Stepp v. In Re: Writ of Habeas Corpus
Petitioner: Robert William Stepp
Respondent: In Re: Writ of Habeas Corpus
Case Number: 3:2020cv01688
Filed: March 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: PSLC AGB
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
2 Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2020 Filing 10 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/4/2020. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DISMISSING CASE Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/4/2020. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Judge Lucy H. Koh no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 03/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2020) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/31/2020: #2 Certificate/Proof of Service) (kedS, COURT STAFF).
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on March 30, 2020. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2020) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/31/2020: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (kedS, COURT STAFF).
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 03/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2020)
March 26, 2020 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2020)
March 23, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Robert William Stepp. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2020)
March 9, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2020)
March 9, 2020 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 4/16/2020. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2020)
March 9, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Filed byRobert William Stepp. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2020) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/10/2020: #1 Envelope) (hdjS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stepp v. In Re: Writ of Habeas Corpus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: In Re: Writ of Habeas Corpus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert William Stepp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?