Service Employees International Union Local No. 1 Health Fund v. Bausch Health Companies Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: Service Employees International Union Local No. 1 Health Fund
Defendant: Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Bausch Health Companies, Inc., Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc. and Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01196
Filed: February 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Referring Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2020 Filing 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman: Discovery Hearing held on 4/16/2020. Parties are instructed to meet and confer and file joint letter briefs regarding 227 & 228, by Friday, April 24, 2020. FTR Time: AT&T Conference. Plaintiff Attorneys: Kristen Johnson, David Nalven, John Bjork, Barry Refsin, and Lauren Ravkin all by phone. Defendant Attorneys: Daniel Asimow, Jennifer Patterson, Brendan Coffman, and Eric Stock all by phone. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (glmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/16/2020)
April 14, 2020 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE Status Conference set for 4/16/2020 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman. Parties shall appear by phone by dialing 888-684-8852/Access Code 1868782. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (glmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2020)
February 26, 2020 Case reassigned to Judge William Alsup. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2020)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RELATING CASE TO NO. C 19-05822 WHA. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/25/2020. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2020)
February 21, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Service Employees International Union Local No. 1 Health Fund (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Administrative Motion iin Related Case)(Street, Whitney) (Filed on 2/21/2020)
February 19, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/14/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/21/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2020)
February 19, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/4/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2020)
February 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byService Employees International Union Local No. 1 Health Fund. (Filing Fee Paid $400.00, Receipt Number 0971-14186183.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Street, Whitney) (Filed on 2/18/2020) Modified on 2/19/2020 (mbcS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Service Employees International Union Local No. 1 Health Fund v. Bausch Health Companies Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bausch Health Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santarus, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Service Employees International Union Local No. 1 Health Fund
Represented By: Whitney E. Street
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?