Adams v. Avanath Realty, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Denise Adams
Defendant: Avanath Capital Management, LLC, Oak Village Preservation, L.P. and Avanath Realty, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01943
Filed: March 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Denise Adams. Avanath Realty, Inc. served on 3/26/2020, answer due 4/16/2020. (Derby, Steven) (Filed on 5/7/2020)
May 7, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Denise Adams. Avanath Capital Management, LLC served on 3/26/2020, answer due 4/16/2020. (Derby, Steven) (Filed on 5/7/2020)
May 7, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Denise Adams. Oak Village Preservation, L.P. served on 3/27/2020, answer due 4/17/2020. (Derby, Steven) (Filed on 5/7/2020)
April 29, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ERRATA to re #1 Complaint filed by Denise Adams. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A)(Derby, Steven) (Filed on 4/29/2020)
April 21, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Denise Adams.. (Derby, Steven) (Filed on 4/21/2020)
April 7, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 4/21/2020. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2020)
March 19, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Defendants Avanath Capital Management, LLC, Avanath Realty, Inc., Oak Village Preservation, L.P.. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2020)
March 19, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/12/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/19/2020 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2020)
March 19, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/2/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2020)
March 19, 2020 Filing 3 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed by Denise Adams. (Derby, Steven) (Filed on 3/19/2020)
March 19, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Derby, Steven) (Filed on 3/19/2020)
March 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief and Damages against All Defendants. Filed by Denise Adams, (Filing Fee Paid of $400.00; Receipt #0971-14296260) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Derby, Steven) (Filed on 3/19/2020) Modified on 3/19/2020 (bwS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/19/2020 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. Avanath Realty, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avanath Capital Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oak Village Preservation, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avanath Realty, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Adams
Represented By: Deborah Darrow Gettleman
Represented By: Steven Leo Derby
Represented By: Celia Louise McGuinness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?