United States of America v. Approximately $1,002,303 and Several Related Firearms
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately $1,002,303 and Several Related Firearms
Claimant: Petko Iliev
Case Number: 3:2020cv02626
Filed: April 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2020 Filing 15 CIVIL JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/9/2020. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2020)
June 8, 2020 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Petko Iliev.. (Michael, David) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 8, 2020 Filing 13 Proposed Order re #12 Stipulation (Proposed Civil Judgment of Forfeiture) by United States of America. (Rees, Robert) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 5, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION (Settlement Agreement and Stipulated Dismissal) filed by United States of America. (Rees, Robert) (Filed on 6/5/2020)
June 4, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Claimaint Petko Iliev shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 6/18/2020. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2020)
June 3, 2020 Filing 10 CLAIM Opposing Forfeiture byPetko Iliev. (Michael, David) (Filed on 6/3/2020)
April 30, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #6 Warrant Issued, #5 Proposed Warrant, #3 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge, 2 Case Assigned by Intake,,, #8 Warrant Issued, #7 Proposed Warrant, #4 Notice (Other), #1 Complaint (Rees, Robert) (Filed on 4/30/2020)
April 24, 2020 Filing 8 WARRANT OF ARREST OF PROPERTY IN REM AS TO SEVERAL RELATED FIRERAMS Issued as to Approximately $1,002,303 and Several Related Firearms (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2020)
April 23, 2020 Filing 7 Proposed Warrant. (Rees, Robert) (Filed on 4/23/2020)
April 23, 2020 Filing 6 Warrant of Arrest of Property In Rem Issued (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2020)
April 22, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Warrant. (Rees, Robert) (Filed on 4/22/2020)
April 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by United States of America (Notice of Forfeiture Action) (Rees, Robert) (Filed on 4/17/2020)
April 17, 2020 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States of America.. (Rees, Robert) (Filed on 4/17/2020)
April 17, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/1/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2020)
April 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Complaint for Forfeiture) against Approximately $1,002,303 and Several Related Firearms. Filed byUnited States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rees, Robert) (Filed on 4/16/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately $1,002,303 and Several Related Firearms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $1,002,303 and Several Related Firearms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Robert David Rees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Petko Iliev
Represented By: David Martin Michael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?