Planned Parenthood Federation of America et al v. Center for Medical Progress & BioMax et al
Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood Center For Choice, Planned Parenthood Gulf Coast, Planned Parenthood Orange & San Bernardino Counties, Inc., Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Planned Parenthood Of The Rocky Mountains, Planned Parenthood Mar Monte, Inc., Planned Parenthood of the Pacific Southwest, Planned Parenthood Pasadena & San Gabriel Valley, Inc., Planned Parenthood Los Angeles and Planned Parenthood Santa Barbara, Ventura & San Luis Obispo Counties, Inc.
Defendant: David Daleiden, Sandra Merritt, Biomax Procurement Services, LLC, Gerardo Lopez Lopez, Center for Medical Progress & BioMax, Robert Sarkis, Troy Newman, Susan Tennenbaum and Albin A. Rhomberg
Respondent: StemExpress, LLC and Sarah Heuston
Receiver: Planned Parenthood: Shasta-Diablo, Inc. and Planned Parenthood: Shasta-Diablo, Inc. doing business as Planned Parenthood Northern California
Case Number: 3:2019mc80042
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Referring Judge: William H Orrick
2 Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Filing 22 OBJECTIONS to re #20 Order on Discovery Letter Brief,,,, Order on Motion to Compel, to Judge Ryu Nondispositive PreTrial Order StemExpress Dkt 20 by Center for Medical Progress & BioMax. (LiMandri, Charles) (Filed on 4/1/2019)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #17 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed on 3/18/2019.(dmrlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2019)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying motions to compel third parties to comply with subpoenas; denying (426) Discovery Letter Brief; denying (427) Discovery Letter Brief in case 3:16-cv-00236-WHO; denying (1) Motion to Compel in case 3:19-mc-80042-WHO. Signed on 3/18/2019. (dmrlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2019)
March 13, 2019 Filing 19 Declaration of Amy L. Bomse in Support of #17 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Reply in support of Motion to Compel Document Production re Subpoena Served on StemExpress, LLC and Sarah Heuston in N.D. Cal Case No. 3:16-CV-00236 filed byPlanned Parenthood Center For Choice, Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Planned Parenthood Gulf Coast, Planned Parenthood Los Angeles, Planned Parenthood Mar Monte, Inc., Planned Parenthood Of The Rocky Mountains, Planned Parenthood Orange & San Bernardino Counties, Inc., Planned Parenthood Pasadena & San Gabriel Valley, Inc., Planned Parenthood Santa Barbara, Ventura & San Luis Obispo Counties, Inc., Planned Parenthood of the Pacific Southwest, Planned Parenthood: Shasta-Diablo, Inc.. (Related document(s) #17 ) (Bomse, Amy) (Filed on 3/13/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 18 OBJECTIONS to Evidence Submitted on Reply by Sarah Heuston, StemExpress, LLC. (Einsohn, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 7, 2019 Filing 17 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Reply in support of Motion to Compel Document Production re Subpoena Served on StemExpress, LLC and Sarah Heuston in N.D. Cal Case No. 3:16-CV-00236 filed by Center for Medical Progress & BioMax. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey M. Trissell, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Proposed Order, #7 Certificate/Proof of Service)(LiMandri, Charles) (Filed on 3/7/2019)
March 7, 2019 Filing 16 Brief re #15 Response ( Non Motion ), ECF Transfer In - converted docket entry Reply in support of Motion to Compel Document Production re Subpoena Served on StemExpress, LLC and Sarah Heuston in N.D. Cal Case No. 3:16 filed byCenter for Medical Progress & BioMax. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of B. Dean Wilson, #2 Declaration of Jeffrey M. Trissell, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #15 , []) (LiMandri, Charles) (Filed on 3/7/2019)
February 28, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu for Discovery (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2019)
February 28, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE Opposition to Motion to Compel Document Production re Subpoena by Sarah Heuston, StemExpress, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Jeffrey S. Einsohn, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Einsohn, Jeffrey) (Filed on 2/28/2019)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu for Discovery purposes. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/28/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2019)
February 27, 2019 Filing 13 Case reassigned to Judge William H. Orrick. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2019)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RELATING CASE. This matter is found to be related to Case No. 3:16cv236-who. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 2/26/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2019)
February 20, 2019 Filing 11 REFERRAL FOR PURPOSE OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 2/20/2019. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2019)
February 19, 2019 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of California Eastern; Case Number 2:19-mc-00009. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/8/19 GRANTING #6 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Transfer Motion to Compel. Defendants' Motion to Compel Document Production re Subpoena #1 shall be transferred to Northern District of California Case No. 3:16- cv-00236. (Kaminski, H)
February 8, 2019 Filing 8 OPPOSITION by Defendant Center for Medical Progress & BioMax to #6 Ex Parte Application,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Paul Jonna iso of Opposition to StemExpress & Heuston Ex Parte Application, #2 Proof of Service)(LiMandri, Charles)
February 8, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER re Transfer of Motion to Compel re #6 Ex Parte Application, by Sarah Heuston, StemExpress, LLC. (Einsohn, Jeffrey)
February 7, 2019 Filing 6 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Transfer or to Continue Hearing on #1 Motion to Compel by StemExpress, LLC, Sarah Heuston . Attorney Einsohn, Jeffrey S. added. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proof of Service)(Einsohn, Jeffrey) Modified on 2/8/2019 (Huang, H).
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER: (Text Only). re #1 Motion to Compel. The court is in receipt of defendants' motion to compel responses to a third party subpoena issued to StemExpress, LLC and Sarah Heuston. ECF No. 1. Upon review of the certificate of service (ECF No. 1-5) there is no indication that either StemExpress, LLC or Sarah Heuston were served in this matter. Defendants are hereby ORDERED to serve the Motion to Compel, accompanying exhibits, and a copy of this order on StemExpress, LLC and Sarah Heuston, and file a certificate of service no later than Tuesday, January 22, 2019. Further, it is noted that defendants incorrectly set this matter for hearing in Courtroom 25. The hearing will take place on February 27, 2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Callen, V)
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED ORDER re #1 Motion to Compel by Center for Medical Progress & BioMax. (LiMandri, Charles) Modified on 1/17/2019 (Benson, A.).
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED NOTICE of MOTION HEARING re #1 Motion to Compel by Center for Medical Progress & BioMax. Motion Hearing set for 2/27/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire (LiMandri, Charles) Modified on 1/17/2019 (Benson, A.).
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Center for Medical Progress & BioMax re #1 Motion to Compel. (LiMandri, Charles)
January 15, 2019 NEW MISCELLANEOUS CASE FILED: MOTION to COMPEL Document Production re Subpoena served on StemExpress, LLC & Sarah Heuston in N.D. Cal Case No. 3:16-cv-00236-WHO. (York, M)
January 15, 2019 PAYMENT for miscellaneous case filing fee in the amount of $47.00, receipt number 0972-8062134. (LiMandri, Charles)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to COMPEL Document Production re Subpoena served on StemExpress, LLC & Sarah Heuston in N.D. Cal Case No. 3:16-cv-00236-WHO by BioMax Procurement Services, LLC, et al.,. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of David Daleiden, #3 Declaration of Paul Jonna, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proof of Service)(LiMandri, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Planned Parenthood Federation of America et al v. Center for Medical Progress & BioMax et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Daleiden
Represented By: Charles S. LiMandri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomax Procurement Services, LLC
Represented By: Charles S. LiMandri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerardo Lopez Lopez
Represented By: Charles S. LiMandri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Center for Medical Progress & BioMax
Represented By: Charles S. LiMandri
Represented By: Charles Salvatore LiMandri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Sarkis
Represented By: Charles S. LiMandri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Newman
Represented By: Vladimir F. Kozina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Tennenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albin A. Rhomberg
Represented By: Michael D. Millen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood Center For Choice
Represented By: Sharon Mayo
Represented By: Amy Lynne Bomse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood Gulf Coast
Represented By: Sharon Mayo
Represented By: Amy Lynne Bomse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood Orange & San Bernardino Counties, Inc.
Represented By: Sharon Mayo
Represented By: Amy Lynne Bomse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood Federation of America
Represented By: Sharon Mayo
Represented By: Amy Lynne Bomse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood Of The Rocky Mountains
Represented By: Sharon Mayo
Represented By: Amy Lynne Bomse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood Mar Monte, Inc.
Represented By: Sharon Mayo
Represented By: Amy Lynne Bomse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood of the Pacific Southwest
Represented By: Sharon Mayo
Represented By: Amy Lynne Bomse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood Pasadena & San Gabriel Valley, Inc.
Represented By: Sharon Mayo
Represented By: Amy Lynne Bomse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood Los Angeles
Represented By: Sharon Mayo
Represented By: Amy Lynne Bomse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood Santa Barbara, Ventura & San Luis Obispo Counties, Inc.
Represented By: Sharon Mayo
Represented By: Amy Lynne Bomse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: StemExpress, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey S Einsohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sarah Heuston
Represented By: Jeffrey S Einsohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: Planned Parenthood: Shasta-Diablo, Inc.
Represented By: Sharon Mayo
Represented By: Amy Lynne Bomse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: Planned Parenthood: Shasta-Diablo, Inc. doing business as Planned Parenthood Northern California
Represented By: Sharon Mayo
Represented By: Amy Lynne Bomse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?