Payward, Inc. v. Runyon
Plaintiff: Payward, Inc. and Payward, Inc. a California Corporation doing business as Kraken
Defendant: Nathan Peter Runyon
Case Number: 3:2020cv02130
Filed: March 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Maxine M Chesney
Referring Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Settlement Conference held on 8/17/2021 at 1:00 p.m., by Zoom.Total Time: 1:00 - 5:00 - 4 hours. Appearances for Plaintiff: Christopher N. LaVigne, CounselKimberly Pallen, CounselMichael OConnor, Clients Representative Appearances for Defendant: Claire Cochran, CounselMaya Rodriquez Sorensen, CounselNathan Peter Runyon, DefendantProceedings: Settlement conference held. The court will send the state summary-judgment order tomorrow and will confer next week about whether a further settlement conference would be productive. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/17/2021)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 CLERK'S NOTICE rescheduling start time of Settlement Conference: The court apologizes and resets the start time again from 12:00 noon to instead begin at: 1:00 p.m. given other scheduled matters tomorrow. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2021)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 CLERK'S NOTICE: The court has freed up some time to allow for a more meaningful settlement conference and so advanced the start time of the Settlement Conference from: 2:00 p.m. - to: 12:00 Noon. Settlement Conference set for 8/17/2021 is advanced to: 12:00 PM - Zoom Videoconference Only. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2021)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Settlement Conference previously set for 7/28/2021 is reset to 8/17/2021 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom meeting.Meeting Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the meeting information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lb. Please DO NOT join the Zoom webinar (for publ ic hearings). Go to the section labeled: Joining Non-Public Hearings (Settlement Conferences, etc.) below the public webinar information and click on the box to the left to expand text and obtain information for the non-public Zoom meeting. You will be placed in a waiting room and admitted once the settlement conference begins. (Meeting ID: 160 464 1326 Passcode: 106809)General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2021)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Order Regarding Settlement Conference Statements.Due to the court's scheduling issues, for the settlement conference before Judge Beeler on 7/28/2021, the settlement conference statements are due on 7/14/2021. The court reminds the parties that they can find the procedures for submitting their statements at ECF No. #58 . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lblc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2021)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 AMENDED PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 7/2/2021. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2021)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines:, Set/Reset Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines as to Close of Expert Discovery due by 10/15/2021. Close of Fact Discovery due by 8/16/2021. Designation of Experts due by 8/30/2021. Dispositive Motion due by 11/19/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/29/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. Jury Selection/Jury Trial (5 days) set for 4/11/2022 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Further Status Conference set for 2/18/2022 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 1/14/2022 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2021)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO MODIFY PRETRIAL AND TRIAL SCHEDULE. The deadline to complete fact discovery is extended to August 16, 2021. The deadline to designate experts is extended to August 30, 2021. The deadline to complete expert discovery is extended to October 15, 2021. The deadline to file dispositive motions is extended to November 19, 2021, and any such motion shall be noticed for hearing on January 14, 2022, at 9:00 a.m. The Further Status Conference is continued to February 18, 2022, at 10:30 a.m. The Pretrial Conference is continued to March 29, 2022, at 10:00 a.m. Jury Selection/Trial is continued to April 11, 2022, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 1, 2021. (mmclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2021)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Letter from Kimberly Pallen to Hon. Chesney re parties request to modify current pretrial and trial schedule. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Modifying Pretrial and Trial Schedule)(LaVigne, Christopher) (Filed on 6/30/2021)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Settlement Conference previously set for 6/29/2021 is reset to 7/28/2021 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. Settlement Conference Statements due 7/21/2021. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom meeting.Meeting Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the meeting information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lb. P lease DO NOT join the Zoom webinar (for public hearings). Go to the section labeled: Joining Non-Public Hearings (Settlement Conferences, etc.) below the public webinar information and click on the box to the left to expand text and obtain information for the non-public Zoom meeting. You will be placed in a waiting room and admitted once the settlement conference begins. (Meeting ID: 160 464 1326 Passcode: 106809)General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS , COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2021)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR LITIGATION INVOLVING PATENTS, HIGHLY SENSITIVE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION AND/OR TRADE SECRETS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 20, 2021. (Attachment#1 Exhibit A (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2021)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER re PARTIES' STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR LITIGATION INVOLVING PATENTS, HIGHLY SENSITIVE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION AND/OR TRADE SECRETS filed by Payward, Inc.. (LaVigne, Christopher) (Filed on 4/16/2021)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Order Setting Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge. Settlement Conference set for 6/29/2021 at 11:30 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. Settlement Conference Statements due 6/22/2021. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom meeting.Meeting Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the meeting information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lb. Please DO NOT join the Zoom webinar (for public hearings). Go to the section labeled: Joining Non-Public Hearings (Settlement Conferences, etc.) below the public webinar information and click on the box to the left to expand text and obtain information for the non-public Zoom meeting. You will be placed in a waiting room and admitted once the settlement conference begins. (Meeting ID: 160 464 1326 Passcode: 106809)General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 04/08/2021. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2021)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Settlement Conference Scheduling Call held on 4/8/2021. The court sets the Settlement Conference for Tuesday, June 29, 2021 at 11:30 AM. (Not Reported). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/8/2021)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE TIME: Settlement Conference Scheduling Call set for 4/8/2021 at 11:15 AM is reset to 11:00 AM. The call-in number remains the same. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2021)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULING CALL: This case was referred for a settlement conference to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. The court sets a call with the parties to discuss the timing and logistics of the settlement conference for Thursday, 4/8/2021 at 11:15 AM. The court will email a call-in number separately. If this date does not work, parties may request to change the date by stipulation. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2021)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 3/26/2021. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2021)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Maxine M. Chesney: Initial Case Management Conference held on 3/26/2021., CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler for Settlement Conference in late June or early July 2021, or as soon thereafter as her calendar will permit. Amended Pleadings due by 5/3/2021. Close of Fact Discovery due by 6/30/2021. Designation of Experts due by 7/16/2021. Close of Expert Discovery due by 7/30/2021. Dispositive Motion due by 7/30/2021.Further Status Conference set for 10/1/2021 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Joint Status Conference statement due by 9/24/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/26/2021 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. Jury Selection/Jury Trial (5 days)set for 11/8/2021 at 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Total Time in Court: 27 minutes. Not Reported or Recorded. Plaintiff Attorney: Christopher LaVigne. Defendant Attorney: Maya Sorensen. Attachment: Civil Minutes. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/26/2021)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS filed by Payward, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Hummingbird Opportunity Fund Comm. VA, Other Affiliate Hummingbird Ventures II Comm. VA, Other Affiliate Money Partners Group Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate Digital Currency Group, Inc., Other Affiliate SBI Investment Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate Blockchain Capital III Digital Liquid Venture Fund, LP, Other Affiliate Forge Investments LLC, Other Affiliate Equity Zen Growth Technology Fund LLC, Other Affiliate Bnk to the Future Capital SPC, Other Affiliate Tribe Capital V, LLC, Other Affiliate Payward Ventures, Inc., Other Affiliate Payward Canada, Inc., Other Affiliate Payward Ltd., Other Affiliate Crypto Facilities Ltd., Other Affiliate Payward Mena Holdings Ltd., Other Affiliate Payward Asia K.K., Other Affiliate Bit Trade Pty Ltd., Other Affiliate Payward Trading Ltd. for Payward, Inc.. (LaVigne, Christopher) (Filed on 3/25/2021)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Claire Elizabeth Cochran (Cochran, Claire) (Filed on 3/22/2021)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Payward, Inc.. (LaVigne, Christopher) (Filed on 3/19/2021)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 CLERK'S NOTICE - MARCH 26, 2021 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD TELEPHONICALLY. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel participating in the conference call are directed to email their name and direct phone number to: mmccrd@cand.uscourts.gov. Due to multiple hearings, counsel are directed to be on telephone stand-by from 10:30 AM until called by the Court. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2021)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ANSWER to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Nathan Peter Runyon. (Cochran, Claire) (Filed on 2/9/2021)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT AND STAY ACTION. To the extent the First Claim for Relief is based on a theory that Runyon made use of a trade secret by producing it to Payward, the motion is granted and the First Claim for Relief is, to such extent, dismissed. In all other respects, the motion is denied. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 25, 2021. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2021)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR STAY. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 12, 2021. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2021)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from January 15, 2021, to March 26, 2021, at 10:30 a.m. A Joint Case Management Conference Statement shall be filed no later than March 19, 2021. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on Janujary 4, 2021. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines:, Set/Reset Hearing re #45 Order, Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/19/2021. Initial Case Management Conference reset to 3/26/2021 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 CLERK'S NOTICE - JANUARY 15, 2021 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD TELEPHONICALLY. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel participating in the conference call are directed to email their name and direct phone number to: mmccrd@cand.uscourts.gov. Due to multiple hearings, counsel are directed to be on telephone stand-by from 10:30 AM until called by the Court. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2020)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER SUSTAINING PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO REPLY EVIDENCE; DENYING AS MOOT PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUR-REPLY; GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 3, 2020. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2020)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #41 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff's Administrative Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply ) filed by Nathan Peter Runyon. (Cochran, Claire) (Filed on 11/23/2020)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal - Plaintiff's Administrative Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply filed by Payward, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Christopher LaVigne's Declaration ISO Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #3 Supplement Redacted Version of Administrative Motion for Sur-Reply and Supporting Papers, #4 Supplement Unredacted Version of Administrative Motion for Sur-Reply and Supporting Papers)(LaVigne, Christopher) (Filed on 11/20/2020)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Defendant Runyon's Reply Evidence filed by Payward, Inc.. (LaVigne, Christopher) (Filed on 11/20/2020)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Nathan Peter Runyon re #38 Opposition/Response to Motion, Amended Proof of Service (Cochran, Claire) (Filed on 11/19/2020)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #35 Second MOTION to Dismiss OR STAY PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; AND [PROPOSED] ORDER) - Reply to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by Nathan Peter Runyon. (Cochran, Claire) (Filed on 11/13/2020)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #35 Second MOTION to Dismiss OR STAY PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; AND [PROPOSED] ORDER) filed by Payward, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order Denying Defendant Nathan Runyon's Motion to Dismiss)(LaVigne, Christopher) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 CLERK'S NOTICE CORRECTING THE TIME FOR HEARING ON 1/15/2021 RE #35 Second MOTION to Dismiss OR STAY PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; AND [PROPOSED] ORDER. Motion Hearing set for 1/15/2021, 09:00 AM, before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2020)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Second MOTION to Dismiss OR STAY PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Nathan Peter Runyon. Motion Hearing set for 1/15/2021 10:30 AM before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 11/6/2020. Replies due by 11/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order 2020 10 20 Runyon Proposed Order for Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration 2020 10 06 Declaration of CEC RUNYON MTD, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service 2020 10 23 Runyon - MTD - POS)(Cochran, Claire) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 AMENDED COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Nathan Peter Runyon. Filed by Payward, Inc.. (LaVigne, Christopher) (Filed on 10/9/2020)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS; DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Runyon's motion is granted, and the complaint is dismissed. Should Payward wish to file a First Amended Complaint, Payward shall do so no later than October 9, 2020. The Case Management Conference is continued from October 2, 2020, to January 15, 2021, at 10:30 a.m.; a Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than January 8, 2021. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 22, 2020. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2020)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Set/Reset Hearing re #33 Order on Motion to Dismiss: First Amended Complaint due by 10/9/2020. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/8/2021. Initial Case Management Conference reset to 1/15/2021 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2020)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Parties and Counsel (Cochran, Claire) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options filed by Payward, Inc. (LaVigne, Christopher) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Payward, Inc. re Standing Orders (LaVigne, Christopher) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 CLERK'S NOTICE - OCTOBER 2, 2020 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD TELEPHONICALLY. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel participating in the conference call are directed to email their name and direct phone number to: mmccrd@cand.uscourts.gov. Due to multiple hearings, counsel are advised to be on telephone stand-by from 10:30 AM until called by the Court.. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2020)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR STAY. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 10, 2020. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2020)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines:, Set/Reset Hearing re #26 Order, Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/25/2020. Initial Case Management Conference reset to 10/2/2020 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2020)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The telephonic Case Management Conference currently scheduled for July 17, 2020, is continued to October 2, 2020, at 10:30 a.m. A Joint Case Management Conference Statement shall be filed no later than September 25, 2020. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 29, 2020. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2020)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Request for Judicial Notice re #24 Reply to Opposition/Response and Declaration of Claire E. Cochran in support of Defendant's Reply filed byNathan Peter Runyon. (Related document(s) #24 ) (Xifo, Natalie) (Filed on 6/26/2020)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 REPLY (re #18 First MOTION to Dismiss or Stay) - Reply Memorandum in support of Defendant's Motion Dismiss or Stay Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Nathan Peter Runyon. (Xifo, Natalie) (Filed on 6/26/2020)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 [Proposed] Order Denying Defendant Nathan Runyon's Motion to Dismiss re #21 Opposition/Response to Motion filed by Payward, Inc.. (LaVigne, Christopher) (Filed on 6/26/2020)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CLERK'S NOTICE - JULY 17, 2020 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD TELEPHONICALLY. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel who will be participating in the conference are directed to email their name and direct phone number to: mmccrd@cand.uscourts.gov. Due to multiple hearings - counsel are directed to be on telephone stand-by from 10:30 AM until called by the Court.. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2020)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #18 First MOTION to Dismiss ) filed by Payward, Inc.. (LaVigne, Christopher) (Filed on 6/19/2020)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING AND BRIEFING DATES ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR STAY PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. The hearing on defendant's motion to dismiss or stay, set for hearing on July 10, 2020, is continued to July 17, 2020, at 9:00 a.m. Plaintiff's opposition is due June 19, 2020, and defendant's reply is due June 26, 2020. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 10, 2020. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2020)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER to Continue Hearing and Briefing dates on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or Stay Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Nathan Peter Runyon. (Xifo, Natalie) (Filed on 6/10/2020)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #18 First MOTION to Dismiss . Opposition due by 6/19/2020. Reply due by 6/26/2020. Motion Hearing reset to 7/17/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2020)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 First MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Plaintiff's Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; and [Proposed] Order filed by Nathan Peter Runyon. Motion Hearing set for 7/10/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 6/12/2020. Replies due by 6/19/2020. (Attachments: #(1) REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE AND, #(2) [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING)(Cochran, Claire) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/17/2020 at 10:30 AM. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/10/2020.. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 5/27/2020. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2020)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER. The withdrawal of Andrew E. Calderon is approved. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 7, 2020. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2020)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Maxine M. Chesney for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 05/07/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2020)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2020)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Substitute Attorney - Notice of Substitution of Counsel and Request for Order Permitting Withdrawal of Counsel for Plaintiff Payward, Inc., d/b/a Kraken filed by Payward, Inc.. (Calderon, Andrew) (Filed on 5/5/2020)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Payward, Inc... (LaVigne, Christopher) (Filed on 5/5/2020)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly A Almazan (Almazan, Kimberly) (Filed on 5/4/2020)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 5/6/2020. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2020)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Payward, Inc.. Service waived by Nathan Peter Runyon waiver sent on 3/30/2020, answer due 5/29/2020. (Calderon, Andrew) (Filed on 4/10/2020)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order, signed 4/3/2020, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Christopher LaVigne.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2020)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-14336280) filed by Payward, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate of Good Standing)(LaVigne, Christopher) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Defendant Nathan Peter Runyon. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2020)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/3/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/10/2020 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2020)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/13/2020. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2020)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Calderon, Andrew) (Filed on 3/27/2020)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Calderon, Andrew) (Filed on 3/27/2020)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Defendant Nathan Peter Runyon, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-14321745). Filed by Payward, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Calderon, Andrew) (Filed on 3/27/2020) Modified on 3/27/2020 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Payward, Inc. v. Runyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Payward, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher N. Lavigne
Represented By: Andrew Emilio Calderon
Represented By: Kimberly A Almazan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Payward, Inc. a California Corporation doing business as Kraken
Represented By: Christopher N. Lavigne
Represented By: Andrew Emilio Calderon
Represented By: Kimberly A Almazan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Peter Runyon
Represented By: Claire Elizabeth Cochran
Represented By: Natalie Alexandria Xifo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?