American Civil Liberties Union, Immigrants' Rights Project v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: American Civil Liberties Union, Immigrants' Rights Project
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security and United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 3:2020cv02023
Filed: March 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by American Civil Liberties Union, Immigrants' Rights Project (Weissman Ward, Lisa) (Filed on 4/24/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security.. (Hsu, Shining) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
March 24, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Civil Liberties Union, Immigrants' Rights Project (Weissman Ward, Lisa) (Filed on 3/24/2020)
March 24, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Re-issued as to Defendants United States Citizenship and Immigration Services & United States Department of Homeland Security. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2020)
March 24, 2020 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. (Weissman Ward, Lisa) (Filed on 3/24/2020)
March 24, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Returned Unexecuted by American Civil Liberties Union, Immigrants' Rights Project as to All Defendants. (Weissman Ward, Lisa) (Filed on 3/24/2020)
March 23, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Defendants United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, and United States Department of Homeland Security. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2020)
March 23, 2020 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/18/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/25/2020 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2020)
March 23, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge filed by American Civil Liberties Union, Immigrants' Rights Project. (Weissman Ward, Lisa) (Filed on 3/23/2020)
March 23, 2020 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by American Civil Liberties Union, Immigrants' Rights Project (Weissman Ward, Lisa) (Filed on 3/23/2020)
March 23, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Weissman Ward, Lisa) (Filed on 3/23/2020)
March 23, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/6/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2020)
March 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Declaratory and Injunctive Relief Under the Freedom of Information Act (FOIA), 5 U.S.C. Section 552 against All Defendants, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-14306145). Filed by American Civil Liberties Union, Foundation Immigrants' Rights Project. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit Exhibit A, #(2) Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet and Attachment)(Weissman Ward, Lisa) (Filed on 3/23/2020) Modified on 3/23/2020 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Civil Liberties Union, Immigrants' Rights Project v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Shining J. Hsu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Shining J. Hsu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Civil Liberties Union, Immigrants' Rights Project
Represented By: Lisa Nicole Weissman Ward
Represented By: Katrina Leigh Eiland
Represented By: Jayashri Srikantiah
Represented By: Michael King Thomas Tan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?