, Rita Postlethwait, Kalleen Slind, Charlene Spencer, Gary Stastny, Mildred Tester, Robert Williams, Nancy Wilson, Ricky Wriden, Bob Yelton, John Young. (Hilliard, Robert) (Filed on 2/10/2020)
January 27, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byMonsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 1/27/2020)
January 27, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 1/27/2020)
January 27, 2020 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 1/27/2020)
December 23, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Delaware, 1:19-cv-02211, Allen et al v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:19-cv-08358-VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 173 cc: JPMDL (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2019)
December 23, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Delaware; Case Number 1:19-cv-02211. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 19, 2019 Filing 4 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER by the UNITED STATES JUDICIAL PANEL on MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-02211-CFC, 1:19-cv-02212-CFC(nmf)
December 5, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charlene Spencer, Gary Stastny, Michael Hewett, Nancy Wilson, Barbara Dettore, Trina Allen, John Young, Charlie Lackey, Christal Buckley, Marilyn Caraballo, Ricky Wriden, Patricia Mullally, Brenda Dunn, Bob Yelton, Faithe Frank, Kalleen Slind, Bobby Jimenez, Rita Postlethwait, Doris Porter, Carol E Mozena, Ronald Fowler, Ellie Horse, Roxana Leal, Mildred Tester, William Hutzel, Robert Williams, Migdalia Crutchfield, Helen Elizabeth Baumgartner, Gerald Joyce, Robert Hamill. Monsanto Company served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (Farnan, Michael)
December 4, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-02211-CFC, 1:19-cv-02212-CFC (rjb)
December 2, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Monsanto Company on 12/2/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (kmd)
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages and Jury Demand against Monsanto Company - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2789759.) - filed by Charlene Spencer, Gary Stastny, Michael Hewett, Nancy Wilson, Barbara Dettore, Trina Allen, John Young, Charlie Lackey, Christal Buckley, Marilyn Caraballo, Ricky Wriden, Patricia Mullally, Brenda Dunn, Bob Yelton, Faithe Frank, Kalleen Slind, Bobby Jimenez, Rita Postlethwait, Doris Porter, Carol E Mozena, Ronald Fowler, Ellie Horse, Roxana Leal, Mildred Tester, William Hutzel, Robert Williams, Migdalia Crutchfield, Helen Elizabeth Baumgartner, Gerald Joyce, Robert Hamill. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen et al v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mildred Tester
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlie Lackey
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Mullally
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Elizabeth Baumgartner
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Hamill
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Dettore
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Williams
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kalleen Slind
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Jimenez
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Migdalia Crutchfield
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol E Mozena
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doris Porter
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faithe Frank
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roxana Leal
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christal Buckley
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Postlethwait
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Caraballo
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Joyce
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Stastny
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Fowler
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Young
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Dunn
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Hutzel
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trina Allen
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hewett
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlene Spencer
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bob Yelton
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellie Horse
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Wilson
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Wriden
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Monzena
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: Joe G. Hollingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?