Jackson v. Morin et al
Plaintiff: Gerald Jackson
Defendant: Richard N Cross and Tammy Morin
Case Number: 3:2020cv00376
Filed: January 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2020)
January 17, 2020 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 2/24/2020. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2020)
January 17, 2020 Filing 3 Case transferred in from District of California Eastern; Case Number 1:20-cv-00056. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 15, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Order, Case Transferred Out to Another District served on Gerald Jackson. (Marrujo, C)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TRANSFERRING Case to the Northern District of California, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/14/20. (Marrujo, C)
January 13, 2020 Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Richard N. Cross, Tammy Morin by Gerald Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rivera, O)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Morin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard N Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Morin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?