BMO Harris Bank, National Association v. Sukhmani Trucking Inc. et al
Plaintiff: BMO Harris Bank, National Association and BMO Harris Bank N.A.
Defendant: Harwinder Singh, Sukhami Trucking and Sukhmani Trucking Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01794
Filed: March 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2020 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TIME: Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/11/2020 at 11:00 AM is reset to 9:30 AM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2020)
May 6, 2020 Filing 11 Application for Refund re #1 Complaint,, Receipt Number 0971-14278695 by BMO Harris Bank N.A.. (Miles, Christopher) (Filed on 5/6/2020)
April 27, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Harwinder Singh. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2020)
April 27, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Sukhmani Trucking Inc. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2020)
April 27, 2020 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. (Miles, Christopher) (Filed on 4/27/2020)
April 27, 2020 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. (Miles, Christopher) (Filed on 4/27/2020)
April 7, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by BMO Harris Bank N.A... (Miles, Christopher) (Filed on 4/7/2020)
April 7, 2020 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 4/21/2020. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2020)
March 24, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Breach of Contract against Harwinder Singh, Sukhmani Trucking Inc.. Filed byBMO Harris Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits to Amended Complaint)(Miles, Christopher) (Filed on 3/24/2020)
March 16, 2020 #Electronic filing error. E-filer is reminded to enter party's name correctly. Defendant's name is Sukhmani Trucking Inc. as named in the complaint but is entered as Sukhami Trucking. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2020)
March 13, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/4/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/11/2020 11:00 AM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2020)
March 13, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/27/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2020)
March 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT against Harwinder Singh, Sukhami Trucking ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14278695.). Filed byBMO Harris Bank, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Miles, Christopher) (Filed on 3/13/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BMO Harris Bank, National Association v. Sukhmani Trucking Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BMO Harris Bank, National Association
Represented By: Christopher Claiborne Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BMO Harris Bank N.A.
Represented By: Christopher Claiborne Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harwinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sukhami Trucking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sukhmani Trucking Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?