California River Watch v. Jaxon Keys Winery & Distillery (A Member of Wilson Artisan Wineries) et al
Plaintiff: California River Watch
Defendant: Diane Wilson, also known as Diane Nolan, Kenneth C. Wilson, Jaxon Keys Winery & Distillery (A Member of Wilson Artisan Wineries) and Diane Nolan
Case Number: 3:2020cv00197
Filed: January 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1319
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by California River Watch. Diane Wilson, also known as Diane Nolan served on 1/23/2020, answer due 2/13/2020. (Silver, Jack) (Filed on 3/5/2020)
March 5, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by California River Watch. Kenneth C. Wilson served on 1/25/2020, answer due 2/18/2020. (Silver, Jack) (Filed on 3/5/2020)
March 5, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by California River Watch. Jaxon Keys Winery & Distillery (A Member of Wilson Artisan Wineries) served on 1/21/2020, answer due 2/11/2020. (Silver, Jack) (Filed on 3/5/2020)
January 10, 2020 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Entities by California River Watch (Silver, Jack) (Filed on 1/10/2020)
January 10, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by California River Watch.. (Silver, Jack) (Filed on 1/10/2020)
January 10, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Jaxon Keys Winery & Distillery (A Member of Wilson Artisan Wineries), Kenneth C. Wilson, Diane Wilson, also known as Diane Nolan. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2020)
January 10, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge James Donato. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2020)
January 9, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 4/2/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/9/2020 10:00 AM. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2020)
January 9, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Silver, Jack) (Filed on 1/9/2020)
January 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Injunctive Relief,Civil Penalties and Declaratory Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14054812.). Filed byCalifornia River Watch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Silver, Jack) (Filed on 1/9/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: California River Watch v. Jaxon Keys Winery & Distillery (A Member of Wilson Artisan Wineries) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Wilson, also known as Diane Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth C. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaxon Keys Winery & Distillery (A Member of Wilson Artisan Wineries)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California River Watch
Represented By: Jack Silver
Represented By: David Jonathan Weinsoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?