Wilkins v. State of California
Plaintiff: Dean McNeil Wilkins and Deon McNeil Wilkins
Defendant: State of California, Santa Clara Sheriff's Department, Valley Medical Center and Najib Magee
Case Number: 3:2020cv01939
Filed: March 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: PSLC CET
Referring Judge: Edward M Chen
2 Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 04/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2020)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK TO REASSIGN THIS ACTION. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/21/2020. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2020)
April 13, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Deon McNeil Wilkins. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2020)
April 13, 2020 Filing 8 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byDeon McNeil Wilkins. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2020)
April 13, 2020 Filing 7 Letter from Plaintiff regarding recent filing of documents. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2020)
April 7, 2020 Remark: Plaintiff's name corrected in Docket. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2020)
April 3, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF Need For Name Change in Docket by Dean McNeil Wilkins re #1 Received Document (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2020)
April 3, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Dean McNeil Wilkins.. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2020)
March 19, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2020)
March 19, 2020 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 4/27/2020. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2020)
March 19, 2020 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE Complaint on Form due by 4/27/2020. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2020)
March 19, 2020 Filing 1 Cover Letter by Dean McNeil Wilkins. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilkins v. State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Clara Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valley Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Najib Magee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean McNeil Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deon McNeil Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?