Hansen v Ticketmaster
Plaintiff: Derek Hansen
Defendant: Live Nation Entertainment Co, Ticketmaster Entertainment, Inc., Ticketmaster LLC and Live Nation Entertainment, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv02685
Filed: April 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Referring Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Marie Ann McCrary (McCrary, Marie) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #19 Joint Stipulation Setting Briefing Schedule and Continuing Case Management Conference. Motion to Compel Arbitration to be filed 6/29/2020; opposition due 7/29/2020; reply due 8/28/2020; hearing set 10/8/2020 at 1:30 PM. Initial Case Management Conference continued until second Thursday following hearing on Motion to Dismiss. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2020)
May 26, 2020 Filing 19 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Setting Briefing Schedule and Continuing Case Management Conference) filed by Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Ticketmaster LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Timothy L. O'Mara)(O'Mara, Timothy) (Filed on 5/26/2020)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/6/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/30/2020. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/20/2020. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2020) Modified on 5/20/2020 (afmS, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 05/07/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2020)
May 6, 2020 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2020)
May 5, 2020 Filing 15 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Ticketmaster LLC.. (O'Mara, Timothy) (Filed on 5/5/2020)
May 5, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint (Defendants erroneously sued as Ticketmaster Entertainment, Inc. and Live Nation Entertainment Co.) filed by Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Ticketmaster LLC. (O'Mara, Timothy) (Filed on 5/5/2020)
May 5, 2020 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Ticketmaster LLC identifying Corporate Parent Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. for Ticketmaster LLC; Other Affiliate Liberty Media Corporation for Live Nation Entertainment, Inc.. (Erroneously sued as Ticketmaster Entertainment, Inc. and Live Nation Entertainment Co.) (O'Mara, Timothy) (Filed on 5/5/2020)
May 5, 2020 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Entities by Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Ticketmaster LLC identifying Corporate Parent Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. for Ticketmaster LLC; Other Affiliate Liberty Media Corporation for Live Nation Entertainment, Inc.. (O'Mara, Timothy) (Filed on 5/5/2020)
May 5, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Michael Gass on behalf of Defendants Ticketmaster LLC and Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. (Erroneously sued as Ticketmaster Entertainment, Inc. and Live Nation Entertainment Co.) (Gass, Andrew) (Filed on 5/5/2020)
May 5, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy L. O'Mara on behalf of Defendants Ticketmaster LLC and Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. (Erroneously sued as Ticketmaster Entertainment, Inc. and Live Nation Entertainment Co.) (O'Mara, Timothy) (Filed on 5/5/2020)
May 5, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Murray Wall on behalf of Defendants Ticketmaster LLC and Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. (Erroneously sued as Ticketmaster Entertainment, Inc. and Live Nation Entertainment Co.) (Wall, Daniel) (Filed on 5/5/2020)
April 20, 2020 Filing 8 ERRATA re #1 Complaint by Derek Hansen. (Safier, Seth) (Filed on 4/20/2020)
April 20, 2020 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/13/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/20/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2020)
April 20, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Ticketmaster Entertainment, Inc. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2020)
April 20, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Live Nation Entertainment Co. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2020)
April 17, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/1/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2020)
April 17, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Safier, Seth) (Filed on 4/17/2020)
April 17, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Safier, Seth) (Filed on 4/17/2020)
April 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14386703.). Filed byDerek Hansen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Safier, Seth) (Filed on 4/17/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hansen v Ticketmaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Live Nation Entertainment Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ticketmaster Entertainment, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ticketmaster LLC
Represented By: Andrew Michael Gass
Represented By: Timothy L. O'Mara
Represented By: Daniel Murray Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Live Nation Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Michael Gass
Represented By: Timothy L. O'Mara
Represented By: Daniel Murray Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Hansen
Represented By: Seth Adam Safier
Represented By: Marie Ann McCrary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?