Moffett v. Salinas Valley State Prison Warden
Plaintiff: Andrew L. Moffett, Jr.
Defendant: Salinas Valley State Prison Warden
Case Number: 3:2020cv02051
Filed: March 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Referring Judge: PSLC CET
2 Judge: Edward M Chen
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Andrew L. Moffett, Jr. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2020)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 03/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2020)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 03/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2020)
March 24, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2020)
March 24, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Andrew L. Moffett, Jr. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2020)
March 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Salinas Valley State Prison Warden. (IFPP) No Process. Filed byAndrew L. Moffett, Jr. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moffett v. Salinas Valley State Prison Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew L. Moffett, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salinas Valley State Prison Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?