McGuire v. Aetna Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Richard McGuire
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00388
Filed: January 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2020 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Entities by Aetna Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company for Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Altura, Jordan) (Filed on 2/28/2020)
February 28, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint byAetna Life Insurance Company. (Altura, Jordan) (Filed on 2/28/2020)
February 27, 2020 Filing 12 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Serebin, Lisa) (Filed on 2/27/2020)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 2/18/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2020)
February 14, 2020 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2020)
February 14, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Aetna Life Insurance Company.. (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 2/14/2020)
January 31, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 2/14/2020. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2020)
January 30, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Altura, Jordan) (Filed on 1/30/2020)
January 23, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Richard McGuire.. (Serebin, Lisa) (Filed on 1/23/2020)
January 21, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Aetna Life Insurance Company. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 21, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/16/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/23/2020 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 21, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/4/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 17, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Serebin, Lisa) (Filed on 1/17/2020)
January 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aetna Life Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14084221.). Filed byRichard McGuire. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Serebin, Lisa) (Filed on 1/17/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGuire v. Aetna Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard McGuire
Represented By: Lisa Sharon Serebin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?