Sayce v. Forescout Technologies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Christopher L. Sayce
Defendant: Christopher Harms, Michael DeCesare and Forescout Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00076
Filed: January 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order by Judge Susan Illston granting #15 Stipulation Extending Defendants' Deadline to Respond to Securities Class Action Complaint and Continuing Case Management Conference. (tvnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2020)
February 14, 2020 Filing 15 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANTS' DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO SECURITIES CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Michael DeCesare, Forescout Technologies, Inc., Christopher Harms. (Salceda, Ignacio) (Filed on 2/14/2020)
February 14, 2020 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Entities by Michael DeCesare, Forescout Technologies, Inc., Christopher Harms identifying Other Affiliate Houston Casualty Company, Other Affiliate State National Insurance Company, Inc., Other Affiliate Hudson Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Endurance Risk Solutions Assurance Co., Other Affiliate Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.) Inc., Other Affiliate Argonaut Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Old Republic Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Great American Insurance Company for Christopher Harms, Forescout Technologies, Inc., Michael DeCesare. and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Salceda, Ignacio) (Filed on 2/14/2020)
February 14, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Ignacio Evaristo Salceda , Boris Feldman and Diane M. Walters (Salceda, Ignacio) (Filed on 2/14/2020)
January 22, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Christopher L. Sayce. Service waived by Christopher Harms waiver sent on 1/10/2020, answer due 3/10/2020. (Lieberman, Jeremy) (Filed on 1/22/2020)
January 22, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Christopher L. Sayce. Service waived by Michael DeCesare waiver sent on 1/10/2020, answer due 3/10/2020. (Lieberman, Jeremy) (Filed on 1/22/2020)
January 22, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Christopher L. Sayce. Service waived by Forescout Technologies, Inc. waiver sent on 1/10/2020, answer due 3/10/2020. (Lieberman, Jeremy) (Filed on 1/22/2020)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Judge Susan Illson granting #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Hood). (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2020)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Lieberman). (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2020)
January 8, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14048770.) filed by Christopher L. Sayce. (Hood, J) (Filed on 1/8/2020)
January 8, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14048749.) filed by Christopher L. Sayce. (Lieberman, Jeremy) (Filed on 1/8/2020)
January 2, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Michael DeCesare, Forescout Technologies, Inc., Christopher Harms. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2020)
January 2, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/27/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/3/2020 02:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording, #2 Standing Order, #3 Standing Order)(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2020)
January 2, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Susan Illston. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2020)
January 2, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/2/2020)
January 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michael DeCesare, Forescout Technologies, Inc., Christopher Harms ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14030752.). Filed byChristopher L. Sayce. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/2/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sayce v. Forescout Technologies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Harms
Represented By: Ignacio Evaristo Salceda
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Diane Marie Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael DeCesare
Represented By: Ignacio Evaristo Salceda
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Diane Marie Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forescout Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Ignacio Evaristo Salceda
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Diane Marie Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher L. Sayce
Represented By: Jennifer Pafiti
Represented By: J Alexander Hood, II
Represented By: Jeremy A Lieberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?