Stack v. Progressive Select Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Tasha Stack
Defendant: Progressive Select Insurance Company and Progressive Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00338
Filed: January 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Select Insurance Company.. (Dawson, Matthew) (Filed on 2/20/2020)
February 6, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 2/20/2020. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2020)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #7 Stipulated Request Enlarging Intital Response and Case Management Deadlines.Deadline for Defendant to answer is extended to 3/16/2020. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 4/16/2020 is reset to 5/14/2020 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 5/11/2020. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 02/06/2020. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2020) Modified on 2/6/2020 (ejkS, COURT STAFF).
February 5, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Enlarging Intital Response and Case Management Deadlines filed by Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Select Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew H. Dawson in Support of the Stipulated Request for an Order Enlarging Initial Response and Case-Management Deadlines)(Dawson, Matthew) (Filed on 2/5/2020)
February 3, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Tasha Stack.. (Noyes, Christopher) (Filed on 2/3/2020)
January 21, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Select Insurance Company. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 17, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/9/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/16/2020 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2020)
January 17, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Noyes, Christopher) (Filed on 1/17/2020)
January 17, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/31/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2020)
January 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt # 0971-14075567 against Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Select Insurance Company. Filed byTasha Stack. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Noyes, Christopher) (Filed on 1/16/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stack v. Progressive Select Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Select Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew H Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew H Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tasha Stack
Represented By: Katherine A Bruce
Represented By: Brian Stephen Kabateck
Represented By: Stephanie Elyse Charlin
Represented By: Christopher B. Noyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?