Wareham v. Puget Sound Commerce Center (fka Todd Shipyards Corporation)
Plaintiff: Richard Wareham
Defendant: PUGET SOUND COMMERCE CENTER, INC. (FKA TODD SHIPYARDS CORPORATION) and Puget Sound Commerce Center (fka Todd Shipyards Corporation)
Case Number: 3:2020cv02590
Filed: April 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2020 Filing 9 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Puget Sound Commerce Center (fka Todd Shipyards Corporation) identifying Corporate Parent The Carlyle Group, Corporate Parent Miles Marine, Inc. for Puget Sound Commerce Center (fka Todd Shipyards Corporation). (Steele, Demian) (Filed on 5/22/2020)
May 22, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint byPuget Sound Commerce Center (fka Todd Shipyards Corporation). (Steele, Demian) (Filed on 5/22/2020)
April 15, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Puget Sound Commerce Center, Inc. (aka Todd Shipyards Corporation). (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2020)
April 15, 2020 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 7/9/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/16/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2020)
April 15, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Edward M. Chen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2020)
April 14, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Donadio, David) (Filed on 4/14/2020)
April 14, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Richard Wareham (Donadio, David) (Filed on 4/14/2020)
April 14, 2020 Filing 2 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Richard Wareham.. (Donadio, David) (Filed on 4/14/2020)
April 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Asbestos Personal Injury/Products Liability; Demand for Jury Trial against PUGET SOUND COMMERCE CENTER, INC. (FKA TODD SHIPYARDS CORPORATION) ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14373717.). Filed byRichard Wareham. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Donadio, David) (Filed on 4/14/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wareham v. Puget Sound Commerce Center (fka Todd Shipyards Corporation)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PUGET SOUND COMMERCE CENTER, INC. (FKA TODD SHIPYARDS CORPORATION)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puget Sound Commerce Center (fka Todd Shipyards Corporation)
Represented By: Demian David Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Wareham
Represented By: David R. Donadio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?