Hy-Vee, Inc. v. Bausch Health Companies Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Hy-Vee, Inc.
Defendant: Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Bausch Health Companies Inc., Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc, Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc., Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. and Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01198
Filed: February 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2020 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman: Discovery Hearing held on 4/16/2020. Parties are instructed to meet and confer and file joint letter briefs regarding 227 & 228, by Friday, April 24, 2020. FTR Time: AT&T Conference. Plaintiff Attorneys: Kristen Johnson, David Nalven, John Bjork, Barry Refsin, and Lauren Ravkin all by phone. Defendant Attorneys: Daniel Asimow, Jennifer Patterson, Brendan Coffman, and Eric Stock all by phone. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (glmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/16/2020)
April 14, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE Status Conference set for 4/16/2020 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman. Parties shall appear by phone by dialing 888-684-8852/Access Code 1868782. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (glmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 6 Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand - relates to In re GLUMETZA ANTITRUST LITIGATION (Case No. 19-CV-05822-WHA) byAssertio Therapeutics, Inc.. (Stock, Eric) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
February 26, 2020 Case reassigned to Judge William Alsup. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2020)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RELATING CASE TO NO. C 19-05822 WHA. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/25/2020. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2020)
February 21, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Hy-Vee, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Administrative Motion in Related Case)(Neill, Anna) (Filed on 2/21/2020)
February 19, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/14/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/21/2020 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2020)
February 19, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/4/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2020)
February 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., Bausch Health Companies Inc., Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., Santarus, Inc., (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-14188321). Filed by Hy-Vee, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Neill, Anna) (Filed on 2/18/2020) Modified on 2/19/2020 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hy-Vee, Inc. v. Bausch Health Companies Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bausch Health Companies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salix Pharmaceuticals, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santarus, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Jonathan Stock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hy-Vee, Inc.
Represented By: Anna Theresa Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?