Zepeda Rivas et al v. Jennings et al
Plaintiff: DUNG TUAN DANG, ANGEL DE JESUS ZEPEDA RIVAS, JAVIER ALFARO, LAWRENCE KURIA MWAURA, LUCIANO GONZALO MENDOZA JERONIMO, BRENDA RUBI RUIZ TOVAR, CORAIMA YARITZA SANCHEZ NUEZ and Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez
Defendant: Acting Director DAVID JENNINGS, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Geo Group, Inc., Deputy Director MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, WARDEN NATHAN ALLEN, David Jennings, Nathan Allen and Matthew T. Albence
Not Classified By Court: Kethikoun Keo, Rachana Duong and Jose Eduardo Guerra
Case Number: 3:2020cv02731
Filed: April 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2020 Filing 776 STATUS REPORT by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 10/28/2020)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 775 ORDER RE INDIVIDUAL MEDICAL RECORDS. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 10/28/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2020)
October 27, 2020 Filing 774 STATUS REPORT by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 10/27/2020)
October 26, 2020 Filing 773 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply in Support of Bail Application of Ivan Hernandez Pelayo)(Friedman, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
October 26, 2020 Filing 772 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #767 Notice (Other), Response to Bail Application (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 767-1 Hernandez Pelayo)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
October 26, 2020 Filing 771 STATUS REPORT by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
October 23, 2020 Filing 770 STATUS REPORT by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 769 ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria denying without prejudice #760 Federal Defendants' motion to compel in Discovery Letter Brief. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 22, 2020 Filing 768 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Notice of Request for Release by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Release Request of Mr. Ivan Omar Hernandez Pelayo)(Wells, Kelly) (Filed on 10/22/2020)
October 22, 2020 Filing 767 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas Notice of Request for Release (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Release Request of Mr. Ivan Omar Hernandez Pelayo)(Wells, Kelly) (Filed on 10/22/2020)
October 22, 2020 Filing 766 STATUS REPORT by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 10/22/2020)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 765 ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #758 Plaintiffs' proposed order re Discovery Letter Brief. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2020)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 764 ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting as modified #759 Plaintiffs' proposed order for Discovery Letter Brief. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2020)
October 21, 2020 Filing 763 STATUS REPORT by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 10/21/2020)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 762 BAIL ORDER NO. 50. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 10/20/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 20, 2020 Filing 761 STATUS REPORT by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 20, 2020 Filing 760 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Joint Submission in Connection with Discovery Disputes filed by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Proposed Order)(Hong, Neal) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 19, 2020 Filing 759 Joint Discovery Letter Brief About Federal Respondents-Defendants' Refusal to Produce Documents and Witnesses Regarding Financial Consideration Paid to GEO Group, Inc. filed by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Plaintiffs' Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Order Federal Defendants' Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Order GEO Group, Inc.'s Proposed Order)(Cook, Timothy) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 19, 2020 Filing 758 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel a Reasonable Inquiry and Responsive Documents to RFPs Set 2 and Set 3 filed by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Plaintiffs' Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Order GEO Group, Inc.'s Proposed Order)(Cook, Timothy) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 19, 2020 Filing 757 STATUS REPORT by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 756 STATUS REPORT by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 755 ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria denying as moot #709 Motion to Dismiss; granting #747 Stipulation regarding filing of amended complaint and responses. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 15, 2020 Filing 754 STATUS REPORT by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 15, 2020 Filing 753 AUDIO RECORDINGS ORDER (re: 750 Further Case Management Conference}, by US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Court will send to Bonny Wong at bonny.wong@usdoj.gov a link to the files requested in this order. Fee waived because filer is USAO, FPD or CJA counsel on this case. (Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 10/15/2020). Modified on 10/16/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
October 15, 2020 Filing 752 CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING THE STATUS CONFERENCE FROM 10/29/2020, TO 10/28/2020, AT 3:00 PM. Status Conference set for 10/28/2020, 03:00 PM, by Videoconference Only before Judge Vince Chhabria. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Court Appearances: Advan ced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Monday, October 26, 2020, at 10:00 a.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Status Conference s et for 10/28/2020, 03:00 PM, by Videoconference Only before Judge Vince Chhabria. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 14, 2020 Filing 751 Transcript of Electronic Recorded Zoom Webinar Proceedings held on August 18, 2020, before Judge Vince Chhabria. Transcribed by Court Reporter Marla F. Knox, RPR, CRR, RMR, telephone number (602) 391-6990. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #608 Transcript Order, ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/12/2021. (Related documents(s) #608 ) (mfk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2020)
October 14, 2020 Filing 750 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vince Chhabria: Further Case Management Conference held via Zoom on 10/14/2020.A hearing on the order to show cause as to why a preliminary injunction should not issue will be held on Monday, November 16. If necessary, the hearing will continue during the afternoons of November 17, 18, 19, and 20 beginning at 1 p.m.The next status conference will be held at 9 a.m. on Thursday, October 29, to discuss the logistics of the hearing.The Court grants the parties stipulation to file oversized briefs of 25 pages per side. Defendants must submit their briefs and supporting documents by Monday, November 2. Plaintiffs must submit their briefs and supporting documents by Tuesday, November 10.Total Time in Court: 27 minutes. Court Reporter: Hearing recorded via Zoom Webinar: 10:07 - 10:34. Plaintiff Attorney: Martin Schenker, Timothy Cook, and Bree Bernwanger. Defendant Attorney: Wendy Garbers, Sara Winslow, and Neal Hong for Federal Defendants; Susan Coleman, David Weinstein, and Royal Oakes for GEO Group. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Not less than 3 court days in advance of the hearing.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/14/2020)
October 14, 2020 Filing 749 STATUS REPORT by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 10/14/2020)
October 14, 2020 Filing 748 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas Notice of Enrollment into In-Patient Program (Dkt. 733, Abdiwelle Yousuf) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Francisco Ugarte)(Ugarte, Francisco) (Filed on 10/14/2020)
October 14, 2020 Filing 747 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #709 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint, #1 Complaint, filed by Nathan Allen, Geo Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1Proposed Order)(Weinstein, David) (Filed on 10/14/2020) Modified on 10/14/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
October 13, 2020 Filing 746 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas re #744 Notice (Other) Reply in Support of Renewed Bail Application for Lawrence Kuria Mwaura (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply in Support of Renewed Bail Application for Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, #2 Declaration Declaration of Douglas Jalaie in Support of Renewed Bail Application for Lawrence Kuria Mwaura)(Rodarte, Hayden) (Filed on 10/13/2020)
October 13, 2020 Filing 745 STATUS REPORT by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 10/13/2020)
October 13, 2020 Filing 744 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #737 Notice (Other), Response to Bail Applications (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 737-1, Mwaura)(Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 10/13/2020)
October 13, 2020 Filing 743 *** DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR (ORDER CANCELLED AT ORDERING PARTY'S REQUEST) *** AUDIO RECORDINGS ORDER (re: 577 Status Conference,,,,,,,,,,,,, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, ), by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. Court will send to Charlotte Gemma at cgemma@cooley.com a link to the files requested in this order. ( Filing fee $ 31, receipt number 0971-15055968). (Schenker, Martin) (Filed on 10/13/2020) Modified on 10/13/2020 (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
October 9, 2020 Filing 742 STATUS REPORT by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 10/9/2020)
October 9, 2020 Filing 741 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Riordan, Sean) (Filed on 10/9/2020)
October 9, 2020 Filing 740 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 10/9/2020)
October 8, 2020 Filing 739 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR RELEASE (UNDER SEAL) by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Ex B to Renewed Application for Release for Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, #2 Unredacted Ex C to Renewed Application for Release for Lawrence Kuria Mwaura)(Rodarte, Hayden) (Filed on 10/8/2020)
October 8, 2020 Filing 738 STATUS REPORT by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 10/8/2020)
October 8, 2020 Filing 737 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR RELEASE (Attachments: #1 Renewed Application for Release for Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, #2 Ex A to Mwaura App, #3 Ex B to Mwaura App, #4 Ex C to Mwaura App, #5 Ex D to Mwaura App, #6 Ex E to Mwaura App, #7 Ex F to Mwaura App)(Rodarte, Hayden) (Filed on 10/8/2020)
October 7, 2020 Filing 736 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING A FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR 10/14/2020, PROVIDING ZOOM ACCESS, AND REQUIRING ADVANCE REGISTRATION OF COUNSEL. Case Management Statement due by 10/9/2020. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/14/2020, 10:00 AM. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #http s://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Tuesday, October 13, 2020, at 10:00 a.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Case Management Statement due by 10/9/2020. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/14/2020, 10:00 AM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2020)
October 7, 2020 Filing 735 STATUS REPORT by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 10/7/2020)
October 6, 2020 Filing 734 STATUS REPORT by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 10/6/2020)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 733 ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #713 Motion to enforce bail order and modifying conditions of bail for Abdiwelle Yousuf. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2020)
October 5, 2020 Filing 732 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Request for Release by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Release of Rene Octavio Gonzalez Caballero)(Bernwanger, Bree) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
October 5, 2020 Filing 731 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas Request for Release (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Release of Rene Octavio Gonzalez Caballero)(Bernwanger, Bree) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
October 5, 2020 Filing 730 STATUS REPORT by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
October 2, 2020 Filing 729 STATUS REPORT by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 10/2/2020)
October 1, 2020 Filing 728 STATUS REPORT by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 10/1/2020)
September 30, 2020 Filing 727 REPLY (re #713 MOTION to Enforce Bail Order for Mr. Yousuf re #425 Order ) filed byMatthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
September 30, 2020 Filing 726 STATUS REPORT by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
September 29, 2020 Filing 725 STATUS REPORT by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 28, 2020 Filing 724 STATUS REPORT by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 9/28/2020)
September 25, 2020 Filing 723 STATUS REPORT by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 9/25/2020)
September 25, 2020 Filing 722 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defedants' Motion to Enforce Bail Order re: Abdiwelle Abas Yousuf (Dkt. 713) by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Francisco Ugarte)(Ugarte, Francisco) (Filed on 9/25/2020)
September 25, 2020 Filing 721 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #713 MOTION to Enforce Bail Order for Mr. Yousuf re #425 Order ) filed byJavier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Francisco Ugarte)(Ugarte, Francisco) (Filed on 9/25/2020)
September 24, 2020 Filing 720 STATUS REPORT by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 9/24/2020)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 719 ORDER RE BAIL APPLICATIONS FOR DETAINEES RECOVERED FROM COVID-19. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 9/24/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2020)
September 23, 2020 Filing 718 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Request for Release by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Release for Jose Aguilar Carrion)(Friedman, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/23/2020)
September 23, 2020 Filing 717 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas Release Request (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Release for Jose Aguilar Carrion)(Friedman, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/23/2020)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 716 BAIL ORDER NO. 49. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 9/23/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2020)
September 23, 2020 Filing 715 STATUS REPORT by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 9/23/2020)
September 23, 2020 Filing 714 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Unredacted Motion to Enforce Bail Order: Yousuf by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of D.O. Lair (Unredacted))(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 9/23/2020)
September 23, 2020 Filing 713 MOTION to Enforce Bail Order for Mr. Yousuf re #425 Order filed by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Responses due by 10/7/2020. Replies due by 10/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of D.O. Lair, #2 Proposed Order)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 9/23/2020)
September 22, 2020 Filing 712 STATUS REPORT by David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 9/22/2020)
September 21, 2020 Filing 711 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply in Support of Bail Application of Jaswant Singh, #2 Exhibit Reply in Support of Bail Application of Alberto Diaz Solano, #3 Exhibit Reply in Support of Bail Application of David Villareal, #4 Exhibit Reply in Support of Bail Application of Alton Edmondson)(Friedman, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/21/2020)
September 21, 2020 Filing 710 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #694 Notice (Other),, #702 Notice (Other), #699 Notice (Other), Response to Bail Applications (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 694-1, Singh, J., #2 Response to ECF 694-2, Diaz Solano, #3 Response to ECF 694-6, Edmondson, #4 Response to ECF 699-1, Argueta Rivera, #5 Response to ECF 702-1, Villareal)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 9/21/2020)
September 21, 2020 Filing 709 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Nathan Allen, Geo Group, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/29/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 10/5/2020. Replies due by 10/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Oakes, Royal) (Filed on 9/21/2020)
September 21, 2020 Filing 708 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #706 Notice (Other), #705 Notice (Other), #691 Notice (Other), Update Regarding Removal Order of Aldo Fabian Sanchez Alvarado (Attachments: #1 Removal Order)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 9/21/2020)
September 21, 2020 Filing 707 STATUS REPORT by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 9/21/2020)
September 18, 2020 Filing 706 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply in Support of Bail Application of Aldo Sanchez Alvarado)(Friedman, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 18, 2020 Filing 705 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #691 Notice (Other), Response to Bail Application (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 691-1, Sanchez Alvarado)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 18, 2020 Filing 704 STATUS REPORT by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 18, 2020 Filing 703 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Release Request by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Release Request of David Eduardo Villareal)(Beier, Genna) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 18, 2020 Filing 702 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas Release Request (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Release Request of David Eduardo Villareal)(Beier, Genna) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 17, 2020 Filing 701 RESPONSE re #686 Order Regarding Possibility of Reinfection by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dr. Medrano, #2 Declaration of Dr. Henderson, #3 Declaration of A. Zack, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 9/17/2020)
September 17, 2020 Filing 700 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR RELEASE (UNDER SEAL) by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Application for Release for Jose Alcides Argueta Rivera)(Friedman, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/17/2020)
September 17, 2020 Filing 699 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR RELEASE (Attachments: #1 Application for Release for Jose Alcides Argueta Rivera)(Friedman, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/17/2020)
September 17, 2020 Filing 698 Brief Plaintiffs' Brief Regarding Risk of Reinfection filed byJavier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Akiko Iwasaki, PH.D.)(MacLean, Emilou) (Filed on 9/17/2020)
September 17, 2020 Filing 697 STATUS REPORT by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 9/17/2020)
September 16, 2020 Filing 696 STATUS REPORT by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 16, 2020 Filing 695 CLERK'S NOTICE vacating 9/18/2020 Further Status Conference at the request of the parties. Should the parties need a new hearing date, they may email the Court requesting one. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 16, 2020 Filing 694 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR RELEASE (Attachments: #1 Jaswant Singh Bail Application, #2 Alberto Diaz Solano Bail App., #3 Exhibit A to Solano Bail App, #4 Exhibit B to Solano Bail App, #5 Exhibit C to Solano Bail App, #6 Alton Edmondson Supp. Bail App., #7 Exhibit A to Edmondson Supp. Bail App, #8 Exhibit B to Edmondson Supp. Bail App)(Riordan, Sean) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 16, 2020 Filing 693 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR RELEASE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Jaswant Singh Short Form Bail Application, #2 Alberto Diaz Solano Short Form Bail Application, #3 Exhibit A To Solano Application, #4 Exhibit B to Solano Application, #5 Exhibit C to Solano Application, #6 Alton Edmondson Supplemental Bail App., #7 Exhibit A to Edmonson App., #8 Exhibit B to Edmonson App)(Riordan, Sean) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 15, 2020 Filing 692 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Notice of Request for Release by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Release of Aldo Fabian Sanchez Alvarado)(Bernwanger, Bree) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 15, 2020 Filing 691 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas Notice of Request for Release (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Release of Aldo Fabian Sanchez Alvarado, #2 Exhibit Exhibit to Request for Release of Aldo Fabian Sanchez Alvarado)(Bernwanger, Bree) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 15, 2020 Filing 690 NOTICE of Appearance by Neal Cho Hong (Hong, Neal) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 15, 2020 Filing 689 STATUS REPORT by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 14, 2020 Filing 688 STATUS REPORT by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 11, 2020 Filing 687 STATUS REPORT by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 9/11/2020)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 686 ORDER FOR BRIEFING ON POSSIBILITY OF REINFECTION. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 9/11/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2020)
September 10, 2020 Filing 685 STATUS REPORT by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 9/10/2020)
September 10, 2020 Filing 684 AUDIO RECORDINGS ORDER (re: 683 Status Conference,,,,,,,,,,,, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,, ), by US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Court will send to Bonny Wong at bonny.wong@usdoj.gov a link to the files requested in this order. Fee waived because filer is USAO, FPD or CJA counsel on this case. (Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 8/27/2020).
September 9, 2020 Filing 682 STATUS REPORT by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 8, 2020 Filing 683 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vince Chhabria: Status Conference held via Zoom on 9/8/2020.The Court ordered the defendants to produce the documents listed on pages 18 and 19 of the plaintiffs medical plan briefing within 7 days of this hearing. The defendants do not need to file these documents on the docket. The plaintiffs can serve any additional discovery requests relating to this particular issue by tomorrow, and the defendants must produce documents responding to those requests within 7 days from when the requests are served.The Court ordered the plaintiffs to identify today five detainees for whom complete medical files must be turned over by this Thursday, September 3, at 5 p.m. The defendants are ordered to produce medical records for the other recovered detainees by next Wednesday, September 16. Further Status Conference set for 9/18/2020, 10:45 AM, before Judge Vince Chhabria. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Total Time in Court: 59 minutes. Court Reporter: Hearing recorded via Zoom Webinar: 4:15 - 5:14. Plaintiff Attorney: Emi Maclean, William S. Freeman, and Bree Bernwanger. Defendant Attorney: Wendy Garbers, Adrienne Zack, Sara Winslow, and Shiwon Choe for Federal Defendants; Susan Coleman, Royal Oakes, and David Weinstein for GEO Group. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Not less than 3 court days in advance of the hearing.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Status Conference set for 9/18/2020, 10:45 AM, before Judge Vince Chhabria. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with t his entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/8/2020)
September 8, 2020 Filing 681 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply in Support of Bail Application of Oscar Vigil)(Friedman, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 8, 2020 Filing 680 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #664 Notice (Other), Response to Bail Application (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 664-1, Vigil)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 8, 2020 Filing 679 STATUS REPORT by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 678 BAIL ORDER NO. 48. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 9/8/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 8, 2020 Filing 677 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Declaration of Bree Bernwanger ISO Case Management Statement by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Bernwanger, Bree) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 8, 2020 Filing 676 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bree Bernwanger)(Bernwanger, Bree) (Filed on 9/8/2020) Modified on 9/9/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
September 7, 2020 Filing 675 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING THE TIME FOR THE 9/8/2020 FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE. Status Conference set for 9/8/2020, 04:00 PM, before Judge Vince Chhabria. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings h eld by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Status Conference set for 9/8/2020, 04:00 PM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with t his entry.)(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 674 STATUS REPORT (Corrected) by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 673 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY. SEE #674 *** STATUS REPORT by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 9/4/2020) Modified on 9/9/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
September 4, 2020 Filing 672 OBJECTIONS to Plaintiffs' Characterization #658 of Defendants' Response to the Court's August 21 Order and OPPOSITION to the Extent Plaintiffs Seek Expedited Discovery by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Shiwon Choe, #2 Exhibit A - draft plan, #3 Exhibit B - response to draft plan, #4 Declaration of Wendy Baca)(Choe, Shiwon) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 671 ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria denying #660 Motion for Reconsideration filed by Juan Barocio-Mendez. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 670 ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #668 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document at 659-1. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 #Electronic filing error. E-filer is reminded to include a caption page for future filings if exhibits need to be filed separately on the docket. Re: #666 Notice (Other), filed by Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Dung Tuan Dang, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Javier Alfaro, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 3, 2020 Filing 669 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas re #662 Notice (Other) Reply in Support of Bail Application for Walter Ivan Carrillo Torres (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply in Support of Bail Application for Walter Ivan Carrillo Torres)(Rodarte, Hayden) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 3, 2020 Filing 668 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document, [PROPOSED] Order (Docket No. 659-1) filed by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Bernwanger, Bree) (Filed on 9/3/2020) Modified on 9/4/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
September 3, 2020 Filing 667 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [659-1] by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Bernwanger, Bree) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 3, 2020 Filing 666 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [659-1]] (Bernwanger, Bree) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 3, 2020 Filing 665 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR RELEASE (UNDER SEAL) by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Application for Release for Oscar Vigil)(Ugarte, Francisco) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 3, 2020 Filing 664 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR RELEASE (Attachments: #1 Application for Release for Oscar Vigil)(Ugarte, Francisco) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 3, 2020 Filing 663 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Unredacted Response to Bail Application ECF 646-1, Carrillo Torres by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 3, 2020 Filing 662 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #646 Notice (Other), Response to Bail Application (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 646-1, Carrillo Torres)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 3, 2020 Filing 661 STATUS REPORT by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 2, 2020 Filing 659 Declaration of Bree Bernwanger in Support of #658 Objection, to Defendants Written Plan to Improve Medical Assistance for Covid-Positive Detainees at Mesa Verde filed byJavier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 *** DOCUMENT REMOVED PER ORDER #670 Exhibit A *** , #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F-1, #7 Exhibit F-2, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Related document(s) #658 ) (MacLean, Emilou) (Filed on 9/2/2020) Modified on 9/4/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/4/2020) (ewn, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/4/2020 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
September 2, 2020 Filing 658 OBJECTIONS to re #645 Response ( Non Motion ), REDACTED - Plaintiffs Objections to Defendants Written Plan to Improve Medical Assistance for Covid-Positive Detainees at Mesa Verde by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (MacLean, Emilou) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
September 2, 2020 Filing 657 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Related to Plaintiffs Objections to Defendants Written Plan to Improve Medical Assistance for Covid-Positive Detainees at Mesa Verde filed by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Timothy W. Cook in Support of Petitioners-Plaintiffs Administrative Motion to Seal Documents Related to Plaintiffs Objections to Defendants Written Plan to Improve Medical Assistance for Covid-Positive Detainees At Mesa Verde, #2 Declaration of Bree Bernwanger in Support of Plaintiffs Objections to Defendants Written Plan to Improve Medical Assistance for Covid-Positive Detainees at Mesa Verde, #3 Exhibit A to Bree Bernwanger Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to Bree Bernwanger Declaration, #5 Exhibit C to Bree Bernwanger Declaration, #6 Exhibit D to Bree Bernwanger Declaration, #7 Exhibit E to Bree Bernwanger Declaration, #8 Exhibit F-1 to Bree Bernwanger Declaration, #9 Exhibit F-2 to Bree Bernwanger Declaration, #10 Exhibit G to Bree Bernwanger Declaration, #11 Exhibit H to Bree Bernwanger Declaration, #12 REDACTED - Plaintiffs Objections to Defendants Written Plan to Improve Medical Assistance for Covid-Positive Detainees at Mesa Verde, #13 UNREDACTED - Plaintiffs Objections to Defendants Written Plan to Improve Medical Assistance for Covid-Positive Detainees at Mesa Verde, #14 Proposed Order Regarding Petitioners-Plaintiffs Administrative Motion to Seal Documents Related to Plaintiffs Objections to Defendants Written Plan to Improve Medical Assistance for Covid-Positive Detainees at Mesa Verde)(MacLean, Emilou) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
September 2, 2020 Filing 656 STATUS REPORT by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
September 1, 2020 Filing 655 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING THE FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE AT THE REQUEST OF THE PARTIES. Status Conference set for 9/8/2020, 10:00 AM, before Judge Vince Chhabria. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of co unsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Friday, September 4, 2020, at 10:00 a.m..General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Status Conference set for 9/8/2020, 10:00 AM, before Judge Vince Chhabria. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
September 1, 2020 Filing 654 STATUS REPORT by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
September 1, 2020 Filing 653 USCA Case Number 20-16690 for #648 Notice of Appeal, filed by US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 652 BAIL ORDER NO. 47. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 9/1/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 651 ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #639 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document at Dkt. 634-1. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
August 31, 2020 Filing 650 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Reply to Defendants' Response to Bail Application by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Reply of Jose Daniel Gonzalez [619-1, 641-1])(Ugarte, Francisco) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 31, 2020 Filing 649 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas (Replies to Defendants' Responses to Bail Applications) (Attachments: #1 Reply of Jose Daniel Gonzalez [619-1, 641-1], #2 Reply of John Emmanuel Carvajal Victorio [628-1, 642-1], #3 Reply of Raleigh Rana Figueras [636-1, 644-1], #4 Reply of Samuel Rios Alvarado [619-2, 641-2], #5 Reply of Rajnish Rajnish [619-4, 641-3])(Ugarte, Francisco) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 31, 2020 Filing 648 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Appeal of Order #465 , Order #564 , Order #471 , Order #556 , Order #459 , Order #518 , Order #415 , Order #625 , Order #579 , Order #539 , Order #448 , Order #425 , Order #492 (Appeal fee FEE WAIVED.) (Choe, Shiwon) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 31, 2020 Filing 647 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Request for Release by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Release of Walter Ivan Carrillo Torres)(Rodarte, Hayden) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 31, 2020 Filing 646 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas Request for Release (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Release of Walter Ivan Carrillo Torres)(Rodarte, Hayden) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 31, 2020 Filing 645 RESPONSE re #595 Order to Create Written Plan by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Medical COVID-19 Response Plan, #2 Declaration of Dr. Richard Medrano)(Choe, Shiwon) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 31, 2020 Filing 644 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #636 Notice (Other), Response to Renewed Bail Application (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 636-1, Figueras)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 31, 2020 Filing 643 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Unredacted Response to Bail Application ECF 619-1, Gonzalez by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 31, 2020 Filing 642 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #628 Notice (Other), Response to Bail Application (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 628-1, Victorio)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 31, 2020 Filing 641 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #619 Notice (Other),, Response to Bail Applications (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 619-1, Gonzalez, #2 Response to ECF 619-2, Rios Alvarado, #3 Response to ECF 619-4, Rajnish)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 31, 2020 Filing 640 STATUS REPORT by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 29, 2020 Filing 639 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document (Docket 634-1) filed by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Ugarte, Francisco) (Filed on 8/29/2020)
August 28, 2020 Filing 638 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Reply to Defendants' Response to Bail Application by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply in Support of Bail Application for Margarito Zamora Guzman)(Beier, Genna) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
August 28, 2020 Filing 637 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas re #633 Notice (Other), Reply to Defendants' Response to Bail Application (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply in Support of Bail Application for Chuny Touch, #2 Exhibit Reply in Support of Bail Application for Margarito Zamora Guzman)(Beier, Genna) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
August 28, 2020 Filing 636 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas re #634 Notice (Other), CORRECTION OF DOCKET No. 634-1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Release for Raleigh Rana Figueras)(Ugarte, Francisco) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
August 28, 2020 Filing 635 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Notice of Request for Release by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Release for Raleigh Rana Figueras)(Ugarte, Francisco) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
August 28, 2020 Filing 634 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas Notice of Request for Release (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Release for Raleigh Rana Figueras)(Ugarte, Francisco) (Filed on 8/28/2020) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/2/2020) (wsnS, COURT STAFF).
August 28, 2020 Filing 633 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #611 Notice (Other), Response to Bail Applications (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 611-1, Zamora Guzman, #2 Response to ECF 611-2, Touch, #3 Response to ECF 611-3, Gallardo Lopez)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
August 28, 2020 Filing 632 STATUS REPORT by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 631 BAIL ORDER NO. 46. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 8/28/20. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
August 28, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Motions due by 2/23/2021. Responses due by 3/23/2021. Replies due by 4/13/2021. Motion Hearing set for 4/29/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
August 27, 2020 Filing 660 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Juan Barocio-Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2020)
August 27, 2020 Filing 630 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas Reply to Defendants' Response to Bail Application (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply in Support of Bail Application for Antonio Gonzalez Agaton)(Beier, Genna) (Filed on 8/27/2020)
August 27, 2020 Filing 629 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Request for Release by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Release of John Emmanuel Carvajal Victorio)(Rodarte, Hayden) (Filed on 8/27/2020)
August 27, 2020 Filing 628 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas Request for Release (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Release of John Emmanuel Carvajal Victorio)(Rodarte, Hayden) (Filed on 8/27/2020)
August 27, 2020 Filing 627 STATUS REPORT by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 8/27/2020)
August 27, 2020 Filing 626 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #605 Notice (Other), Further Response to ECF 605-1, Gonzalez Agaton (Attachments: #1 Further Response to ECF 605-1, Gonzalez Agaton)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 8/27/2020)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 625 BAIL ORDER NO. 45. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 8/27/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2020)
August 27, 2020 Filing 624 AUDIO RECORDINGS ORDER (re: 623 Further Status Conference,,,,,,,,,,,, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,, ), by US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Court will send to Bonny Wong at bonny.wong@usdoj.gov a link to the files requested in this order. Fee waived because filer is USAO, FPD or CJA counsel on this case. (Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 8/27/2020)
August 26, 2020 Filing 623 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vince Chhabria: Further Status Conference held via Zoom webinar on 8/26/2020.The Court again confirmed that the protective order entered in this case covers the contract between GEO and Wellpath, but agreed to the added condition that only attorneys and experts be permitted to view it.The Court ordered the defendants to use staff or outside contractors to clean Dorm B, not Covid-positive detainees. The Court further ordered that cleaning occur while detainees are cleared out of the dorm.The Court ordered defendants to communicate Covid test results to detainees in writing, and to provide hard copies of their lab results to detainees upon request.The defendants are to continue to send weekly rosters for both facilities on Friday via email.Total Time in Court: 37 minutes. Court Reporter: Hearing recorded via Zoom Webinar: 4:18 - 4:55. Plaintiff Attorney: Emi Maclean and William S. Freeman. Defendant Attorney: Wendy Garbers, Sara Winslow, Adrienne Zack, and Shiwon Choe for Federal Defendants; Susan Coleman, Royal Oakes, Michael Newman, and David Weinstein for GEO Group. Further Status Conference set for 9/2/2020, 02:00 PM, before Judge Vince Chhabria. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts .gov/vc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Monday, August 31, 2020, at 10:00 a.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand .uscourts.gov/zoom/. Status Conference set for 9/2/2020, 02:00, before Judge Vince Chhabria. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/26/2020)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 622 BAIL ORDER RE CONDITIONS OF RELEASE FOR PRAVINDAR SINGH. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 8/26/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 26, 2020 Filing 621 STATUS REPORT by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 26, 2020 Filing 620 STATUS REPORT by Nathan Allen, Geo Group, Inc.. (Coleman, Susan) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 26, 2020 Filing 619 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR RELEASE (Attachments: #1 Jose Daniel Gonzalez Bail Application, #2 Samuel Rios Alvarado Bail Application, #3 Exhibit to Samuel Rios Alvarado Bail Application, #4 Renewed Short Form Bail Application of Rajnish Rajnish, #5 Exhibit 1 to Rajnish Rajnish Bail Application, #6 Exhibit 2 to R. Rajnish Renewed Bail Application, #7 Exhibit 3 to R. Rajnish Renewed Bail Application, #8 Exhibit #4 to R. Rajnish Renewed Bail Application)(Friedman, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 26, 2020 Filing 618 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, NOTICE OF RELEASE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Jose Daniel Gonzalez Bail Application, #2 Samuel Rios Alvarado Bail Application, #3 Exhibit in Support of Samuel Rios Alvarado Bail Application, #4 Renewed Bail Application of Rajnish Rajnish, #5 Exhibit #1 Declaration of Dr. Howard In Support of R. Rajnish Bail Application, #6 Exhibit #2 Signed Letter from Norcal to R. Rajnish Renewed Bail Application, #7 Exhibit #3 Attorney Declaration to Renewed App. of R. Rajnish, #8 Exhiibit #4 Declaration of M. Kumar Re Renewed App of R. Rajnish)(Friedman, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 26, 2020 Filing 617 NOTICE of Appearance by David S Weinstein (Weinstein, David) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 616 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #598 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Weinstein.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 26, 2020 Filing 615 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A.S. Newman (Newman, Michael) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 26, 2020 Filing 614 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT filed by Nathan Allen, Geo Group, Inc.. (Coleman, Susan) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 613 BAIL ORDER NO. 44. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 8/25/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
August 25, 2020 Filing 612 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Bail Application of Chuny Touch, #2 Unredacted Bail Application of Moises Adrian Gallardo Lopez)(MacLean, Emilou) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
August 25, 2020 Filing 611 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas (Attachments: #1 Bail Application of Margarito Zamora Guzman, #2 Bail Application of Chuny Touch, #3 Bail Application of Moises Adrian Gallardo Lopez, #4 Supplement ISO Bail Application of Jose Ruiz Bolanez)(MacLean, Emilou) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
August 25, 2020 Filing 610 STATUS REPORT by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
August 25, 2020 Filing 609 CLERK'S NOTICE CHANGING THE TIME FOR THE FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE ON 8/26/2020, TO 4:00 PM. Status Conference set for 8/26/2020, 04:00 PM, before Judge Vince Chhabria. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc General Order 58. Persons granted access to cou rt proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Status Conference set for 8/26/2020, 04:00 PM, before Judge Vince Chhabria. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
August 25, 2020 #Electronic filing error. If the Exhibits have to be filed separately on the docket, please include a caption page with the case number and initials in future filings. Re : #599 Exhibits, filed by Nathan Allen, Geo Group, Inc. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
August 25, 2020 Filing 608 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 08/18/2020 before Judge Vince Chhabria by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Schenker, Martin) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
August 24, 2020 Filing 607 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Notice of Replies to Dfts Opps by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply to Dfts Opp for Boar, #2 Exhibit Reply to Dfts Opp for Hernandez Velasquez, #3 Exhibit Reply to Dfts Opp for Hernandez)(Bernwanger, Bree) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 24, 2020 Filing 606 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas re #601 Notice (Other), #602 Notice (Other), #600 Notice (Other), Notice of Replies to Dfts Opps (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply to Dfts Opp for Cruz Rivera, #2 Exhibit Reply to Dfts Opp for Romero Romero, #3 Exhibit Reply to Dfts Opp for Boar, #4 Exhibit Reply to Dfts Opp for Aquino Camiro, #5 Exhibit Reply to Dfts Opp for Hernandez Velasquez, #6 Exhibit Reply to Dfts Opp for Hernandez)(Bernwanger, Bree) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 24, 2020 Filing 605 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas re #518 Order Release Request (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supplemental Reply in Support of Release Request for Antonio Gonzalez Agaton)(Beier, Genna) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 604 ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #584 Stipulation and Proposed Order re Motion for Class Certification. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 24, 2020 Filing 603 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Unredacted Response to Bail Applications in ECF 582, 589, 593 by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Response to ECF 582-2, Romero Romero (renewed), #2 Unredacted Response to ECF 589-1, Boar, #3 Unredacted Response to ECF 593-1, Hernandez)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 24, 2020 Filing 602 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #593 Notice (Other), (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 593-1, Hernandez, #2 Response to ECF 593-2, Arias Romero)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 24, 2020 Filing 601 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #589 Notice (Other), Response to Bail Applications (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 589-1, Boar, #2 Response to ECF 589-2, Aquino Camiro, #3 Response to ECF 589-3, Hernandez-Velasquez (renewed))(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 24, 2020 Filing 600 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #582 Notice (Other), Response to Bail Applications (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 582-1, Cruz Rivera, #2 Response to ECF 582-2, Romero Romero (renewed))(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 24, 2020 Filing 599 EXHIBITS re #598 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14853458.) Certificate of Good Standing filed byNathan Allen, Geo Group, Inc.. (Related document(s) #598 ) (Weinstein, David) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 24, 2020 Filing 598 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14853458.) filed by Nathan Allen, Geo Group, Inc.. (Weinstein, David) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 24, 2020 Filing 597 NOTICE of Appearance by Royal Forest Oakes (Oakes, Royal) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 24, 2020 Filing 596 STATUS REPORT by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 595 ORDER TO CREATE WRITTEN PLAN TO IMPROVE MEDICAL ASSISTANCE FOR COVID POSITIVE DETAINEES. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 8/21/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 21, 2020 Filing 594 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Release Requests by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Release Request of Luis Hernandez, #2 Exhibit Release Request of Kevin Arias Romero)(Beier, Genna) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 21, 2020 Filing 593 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas Requests for Release (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Release Request of Luis Hernandez, #2 Exhibit Release Request of Kevin Arias Romero)(Beier, Genna) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 21, 2020 Filing 592 STATUS REPORT by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 591 RESPONSE re #585 Response, Petitioners-Plaintiffs Response to Defendants Submissions Re Medical Care at Mesa Verde by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William S. Freeman in Support of Petitioners-Plaintiffs Response to Defendants Submissions re Medical Care at Mesa Verde, #2 Declaration of Sarah Allen, M.D. in Support of Petitioners-plaintiffs Response to Defendants Submissions re Medical Care at Mesa Verde - Supplemental, #3 Declaration of Susan Beaty in Support of Petitioners-plaintiffs Response to Defendants Submissions Re Medical Care at Mesa Verde, #4 Declaration of Robert B. Greifinger, M.D. in Support of Petitioners-Plaintiffs Response to Defendants Submissions Re Medical Care At Mesa Verde - Third Supplemental, #5 Declaration of Sandra Hernandez in Support Of Petitioners-Plaintiffs Response to Defendants Submissions Re Medical Care at Mesa Verde - Second Supplemental, #6 Declaration of Allen Keller, M.D. in Support of Petitioners-Plaintiffs Response to Defendants Submissions Re Medical Care at Mesa Verde)(Freeman, William) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 590 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Release for Dan Jeno Boar, #2 Exhibit Request for Release for Narcizo Aquino Camiro, #3 Exhibit Renewed Request for Release for Kevin Hernandez Velasquez)(Friedman, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 589 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Release for Dan Jeno Boar, #2 Exhibit Request for Release for Narcizo Aquino Camiro, #3 Exhibit Renewed Request for Release for Kevin Hernandez Velasquez)(Friedman, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 588 ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #568 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 587 STATUS REPORT by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 586 STATUS REPORT by Nathan Allen, Geo Group, Inc.. (Coleman, Susan) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 585 Response re #563 Order Calling for Briefs and Declarations Regarding Medical Conditions byMatthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dr. Ada Rivera)(Choe, Shiwon) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 584 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Freeman, William) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 583 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Notice of Request for Release by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unredacted Request for Release for Conrado Octavio Cruz Rivera, #2 Exhibit Unredacted Resubmission of Bail Application for Nectali Romerofor)(Ugarte, Francisco) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 582 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Release for Conrado Octavio Cruz Rivera, #2 Exhibit Resubmission of Request for Release for Nectali Romero)(Ugarte, Francisco) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 581 Brief re 561 Status Conference,,,,,,,,,, Terminate Hearings,,,,,,,,, #563 Order filed byNathan Allen, Geo Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Richard Medrano, M.D., #2 Declaration Nathan Allen)(Related document(s) 561 , #563 ) (Coleman, Susan) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 580 STATUS REPORT by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 579 BAIL ORDER NO. 43. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 8/19/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 578 AUDIO RECORDINGS ORDER (re: 577 Status Conference,,,,,,,,,,,, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,, ), by US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Court will send to Bonny Wong at bonny.wong@usdoj.gov a link to the files requested in this order. Fee waived because filer is USAO, FPD or CJA counsel on this case. (Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 577 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vince Chhabria: Further Status Conference held via Zoom webinar on 8/18/2020.The Court ordered Defendants to use rapid point-of-care and lab tests today on all remaining detainees in Mesa Verde dorms A and C. The Court further ordered that detainees whose rapid tests come back positive must, to the extent feasible, be isolated until lab tests confirm the results. Counsel for all parties should consult with each other after the rapid tests results are received. The Court ordered Defendants to immediately identify alternatives to having Covid-positive detainees clean facility common spaces.The Court emphasized that counsel for Defendants have the obligation to verify the reports given by their clients about the practices in place at the facilities. The Court confirmed that the protective order entered in this case before GEO became a party applies to GEO. Defendants are ordered to turn over medical records for the four hospitalized detainees in Mesa Verde as soon as possible pursuant to that protective order.The Court ordered that there are to be no further transfers out of Mesa Verde facility without the consent of class counsel or the Court, other than for purposes of removal. If ICE believes a transfer is necessary, they are to first contact class counsel, and then seek emergency relief from the Court if necessary. The parties are to consult on the question of how transfers for removal are being handled, including how long detainees are being detained after the initial transfer and prior to removal, and whether court intervention is necessary. For the medical briefing to be filed this week, Defendants are to submit their brief by Wednesday. Plaintiffs are to respond by Thursday. Plaintiffs should include in their brief their position on retesting facility staff members who have already tested positive. Moving forward, Defendants are to include information about arrivals and releases from Monday in their Tuesday report, instead of in an email Monday evening. Defendants will still file the Monday morning report by 10 a.m., just without that information.The parties will continue to consult on a schedule for the OSC hearing. The parties are to continue to work together on the issue of information-sharing. When information can be provided informally and quickly, it should be. Further Status Conference set for 8/26/2020, 09:00 AM, before Judge Vince Chhabria.Total Time in Court: 1 hour 5 minutes. Court Reporter: Hearing recorded via Zoom Webinar: 9:07 - 10:12. Plaintiff Attorney: Emi Maclean, William S. Freeman, Bree Bernwanger, and Genna Beier. Defendant Attorney: wendy Garbers, Adrienne Zack, and Shiwon Choe for Federal Defendants; Susan Coleman for Geo Group. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/18/2020) Modified on 9/4/2020: Matter transcribed by Marla Knox. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
August 18, 2020 Filing 576 STATUS REPORT by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 575 STATUS REPORT by Nathan Allen, Geo Group, Inc.. (Coleman, Susan) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 574 AUDIO RECORDINGS ORDER (re: 561 Status Conference,,,,,,,,,, Terminate Hearings,,,,,,,,, ), by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Court will send to Bonny Wong at bonny.wong@usdoj.gov a link to the files requested in this order. Fee waived because filer is USAO, FPD or CJA counsel on this case. (Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 573 AUDIO RECORDINGS ORDER (re: 560 Further Status Conference held via Zoom on 8/11/2020 ), by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Court will send to Bonny Wong at bonny.wong@usdoj.gov a link to the files requested in this order. Fee waived because filer is USAO, FPD or CJA counsel on this case. (Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 8/182020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 572 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply in Support of Bail Application of Isrrael Marin Parra)(Friedman, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 571 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Unredacted Response to Bail Application ECF 548-2, Marin Parra by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 570 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #548 Notice (Other),, Response to ECF 548-2, Marin Parra CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [566-2] (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 569 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply in Support of Bail Application of Jose Melgoza Enriquez, #2 Exhibit Reply in Support of Bail Application of Isrrael Marin Parra, #3 Exhibit Reply in Support of Bail Application of Oscar Armando Amaya, #4 Exhibit Reply in Support of Bail Application of Francisco Mendoza Canales)(Friedman, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 568 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document ; [PROPOSED] Order -ECF 566-2 filed by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 8/17/2020) Modified on 8/18/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
August 17, 2020 Filing 567 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Response to Bail Applications by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 548-1, Melgoza Enriquez, #2 LOCKED AT REQUEST OF PARTY ON 8/17/2020. Response to ECF 548-3, Armando Amaya)(Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 8/17/2020) Modified on 8/17/2020 (knm, COURT STAFF).
August 17, 2020 Filing 566 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #548 Notice (Other),, Response to Bail Applications (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 548-1, Melgoza Enriquez, #2 Response to ECF 548-2, Marin Parra, #3 Response to ECF 548-3, Armando Amaya, #4 Response to ECF 548-4, Mendoza Canales)(Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 8/17/2020) (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/21/2020) (wsnS, COURT STAFF).
August 17, 2020 Filing 565 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #537 Notice (Other), Response to Bail Applications (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 537-1, Minchaca Ramos)(Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 564 BAIL ORDER No. 42. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 8/17/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 563 ORDER FOR BRIEFS RE MEDICAL CONDITIONS. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 8/17/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 562 STATUS REPORT by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 14, 2020 Filing 561 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vince Chhabria: Emergency Further Status Conference held via Zoom on 8/14/2020.The Court ordered Defendants to administer point-of-care tests to everyone at Mesa Verde facility who has not already tested positive, to begin immediately and to continue until completed. The parties agreed that if any class member refuses testing, Defendants are to direct them to call class counsel. Class counsel agreed to be available as Defendants conduct testing. The Court ordered Defendants to file a submission by end of day Monday, August 17, 2020, answering the question of how it can be sufficient from a medical standpoint to check on people known to be infected with COVID only two times per day, considering the ongoing outbreak at the facility. The Court denied Plaintiffs request to release everyone in the facility who has tested negative. The Court ordered that each staff member entering the facility be tested with a lab test starting with the morning shift tomorrow, August 15, 2020. The Court also ordered that each staff member be subsequently tested once a week until further notice. If a staff member declines testing, they are not to enter the facility. Plaintiffs agreed to send an email to the Court immediately following the hearing with the names of all individuals with pending bail applications, the status of their test results (negative, positive, or pending), and whether the applications are new or renewed. The parties agreed to defer the OSC hearing scheduled on August 21. The briefing schedule for that hearing will be vacated. The parties also informed the Court that they will be conferring daily, and will propose a new date for the OSC hearing. The status conference set for 9 a.m. on Tuesday, August 18, will proceed as scheduled. Total Time in Court: 1 hour 30 minutes. Court Reporter: Hearing recorded via Zoom Webinar: 2:21 - 3:51. Plaintiff Attorney: Emi Maclean, William S. Freeman, Bree Bernwanger, and Sean Riordan. Defendant Attorney: Wendy Garbers, Sara Winslow, and Shiwon Choe for Federal Defendants; Susan Coleman for GEO Group. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/14/2020)
August 14, 2020 Filing 559 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (MacLean, Emilou) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
August 14, 2020 Filing 558 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas re #528 Notice (Other), (Attachments: #1 Reply ISO Bail Application of Marcos Najera Sandoval, #2 Reply ISO Bail Application of German Najera Grajeda)(MacLean, Emilou) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 557 ORDER TO MEET AND CONFER RE STAFF SHARING. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 8/14/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 556 BAIL ORDER No. 41. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 8/14/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
August 14, 2020 Filing 555 STATUS REPORT by Nathan Allen, Geo Group, Inc.. (Coleman, Susan) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
August 14, 2020 Filing 554 STATUS REPORT by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
August 14, 2020 Filing 553 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #528 Notice (Other), Response to Bail Applications (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 528-1, Najera Sandoval, #2 Response to ECF 528-2, Najera Grajeda)(Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 552 ORDER RE EMERGENCY HEARING. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 8/14/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
August 14, 2020 Filing 551 STATUS REPORT EMERGENCY STATUS REPORT/REQUEST FOR IMMEDIATE ENFORCEMENT OF TRO AND REQUEST FOR IMMEDIATE RELIEF by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (MacLean, Emilou) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
August 14, 2020 Filing 550 STATUS REPORT by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 549 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR RELEASE (UNDER SEAL) by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Application for Release for Jose Arturo Melgoza Enriquez, #2 Application for Release for Isrrael Marin Parra, #3 Application for Release for Oscar Armando Amaya, #4 Renewed Bail Application for Francisco Antonio Mendoza Canales)(Bernwanger, Bree) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 548 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR RELEASE (Attachments: #1 Application for Release for Jose Arturo Melgoza Enriquez, #2 Application for Release for Isrrael Marin Parra, #3 Application for Release for Oscar Armando Amaya, #4 Renewed Bail Application for Francisco Antonio Mendoza Canales, #5 Supplemental Reply for Asif Qazi)(Bernwanger, Bree) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 547 Brief re COVID-19 Testing of Staff filed byNathan Allen, Geo Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration N. Allen, #2 Exhibit A-G, #3 Declaration B. Sanchez Othon)(Coleman, Susan) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 546 STATUS REPORT by Nathan Allen, Geo Group, Inc.. (Coleman, Susan) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 545 Letter Plaintiffs-Petitioners Letter Brief Regarding Staff Testing. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit)(Riordan, Sean) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 544 STATUS REPORT by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 543 THIRD REVISED STANDARD CONDITIONS OF RELEASE. These conditions supersede those listed in #502 SECOND REVISED STANDARD CONDITIONS OF RELEASE. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 8/13/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 542 ORDER. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 8/13/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 541 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #523 Notice (Other), Response to Bail Applications (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 523-1, Villalobos Suria)(Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 540 ORDER re Mesa Verde Testing. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 8/12/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 539 BAIL ORDER NO. 40. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 8/12/20. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
August 12, 2020 Filing 538 STATUS REPORT by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
August 12, 2020 Filing 537 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas Notice of Request for Release (Attachments: #1 Renewed Short Form Bail Application Juan Carlos Minchaca Ramos)(Beier, Genna) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
August 12, 2020 Filing 536 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Notice of Request for Release by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Renewed Short Form Bail Application Juan Carlos Minchaca Ramos)(Beier, Genna) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
August 12, 2020 Filing 535 Declaration of Nathan Allen re COVID Testing at Mesa Verde filed byNathan Allen, Geo Group, Inc.. (Coleman, Susan) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
August 11, 2020 Filing 560 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vince Chhabria: Further Status Conference held via Zoom on 8/11/2020.The parties agree that the defendants can exercise discretion regarding how frequently to re-test people who have already tested positive. The Court ordered the defendants to provide more detailed and narrative information in their daily reports, or else the defendants lawyers will be sanctioned. GEO was ordered to submit a declaration explaining the current status of testing capacity and speed at Mesa Verde. The defendants were ordered to enable class counsel to communicate with detainees who refuse testing by both written communication to the Mesa Verde population as a whole, as well as real-time (or very prompt) communication with detainees who refuse testing. The defendants were ordered to achieve compliance with this order by the end of the day. The parties were ordered to file letter briefs by Thursday at 5:00 p.m. on the issue of whether it would be legally appropriate and practical for the Court to issue an order requiring regular testing of all staff at Mesa Verde. The Court ordered that a new standard condition of release will be that class members must agree to be tested prior to release. The defendants are required to inform class counsel if any class member tests positive upon or after release. Class counsel are required to communicate that information to the class member. The Court will issue a revised standard conditions of release reflecting this change. With respect to pending discovery, Dr. Greifinger may be given a virtual tour of Mesa Verde. The plaintiffs can take the depositions of the new AFOD and Mr. Bonnar. The government may depose Dr. Greifinger. Either video excerpts from the deposition of Mr. Pham, or live testimony from Mr. Pham, will be part of the OSC hearing. The parties were ordered to meet and confer to propose a new date for the OSC hearing. Total Time in Court: 1 hour 47 minutes. Court Reporter: Hearing recorded via Zoom Webinar: 2:02 - 3:49. Plaintiff Attorney: Emi Maclean, William S. Freeman, and Sean Riordan. Defendant Attorney: wendy Garbers and Shiwon Choe for Federal Defendants. Status Conference set for 8/18/2020, 09:00 AM, before Judge Vince Chhabria. For Zoom connection, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/This proceeding will be a Zoom video conferencing webinar. ADVANCE REGISTRATION OF PARTICIPATING COUNSEL IS REQUIRED and must be done by emailing a list of names and emails of counsel who will be participating in the hearing to vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov by no later than Monday, August 17, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III.Case participants may also receive an email invitation from the court with different information which should be followed.All counsel, members of the public and press please click the link or use the information below to join the webinar: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1612857657?pwd=WE5Gcm1zS293WU84V0tyd0c2Ulp1UT09Meeting ID: 161 285 7657Password: 547298Dial by your location+1 929 205 6099 US (New York)+1 253 215 8782 US+1 301 715 8592 US+1 312 626 6799 US (Chicago)+1 346 248 7799 US (Houston)+1 669 900 6833 US (San Jose)Find your local number: https://zoom.us/u/ac4JkPfcjoFor important information and guidance on technical preparation, please see #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Status Conference set for 8/18/2020, 09:00 AM, before Judge Vince Chhabria. (This is a text-only entry generat ed by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/11/2020)
August 11, 2020 Filing 534 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply in Support of Release Request for Jose Ruiz Bolanez)(Friedman, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/11/2020)
August 11, 2020 Filing 533 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #532 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Redacted Further Response to Bail Application No. 511-2 (Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 8/11/2020)
August 11, 2020 Filing 532 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Further Response to Bail Application ECF No. 511-2 by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 8/11/2020)
August 11, 2020 Filing 531 STATUS REPORT by Nathan Allen, Geo Group, Inc.. (Coleman, Susan) (Filed on 8/11/2020)
August 11, 2020 Filing 530 STATUS REPORT by Matthew T. Albence. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Testing Tracker, #2 Exhibit Testing Plan)(Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 8/11/2020)
August 11, 2020 Filing 529 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, REQUEST FOR RELEASE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Marco Najera Sandoval, #2 Exhibit Sealed Renewed Request for Release for German Arnoldo Najera Grajeda)(Friedman, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/11/2020)
August 11, 2020 Filing 528 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR RELEASE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Marco Najera Sandoval, #2 Exhibit Renewed Request Application for Release for German Arnoldo Najera Grajeda)(Friedman, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/11/2020)
August 11, 2020 Filing 527 Declaration of Moises Becerra Re COVID Testing At Mesa Verde filed byMatthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 8/11/2020)
August 10, 2020 Filing 526 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Reply to Defendants' Response to Bail Application by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply in Support of Bail Application for Alton Edmondson)(Beier, Genna) (Filed on 8/10/2020)
August 10, 2020 Filing 525 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas Reply to Defendants' Response to Bail Application (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply in Support of Bail Application for Albert Christian Orellana, #2 Exhibit Reply in Support of Bail Application for Alton Edmondson, #3 Exhibit Reply in Support of Bail Application of Elodio Valencia Chavez, #4 Exhibit Reply in Support of Bail Application for Asif Qazi, #5 Exhibit Reply in Support of Bail Application of Naveed Hameed, #6 Exhibit Reply in Support of Bail Application of Jose Ruiz Bolanez, #7 Exhibit Reply in Support of Bail Application of Asif Qazi, Eleazar Porcayo Garcia, Alexsandr Melnichuk, and Alejandro Flores Banuelos)(Beier, Genna) (Filed on 8/10/2020)
August 10, 2020 Filing 524 Letter Zepeda Rivas, et al. v. Jennings, et al., Case No. 3:20-cv-02731-VC Joint Submission in Connection with Discovery Disputes. (Attachments: #1 PETITIONERS-PLAINTIFFS PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING PETITIONERS-PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF FED. R. CIV. P. 30(B)(6) DESIGNEE, #2 FEDERAL DEFENDANTS PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF FED. R. CIV. P. 30(B)(6) DESIGNEE)(Freeman, William) (Filed on 8/10/2020) Modified on 8/11/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2020 Filing 523 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas Renewed Release Request (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Renewed Release Request of Benito Villalobos Suria)(Beier, Genna) (Filed on 8/10/2020)
August 10, 2020 Filing 522 Declaration of Brooke Sanchez Othon, R.N. Regarding Timing and Logistics of COVID-19 Testing filed byNathan Allen, Geo Group, Inc.. (Coleman, Susan) (Filed on 8/10/2020)
August 10, 2020 Filing 521 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #511 Notice (Other),, Response to Bail Applications (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 511-1, Portillo Navas, #2 Response to ECF 511-2, Ruiz Bolanez, #3 Response to ECF 511-3, Masoom Qazi, #4 Response to ECF 511-4, Christian Orellana, #5 Response to ECF 511-5, Garcia Martinez)(Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 8/10/2020)
August 10, 2020 Filing 520 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #507 Notice (Other), Response to Bail Applications (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 507-1, Edmondson, #2 Response to ECF 507-2, Flores Banuelos)(Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 8/10/2020)
August 10, 2020 Filing 519 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #493 Notice (Other),, Response to Bail Applications (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 493-1, Valencia Chavez, #2 Response to ECF 493-2, Hameed, #3 Response to ECF 493-3, Porcayo Garcia, #4 Response to ECF 493-4, Melnichuk, #5 Response to ECF 493-5, Qui)(Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 8/10/2020)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 518 BAIL ORDER NO. 39. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 8/10/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2020)
August 10, 2020 Filing 517 QUESTIONS FOR STATUS CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 8/10/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2020)
August 10, 2020 Filing 516 STATUS REPORT by Nathan Allen, Geo Group, Inc.. (Coleman, Susan) (Filed on 8/10/2020)
August 10, 2020 Filing 515 STATUS REPORT by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 8/10/2020)
August 7, 2020 Filing 514 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Reply to Defendants' Response to Bail Application by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply in Support of Bail Application for Lateef Animawun)(Beier, Genna) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
August 7, 2020 Filing 513 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas re #510 Notice (Other), Reply to Defendants' Response to Bail Application (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply in Support of Bail Application for Lateef Animawun, #2 Exhibit Reply in Support of Bail Application for Antonio Gonzalez Agaton)(Beier, Genna) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
August 7, 2020 Filing 512 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Release Requests by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Release Request for Kenneth Portillo Navas, #2 Exhibit Renewed Release Request of Asif Masoom Qazi, #3 Exhibit Renewed Release Request for Albert Christian Orellana)(Beier, Genna) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
August 7, 2020 Filing 511 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas Requests for Release (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Release Request for Kenneth Portillo Navas, #2 Exhibit Renewed Release Request of Jose Ruiz Bolanez, #3 Exhibit Renewed Release Request for Asif Masoom Qazi, #4 Exhibit Renewed Release Request for Albert Christian Orellana, #5 Exhibit Supplement in Support of Release Request for Hamilton Garcia Martinez)(Beier, Genna) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
August 7, 2020 Filing 510 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #480 Notice (Other), Response to Bail Applications (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 480-1, Gonzalez Agaton, #2 Response to ECF 480-2, Animawun (renewed))(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 509 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas Reply to Dfts Response (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply to Dfts Opp for Juan Alvarez Gonzalez)(Bernwanger, Bree) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 508 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Release Request by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Release Request for Alton Edmondson)(Beier, Genna) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 507 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas Requests for Release (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Release Request of Alton Edmondson, #2 Exhibit Renewed Release Request of Alejandro Flores Banuelos)(Beier, Genna) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 506 CLERK'S NOTICE PROVIDING ZOOM WEBINAR ACCESS AND REQUIRING ADVANCE REGISTRATION FOR UPCOMING STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING. Further Status Conference set for 8/11/2020, 02:00 PM, before Judge Vince Chhabria. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 8/21/2020, 09:00 AM.For Zoom connection, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/This proceeding will be a Zoom video conferencing webinar. ADVANCE REGISTRATION OF PARTICIPATING COUNSEL IS REQUIRED and must be done by emailing a list of names and emails of counsel who will be participating in the hearing to vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov by no later than 2 court days prior to the hearing(s). PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III.Case participants may also receive an email invitation from the court with different information which should be followed.All counsel, members of the public and press please click the link or use the information below to join the webinar: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1612857657?pwd=WE5Gcm1zS293WU84V0tyd0c2Ulp1UT09Meeting ID: 161 285 7657Password: 547298Dial by your location+1 929 205 6099 US (New York)+1 253 215 8782 US+1 301 715 8592 US+1 312 626 6799 US (Chicago)+1 346 248 7799 US (Houston)+1 669 900 6833 US (San Jose)Find your local number: https://zoom.us/u/ac4JkPfcjoFor important information and guidance on technical preparation, please see #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Further Status Conference set for 8/11/2020, 02:00 PM, before Judge Vince Chhabria. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 8/21/2020, 09:00 AM. (T his is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 6, 2020 Reset Hearing re 491 Status Conference: Motion Hearing set for 5/12/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. This entry corrects the year of the hearing. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 505 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Unredacted Response to Bail Application ECF 475-2, Alvarez-Gonzalez by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 504 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #475 Notice (Other), Response to Bail Applications (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 475-1, Aviles Urtis, #2 Response to ECF 475-2, Alvarez-Gonzalez)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 503 ERRATA re #484 Opposition/Response to Motion, by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Choe, Shiwon) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 502 SECOND REVISED STANDARD CONDITIONS OF RELEASE. These conditions supersede those listed in #369 REVISED STANDARD CONDITIONS OF RELEASE. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 8/6/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 501 ORDER re Released Class Members. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 8/6/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 500 ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #485 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 499 AUDIO RECORDINGS ORDER (re: 491 Status Conference,,,,,,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,,, ), by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Court will send to Bonny Wong at bonny.wong@usdoj.gov a link to the files requested in this order. Fee waived because filer is USAO, FPD or CJA counsel on this case. (Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 498 Declaration of Emilou Maclean in Support of #497 Reply to Opposition/Response, filed byJavier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) #497 ) (MacLean, Emilou) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 497 REPLY (re #485 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ) filed byJavier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (MacLean, Emilou) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 5, 2020 Filing 496 OBJECTIONS to re #490 Proposed Order, by Nathan Allen, Geo Group, Inc.. (Coleman, Susan) (Filed on 8/5/2020)
August 5, 2020 Filing 495 OBJECTIONS to re #490 Proposed Order, by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 8/5/2020)
August 5, 2020 Filing 494 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Requests for Release by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Release of Elodio Valencia Chavez, #2 Exhibit Request for Release of Naveed Hameed, #3 Exhibit Renewed Request for Release of Aleksandr Melnichuk)(Bernwanger, Bree) (Filed on 8/5/2020)
August 5, 2020 Filing 493 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas Requests for Release (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Release of Elodio Valencia Chavez, #2 Exhibit Request for Release of Naveed Hameed, #3 Exhibit Renewed Request for Release of Eleazar Porcayo Garcia, #4 Exhibit Renewed Request for Release of Aleksandr Melnichuk, #5 Exhibit Supplement to Request for Release of Zuoling Qiu)(Bernwanger, Bree) (Filed on 8/5/2020)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 492 BAIL ORDER NO. 38. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 8/5/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2020)
August 5, 2020 Filing 491 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vince Chhabria: Further Status Conference held via Zoom webinar on 8/5/2020.The defendants must communicate with the plaintiffs by 3:00 p.m. today about what materials from the TRO motion can properly be redacted. The plaintiffs must file a new TRO motion on the docket with accompanying papers by 5:00 p.m. today. The plaintiffs must submit a proposed order regarding their new TRO motion by 5:00 p.m. today. They must share their proposal with the defendants by 3:00 p.m. today so that the defendants may provide any input. The defendants are ordered to provide the plaintiffs with daily information regarding which detainees are being housed in which dormitories. The defendants are ordered to begin investigating the availability of greater quantities of rapid point-of-care tests. The Court set the following case management schedule: Close of Fact Discovery: 2/1/2021 Close of Expert Discovery: 3/15/2021 Hearing on Summary Judgment Motions: 5/12/2021 The parties are ordered to meet and confer on a schedule for adjudicating class certification. The hearing should take place prior to the hearing on summary judgment. The parties should submit a joint proposed schedule or competing proposed schedules within 14 days of today. A further status conference is set for 8/17/2021 at 9:00 a.m. Total Time in Court: 1 hour 22 minutes. Court Reporter: Hearing recorded via Zoom Webinar: 9:01 - 10:23. Plaintiff Attorney: emi Maclean, William S. Freeman, and Sean Riordan. Defendant Attorney: wendy Garbers, Adrienne Zack, and Shiwon Choe for Federal Defendants; Susan Coleman and Terri Mehra for Geo Group. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/5/2020)
August 5, 2020 Filing 490 Proposed Order re #485 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Riordan, Sean) (Filed on 8/5/2020)
August 5, 2020 Filing 489 Declaration of Francisco M. Unger in Support of #485 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed byJavier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Related document(s) #485 ) (Riordan, Sean) (Filed on 8/5/2020)
August 5, 2020 Filing 488 Declaration of Emilou Maclean in Support of #485 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed byJavier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Related document(s) #485 ) (Riordan, Sean) (Filed on 8/5/2020)
August 5, 2020 Filing 487 Declaration of Robert Greifinger, MD in Support of #485 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed byJavier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Related document(s) #485 ) (Riordan, Sean) (Filed on 8/5/2020)
August 5, 2020 Filing 486 Declaration of Susan Beaty in Support of #485 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed byJavier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Related document(s) #485 ) (Riordan, Sean) (Filed on 8/5/2020)
August 5, 2020 Filing 485 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Riordan, Sean) (Filed on 8/5/2020)
August 4, 2020 Filing 484 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #477 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Related to Motion for Temporary Restraining Order ) filed byMatthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Moises Becerra)(Choe, Shiwon) (Filed on 8/4/2020)
August 4, 2020 Filing 483 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas re #479 Notice (Other), Reply to Defendants' Response to Bail Application (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply in Support of Bail Application for Jose Isidro Carballo)(Beier, Genna) (Filed on 8/4/2020)
August 4, 2020 Filing 482 DECLARATION of Nathan Allen in Opposition to #477 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Related to Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed byNathan Allen, Geo Group, Inc.. (Related document(s) #477 ) (Coleman, Susan) (Filed on 8/4/2020)
August 4, 2020 Filing 481 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Requests for Release by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Release of Antonio Gonzalez Agaton, #2 Exhibit Renewed Request for Release of Lateef Animawun)(Bernwanger, Bree) (Filed on 8/4/2020)
August 4, 2020 Filing 480 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas Requests for Release (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Release of Antonio Gonzalez Agaton, #2 Exhibit Renewed Request for Release of Lateef Animawun)(Bernwanger, Bree) (Filed on 8/4/2020)
August 4, 2020 Filing 479 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #473 Notice (Other), Response to Bail Application (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 473-1, Benavides Carballo)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 8/4/2020)
August 4, 2020 Filing 478 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas re #477 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Related to Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Riordan, Sean) (Filed on 8/4/2020)
August 4, 2020 Filing 477 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Related to Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Declaration of Timothy W. Cook iso Administrative Motion to Seal, #3 Supplement Notice of Motion and Motion for Temporary Restraining Order - REDACTED, #4 Supplement Notice of Motion and Motion for Temporary Restraining Order - SEALED, #5 Proposed Order re Temporary Restraining Order, #6 Declaration of Francisco M. Unger iso Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #7 Exhibit A to Declaration of Francisco M. Unger - SEALED, #8 Exhibit B to Declaration of Francisco M. Unger - SEALED, #9 Exhibit C to Declaration of Francisco M. Unger - SEALED, #10 Exhibit D to Declaration of Francisco M. Unger - SEALED, #11 Exhibit E to Declaration of Francisco M. Unger - SEALED, #12 Exhibit F to Declaration of Francisco M. Unger - SEALED, #13 Exhibit G to Declaration of Francisco M. Unger - SEALED, #14 Exhibit H to Declaration of Francisco M. Unger - SEALED, #15 Declaration of Emilou MacLean iso Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #16 Exhibit A to Declaration of Emilou MacLean - PUBLIC, #17 Exhibit B to Declaration of Emilou MacLean - PUBLIC, #18 Exhibit C to Declaration of Emilou MacLean - PUBLIC, #19 Exhibit D to Declaration of Emilou MacLean - PUBLIC, #20 Exhibit E to Declaration of Emilou MacLean - PUBLIC, #21 Exhibit F to Declaration of Emilou MacLean - PUBLIC, #22 Exhibit G to Declaration of Emilou MacLean - PUBLIC, #23 Exhibit H to Declaration of Emilou MacLean - PUBLIC, #24 Exhibit I to Declaration of Emilou MacLean - PUBLIC, #25 Exhibit J to Declaration of Emilou MacLean - PUBLIC, #26 Exhibit K to Declaration of Emilou MacLean - PUBLIC, #27 Exhibit L to Declaration of Emilou MacLean - SEALED, #28 Exhibit M to Declaration of Emilou MacLean - SEALED, #29 Declaration Third Supplemental Declaration of Robert Greifinger, MD iso Motion for Temporary Restraining Order - PUBLIC, #30 Declaration of Susan Beaty iso Motion for Temporary Restraining Order - PUBLIC)(Riordan, Sean) (Filed on 8/4/2020)
August 3, 2020 Filing 476 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Requests for Release by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Release of Jesus Aviles Urtis, #2 Exhibit Request for Release of Juan Manuel Alvarez Gonzalez)(Bernwanger, Bree) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
August 3, 2020 Filing 475 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas Requests for Release (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Release of Jesus Aviles Urtis, #2 Exhibit Request for Release of Juan Manuel Alvarez Gonzalez)(Bernwanger, Bree) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
July 31, 2020 Filing 474 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Case Management Conference Statement filed by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Freeman, William) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 31, 2020 Filing 473 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas Release Request (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Release Request of Jose Isidro Carballo)(Beier, Genna) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 31, 2020 Filing 472 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Release Request by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Release Request of Jose Isidro Carballo)(Beier, Genna) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 471 BAIL ORDER NO. 37. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 7/31/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 30, 2020 Filing 470 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Reply to Defendants' Response to Bail Application by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply in Support of Bail Application for Gedber Morales Castillo)(Beier, Genna) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 30, 2020 Filing 469 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas re #468 Notice (Other) Reply to Defendants' Response to Bail Application (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply in Support of Bail Application for Gedber Morales Castillo)(Beier, Genna) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 30, 2020 Filing 468 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement of Detention of Gustavo Pureco Calderon (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 30, 2020 Filing 467 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Unredacted Response to Bail Application ECF 461-1, Morales Castillo by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 30, 2020 Filing 466 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #461 Notice (Other), Response to Bail Application (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 461-1, Morales Castillo)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 465 BAIL ORDER NO. 36. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 7/29/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 464 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement of Detention of Angel Machuca Villacana (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 27, 2020 Filing 463 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas re #460 Notice (Other), Reply to Dfts Responses (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply in Support of Bail Application for Martin Lopez Curiel, #2 Exhibit Reply in Support of Bail Application for Zuoling Qiu)(Beier, Genna) (Filed on 7/27/2020)
July 27, 2020 Filing 462 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Request for Release by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Release of Gedber Morales Castillo)(Bernwanger, Bree) (Filed on 7/27/2020)
July 27, 2020 Filing 461 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas Request for Release (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Release of Gedber Morales Castillo)(Bernwanger, Bree) (Filed on 7/27/2020)
July 27, 2020 Filing 460 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #452 Notice (Other), #456 Notice (Other), Response to Bail Applications (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 452-1, Qiu, #2 Response to ECF 452-3, Cabrera Reyes, #3 Response to ECF 456-1, Lopez Curiel)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 7/27/2020)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 459 BAIL ORDER NO. 35. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 7/27/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2020)
July 24, 2020 Filing 458 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas Reply to Dfts Responses (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply to Dfts Opp for Martinez Ortiz, #2 Exhibit Reply to Dfts Opp for Flores Banuelos)(Bernwanger, Bree) (Filed on 7/24/2020)
July 24, 2020 Filing 457 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Request for Release by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Release of Martin Lopez Curiel)(Bernwanger, Bree) (Filed on 7/24/2020)
July 24, 2020 Filing 456 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas Request for Release (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Release of Martin Lopez Curiel)(Bernwanger, Bree) (Filed on 7/24/2020)
July 24, 2020 Filing 455 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #450 Notice (Other), Response to Bail Applications (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 450-1, Martinez Ortiz, #2 Response to ECF 450-2, Flores Banuelos)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 7/24/2020)
July 23, 2020 Filing 454 CLERK'S NOTICE PROVIDING ZOOM WEBINAR ACCESS AND REQUIRING ADVANCED REGISTRATION FOR UPCOMING FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE ON 8/5/2020. Status Conference set for 8/5/2020, 09:00 AM, before Judge Vince Chhabria. For Zoom connection, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/This proceeding will be a Zoom video conferencing webinar. ADVANCE REGISTRATION OF PARTICIPATING COUNSEL IS REQUIRED and must be done by emailing a list of names and emails of counsel who will be participating in the hearing to vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov by no later than Monday, August 3, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III.Case participants may also receive an email invitation from the court with different information which should be followed.All counsel, members of the public and press please click the link or use the information below to join the webinar: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1612857657?pwd=WE5Gcm1zS293WU84V0tyd0c2Ulp1UT09Meeting ID: 161 285 7657Password: 547298Dial by your location+1 929 205 6099 US (New York)+1 253 215 8782 US+1 301 715 8592 US+1 312 626 6799 US (Chicago)+1 346 248 7799 US (Houston)+1 669 900 6833 US (San Jose)Find your local number: https://zoom.us/u/ac4JkPfcjoFor important information and guidance on technical preparation, please see #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom /. Status Conference set for 8/5/2020, 09:00 AM, before Judge Vince Chhabria. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2020)
July 22, 2020 Filing 453 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Request for Release by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Release of Zuoling Qiu, #2 Exhibit Request for Release of Alexander Labastida, #3 Exhibit Request for Release of Alan Cabrera-Reyes)(Bernwanger, Bree) (Filed on 7/22/2020)
July 22, 2020 Filing 452 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas Request for Release (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Release of Zuoling Qiu, #2 Exhibit Request for Release of Alexander Labastida, #3 Exhibit Request for Release of Alan Cabrera-Reyes)(Bernwanger, Bree) (Filed on 7/22/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 451 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Release Request by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Release Request for Fernando Martinez-Ortiz, #2 Release Request for Alejandro Flores Banuelos)(Friedman, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 450 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas Release Request (Attachments: #1 Release Request for Fernando Martinez-Ortiz, #2 Release Request for Alejandro Flores Banuelos)(Friedman, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 449 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INTIAL COMPLAINT (SECOND) filed by Nathan Allen, Geo Group, Inc.. (Coleman, Susan) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 448 BAIL ORDER NO. 34. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 7/21/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 447 Transcript of Electronic Record Zoom Proceedings held on July 6, 2020, before Judge Vince Chhabria. Transcribed by Court Reporter Marla F. Knox, RPR, CRR, RMR, telephone number (602) 391-6990. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #446 Transcript Order, ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/19/2020. (Related documents(s) #446 ) (mfk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 14, 2020 Filing 446 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 07/06/2020 before Judge Vince Chhabria by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Schenker, Martin) (Filed on 7/14/2020)
July 14, 2020 Filing 445 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 4/28/20; 4/30/20; 5/1/20; 5/5/20; 5/7/20; 5/11/20; 5/15/20; 5/19/20; 6/4/20; 6/19/20; 7/6/20 before Judge Vince Chhabria by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas, for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transcript Order B)(Salceda, Angelica) (Filed on 7/14/2020)
July 14, 2020 Filing 444 *** DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR (SEE DOCKET #446 ) ***TRANSCRIPT ORDER before Judge Vince Chhabria by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas, for Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina. (Schenker, Martin) (Filed on 7/14/2020). Modified on 7/14/2020 (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
July 13, 2020 Filing 443 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Replies to Defendants' Response to Bail Application by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply in Support of Bail Application for Obed Mateo Virula)(Beier, Genna) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 13, 2020 Filing 442 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas re #430 Notice (Other), #431 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Replies to Defendants' Responses to Bail Applications (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply in Support of Bail Application for Obed Mateo Virula, #2 Exhibit Reply in Support of Bail Application for Sokha Khan)(Beier, Genna) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 13, 2020 Filing 441 Transcript of Proceedings held on 06/19/2020, before Judge Chhabria. Transcriber Pamela Batalo Hebel, telephone number 626-688-7509; pamela_batalo-hebel@and.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #420 Transcript Order, ) Redaction Request due 8/3/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/13/2020. (Related documents(s) #420 ) (Batalo, Pam) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 13, 2020 Filing 440 Transcript of Proceedings held on 06/04/2020, before Judge Chhabria. Transcriber Pamela Batalo Hebel, telephone number 626-688-7509; pamela_batalo-hebel@and.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #420 Transcript Order, ) Redaction Request due 8/3/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/13/2020. (Related documents(s) #420 ) (Batalo, Pam) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 13, 2020 Filing 439 Transcript of Proceedings held on 05/19/2020, before Judge Chhabria. Transcriber Pamela Batalo Hebel, telephone number 626-688-7509; pamela_batalo-hebel@and.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #420 Transcript Order, ) Redaction Request due 8/3/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/13/2020. (Related documents(s) #420 ) (Batalo, Pam) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 13, 2020 Filing 438 Transcript of Proceedings held on 05/15/2020, before Judge Chhabria. Transcriber Pamela Batalo Hebel, telephone number 626-688-7509; pamela_batalo-hebel@and.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #420 Transcript Order, ) Redaction Request due 8/3/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/13/2020. (Related documents(s) #420 ) (Batalo, Pam) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 13, 2020 Filing 437 Transcript of Proceedings held on 05/11/2020, before Judge Chhabria. Transcriber Pamela Batalo Hebel, telephone number 626-688-7509; pamela_batalo-hebel@and.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #420 Transcript Order, ) Redaction Request due 8/3/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/13/2020. (Related documents(s) #420 ) (Batalo, Pam) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 13, 2020 Filing 436 Transcript of Proceedings held on 05/07/2020, before Judge Chhabria. Transcriber Pamela Batalo Hebel, telephone number 626-688-7509; pamela_batalo-hebel@and.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #420 Transcript Order, ) Redaction Request due 8/3/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/13/2020. (Related documents(s) #420 ) (Batalo, Pam) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 13, 2020 Filing 435 Transcript of Proceedings held on 05/05/2020, before Judge Chhabria. Transcriber Pamela Batalo Hebel, telephone number 626-688-7509; pamela_batalo-hebel@and.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #420 Transcript Order, ) Redaction Request due 8/3/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/13/2020. (Related documents(s) #420 ) (Batalo, Pam) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 13, 2020 Filing 434 Transcript of Proceedings held on 05/01/2020, before Judge Chhabria. Transcriber Pamela Batalo Hebel, telephone number 626-688-7509; pamela_batalo-hebel@and.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #420 Transcript Order, ) Redaction Request due 8/3/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/13/2020. (Related documents(s) #420 ) (Batalo, Pam) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 13, 2020 Filing 433 Transcript of Proceedings held on 04/30/2020, before Judge Chhabria. Transcriber Pamela Batalo Hebel, telephone number 626-688-7509; pamela_batalo-hebel@and.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #420 Transcript Order, ) Redaction Request due 8/3/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/13/2020. (Related documents(s) #420 ) (Batalo, Pam) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 13, 2020 Filing 432 Transcript of Proceedings held on 04/28/2020, before Judge Chhabria. Transcriber Pamela Batalo Hebel, telephone number 626-688-7509; pamela_batalo-hebel@and.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #420 Transcript Order, ) Redaction Request due 8/3/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/13/2020. (Related documents(s) #420 ) (Batalo, Pam) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 13, 2020 Filing 431 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Unredacted Response to Bail Application ECF 422-1, Khan by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 13, 2020 Filing 430 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #422 Notice (Other), #426 Notice (Other), Response to Bail Applications (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 422-1, Khan, #2 Response to ECF 426-1, Mateo Virula)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 13, 2020 Filing 429 RESPONSE re 421 Case Management Conference - Further,,,,,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,, re the Court's July 6, 2020 Order Calling for Declaration by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Deputy Field Office Director Erik Bonnar, #2 Declaration of Warden Nathan Allen)(Choe, Shiwon) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 13, 2020 Filing 428 AUDIO RECORDINGS ORDER (re: 149 Status Conference,,,,,,,, 92 Case Management Conference - Further,,,,,,,,,, 123 Status Conference,,,, 91 Case Management Conference - Further,,,,,,,,, 421 Case Management Conference - Further,,,,,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,, 207 Status Conference,,,,,, 334 Preliminary Injunction Hearing - Non-evidentiary,,,,, 390 Status Conference,,,,, 190 Status Conference,,,, 55 Motion Hearing,,, 101 Case Management Conference - Further,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ), by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. Court will send to Tara Coughlin at tcoughlin@aclunc.org a link to the files requested in this order. ( Filing fee $ 31, receipt number 0971-14683853). (Freeman, William) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 10, 2020 Filing 427 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Notice of Request for Release by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sealed Bail Application for Obed Mateo Virula)(Riordan, Sean) (Filed on 7/10/2020)
July 10, 2020 Filing 426 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas of Request for Release (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bail Application for Obed Mateo Virula)(Riordan, Sean) (Filed on 7/10/2020)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 425 BAIL ORDER NO. 33. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 7/9/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2020)
July 9, 2020 Filing 424 AUDIO RECORDINGS ORDER (re: 421 Case Management Conference - Further,,,,,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,, ), by Matthew T. Albence, Nathan Allen, Rachana Duong, Geo Group, Inc., Jose Eduardo Guerra, David Jennings, Kethikoun Keo, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Court will send to Lucy Rollins at lucy.rollins@usdoj.gov a link to the files requested in this order. Fee waived because filer is USAO, FPD or CJA counsel on this case. (Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 7/9/2020)
July 8, 2020 Filing 423 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Request for Release for Sokha Khan by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Salceda, Angelica) (Filed on 7/8/2020)
July 8, 2020 Filing 422 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas Request for Release (Attachments: #1 Release Request for Sokha Khan)(Salceda, Angelica) (Filed on 7/8/2020)
July 6, 2020 Filing 421 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vince Chhabria: Further Case Management Conference held via Zoom Webinar on 7/6/2020.Counsel for the government is ordered to consult with ICE on a daily basis regarding Covid-19 tests that have been administered, any positive results, any tracing due to those positive results, and any further preventive measures being taken. Counsel should then promptly provide any pertinent information to class counsel. The defendants are ordered to file a declaration (or multiple declarations if necessary) by Monday, July 13 explaining what significant measures ICE and/or GEO have explored or considered to improve the safety of the conditions at Mesa Verde, and, if applicable, why those measures have not been taken. If class counsel has further updates regarding changes in housing for class members released on bail, those updates should be communicated to ICE in the first instance, and raised with the Court only if a dispute arises or the parties feel that the Court needs to be informed about a particular issue. A further status conference is set for Wednesday, Aug. 5 at 9:00 a.m. The parties should be prepared then to set a schedule for adjudicating the case. The Further Case Management Conference previously set for 7/22/2020 is vacated.Total Time in Court: 38 minutes. Court Reporter: Hearing recorded via Zoom Webinar: 2:07 - 2:45. Plaintiff Attorney: Angelica Salceda, Martin Schenker, and Bree Bernwanger. Defendant Attorney: Shiwon Choe and Adrienne Zack. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/6/2020) Modified on 7/14/2020: Matter transcribed by Marla Knox. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
July 6, 2020 Filing 420 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 4/28/20; 4/30/20; 5/1/20; 5/5/20; 5/7/20; 5/11/20; 5/15/20; 5/19/20; 6/4/20; 6/19/20 before Judge Vince Chhabria by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 7/6/2020)
July 6, 2020 Filing 419 Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on 4/28/20; 4/30/20; 5/1/20; 5/5/20; 5/7/20; 5/11/20; 5/15/20; 5/19/20; 6/4/20; 6/19/20 before Judge VC, re #411 Notice of Appeal,, Transcript due by 7/14/2020. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 7/6/2020)
July 1, 2020 Filing 418 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Supplemental Reply in Support of Bail Application of Jose Mejia Rosas by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(MacLean, Emilou) (Filed on 7/1/2020)
July 1, 2020 Filing 417 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas re #408 Notice (Other), Supplemental Reply re Mejia Rosas (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Reply in support of bail application of Jose Mejia Rosas, #2 Exhibits)(MacLean, Emilou) (Filed on 7/1/2020)
July 1, 2020 Filing 416 USCA Case Number 20-16276 for #411 Notice of Appeal, filed by US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2020)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 415 BAIL ORDER NO. 32. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 7/1/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2020)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 414 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #376 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Wells.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2020)
June 29, 2020 Filing 413 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Sealed Reply ISO Pedro Moises Narvaez Application by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Riordan, Sean) (Filed on 6/29/2020)
June 29, 2020 Filing 412 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas re #408 Notice (Other), Replies to Defendants' Responses to Bail Applications (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply ISO Cesar Eduardo Miranda Application, #2 Exhibit Reply ISO Pablo Ramirez Benitez Application, #3 Exhibit Reply ISO Pedro Moises Narvaez Application, #4 Exhibit Reply ISO Brandon Cerda Hidalgo Application, #5 Exhibit Reply ISO Sopheap Choeung Application, #6 Exhibit Reply ISO Hamilton Martinez Garcia, #7 Exhibit Reply ISO Kevin Andrade Menjivar)(Riordan, Sean) (Filed on 6/29/2020)
June 29, 2020 Filing 411 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Appeal of Order #246 , Order on Motion to Stay, Order on Motion for TRO, Order on Motion to Certify Class #53 , Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction #357 , Order #213 , Order #271 , Order #97 , Order #218 , Order #242 , Order #342 , Order #206 , Order #159 , Order #115 , Order #360 , Order #177 , Order #335 , Order #145 , Order #303 , Order #95 , Order #183 , Order #250 , Order #295 , Order #107 , Order #320 , Order #272 , Order #268 , Order #238 , Order #375 , Order #364 , Order #281 , Order #204 (Appeal fee FEE WAIVED.) (Choe, Shiwon) (Filed on 6/29/2020)
June 29, 2020 Filing 410 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #405 Notice (Other), Response to Bail Applications (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 405-1, Cerda Hidalgo, #2 Response to ECF 405-2, Chhoeung, #3 Response to ECF 405-3, Garcia Martinez, #4 Response to ECF 405-4, Andrade Menjivar)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 6/29/2020)
June 29, 2020 Filing 409 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Unredacted Response to Bail Application ECF 398-3, Narvaez by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 6/29/2020)
June 29, 2020 Filing 408 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #398 Notice (Other), #401 Order Response to Bail Applications and Bail Order 31 (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 398-1, Miranda, #2 Response to ECF 398-2, Ramirez Benitez, #3 Response to ECF 398-3, Narvaez, #4 Further Response re Mejia Rosas, #5 Declaration of DO Winans re Mejia Rosas, #6 Declaration of SDDO Gonzalez re Mejia Rosas)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 6/29/2020)
June 29, 2020 Filing 407 STATUS REPORT RE PLAN TO TEST ALL INCOMING DETAINEES AND POSITIVE COVID-19 TEST OF GEO OFFICER AT MESA VERDE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 6/29/2020)
June 26, 2020 Filing 406 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Release Requests by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Release Request for Brandon Cerda Hidalgo, #2 Release Request for Chhoeung Sopheap, #3 Release Request for Hamilton Garcia Martinez, #4 Release Request for Kevin Andrade Menjivar)(Salceda, Angelica) (Filed on 6/26/2020)
June 26, 2020 Filing 405 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas Release Requests (Attachments: #1 Release Request for Brandon Cerda Hidalgo, #2 Release Request for Chhoeung Sopheap, #3 Release Request for Hamilton Garcia Martinez, #4 Release Request for Kevin Andrade Menjivar)(Salceda, Angelica) (Filed on 6/26/2020)
June 26, 2020 Filing 404 NOTICE by Nathan Allen, Geo Group, Inc. re #403 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal OF PLAINTIFFS' NON-COMPLIANCE WITH CDC RECOMMENDED GUIDELINES (Attachments: #1 Declaration N. Allen, #2 Exhibit A-E (redacted), #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Coleman, Susan) (Filed on 6/26/2020)
June 26, 2020 Filing 403 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Nathan Allen, Geo Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration S. Coleman, #2 Exhibits A-E (redacted), #3 Exhibits A-E (unredacted), #4 Proposed Order)(Coleman, Susan) (Filed on 6/26/2020) Modified on 6/29/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
June 25, 2020 Filing 402 STATUS REPORT Update Re Positive COVID-19 Test of Medical Contract Employee at Mesa Verde and Response to ECF 400 by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 6/25/2020)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 401 BAIL ORDER NO. 31. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 6/24/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2020)
June 24, 2020 Filing 400 RESPONSE re #393 Status Report Re Positive COVID-19 Test of Medical Contract Employee at Mesa Verde by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Emilou MacLean, #2 Exhibit 1)(MacLean, Emilou) (Filed on 6/24/2020)
June 24, 2020 Filing 399 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Release Requests by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Release Request for Cesar Miranda, #2 Release Request for Pablo Ramirez Benitez, #3 Release Request for Pedro Moises Narvaez)(Salceda, Angelica) (Filed on 6/24/2020)
June 24, 2020 Filing 398 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas Request for Release (Attachments: #1 Release Request for Cesar Eduardo Miranda, #2 Release Request for Pablo Ramirez Benitez, #3 Release Request for Pedro Moises Narvaez)(Salceda, Angelica) (Filed on 6/24/2020)
June 24, 2020 Filing 397 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Declaration of Emilou MacLean and accompanying exhibits by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (MacLean, Emilou) (Filed on 6/24/2020)
June 24, 2020 Filing 396 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas of Address Changes for Certain Class Members Released on Bail (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Emilou MacLean and accompanying exhibits)(MacLean, Emilou) (Filed on 6/24/2020)
June 22, 2020 Filing 395 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Reply to Dfts Response by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply to Dfts Opp for Flores Hidalgo)(Bernwanger, Bree) (Filed on 6/22/2020)
June 22, 2020 Filing 394 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas Reply to Dfts Response (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply to Dfts Opp for Flores Hidalgo)(Bernwanger, Bree) (Filed on 6/22/2020)
June 22, 2020 Filing 393 STATUS REPORT Re Positive COVID-19 Test of Medical Contract Employee at Mesa Verde by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 6/22/2020)
June 22, 2020 Filing 392 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #380 Notice (Other), Response to Bail Applications (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 380-1, Flores Hidalgo)(Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 6/22/2020)
June 19, 2020 Filing 391 AUDIO RECORDINGS ORDER (re: 390 Status Conference,,,,, ), by Matthew T. Albence, Nathan Allen, Rachana Duong, Geo Group, Inc., Jose Eduardo Guerra, David Jennings, Kethikoun Keo, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Court will send to Lucy Rollins at lucy.rollins@usdoj.gov a link to the files requested in this order. Fee waived because filer is USAO, FPD or CJA counsel on this case. (Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 6/19/2020)
June 19, 2020 Set/Reset Hearing. Status Conference set for 7/6/2020 02:00 PM before Judge Vince Chhabria. (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2020)
June 19, 2020 Filing 390 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vince Chhabria: Status Conference held on 6/19/2020. The government will file a status report by Monday, June 22 at 5:00 p.m. discussing what actions it has taken, and will take, in response to the discovery that a member of the medical staff at Mesa Verde tested positive for Covid-19. ICE is ordered to respond to the plaintiff's discovery requests on an expedited basis by Friday, June 26. The parties agreed that Judge Chhabria may read and consider Dr. Allen's declaration as part of the record, but Judge Chhabria's law clerk will not read it. The next status conference will take place Monday, July 6 at 2:00 p.m. Total Time in Court: 32 minutes. Court Reporter: Hearing Recorded via Zoom Webinar, 9:43-10:15 a.m. Plaintiff Attorneys: Emi MacLean, Angelica Salceda, Marty Schenker, and Timothy Cook. Defendant Attorneys: Adrienne Zack, Wendy Garbers, and Shiwon Choe for ICE; Susan Coleman for The GEO Group, Inc. and for Nathan Allen, Warden of the Mesa Verde Detention Facility. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/19/2020) Modified on 7/7/2020: Matter transcribed by Pam Hebel. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
June 19, 2020 Filing 389 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #380 Notice (Other), Response to Supplemental Bail Information (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Response to ECF 380-2, Lopez Alvarenga)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 6/19/2020)
June 19, 2020 Filing 388 AUDIO RECORDINGS ORDER (re: 149 Status Conference,,,,,,,, 123 Status Conference,,,, 207 Status Conference,,,,, 190 Status Conference,,, 101 Case Management Conference - Further,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ), by Matthew T. Albence, Nathan Allen, Rachana Duong, Geo Group, Inc., Jose Eduardo Guerra, David Jennings, Kethikoun Keo, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Court will send to Lucy Rollins at lucy.rollins@usdoj.gov a link to the files requested in this order. Fee waived because filer is USAO, FPD or CJA counsel on this case. (Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 6/19/2020)
June 19, 2020 Filing 387 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT filed by Nathan Allen, Geo Group, Inc.. (Coleman, Susan) (Filed on 6/19/2020)
June 18, 2020 Filing 386 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Reply to Dfts Responses by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply to Dfts Opp for Mejia Rosas, #2 Exhibit Exhibits to Reply to Dfts Opp for Mejia Rosas)(Bernwanger, Bree) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
June 18, 2020 Filing 385 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas re #383 Notice (Other), Reply to Dfts Responses (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply to Dfts Opp for Ortiz Herrera, #2 Exhibit Reply to Dfts Opp for Mejia Rosas, #3 Exhibit Exhibits to Reply to Dfts Opp for Mejia Rosas)(Bernwanger, Bree) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
June 18, 2020 Filing 384 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Shiwon Choe, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Choe, Shiwon) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
June 18, 2020 Filing 383 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #377 Notice (Other),, Response to Bail Applications (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 377-1, Ortiz Herrera, #2 Response to ECF 377-2, Mejia Rosas)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
June 18, 2020 Filing 382 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 DECLARATION OF WILLIAM S. FREEMAN IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONERS-PLAINTIFFS CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Freeman, William) (Filed on 6/18/2020) Modified on 6/18/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
June 17, 2020 Filing 381 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Notice of Request for Release by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Rumolo Flores Hidalgo)(Bernwanger, Bree) (Filed on 6/17/2020)
June 17, 2020 Filing 380 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas Notice of Request for Release (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Release Application for Rumolo Flores Hidalgo, #2 Exhibit Supplement to Deferred Bail Application for Presentacion Lopez Alvarenga)(Bernwanger, Bree) (Filed on 6/17/2020)
June 17, 2020 Filing 379 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING ZOOM STATUS CONFERENCE. Status Conference set for 6/19/2020 09:30 AM . For Zoom connection, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/.This proceeding will be a Zoom video conferencing webinar. ADVANCE REGISTRATION OF PARTICIPATING COUNSEL IS REQUIRED and must be done by emailing a list of names and emails of counsel who will be participating in the hearing to vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov by no later than noon on Thursday, June 18. PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III.Case participants will receive an email invitation from the court with different information which should be followed.Members of the public and press, please click the link or use the information below to join the webinar: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1603251030?pwd=Q0RQSzJnMzA5UUVoS1BybnhFV1dGUT09Meeting ID: 160 325 1030Password: 683925Dial by your location+1 929 205 6099 US (New York)+1 253 215 8782 US+1 301 715 8592 US+1 312 626 6799 US (Chicago)+1 346 248 7799 US (Houston)+1 669 900 6833 US (San Jose)Find your local number: https://zoom.us/u/ac4JkPfcjoFor important information and guidance on technical preparation, please see #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Status Conference set for 6/19/2020 09:30 AM before Judge Vince Chhabria. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2020)
June 15, 2020 Filing 378 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Order on Stipulation, Notice of Request for Release (Under Seal) by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Alexis Ortiz Short-Form Bail Application, #2 Exhibit Jose Mejia Rosas Short-Form Bail Application, #3 Exhibit A - Mejia Rosas Jacobo ID, #4 Exhibit B - Paralegal Certificate, #5 Exhibit C - Rehabilitation Certificates, #6 Exhibit D - Sponsor Letter from Angelica Rosas)(Riordan, Sean) (Filed on 6/15/2020) Modified on 6/16/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
June 15, 2020 Filing 377 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas Notice of Request for Release (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Alexis Ortiz Herrera Short-Form Bail Application, #2 Exhibit Jose Mejia Rosas Short-Form Bail Application, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A - Mejia Rosas Jacobo ID, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B - Paralegal Certificate, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C - Rehabilitation Certificates, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D - Sponsor Letter from Angelica Rosas)(Riordan, Sean) (Filed on 6/15/2020)
June 15, 2020 Filing 376 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Kelly Engel Wells ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14581636.) filed by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment In Support of Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Declaration of Kelly Engel Wells, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Wells, Kelly) (Filed on 6/15/2020) Modified on 6/16/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 375 BAIL ORDER NO. 30. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 6/15/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2020)
June 11, 2020 Filing 374 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Notice of Reply for Walter Alexander Quijada-Alfaro by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply ISO Walter Alexander Quijada-Alfaro Bail Application)(Riordan, Sean) (Filed on 6/11/2020)
June 11, 2020 Filing 373 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas re #371 Notice (Other), of Reply to Walter Alexander Quijada-Alfaro (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply ISO Walter Alexander Quijada-Alfaro Bail Application)(Riordan, Sean) (Filed on 6/11/2020)
June 11, 2020 Filing 372 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Unredacted Response to Further Bail Information, ECF 353-1, Xiong, T. by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 6/11/2020)
June 11, 2020 Filing 371 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #362 Notice (Other), #352 Notice (Other), #353 Document E-Filed Under Seal,, Response to Further Bail Information (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 353-1, Xiong, T., #2 Response to ECF 352-1, Quijada Alfaro, #3 Response to ECF 362-1, Yousef)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 6/11/2020)
June 11, 2020 Filing 370 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan Eileen Coleman for Defendants The Geo Group, Inc. and Nathan Allen (Coleman, Susan) (Filed on 6/11/2020)
June 11, 2020 Filing 369 REVISED STANDARD CONDITIONS OF RELEASE. These conditions supersede those listed in #108 STANDARD CONDITIONS OF RELEASE. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 6/11/2020. (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2020)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 368 ORDER re Re-Detention. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 6/11/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2020)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #366 Motion to Terminate Bail Order as to Carlos Ruben Franco Paz. (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2020)
June 11, 2020 Filing 366 MOTION to Terminate Bail Order for Mr. Franco Paz re #271 Order filed by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Responses due by 6/25/2020. Replies due by 7/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of D.O. Gilbert, #2 Exhibit 1 - Blue Notice, #3 Exhibit 2 - Memorandum of Investigation)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 6/11/2020)
June 10, 2020 Filing 365 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE FOR 6/19/2020 2:00 PM PDT. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Status Conference set for 6/19/2020 02:00 PM before Judge Vince Chhabria. (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2020)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 364 BAIL ORDER NO. 29. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 6/10/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2020)
June 10, 2020 Filing 363 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR RELEASE (UNDER SEAL) by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Filing in Support of Bail Application for Abdiwelle Yousuf)(MacLean, Emilou) (Filed on 6/10/2020)
June 10, 2020 Filing 362 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR RELEASE (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Filing in Support of Bail Application for Abdiwelle Yousuf)(MacLean, Emilou) (Filed on 6/10/2020)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 361 ORDER re Bail Process. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 6/10/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2020)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 360 BAIL ORDER NO. 28. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 6/10/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2020)
June 10, 2020 Filing 359 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Declaration of Ajay Kusnoor re Housing Update for Yong Joo Chung by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Salceda, Angelica) (Filed on 6/10/2020)
June 10, 2020 Filing 358 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas re #342 Order Declaration of Ajay Kusnoor (Attachments: #1 Declaration Housing Update for Yong Joo Chung)(Salceda, Angelica) (Filed on 6/10/2020)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #229 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2020)
June 9, 2020 Filing 356 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply to Government's Response to Gerardo Lopez Zamora's Bail Application)(Ugarte, Francisco) (Filed on 6/9/2020)
June 9, 2020 Filing 355 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unredacted Reply in Support of Bail Application of Gerardo Lopez Zamora)(Ugarte, Francisco) (Filed on 6/9/2020)
June 8, 2020 Filing 354 NOTICE by Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply in Support of Bail Application of Abel Jimenez Bonillas, #2 Exhibit Reply in Support of Bail Application of Alejandro Chocoteo, #3 Exhibit Reply in Support of Bail Application of Angel Diaz Mendoza, #4 Exhibit Reply in Support of Bail Application of Dung Dang, #5 Exhibit Reply in Support of Bail Application of Enrique Montes Rios, #6 Exhibit Reply in Support of Bail Application of Gerardo Lopez Zamora, #7 Exhibit Reply in Support of Bail Application of Isais Lopez Garcia, #8 Exhibit Reply in Support of Bail Application of Jose Ruiz Bolanes, #9 Exhibit Juan Fredy Montoya Echeverria, #10 Exhibit Reply in Support of Bail Application of Juan Lopez Garcia, #11 Exhibit Lateef Animawun, #12 Exhibit Pedro Javier Gonzalez Maldonado, #13 Exhibit Reply in Support of Bail Application of Ricky Williamson, #14 Exhibit Rudis Matlide Barrera Gomez, #15 Exhibit Willian Matias Rauda)(Ugarte, Francisco) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 8, 2020 Filing 353 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Sealed Notice of Supplemental Filing ISO Bail Application and Housing Update re #352 by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supplemental Filing ISO Xiong Bail Application, #2 Declaration Regarding Housing Update)(Riordan, Sean) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 8, 2020 Filing 352 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas of Supplemental Filings ISO Bail Applications and Housing Update (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supplemental Filing ISO Quijada-Alfaro Bail Application, #2 Declaration Regarding Housing Update)(Riordan, Sean) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 8, 2020 Filing 351 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Response to Bail Application 328-13, Payeras (with probation report) by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 8, 2020 Filing 350 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #336 Notice (Other), Response to Bail Applications (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 336-1, Lopez Zamora, #2 Response to ECF 336-2, Jovel)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 8, 2020 Filing 349 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #328 Notice (Other),,,,, Response to Bail Applications (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 328-1, Animawun, #2 Response to ECF 328-2, Aquino Miranda, #3 Response to ECF 328-3, Chocoteco Reyes, #4 Response to ECF 328-4, Dang, #5 Response to ECF 328-5, Diaz Mendoza, #6 Response to ECF 328-6, Gonzalez Maldonado, #7 Response to ECF 328-7, Jimenez Bonillas, #8 Response to ECF 328-8, Juarez Alvarez, #9 Response to ECF 328-9, Lopez Garcia, #10 Response to ECF 328-10, Montes Rio, #11 Response to ECF 328-11, Mosqueda Cisneros, #12 Response to ECF 328-12, Williamson, #13 Response to ECF 328-13, Payeras, #14 Response to ECF 328-14, Barrera Gomez, #15 Response to ECF 328-15, Ruiz Bolanez)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 8, 2020 Filing 348 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #321 Notice (Other),, #327 Notice (Other), Response to Bail Applications (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 321-2, Montoya Echeverria, #2 Response to ECF 321-3, Matias Rauda, #3 Response to ECF 327-6, Cruz Calmo)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 6, 2020 Filing 347 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Reply in Support of Bail Application of Kevin Hernandez Velazquez by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (MacLean, Emilou) (Filed on 6/6/2020)
June 5, 2020 Filing 346 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas re #317 Notice (Other),,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply in Support of Bail Application of Waljeet Singh, #2 Exhibit Reply in Support of Bail Application of Juan Cerritos Munoz, #3 Exhibit Reply in Support of Bail Application of Kevin Hernandez Velazquez, #4 Exhibit Reply in Support of Bail Application of Ondrej Vanicek, #5 Exhibit Reply in Support of Bail Application of Pedro Ortiz Cruz, #6 Exhibit Reply in Support of Bail Application of Ezequiel Hernandez Gomez)(MacLean, Emilou) (Filed on 6/5/2020)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 345 ORDER re Juvenile Records. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 6/5/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2020)
June 5, 2020 Filing 344 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Unredacted Response to Bail Application ECF 317-8, Hernandez Velasquez by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 6/5/2020)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER re Timing of Preliminary Injunction Ruling. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 6/5/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2020)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 342 BAIL ORDER NO. 27. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 6/5/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2020)
June 5, 2020 Filing 341 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #317 Notice (Other),,, Response to Bail Applications (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 317-1, Manuel Andres, #2 Response to ECF 317-2, Ortiz-Cruz, #3 Response to ECF 317-3, Hernandez Gomez, #4 Response to ECF 317-4, Sanchez Lagunas, #5 Response to ECF 317-5, Cerritos Munoz, #6 Response to ECF 317-6, Singh, H, #7 Response to ECF 317-7, Vanicek, #8 Response to ECF 317-8, Hernandez Velasquez, #9 Response to ECF 317-9, Oretekor)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 6/5/2020)
June 5, 2020 Filing 340 AUDIO RECORDINGS ORDER (re: 334 Preliminary Injunction Hearing - Non-evidentiary,,,,, ), by Matthew T. Albence, Nathan Allen, Rachana Duong, Geo Group, Inc., Jose Eduardo Guerra, David Jennings, Kethikoun Keo, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Court will send to Lucy Rollins at lucy.rollins@usdoj.gov a link to the files requested in this order. Fee waived because filer is USAO, FPD or CJA counsel on this case. (Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 6/5/2020)
June 5, 2020 Filing 339 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Housing Update for Livia Pinheiro by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Aaron Morrison, #2 Exhibit Letter of Acceptance to A New Way of Life Re-Entry Project)(Beier, Genna) (Filed on 6/5/2020)
June 5, 2020 Filing 338 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas re #246 Order Housing Update for Livia Pinheiro (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Aaron Morrison, #2 Exhibit Letter of Acceptance to A New Way of Life Re-Entry Project)(Beier, Genna) (Filed on 6/5/2020)
June 5, 2020 Filing 337 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Request for Release by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Gerardo Lopez Zamora, #2 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Rene Jovel)(Beier, Genna) (Filed on 6/5/2020)
June 5, 2020 Filing 336 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR RELEASE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Gerardo Lopez Zamora, #2 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Rene Jovel)(Beier, Genna) (Filed on 6/5/2020)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 335 BAIL ORDER NO. 26. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 6/5/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2020)
June 4, 2020 Filing 334 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vince Chhabria: Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 6/4/2020. The Court heard argument on the parties' cross-motions. The Court indicated that an evidentiary hearing will be necessary to address the scope of preliminary relief the plaintiffs may be entitled to. The parties are ordered to meet and confer regarding any documents the plaintiffs may seek in preparation for an evidentiary hearing. The Court is prepared to hold the evidentiary hearing as promptly as the government requests. The process for releasing detainees on an interim basis, as well as the previously issued bail orders, will remain in place pending a decision on the motion for a preliminary injunction, which the Court intends to issue as soon as possible. The government may have three days to respond to any future bail applications (rather than the two days previously ordered). Total Time in Court: 1:24. Court Reporter: Hearing recorded via Zoom Webinar 12:40 - 2:04. Plaintiff Attorneys: Emi MacLean, Martin Schenker, Judah Lakin, and William Freeman. Defendant Attorneys: Adrienne Zack, Wendy Garbers, and Shiwon Choe. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/4/2020)
June 4, 2020 Filing 333 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas re #330 Notice (Other),, NOTICE OF REPLY TO DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO BAIL APPLICATIONS (ECF 305) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Moahamed Saladdin Mousa's Reply to Defendants' Response to Short-Form Bail App, #2 Exhibit Bryan Apaza Munoz's Reply to Defendants' Response to Short-Form Bail App, #3 Exhibit Jorge Andara-Ponce's Reply to Defendants' Response to Short-Form Bail App, #4 Exhibit Jamie Lopez Solorio's Reply to Defendants' Response to Short-Form Bail App, #5 Exhibit Yong Joo Chung's Reply to Defendants' Response to Short-Form Bail App)(Salceda, Angelica) (Filed on 6/4/2020)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER re Mendez-Barocio v. Barr. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 6/4/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2020)
June 4, 2020 Filing 331 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Unredacted Response to Bail Application ECF 305-2, Saladdin Mousa by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 6/4/2020)
June 4, 2020 Filing 330 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #305 Notice (Other),,,, Response to Bail Applications (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 305-1, Griffin, #2 Response to ECF 305-2, Saladdin Mousa, #3 Response to ECF 305-3, Diaz Palacio, #4 Response to ECF 305-4, Robles, #5 Response to ECF 305-5, Apaza Munoz, #6 Response to ECF 305-6, Ramirez Chavez, #7 Response to ECF 305-7, Gomez Anival, #8 Response to ECF 305-8, Andara Ponce, #9 Response to ECF 305-9, Lopez Solorio, #10 Response to ECF 305-13, Chung)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 6/4/2020)
June 4, 2020 Filing 329 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Request for Release by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Lateef Animawun, #2 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Elias Aquino Miranda, #3 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Alejandro Chocotecto Reyes, #4 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Dung Dang, #5 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Angela Diaz Mendoza, #6 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Pedro Javier Gonzalez, #7 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Abel Jimenez Bonillas, #8 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Edwin Juarez Alvarez, #9 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Juan Lopez Garcia, #10 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Enriques Montes Rios, #11 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Isaias Mosqueda Cisneros, #12 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Ricky Paul Williamson, #13 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Gabriel Payeras, #14 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Jose Rudy Barrera Gomez, #15 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Jose Ruiz-Bolanez)(Beier, Genna) (Filed on 6/4/2020)
June 4, 2020 Filing 328 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR RELEASE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Lateef Animawun, #2 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Elias Aquino Miranda, #3 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Alejandro Chocoteco Reyes, #4 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Dung Dang, #5 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Angel Diaz Mendoza, #6 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Pedro Javier Gonzalez Maldonado, #7 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Abel Jimenez Bonillas, #8 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Edwin Juarez Alvarez, #9 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Juan Lopez Garcia, #10 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Enrique Montes Rios, #11 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Isaias Mosqueda Cisneros, #12 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Ricky Paul Williamson, #13 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Gabriel Payeras, #14 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Jose Rudy Barrera Gomez, #15 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Jose Ruiz-Bolanez)(Beier, Genna) (Filed on 6/4/2020)
June 3, 2020 Filing 327 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas re #297 Notice (Other),,,,, Reply to Dfts Responses (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Xiong, #2 Exhibit Quijada-Alfaro, #3 Exhibit Torres Elias, #4 Exhibit Olivera Hernandez, #5 Exhibit Giha, #6 Exhibit Cruz-Calmo)(Padilla, Stephanie) (Filed on 6/3/2020)
June 3, 2020 Filing 326 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Update for Trinidad Ramirez Ramirez by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Salceda, Angelica) (Filed on 6/3/2020)
June 3, 2020 Filing 325 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas re #320 Order Update for Trinidad Ramirez Ramirez (Salceda, Angelica) (Filed on 6/3/2020)
June 3, 2020 Filing 324 ERRATA re #264 Opposition/Response to Motion, by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexander Pham, #2 Attachment A - checklist, #3 Attachment B - checklists)(Choe, Shiwon) (Filed on 6/3/2020)
June 3, 2020 Filing 323 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Padilla (Padilla, Stephanie) (Filed on 6/3/2020)
June 3, 2020 Filing 322 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Request for Release by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sealed Renewed Request for Release for Armando Aguilar Ceja, #2 Exhibit Sealed Renewed Request for Release for Willian Matias Rauda)(Salceda, Angelica) (Filed on 6/3/2020)
June 3, 2020 Filing 321 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR RELEASE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Renewed Request Application for Release for Armando Aguilar Ceja, #2 Exhibit Renewed Request Application for Release for Juan Fredy Montoya Echeverria, #3 Exhibit Renewed Request Application for Release for Willian Matias Rauda)(Salceda, Angelica) (Filed on 6/3/2020)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 320 BAIL ORDER NO. 25. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 6/3/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2020)
June 3, 2020 Filing 319 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #297 Notice (Other),,,,, Response to Bail Applications (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 297-1, Vasquez Rodrigeuz, #2 Response to ECF 297-2, Xiong, T, #3 Response to ECF 297-3, Robles Flores, #4 Response to ECF 297-4, Quijada Alfaro, #5 Response to ECF 297-5, Hermosillo, #6 Response to ECF 297-6, Melnichuk, #7 Response to ECF 297-7, Torres Elias, #8 Response to ECF 297-8, Ortega Garcia, #9 Response to ECF 297-9, Corzo Chinchilla, #10 Response to ECF 297-10, Olivera Hernandez, #11 Response to ECF 297-11, Giha, #12 Response to ECF 297-12, Ordaz Camacho, #13 Response to ECF 297-13, Rojas Orellana, #14 Response to ECF 297-14, Mendez Boracio, #15 Response to ECF 297-15, Ton)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 6/3/2020)
June 3, 2020 Filing 318 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Request for Release by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Jose Manuel Andres, #2 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Pedro Ortiz-Cruz, #3 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Ezequiel Hernandez, #4 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Lionel Sanchez-Lagunas, #5 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Juan Cerritos Munoz, #6 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Harkan Waljeet Singh, #7 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Ondrej Vanicek, #8 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Kevin Hernandez-Velasquez, #9 Supplement Sealed Update to Deferred Bail Application for Bernard Oretekor)(Salceda, Angelica) (Filed on 6/3/2020)
June 3, 2020 Filing 317 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR RELEASE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Jose Manuel Andres, #2 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Pedro Ortiz-Cruz, #3 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Ezequiel Hernandez, #4 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Lionel Sanchez-Lagunas, #5 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Juan Cerritos Munoz, #6 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Harkan Waljeet Singh, #7 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Ondrej Vanicek, #8 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Kevin Hernandez-Velasquez, #9 Supplement Update to Deferred Bail Application for Bernard Oretekor)(Salceda, Angelica) (Filed on 6/3/2020)
June 3, 2020 Filing 316 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas re #315 Notice (Other), Notice of Update for Jose Olvera Gonzalez (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Jennifer Friedman)(Salceda, Angelica) (Filed on 6/3/2020)
June 3, 2020 Filing 315 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #303 Order, #294 Notice (Other),, #273 Notice (Other),,, Update Regarding Removal of Jose Olvera Gonzalez (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Removal Order)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 6/3/2020)
June 3, 2020 Filing 314 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas re #308 Notice (Other),,, Reply to Dfts Response (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply to Dfts Opp for Lopez Alvarenga)(Bernwanger, Bree) (Filed on 6/3/2020)
June 3, 2020 Filing 313 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Replies to Dfts Responses by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply to Dfts Opp for Cruz-Calmo, #2 Exhibit Reply to Dfts Opp for Godinez Domingo, #3 Exhibit Reply to Dfts Opp for Mejia Melchor, #4 Exhibit Reply to Dfts Opp for Singh Kahlon, #5 Exhibit Reply to Dfts Opp for Yousuf)(Bernwanger, Bree) (Filed on 6/3/2020)
June 2, 2020 Filing 312 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas re #307 Notice (Other),,,,, #308 Notice (Other),,, Reply to Dfts Responses (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply to Dfts Opp for Cruz-Calmo, #2 Exhibit Reply to Dfts Opp for Miller, #3 Exhibit Reply to Dfts Opp for Reyes Cota, #4 Exhibit Reply to Dfts Opp for Godinez Domingo, #5 Exhibit Reply to Dfts Opp for Bagdasaryan, #6 Exhibit Reply to Dfts Opp for Mejia Melchor, #7 Exhibit Reply to Dfts Opp for Romero Romero, #8 Exhibit Reply to Dfts Opp for Delgadillo, #9 Exhibit Reply to Dfts Opp for Nguyen, #10 Exhibit Reply to Dfts Opp for Oliviera Martinez, #11 Exhibit Reply to Dfts Opp for Petrosyan, #12 Exhibit Reply to Dfts Opp for Oxlaj, #13 Exhibit Reply to Dfts Opp for Singh Kahlon, #14 Exhibit Reply to Dfts Opp for Ramirez Ramirez, #15 Exhibit Reply to Dfts Opp for Vang, #16 Exhibit Reply to Dfts Opp for Yousuf)(Bernwanger, Bree) (Filed on 6/2/2020)
June 2, 2020 Filing 311 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Decl. of Jennifer Friedman re Housing Update for Jose Luis Pacheco Mendez by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Salceda, Angelica) (Filed on 6/2/2020)
June 2, 2020 Filing 310 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas re #238 Order Housing Update for Jose Luis Pacheco Mendez (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer Freidman)(Salceda, Angelica) (Filed on 6/2/2020)
June 2, 2020 Filing 309 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Unredacted Response to Bail Application Supplement ECF 288-13, Singh Kahlon by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 6/2/2020)
June 2, 2020 Filing 308 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #288 Notice (Other),,,,, Response to Bail Applications (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 288-1, Lopez Alvarenga, #2 Response to ECF 288-2, Bagdasaryan, #3 Response to ECF 288-3, Cruz Calmo, #4 Response to ECF 288-4, Gomez Fernandez, #5 Response to ECF 288-5, Iglesias Iglesias, #6 Response to ECF 288-6, Moreno Mendoza, #7 Response to ECF 288-7, Nguyen, Hieu Trung, #8 Response to ECF 288-8, Petrosyan, #9 Response to ECF 288-9, Ravato, #10 Response to ECF 288-10, Ruiz Hernandez, #11 Response to ECF 288-11, Yousuf, #12 Response to ECF 288-13, Singh Kahlon, #13 Response to ECF 288-14, Tran, Hoan)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 6/2/2020)
June 2, 2020 Filing 307 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #283 Notice (Other),,,,,,,,, #284 Notice (Other),, Response to Bail Applications (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 283-1, Bin, #2 Response to ECF 283-2, Grewal, #3 Response to ECF 283-3, Gomez Licea, #4 Response to ECF 283-4, Oxlaj Siguantay, #5 Response to ECF 283-5, Lee, #6 Response to ECF 283-6, Mejia Melchor, #7 Response to ECF 283-7, Olivera Martinez, #8 Response to ECF 283-9, Delgadillo Montalvan, #9 Response to ECF 283-10, Deogracias, #10 Response to ECF 283-13, Godinez Domingo, #11 Response to ECF 283-14, Reyes Cota, #12 Response to ECF 283-15, Lorenzo, #13 Response to ECF 283-16, Pastor Hernandez, #14 Response to ECF 283-17, Miller, #15 Response to ECF 283-18, Ramirez Ramirez, #16 Response to ECF 283-19, Villatoro Beltran, #17 Response to ECF 283-20, Gamez Gonzalez, #18 Response to ECF 283-21, Chales Mendoza, #19 Response to ECF 283-22, Ambriz Bejar, #20 Response to ECF 283-23, Romero Romero, #21 Response to ECF 283-26, Vang, #22 Response to ECF 283-27, Ramirez Mendoza, #23 Response to ECF 283-28, Cux-Jocop, #24 Response to ECF 284-4, Godinez Garcia)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 6/2/2020)
June 2, 2020 Filing 306 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, REQUEST FOR RELEASE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Mark Griffin, #2 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Mohamed Saladdin Mousa, #3 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Carlos Diaz-Palacio, #4 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Ruperto Robles, #5 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Bryan Jesus Apaza Munoz, #6 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Alejandro Ramirez Chavez, #7 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Herbert Gomez Anival, #8 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Jorge Andara-Ponce, #9 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Jaime Lopez Solorio, #10 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Rafael Pantoja Mendez, #11 Exhibit Letter in Support of Rafael Pantoja Mendez (English), #12 Exhibit Letter in Support of Rafael Pantoja Mendez (Spanish), #13 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Yong Joo Chung, #14 Exhibit Commutation in Support of Yong Joo Chung)(MacLean, Emilou) (Filed on 6/2/2020)
June 2, 2020 Filing 305 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR RELEASE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Mark Griffin, #2 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Mohamed Saladdin Mousa, #3 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Carlos Diaz-Palacio, #4 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Ruperto Robles, #5 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Bryan Jesus Apaza Munoz, #6 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Alejandro Ramirez Chavez, #7 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Herbert Gomez Anival, #8 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Jorge Andara-Ponce, #9 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Jaime Lopez Solorio, #10 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Rafael Pantoja Mendez, #11 Exhibit Letter in Support of Rafael Pantoja Mendez (Spanish), #12 Exhibit Letter in Support of Rafael Pantoja Mendez (Spanish), #13 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Yong Joo Chung, #14 Exhibit Commutation in Support of Yong Joo Chung)(MacLean, Emilou) (Filed on 6/2/2020)
June 2, 2020 Filing 304 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas re #300 Notice (Other),, CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [300-3] Juan Aguilar Castaneda (Riordan, Sean) (Filed on 6/2/2020)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 303 BAIL ORDER NO. 24. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 6/2/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2020)
June 2, 2020 Filing 302 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING ON #229 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Hearing set for 6/4/2020 12:30 PM. For Zoom connection, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/.This proceeding will be a Zoom video conferencing webinar. ADVANCE REGISTRATION OF PARTICIPATING COUNSEL IS REQUIRED and must be done by emailing a list of names and emails of counsel who will be participating in the hearing to vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov by no later than noon on Wednesday, June 3.Case participants may also receive an email invitation from the court with different information which should be followed.Members of the public and press, please click the link or use the information below to join the webinar: https://us02web.zoom.us/j/85360769471?pwd=R2F1TnBPbmhXd0VDWk04cS9JSEdUQT09Meeting ID: 853 6076 9471Password: 971651Dial by your location+1 929 205 6099 US (New York)+1 253 215 8782 US+1 301 715 8592 US+1 312 626 6799 US (Chicago)+1 346 248 7799 US (Houston)+1 669 900 6833 US (San Jose)Find your local number: https://zoom.us/u/ac4JkPfcjoFor important information and guidance on technical preparation, please see #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 6/4/2020 12:30 PM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2020)
June 1, 2020 Filing 301 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 5:20-2558. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/1/2020. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2020)
June 1, 2020 Filing 300 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas Replies to Defendants' Responses (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply ISO Application for Aaron Ramirez Avila, #2 Exhibit Reply ISO Application for Ruben Morales Vargas, #3 Exhibit Reply ISO Application for Juan Aguilar Castaneda, #4 Exhibit Reply ISO Application for Primo Domingo)(Riordan, Sean) (Filed on 6/1/2020) **Locked per filer's request.** Modified on 6/2/2020 (ddkS, COURT STAFF).
June 1, 2020 Filing 299 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING ON 6/2/2020. The hearing will take place at a later date this week. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2020)
June 1, 2020 Filing 298 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR RELEASE (UNDER SEAL) by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Sealed Request for Release Application for Jonny Savier Vasqez Rodriguez, #2 Sealed Request for Release Application for That Xiong, #3 Sealed Request for Release Application for Jose Luis Robles Flores, #4 Sealed Request for Release Application for Walter Alexander Quijada-Alfaro, #5 Sealed Request for Release Application for Heriberto Hermosillo, #6 Sealed Request for Release Application for Aleksandr Melnichuk, #7 Sealed Request for Release Application for Jose Guadalupe Trres Elias, #8 Sealed Request for Release Application for Jose Cruz Ortega Garcia, #9 Sealed Request for Release Application for Hector Rene Corzo-Chinchilla, #10 Sealed Request for Release Application for Cristobal Olivera Hernandez, #11 Sealed Request for Release Application for Caleb Giha, #12 Sealed Request for Release Application for Angel Ordaz Camacho, #13 Sealed Request for Release Application for Nahmum Rojas Orellana, #14 Sealed Request for Release Application for Juan Mendez-Boracio, #15 Sealed Request for Release Application for Tith Ton)(Salceda, Angelica) (Filed on 6/1/2020)
June 1, 2020 Filing 297 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR RELEASE (Attachments: #1 Request Application for Release for Jonny Savier Vasquez Rodriguez, #2 Request Application for Release for That Xiong, #3 Request Application for Release for Jose Luis Robles Flores, #4 Request Application for Release for Walter Alexander Quijada-Alfaro, #5 Request Application for Release for Heriberto Hermosillo, #6 Request Application for Release for Aleksandr Melnichuk, #7 Request Application for Release for Jose Guadalupe Torres Elias, #8 Request Application for Release for Jose Cruz Ortega Garcia, #9 Request Application for Release for Hector Rene Corzo-Chinchilla, #10 Request Application for Release for Cristobal Olivera Hernandez, #11 Request Application for Release for Caleb Giha, #12 Request Application for Release for Angel Ordaz Camacho, #13 Request Application for Release for Nahmum Rojas Orellana, #14 Request Application for Release for Juan Mendez-Boracio, #15 Request Application for Release for Tith Ton)(Salceda, Angelica) (Filed on 6/1/2020)
June 1, 2020 Filing 296 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Unredacted Response to Bail Applications in ECF 273 by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Response to ECF 273-6, Aguilar Castaneda, #2 Unredacted Response to ECF 273-9, Linares Morales)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 6/1/2020)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 295 BAIL ORDER NO. 23. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 6/1/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2020)
June 1, 2020 Filing 294 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #273 Notice (Other),,, Response to Bail Applications (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 273-1, Ramirez Avila, #2 Response to ECF 273-2, Olvera Gonzalez, #3 Response to ECF 273-4, Najera Grajeda, #4 Response to ECF 273-5, Morales Vargas, #5 Response to ECF 273-6, Aguilar Castaneda, #6 Response to ECF 273-7, Domingo, #7 Response to ECF 273-9, Linares Morales)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 6/1/2020)
June 1, 2020 Filing 293 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR RELEASE (Attachments: #1 Update Deferred Bail Application for Donaciano Salvador Resendiz-Chavez)(Beier, Genna) (Filed on 6/1/2020)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER re Preliminary Injunction Hearing. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 6/1/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2020)
June 1, 2020 Filing 291 CLERK'S NOTICE CONVERTING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING TO ZOOM WEBINAR. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 6/2/2020 10:00 AM. For Zoom connection, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/.This proceeding will be a Zoom video conferencing webinar. ADVANCE REGISTRATION OF PARTICIPATING COUNSEL IS REQUIRED and must be done by emailing a list of names and emails of counsel who will be participating in the hearing to vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 7:00 PM today, June 1. Case participants will receive individualized invitations to participate.Members of the public and press, please click the link or use the information below to join the webinar: https://us02web.zoom.us/j/85360769471?pwd=R2F1TnBPbmhXd0VDWk04cS9JSEdUQT09Meeting ID: 853 6076 9471Password: 971651Dial by your location+1 929 205 6099 US (New York)+1 253 215 8782 US+1 301 715 8592 US+1 312 626 6799 US (Chicago)+1 346 248 7799 US (Houston)+1 669 900 6833 US (San Jose)Find your local number: https://zoom.us/u/ac4JkPfcjoFor important information and guidance on technical preparation, please see #https://www.cand.uscou rts.gov/zoom/. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 6/2/2020 10:00 AM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2020)
June 1, 2020 Filing 290 REPLY (re #229 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) in Support of Motion #264 for Order Confirming That Temporary Restraining Order Has Expired, Ending Bail Process, and Vacating Bail Orders and Objection to Plaintiffs' Declaration filed byMatthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Choe, Shiwon) (Filed on 6/1/2020)
May 31, 2020 Filing 289 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Request for Release by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Presentacion Lopez Alvarenga, #2 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Kolya Bagdasaryan, #3 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Ricardo Cruz-Calmo, #4 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Jose Gomez, #5 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Juan Jose Iglesias Iglesias, #6 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Alberto Moreno Mendoza, #7 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Hieu Nguyen, #8 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Arthur Petrosyan, #9 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Pateresio Ravato, #10 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Jose Andres Ruiz, #11 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Abdiwelle Yousuf, #12 Supplement Sealed Update to Deferred Bail Application for Eliseo Reyes Cota, #13 Supplement Sealed Update to Deferred Bail Application for Yadwinder Singh Kahlon, #14 Supplement Sealed Update to Deferred Bail Application for Hoan Tran)(Wells, Jordan) (Filed on 5/31/2020)
May 31, 2020 Filing 288 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR RELEASE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Presentacion Lopez Alvarenga, #2 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Kolya Bagdasaryan, #3 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Ricardo Cruz-Calmo, #4 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Jose Gomez, #5 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Juan Jose Iglesias Iglesias, #6 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Alberto Moreno Mendoza, #7 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Hieu Nguyen, #8 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Arthur Petrosyan, #9 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Pateresio Ravato, #10 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Jose Andres Ruiz, #11 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Abdiwelle Yousuf, #12 Supplement Update to Deferred Bail Application for Eliseo Reyes Cota, #13 Supplement Update to Deferred Bail Application for Yadwinder Singh Kahlon, #14 Supplement Update to Deferred Bail Application for Hoan Tran)(Wells, Jordan) (Filed on 5/31/2020)
May 30, 2020 Filing 287 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas re #247 Notice (Other), Declaration Kathleen Anne Kavanagh re Housing Update (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Housing Update for Rivera-Giorges)(Salceda, Angelica) (Filed on 5/30/2020)
May 29, 2020 Filing 286 REPLY (re #229 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) Petitioners-Plaintiffs' Reply In Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Opposition to Motion to Dissolve Temporary Restraining Order filed byJavier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Arnulfo Ramirez Ramos In Support of Petitioners-Plaintiffs' Reply In Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Declaration of Emilou MacLean In Support Of Petitioners-Plaintiffs' Reply In Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #3 Declaration of Martin S. Schenker ISO Petitioners-Plaintiffs' Reply ISO Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Freeman, William) (Filed on 5/29/2020) Modified on 6/1/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
May 29, 2020 Filing 285 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Reply to Defts Opp to Lan Vi Quan by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (MacLean, Emilou) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 29, 2020 Filing 284 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Rachana Duong, Jose Eduardo Guerra, Kethikoun Keo, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas re #266 Notice (Other),,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply to Defts Opp to Pascual Hilario Pankim, #2 Exhibit Reply to Defts Opp to Heraclio Hinojosa Minero, #3 Exhibit Reply to Defts Opp to Lan Vi Quan, #4 Exhibit Update to Deferred App of Adolfo Godinez Garcia)(MacLean, Emilou) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 29, 2020 Filing 283 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR RELEASE (Attachments: #1 Notice of Request for Release of Sithy Bin, #2 Notice of Request for Release of Ravinder Singh Grewal, #3 Notice of Request for Release of Jonathan Gomez Licea, #4 Notice of Request for Release of Maynor Oxlaj-Siguantay, #5 Notice of Request for Release of Va Lee, #6 Notice of Request for Release of Manuel Mejia Melchor, #7 Notice of Request for Release of Alejandro Olivera Martinez, #8 Exhibit to Notice of Request for Release of Alejandro Olivera Martinez, #9 Notice of Request for Release of Nelson Johan Delgadillo Montalvan, #10 Notice of Request for Release of Edgar Flores Deogracias, #11 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Request for Release of Edgar Flores Deogracias, #12 Exhibit 2 to Notice of Request for Release of Edgar Flores Deogracias, #13 Notice of Request for Release of Juan Godinez Domingo, #14 Notice of Request for Release of Eliseo Reyes Cota, #15 Notice of Request for Release of Jay Pee Lorenzo, #16 Notice of Request for Release of Santos Pastor Hernandez, #17 Notice of Request for Release of Edison Miller Jr., #18 Notice of Request for Release of Trinidad Ramirez Ramirez, #19 Notice of Request for Release of Marvin Villatoro Beltran, #20 Notice of Request for Release of Jose Gamez-Gonzalez, #21 Notice of Request for Release of Luis Charles Mendoza AKA Jesus Lorenza Morelas, #22 Notice of Request for Release of Paulino Ambriz Bejar, #23 Notice of Request for Release of Nectali Romero Romero, #24 Exhibit 1 for Notice of Request for Release of Nectali Romero Romero, #25 Exhibit 2 for Notice of Request for Release of Nectali Romero Romero, #26 Notice of Request for Release of Yee Vang, #27 Notice of Request for Release of Ilisandro Ramirez Mendoza, #28 Supplemental Request for Release of Myke Jonathan Cux-Jocop, #29 Exhibit 1 to Supplemental Request for Release of Myke Jonathan Cux-Jocop, #30 Exhibit 2 to Supplemental Request for Release of Myke Jonathan Cux-Jocop, #31 Exhibit 3 to Supplemental Request for Release of Myke Jonathan Cux-Jocop)(Beier, Genna) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 29, 2020 Filing 282 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR RELEASE (UNDER SEAL) by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Sealed Request for Release Sithy Bin, #2 Sealed Request for Release of Ravinder Singh Grewal, #3 Sealed Request for Release of Jonathan Gomez Licea, #4 Sealed Request for Release of Maynor Oxlaj-Siguantay, #5 Sealed Request for Release of Va Lee, #6 Sealed Request for Release of Manuel Mejia Melchor, #7 Sealed Request for Release of Alejandro Olivera Martinez, #8 Exhibit 1 in support of Sealed Request for Release of Alejandro Olivera Martinez, #9 Sealed Request for Release of Nelson Johan Delgadillo Montalvan, #10 Sealed Request for Release of Edgar Flores Deogracias, #11 Exhibit 1 in support of Sealed Request for Release of E. Deogracias, #12 Exhibit 2 in Support of Sealed Request for Release of E. Deogracias, #13 Sealed Request for Release of Juan Godinez Domingo, #14 Sealed Request for Release of Eliseo Reyes Cota, #15 Sealed Request for Release of Jay Pee Lorenzo, #16 Sealed Request for Release of Santos Pastor Hernandez, #17 Sealed Request for Release of Edison Miller Jr., #18 Sealed Request for Release of Trinidad Ramirez Ramirez, #19 Sealed Request for Release of Marvin Villatoro Beltran, #20 Sealed Request for Release of Jose Gamez-Gonzalez, #21 Sealed Request for Release of Luis Chrles Mendoza AKA Jesus Lorenza Morelas, #22 Sealed Request for Release of Paulino Ambriz Bejar, #23 Sealed Request for Release of Nectali Romero Romero, #24 Exhibit 1 in Support of Sealed Request for Release of N. Romero, #25 Exhibit 2 in Support of Sealed Request for Release of N. Romero, #26 Sealed Request for Release of Yee Vang, #27 Sealed Request for Release of Ilisandro Ramirez Mendoza, #28 Sealed Supplemental Request for Release of Myke Jonathan Cux-Jocop, #29 Exhibit 1 to Sealed Supplemental Request for Release of Myke Jonathan Cux-Jocop, #30 Exhibit 2 to Sealed Supplemental Request for Release of Myke Jonathan Cux-Jocop, #31 Exhibit 3 to Sealed Supplemental Request for Release of Myke Jonathan Cux-Jocop)(Beier, Genna) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 281 BAIL ORDER NO. 22. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/29/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 29, 2020 Filing 280 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #224 Order, #266 Notice (Other),,,, Response to Bail Applications (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 266-1, Hinojosa, #2 Response to ECF 266-2, Bravo Zambrano, M., #3 Response to ECF 266-3, Rodriguez, #4 Response to ECF 266-4, Hilario Pankim, #5 Response to ECF 266-5, Mendoza Soria, #6 Response to ECF 266-6, Melendez Villanueva, #7 Response to ECF 266-7, Quan, #8 Response to ECF 266-8, Ordaz Gomez, #9 Response to ECF 266-9, Singh, G., #10 Response to ECF 266-10, Rodriguez Vasquez, #11 Response to ECF 266-11, 224 Rodriguez Magana)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 29, 2020 Filing 279 Response re #272 Order byMatthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 29, 2020 Filing 278 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING 5/29/2020 STATUS CONFERENCE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 28, 2020 Filing 277 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas re #252 Notice (Other),,,, Reply to Dfts Responses (Attachments: #1 Exhibit iso Mendez Jimenez, #2 Exhibit iso Ramirez Perez, #3 Exhibit iso Sharma)(Wells, Jordan) (Filed on 5/28/2020)
May 28, 2020 Filing 276 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Unredacted Response to Bail Application ECF 252-7, Ramirez Perez by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 5/28/2020)
May 28, 2020 Filing 275 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #252 Notice (Other),,,, Response to Bail Applications (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 252-1, Flores Guzman, #2 Response to ECF 252-2, Alfaro Henriquez, #3 Response to ECF 252-4, Mendez Jimenez, #4 Response to ECF 252-5, Navarrete Villeda, #5 Response to ECF 252-6, Nava Gonzalez, #6 Response to ECF 252-7, Ramirez Perez, #7 Response to ECF 252-8, Arevalo Barragan, #8 Response to ECF 252-9, Villalobos Sura, #9 Response to ECF 252-10, Sharma)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 5/28/2020)
May 28, 2020 Filing 274 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, REQUEST FOR RELEASE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Aaron Ramirez Avila, #2 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Jose de Jesus Olvera Gonzalez, #3 Exhibit Parole Verification Document in Support of Jose de Jesus Olvera Gonzalez, #4 Exhibit Request Application for Release for German Arnoldo Najera Grejeda, #5 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Ruben Morales Vargas, #6 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Juan Aguilar Castaneda, #7 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Primo Domingo, #8 Exhibit Exhibits in Support of Primo Domingo, #9 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Francisco Linares Morales, #10 Exhibit Letter in Support of Francisco Linares Morales)(Beier, Genna) (Filed on 5/28/2020)
May 28, 2020 Filing 273 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR RELEASE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Aaron Ramirez Avila, #2 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Jose de Jesus Olvera Gonzalez, #3 Exhibit Parole Verification Document in Support of Jose de Jesus Olvera Gonzalez, #4 Exhibit Request Application for Release for German Arnoldo Najera Grejeda, #5 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Ruben Morales Vargas, #6 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Juan Aguilar Castaneda, #7 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Primo Domingo, #8 Exhibit Exhibits in Support of Primo Domingo, #9 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Francisco Linares Morales, #10 Exhibit Letter in Support of Francisco Linares Morales)(Beier, Genna) (Filed on 5/28/2020)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 272 BAIL ORDER NO. 21. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/28/2020. (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2020)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 271 BAIL ORDER NO. 20. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/28/2020. (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2020)
May 27, 2020 Filing 270 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Reply to Dfts Responses by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply to Dfts Opp for Kakande)(Bernwanger, Bree) (Filed on 5/27/2020)
May 27, 2020 Filing 269 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas re #263 Notice (Other),, Reply to Dfts Responses (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply to Dfts Opp for Kakande, #2 Exhibit Reply to Dfts Opp for Qazi)(Bernwanger, Bree) (Filed on 5/27/2020)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 268 BAIL ORDER NO. 19. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/27/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2020)
May 27, 2020 Filing 267 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR RELEASE (UNDER SEAL) by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Sealed Request for Release for Heraclio Hinojosa, #2 Sealed Request for Release for Marcial Bravo Zambrano, #3 Sealed Request for Release for Sebastian Sergio Rodriguez, #4 Sealed Request for Release for Pascual Hilario Pankim, #5 Sealed Request for Release for Arnulfo Mendoza Soria, #6 Sealed Request for Release for Eduardo Ezequiel Melendez Villanueva, #7 Sealed Request for Release for Lam "Peter" Vi Quan, #8 Sealed Request for Release for Jose Oscar Ordaz Gomez, #9 Sealed Request for Release for Gursamitar Singh, #10 Sealed Request for Release for Sergio Luis Rodriguez Vasquez, #11 Sealed Update to Deferred Bail Application for Ernesto Rodriguez Magana)(Riordan, Sean) (Filed on 5/27/2020)
May 27, 2020 Filing 266 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR RELEASE (Attachments: #1 Request for Release Application for Heraclio Hinojosa, #2 Request for Release Application for Marcial Bravo Zambrano, #3 Request for Release Application for Sebastian Sergio Rodriguez, #4 Request for Release Application for Pascual Hilario Pankim, #5 Request for Release Application for Arnulfo Mendoza Soria, #6 Request for Release Application for Eduardo Ezequiel Melendez Villanueva, #7 Request for Release Application for Lam "Peter" Vi Quan, #8 Request for Release Application for Jose Oscar Ordaz Gomez, #9 Request for Release Application for Gursamitar Singh, #10 Request for Release Application for Sergio Luis Rodriguez Vasquez, #11 Update to Deferred Bail Application for Ernesto Rodriguez Magana)(Riordan, Sean) (Filed on 5/27/2020)
May 27, 2020 Filing 265 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas Notice of Housing Update for Gustavo Pureco Calderon and Sitha Chhum (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard Coshnear, #2 Declaration of Hayley Upshaw)(Salceda, Angelica) (Filed on 5/27/2020) Modified on 5/28/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
May 27, 2020 Filing 264 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #229 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) and Motion for Order Confirming That Temporary Restraining Order Has Expired, Ending Bail Process, and Vacating Bail Orders filed byMatthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexander Pham, #2 Declaration of Dana Fishburn, #3 Declaration of Shiwon Choe with Hernandez Roman Injunction)(Choe, Shiwon) (Filed on 5/27/2020)
May 27, 2020 Filing 263 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #248 Notice (Other),, Response to Bail Applications (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 248-1, Urdena Bustos, #2 Response to ECF 248-2, Aldena Ocana, #3 Response to ECF 248-3, Resendiz Chavez, #4 Response to ECF 248-4, Bravo Zambrano, #5 Response to ECF 248-5, Kakande, #6 Response to ECF 248-6, Camarena Navarrete, #7 Response to ECF 248-7, Qazi Further Response)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 5/27/2020)
May 27, 2020 Filing 262 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM STATUS CONFERENCE. Status Conference set for 5/29/2020 02:00 PM by Zoom Webinar. For Zoom connection, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/.This proceeding will be a Zoom video conferencing webinar. ADVANCE REGISTRATION OF PARTICIPATING COUNSEL IS REQUIRED and must be done by emailing a list of names and emails of counsel who will be participating in the hearing to vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov by no later than noon on Thursday, May 28. Counsel who have pre-registered will receive individualized invitations to participate.Members of the public and press, please click the link or use the information below to join the webinar: https://us02web.zoom.us/j/87102937063?pwd=Qks2ZytJVU1RSUxTdklNcHFZYXY5UT09Meeting ID: 871 0293 7063Password: 971651Dial by your location+1 929 205 6099 US (New York)+1 253 215 8782 US+1 301 715 8592 US+1 312 626 6799 US (Chicago)+1 346 248 7799 US (Houston)+1 669 900 6833 US (San Jose)Find your local number: https://zoom.us/u/ac4JkPfcjoFor important information and guidance on technical preparation, please see #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zo om/. Status Conference set for 5/29/2020 02:00 PM by Zoom Webinar before Judge Vince Chhabria. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2020)
May 27, 2020 Filing 261 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas re #258 Notice (Other),, CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [258-2] Exhibit Reply to Dfts' Response for Donovan Anthony Grant (Salceda, Angelica) (Filed on 5/27/2020)
May 27, 2020 Filing 260 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas re #256 Notice (Other),, Reply to Dfts Responses (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply to Dfts' Response to Sahota, #2 Exhibit Reply to Dfts' Response to Jocop-Pirir, #3 Exhibit Reply to Dfts' Response to Keo)(Salceda, Angelica) (Filed on 5/27/2020)
May 27, 2020 Filing 259 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas re #255 Notice (Other),, Reply to Dfts Responses (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply to Dfts' Response to Montoya Amaya, #2 Exhibit Reply to Dfts' Response to Orellana, #3 Exhibit Reply to Dfts' Response to Tovar Reyes, #4 Exhibit Reply to Dfts' Response to Cabrera, #5 Exhibit Reply to Dfts' Response to Lucas Pelaez, #6 Exhibit Reply to Dfts' Response to Garcia Gonzalez)(Salceda, Angelica) (Filed on 5/27/2020)
May 26, 2020 Filing 258 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas re #254 Notice (Other),, Reply to Dfts Responses (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply to Dfts' Response for Duong, #2 Exhibit Reply to Dfts' Response for Grant, #3 Exhibit Reply to Dfts' Response for Encarnacion, #4 Exhibit Reply to Dfts' Response for Rodriguez Nunez)(Salceda, Angelica) (Filed on 5/26/2020) **Locked per filer's request.** Modified on 5/27/2020 (ddkS, COURT STAFF).
May 26, 2020 Filing 257 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Unredacted Response to Bail Applications in ECF 220, 233, 244 by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Response to ECF 220-3, Navas, #2 Unredacted Response to ECF 233-1, Sanchez Brito, #3 Unredacted Response to ECF 244-4, Cadena)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 5/26/2020)
May 26, 2020 Filing 256 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #244 Notice (Other),,, Response to Bail Applications (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 244-1, Nunez Salgado, #2 Response to ECF 244-2, Franco Paz, #3 Response to ECF 244-3, Sahota, #4 Response to ECF 244-4, Cadena, #5 Response to ECF 244-5, Mirzaians, #6 Response to ECF 244-6, Jocop-Pirir, #7 Response to ECF 244-7, Keo, #8 Response to ECF 244-8, Hernandez Lopez)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 5/26/2020)
May 26, 2020 Filing 255 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #233 Notice (Other),,,, Response to Bail Applications (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 233-1, Sanchez Brito, #2 Response to ECF 233-2, Montoya Amaya, #3 Response to ECF 233-3, Orellana, #4 Response to ECF 233-4, Tovar Reyes, #5 Response to ECF 233-5, Singh Kahlon, #6 Response to ECF 233-6, Cabrera Arvizo, #7 Response to ECF 233-7, Lucas Peleaz, #8 Response to ECF 233-8, Garcia Gonzalez)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 5/26/2020)
May 26, 2020 Filing 254 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #220 Notice (Other),,, Response to Bail Applications (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 220-1, Duong, #2 Response to ECF 220-2, Grant, #3 Response to ECF 220-3, Navas, #4 Response to ECF 220-4, Uc Encarnacion, #5 Response to ECF 220-6, Dominguez Candelaria, #6 Response to ECF 220-7, Rodriguez Nunez, #7 Response to ECF 220-8, Rivera Garcia)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 5/26/2020)
May 26, 2020 Filing 253 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, REQUEST FOR RELEASE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Jose Pilar Flores-Guzman, #2 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Jose Eliseo Alfaro Henriquez, #3 Exhibit Letter in Support of Jose Eliseo Alfaro Henriquez, #4 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Abraham Mendez Jimenez, #5 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Fredin Navarrete Villeda, #6 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Mario Nava Gonzalez, #7 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Rafael Ramirez Perez, #8 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Carlos Arevalo Barragan, #9 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Benito Villalobos Suria, #10 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Akash Sharma)(MacLean, Emilou) (Filed on 5/26/2020)
May 26, 2020 Filing 252 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR RELEASE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Jose Pilar Flores-Guzman, #2 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Jose Eliseo Alfaro Henriquez, #3 Exhibit Letter in Support of Jose Eliseo Alfaro Henriquez, #4 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Abraham Mendez Jimenez, #5 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Fredin Navarrete Villeda, #6 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Mario Nava Gonzalez, #7 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Rafael Ramirez Perez, #8 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Carlos Arevalo Barragan, #9 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Benito Villalobos Suria, #10 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Akash Sharma)(MacLean, Emilou) (Filed on 5/26/2020)
May 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER Relating Duong v. Jennings. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/25/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2020)
May 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 250 BAIL ORDER NO. 18. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/25/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2020)
May 25, 2020 Filing 249 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR RELEASE (UNDER SEAL) by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Sealed Request for Release Application for Guillermo Urenda Bustos, #2 Sealed Request for Release Application for Walter Aldana-Ocana, #3 Sealed Request for Release Application for Donaciano Salvador Resendiz-Chavez, #4 Sealed Request for Release Application for Juan Bravo Zambrano, #5 Sealed Request for Release Application for Ali Kakande, #6 Sealed Request for Release Application for Jose Camarena Navarrete, #7 Sealed Update to Deferred Bail Application for Asif Masoom Qazi)(Wells, Jordan) (Filed on 5/25/2020)
May 25, 2020 Filing 248 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR RELEASE (Attachments: #1 Request for Release Application for Guillermo Urenda Bustos, #2 Request for Release Application for Walter Aldana-Ocana, #3 Request for Release Application for Donaciano Salvador Resendiz-Chavez, #4 Request for Release Application for Juan Bravo Zambrano, #5 Request for Release Application for Ali Kakande, #6 Request for Release Application for Jose Camarena Navarrette, #7 Update to Deferred Bail Application for Asif Masoom Qazi)(Wells, Jordan) (Filed on 5/25/2020)
May 25, 2020 Filing 247 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas Re Housing Update for Alex Rivera-Giorges (Attachments: #1 Declaration Kathleen Anne Kavanagh)(Salceda, Angelica) (Filed on 5/25/2020)
May 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 246 BAIL ORDER NO. 17. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/25/2020. (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2020)
May 24, 2020 Filing 245 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Request for Release by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Armando Nunez Salgado, #2 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Carlos Ruben Franco Paz, #3 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Deepak Sahota, #4 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Efrain Cadena, #5 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Hrand Mirzaians, #6 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Juan Domingo Jocop-Pirir, #7 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Kethikoun Keo, #8 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Senobio Hernandez Lopez, #9 Exhibit Sealed Supplemental Information in Support of the Deferred Request for Release for Nelson Coche Salazar)(Salceda, Angelica) (Filed on 5/24/2020)
May 24, 2020 Filing 244 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR RELEASE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Armando Nunez Salgado, #2 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Carlos Ruben Franco Paz, #3 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Deepak Sahota, #4 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Efrain Cadena, #5 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Hrand Mirzaians, #6 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Juan Domingo Jocop-Pirir, #7 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Kethikoun Keo, #8 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Senobio Hernandez Lopez, #9 Exhibit Supplemental Information in Support of the Deferred Request Application for Release for Nelson Coche Salazar)(Salceda, Angelica) (Filed on 5/24/2020)
May 24, 2020 Filing 243 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Amendment to #236 Response ( Non Motion ) . (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 5/24/2020)
May 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 242 BAIL ORDER NO. 16. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/23/2020. (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2020)
May 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER NO. 2 for Further Information re Deferred Bail Applications. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/23/2020. (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2020)
May 22, 2020 Filing 240 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Reply iso Garcia, #2 Supplemental Update to Pending Deferred Short-Form Bail App JUAN JOSE ERAZO HERRERA)(Wells, Jordan) (Filed on 5/22/2020)
May 22, 2020 Filing 239 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas re #232 Notice (Other), of Reply to Defs' Responses to (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply iso Sumoza, #2 Exhibit Reply iso Garcia, #3 Exhibit Reply iso Arias, #4 Exhibit Reply iso Trejo, #5 Exhibit Reply iso Pinheiro, #6 Exhibit Reply iso Singh, #7 Exhibit Supplemental Update to Pending Deferred Short-Form Bail App JUAN JOSE ERAZO HERRERA)(Wells, Jordan) (Filed on 5/22/2020)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 238 BAIL ORDER NO. 15. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/22/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2020)
May 22, 2020 Filing 237 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Unredacted Response to ECF 179 by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 5/22/2020)
May 22, 2020 Filing 236 RESPONSE re #179 Order by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 5/22/2020)
May 22, 2020 Filing 235 CLERK'S NOTICE : The court has reviewed the motion and determined that case 20-cv-02966-HSG, Johal v. United States of America, is not related and no reassignment shall occur. (knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2020)
May 22, 2020 Filing 234 CLERK'S NOTICE: The court has reviewed the motion and determined that case 20-cv-03145-KAW, Guerra v. Allen et al, is not related and no reassignment shall occur. (knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2020)
May 22, 2020 Filing 233 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR RELEASE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Release of Victor Sanchez Brito, #2 Exhibit Request for Release of Marco Montoya Amaya, #3 Exhibit Request for Release of Albert Christian Orellana, #4 Exhibit Request for Release of Rene Alejandro Tovar Reyes, #5 Exhibit Request for Release of Yadwinder Singh Kahlon, #6 Exhibit Request for Release of Salvador Cabrera Arvizo, #7 Exhibit Request for Release of Hugo Lucas Pelaez, #8 Exhibit Request for Release of Juvenal Garcia Gonzalez, #9 Exhibit in Support of Exhibit Request for Release of Juvenal Garcia Gonzalez, #10 Exhibit in Support of Exhibit Request for Release of Juvenal Garcia Gonzalez, #11 Exhibit Supplement for Deferred Decision of Nestor Chavez Cost for Deferred, #12 Exhibit Documents in Support of Exhibit Supplement for Deferred Decision of Nestor Chavez Cos)(Riordan, Sean) (Filed on 5/22/2020)
May 22, 2020 Filing 232 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #214 Notice (Other),,, Response to Bail Applications (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 214-1, Hernandez Sumoza, #2 Response to ECF 214-2, Archundia Garcia, #3 Response to ECF 214-3, Zelaya Alas aka Arias, #4 Response to ECF 214-4, Soto Trejo, #5 Response to ECF 214-5, Peralta Iglesias)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 5/22/2020)
May 22, 2020 Filing 231 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Request for Release by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request Application for Release of Victor Sanchez Brito, #2 Exhibit Request Application for Release of Marco Montoya Amaya, #3 Exhibit Request Application for Release of Albert Christian Orellana, #4 Exhibit Request Application for Release of Rene Alejandro Tovar Reyes, #5 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Yadwinder Singh Kahlon, #6 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Salvador Cabrera Arvizo, #7 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Hugo Lucas Pelaez, #8 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Juvenal Garcia Gonzalez, #9 Exhibit in support of Request Application for Release of Juvenal Garcia Gonzalez, #10 Exhibit 2 in in support of Request Application for Release of Juvenal Garcia Gonzalez, #11 Exhibit Supplement for Deferred Decision of Nestor Chavez Cos, #12 Exhibit in Support of Supplement for Deferred Decision of Nestor Chavez Cost for Deferred)(Riordan, Sean) (Filed on 5/22/2020)
May 22, 2020 Filing 230 Statement of Opposition re #124 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases ;[PROPOSED] Order. by Jose Eduardo Guerra. (Day, Allison) (Filed on 5/22/2020) Modified on 5/26/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
May 22, 2020 Filing 229 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. Motion Hearing set for 6/2/2021 10:00 AM before Judge Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 5/27/2020. Replies due by 5/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Camilo Abel ISO Petitioners-Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction Arias Marroquin, #2 Declaration of Aroldo Rodriguez Diaz ISO Petitioners-Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #3 Declaration of Asif Masoom Qazi ISO Petitioners-Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #4 Declaration of Aylaliyah AssefaBirru ISO Petitioners-Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #5 Declaration of Carlos Renan Solis Manzanilla ISO Petitioners-Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #6 Declaration of Fermin Trujillo Lopez ISO Petitioners-Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #7 Declaration of Gilberto Pablo Perez ISO Petitioners-Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #8 Declaration of Jose Pablo Garcia Montes de Oca ISO Petitioners-Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #9 Declaration of Jose Mejia Rosas ISO Petitioners-Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #10 Declaration of Juan Aguilar Castaneda ISO Petitioners-Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #11 Declaration of Juan Jose Erazo Herrera ISO Petitioners-Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #12 Declaration of Livia Pinheiro ISO Petitioners-Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #13 Declaration of Maria Andreas Salgado ISO Petitioners-Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #14 Declaration of Maynor Oxlaj Siguantay ISO Petitioners-Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #15 Declaration of Pravindar Singh ISO Petitioners-Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #16 Declaration of Akiki Iwaski, Ph.D ISO Petitioners-Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #17 Declaration of Sandra Hernandez ISO Petitioners-Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #18 Declaration of Sarah H. Allen, M.D. ISO Petitioners-Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #19 Declaration of Robert B. Greifinger, M.D. ISO Petitioners-Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #20 Declaration of William S. Freeman ISO Petitioners-Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #21 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] Order)(Freeman, William) (Filed on 5/22/2020) Modified on 5/26/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
May 22, 2020 Filing 228 RESPONSE re 207 Status Conference,,,,, To The Court's Questions Regarding Removal Via Air by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 5/22/2020)
May 22, 2020 Filing 227 RESPONSE re 207 Status Conference,,,,, To The Court's Questions Regarding Implementing Release Orders by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 5/22/2020)
May 21, 2020 Filing 226 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Reply to Dfts Responses by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply to Dfts Opp for Ayala Mendoza, #2 Exhibit Reply to Dfts Opp for Pacheco Mendez)(Bernwanger, Bree) (Filed on 5/21/2020)
May 21, 2020 Filing 225 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas re #221 Notice (Other),, Reply to Dfts Responses (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply to Dfts Opp for Ayala Mendoza, #2 Exhibit Reply to Dfts Opp for Jimenez Garcia, #3 Exhibit Reply to Dfts Opp for Pacheco Mendez, #4 Exhibit Reply to Dfts Opp for Kifle, #5 Exhibit Reply to Dfts Opp for Garcia Martinez)(Bernwanger, Bree) (Filed on 5/21/2020)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER re Domestic Violence. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/21/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2020)
May 21, 2020 Filing 223 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Unredacted Response to Bail Applications in ECF 202 by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Response to ECF 202-1, Ayala Mendoza, #2 Unredacted Response to ECF 202-6, Mendoza Valdovinos)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 5/21/2020)
May 21, 2020 Filing 222 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, REQUEST FOR RELEASE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Rachana Duong, #2 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Donavan Grant, #3 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Gerardo Francisco Navas, #4 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Ernesto Uc Encarnacion, #5 Exhibit Declaration in Support of Ernesto Uc Encarnacion, #6 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Felix Daniel Dominguez-Candelaria, #7 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Leobardo Rodriguez Nunez, #8 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Noe Rivera Garcia, #9 Exhibit Update to Pending Application for Release for Livia Pinheiro, #10 Exhibit Supporting Documents for Livia Pinheiro)(Beier, Genna) (Filed on 5/21/2020)
May 21, 2020 Filing 221 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #202 Notice (Other),,,, Response to Bail Applications (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 202-1, Ayala Mendoza, #2 Response to ECF 202-3, Jimenez Garcia, #3 Response to ECF 202-4, Pacheco Mendez, #4 Response to ECF 202-5, Kifle, #5 Response to ECF 202-6, Mendoza Valdovinos, #6 Response to ECF 202-7, Khan, #7 Exhibit to Response re Khan, #8 Response to ECF 202-8, Garcia Martinez, #9 Response to ECF 202-9, Oretekor, #10 Response to ECF 202-11, Garcia Velasco)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 5/21/2020)
May 21, 2020 Filing 220 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR RELEASE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Rachana Duong, #2 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Donavan Grant, #3 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Gerardo Francisco Navas, #4 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Ernesto Uc Encarnacion, #5 Exhibit Declaration in Support of Ernesto Uc Encarnacion, #6 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Felix Daniel Dominguez-Candelaria, #7 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Leobardo Rodriguez Nunez, #8 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Noe Rivera Garcia, #9 Exhibit Update to Pending Application for Release for Livia Pinheiro, #10 Exhibit Supporting Documents for Livia Pinheiro)(Beier, Genna) (Filed on 5/21/2020)
May 21, 2020 Filing 219 CLERK'S NOTICE vacating the status conference scheduled for 5/22/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2020)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 218 BAIL ORDER NO. 14. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/21/2020. (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2020)
May 21, 2020 Filing 217 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING ZOOM STATUS CONFERENCE. Status Conference reset for 2:00 PM on 5/22/2020. For Zoom connection, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/. ADVANCE REGISTRATION OF PARTICIPATING COUNSEL IS REQUIRED. The parties are asked to email a list of names and emails of counsel who will be participating in the hearing to vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov by noon on Thursday, May 21, if they have not done so already. Counsel who have pre-registered will receive individualized invitations to participate.Members of the public and press, please click the link or use the information below to join the webinar:https://us02web.zoom.us/j/84386281387?pwd=VFlNV09SWVJybkNPV1dJSE1rZlB1QT09Meeting ID: 843 8628 1387Password: 971651Dial by your location+1 929 205 6099 US (New York)+1 253 215 8782 US+1 301 715 8592 US+1 312 626 6799 US (Chicago)+1 346 248 7799 US (Houston)+1 669 900 6833 US (San Jose)Find your local number: https://zoom.us/u/ac4JkPfcjoFor important information and guidance on technical preparation, please see #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2020)
May 20, 2020 Filing 216 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas re #211 Notice (Other), #210 Notice (Other),, NOTICE OF REPLY TO DEFENDANTS RESPONSES TO NELVIS REYES CRUZ (ECF 210-2); ADOLFO GODINEZ-GARCIA (ECF 210-4); IGNACIO ARZATE REYES (ECF 210-7); AND JOSE PABLO GARCIA MONTES DE OCA (ECF 211-1) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Nelvis Reyes Cruz Reply to Short-Form Bail Application, #2 Exhibit Adolfo Godinez-Garcia Reply to Short-Form Bail Application, #3 Exhibit Ignacio Arzate Reyes Reply to Short-Form Bail Application, #4 Exhibit Jose Pablo Garcia Montes de Oca Reply to Short-Form Bail Application)(Salceda, Angelica) (Filed on 5/20/2020)
May 20, 2020 Filing 215 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR RELEASE (UNDER SEAL) AND UPDATE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Sealed Request for Release for Selvin Rolando Hernandez Sumoza, #2 Sealed Request for Gustavo Archundia Garcia, #3 Sealed Request for Nelson Zelaya Alas AKA Nelson Arias, #4 Sealed Request for Juan Carlos Soto Trejo, #5 Sealed Request for Gustavo Adolfo Peralta Iglesias, #6 Sealed Update Pending Deferred Request Application for Ajaypal Singh)(Wells, Jordan) (Filed on 5/20/2020)
May 20, 2020 Filing 214 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR RELEASE AND UPDATES (Attachments: #1 Request Application for Release for Selvin Rolando Hernandez Sumoza, #2 Request Application for Release for Gustavo Archundia Garcia, #3 Request Application for Release for Nelson Zelaya Alas AKA Nelson Arias, #4 Request Application for Release for Juan Carlos Soto Trejo, #5 Request Application for Release for Gustavo Adolfo Peralta Iglesias, #6 Update to Pending Deferred Request Application for Eleazar Porcayo Garcia, #7 Update to Pending Deferred Request Application for Ajaypal Singh, #8 Update to Pending Deferred Request Application for Lawrence Kuria Mwaura)(Wells, Jordan) (Filed on 5/20/2020)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 213 BAIL ORDER NO. 13. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/20/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2020)
May 20, 2020 Filing 212 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Unredacted Response to Bail Application ECF 186-3, Machuca Villacana by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 5/20/2020)
May 20, 2020 Filing 211 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #195 Notice (Other),, Response to Bail Applications (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 195-1, Garcia Montes de Oca, #2 Response to ECF 195-2, Raymundo Lopez, #3 Response to ECF 195-3, Arias Marroquin)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 5/20/2020)
May 20, 2020 Filing 210 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #186 Notice (Other),, Response to Bail Applications (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 186-1, Quintanilla, #2 Response to ECF 186-2, Reyes Cruz, #3 Response to ECF 186-3, Machuca Villacana, #4 Response to ECF 186-4, Godinez-Garcia, #5 Response to ECF 186-5, Chhum, #6 Response to ECF 186-6, Minchaca Ramos, #7 Response to ECF 186-6, Arzate-Reyes)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 5/20/2020)
May 20, 2020 Filing 209 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Status Conference set for 5/22/2020 02:30 PM by Zoom Webinar. For Zoom connection, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/.ADVANCE REGISTRATION OF PARTICIPATING COUNSEL IS REQUIRED. Please email a list of names and emails of counsel who will be participating in the hearing to vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov by noon on Thursday, May 21. Counsel who have pre-registered will receive individualized invitations to participate.Members of the public and press, please click the link or use the information below to join the webinar: https://us02web.zoom.us/j/84386281387?pwd=VFlNV09SWVJybkNPV1dJSE1rZlB1QT09Meeting ID: 843 8628 1387Password: 971651Dial by your location+1 929 205 6099 US (New York)+1 253 215 8782 US+1 301 715 8592 US+1 312 626 6799 US (Chicago)+1 346 248 7799 US (Houston)+1 669 900 6833 US (San Jose)Find your local number: https://zoom.us/u/ac4JkPfcjoFor important information and guidance on technical preparation, please see #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associate d with this entry.) (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2020)
May 20, 2020 Filing 208 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Taylor Friedman (Friedman, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/20/2020)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 206 BAIL ORDER NO. 12. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/20/2020. (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2020)
May 19, 2020 Filing 207 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vince Chhabria: Status Conference held via Zoom Webinar on 5/19/2020. The government is ordered to provide further information regarding whether and when it is truly necessary to transfer detainees to El Paso, or other facilities with known cases of Covid-19, prior to removal. The government should also explain, in as much detail as possible without creating security concerns, the typical timeline between the decision to remove a detainee and the actual removal. The government is ordered, at the next status conference, to provide further information regarding the facilities' capacity to release detainees over the weekend. At the next status conference, the parties should be prepared to discuss all the informational obligations that the Court has imposed on the government, and whether any of those obligations are no longer necessary, or can be adjusted. A further status conference is scheduled for Friday, May 22, at 2:30 PM. Total Time in Court: 1:03 minutes Court Reporter: Hearing recorded via Zoom Webinar, 2:01 PM - 3:04 PM. Plaintiff Attorneys: Emi MacLean and Angelica Salceda.Defendant Attorneys: Wendy Garbers, Adrienne Zack, and Shiwon Choe. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/20/2020)
May 19, 2020 Filing 205 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas re #201 Notice (Other),, Replies to Defendants' Responses (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply for Donis Armando Salguero Aguilar, #2 Exhibit Reply for Marcos Alejandro Reyes, #3 Exhibit Reply for Hoan Van Tran, #4 Exhibit Reply for Walter Cruz Zavala)(Riordan, Sean) (Filed on 5/19/2020)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 204 BAIL ORDER NO. 11. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/19/2020. (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2020)
May 19, 2020 Filing 203 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, REQUEST FOR RELEASE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Miguel Angel Ayala Mendoza, #2 Exhibit Letter in Support of Miguel Angel Ayala Mendoza, #3 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Francisco Javier Jimenez Garcia, #4 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Jose Pacheco Mendez, #5 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Yebio Kifle, #6 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Jose Fernando Mendoza Vadovinos, #7 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Mohamed Khan, #8 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Leonel Garcia Martinez, #9 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Bernard Oretekor, #10 Exhibit Letter in Support of Bernard Oretekor, #11 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Nelson Coche Salazar, #12 Exhibit Documents in Support of Nelson Coche Salazar, #13 Exhibit Update to Pending Application for Release for Gustavo Raudales Banegas)(Bernwanger, Bree) (Filed on 5/19/2020)
May 19, 2020 Filing 202 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR RELEASE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Miguel Angel Ayala Mendoza, #2 Exhibit Letter in Support of Miguel Angel Ayala Mendoza, #3 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Francisco Javier Jimenez Garcia, #4 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Jose Pacheco Mendez, #5 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Yebio Kifle, #6 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Jose Fernando Mendoza Vadovinos, #7 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Mohamed Khan, #8 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Leonel Garcia Martinez, #9 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Bernard Oretekor, #10 Exhibit Letter in Support of Bernard Oretekor, #11 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Nelson Coche Salazar, #12 Exhibit Documents in Support of Nelson Coche Salazar, #13 Exhibit Update to Pending Application for Release for Gustavo Raudales Banegas)(Bernwanger, Bree) (Filed on 5/19/2020)
May 19, 2020 Filing 201 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #184 Notice (Other),,, Response to Bail Applications (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 184-1, Zarazua Blancas, #2 Response to ECF 184-2, Aguilar Zalazar, #3 Response to ECF 184-3, Tran, #4 Response to ECF 184-4, Reyes, #5 Response to ECF 184-5, Sokol, #6 Response to ECF 184-6, Cruz Menjivar, #7 Response to ECF 184-7, Batinas, #8 Response to ECF 184-8, Cruz-Zavala)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 5/19/2020)
May 18, 2020 Filing 200 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Reply to Dfts Response by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply to Dfts Opp for Mirzada)(Bernwanger, Bree) (Filed on 5/18/2020)
May 18, 2020 Filing 199 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas re #194 Notice (Other),, Reply to Dfts Response (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply to Dfts Opp for Mirzada)(Bernwanger, Bree) (Filed on 5/18/2020)
May 18, 2020 Filing 198 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas re #193 Notice (Other), #194 Notice (Other),, Reply to Dfts Responses (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply to Dfts Opp for Rodriguez Magana, #2 Exhibit Reply to Dfts Opp for Qazi, #3 Exhibit Reply to Dfts Opp for Ntawangundi, #4 Exhibit Reply to Dfts Opp for Ke, #5 Exhibit Reply to Dfts Opp for Rajnish)(Bernwanger, Bree) (Filed on 5/18/2020)
May 18, 2020 Filing 197 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #171 Notice (Other),,,, #193 Notice (Other), of Release on Bond (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 5/18/2020)
May 18, 2020 Filing 196 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR RELEASE (UNDER SEAL) by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Sealed Application for Release for Jose Pablo Garcia Montes De Oca, #2 Sealed Application for Release for Juan Raymundo Lopez, #3 Sealed Application for Release for Camilo Arias Marroquin, #4 Sealed Application for Release for Reynaldo Flores Aviles)(Salceda, Angelica) (Filed on 5/18/2020)
May 18, 2020 Filing 195 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR RELEASE (Attachments: #1 Application for Release for Jose Pablo Garcia Montes De Oca, #2 Application for Release for Juan Raymundo Lopez, #3 Application for Release for Camilo Arias Marroquin, #4 Application for Release for Reynaldo Flores Aviles)(Salceda, Angelica) (Filed on 5/18/2020)
May 18, 2020 Filing 194 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #180 Notice (Other),,, Response to Bail Applications (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 180-1, Mirzada, #2 Response to ECF 18-2, Singh, Dilbagh, #3 Response to ECF 180-3, Ntawangundi, #4 Response to ECF 180-4, Ke, #5 Response to ECF 180-5, He, #6 Response to ECF 180-6, Cux-Jocop, #7 Response to ECF 180-7, Cardenas, #8 Response to ECF 180-8, Joya Lazo, #9 Response to ECF 180-9, Ponce-Maradiaga, #10 Response to ECF 180-10, Rajnish)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 5/18/2020)
May 18, 2020 Filing 193 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #171 Notice (Other),,,, Response to Bail Applications (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 171-1, Magana, #2 Response to ECF 171-2, So, #3 Response to ECF 171-3, Dikshat, #4 Response to ECF 171-4, Ramos Lopez, #5 Response to ECF 171-5, Purcero Calderon, #6 Response to ECF 171-6, Qazi, #7 Response to ECF 171-8, Guerra)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 5/18/2020)
May 18, 2020 Filing 192 RESPONSE re 190 Status Conference,,, by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 5/18/2020)
May 18, 2020 Filing 191 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas PETITIONERS-PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF DEATH OF CLASS MEMBER CHONG WOOHN AHN (Freeman, William) (Filed on 5/18/2020)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER ADOPTING [175-1] PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION MOTION AND MOTION TO DISSOLVE & STAY THE TRO. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/18/2020. (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2020)
May 17, 2020 Filing 188 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM STATUS CONFERENCE. Status Conference set for 5/19/2020 02:00 PM PDT by Zoom Webinar. For Zoom connection, please see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/. ADVANCE REGISTRATION OF PARTICIPATING COUNSEL IS REQUIRED. Please send a list of names and emails of counsel who will be participating in the hearing to vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov by Tuesday, May 19 at 10:00 AM PDT. Counsel who have pre-registered will receive individualized invitations to participate.Members of the public and press, please click the link or use the information below to join the webinar: https://us02web.zoom.us/j/82787647519?pwd=QVVUc2ZjNjNwWERXS3RoVHhYbyt2UT09Meeting ID: 827 8764 7519Password: 971651Dial by your location+1 929 205 6099 US (New York)+1 253 215 8782 US+1 301 715 8592 US+1 312 626 6799 US (Chicago)+1 346 248 7799 US (Houston)+1 669 900 6833 US (San Jose)Find your local number: https://zoom.us/u/ac4JkPfcjoFor important information and guidance on technical preparation, please see #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. T here is no document associated with this entry.) (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2020)
May 17, 2020 Filing 187 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, REQUEST FOR RELEASE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Release Request for Jose Darwin Quintanilla, #2 Exhibit Release Request for Nelvis Reyes Cruz, #3 Exhibit Release Request for Angel Machuca Villacana, #4 Exhibit Release Request for Ignacio Arzate-Reyes, #5 Exhibit Release Request for Adolfo Godinez-Garcia, #6 Exhibit Release Request for Sitha Chhum, #7 Exhibit Release Request for Juan Carlos Minchaca Ramos)(Beier, Genna) (Filed on 5/17/2020)
May 17, 2020 Filing 186 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR RELEASE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Release Request for Jose Darwin Quintanilla, #2 Exhibit Release Request for Nelvis Reyes Cruz, #3 Exhibit Release Request for Angel Machuca Villacana, #4 Exhibit Release Request for Adolfo Godinez-Garcia, #5 Exhibit Release Request for Sitha Chhum, #6 Exhibit Release Request for Juan Carlos Minchaca Ramos, #7 Exhibit Release Request for Ignacio Arzate-Reyes)(Beier, Genna) (Filed on 5/17/2020)
May 16, 2020 Filing 185 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Request for Release by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Carlos Zarazua Blancas, #2 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Donis Armando Salguero Aguilar, #3 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Hoan Van Tran, #4 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Marcos Alejandro Reyes, #5 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Mikhail Sergeyevich Sokol, #6 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Levi Antonio Cruz Menjivar, #7 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Paul Batinas, #8 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Walter Cruz-Zavala)(Salceda, Angelica) (Filed on 5/16/2020)
May 16, 2020 Filing 184 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR RELEASE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Carlos Zarazua Blancas, #2 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Donis Armando Salguero Aguilar, #3 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Hoan Van Tran, #4 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Marcos Alejandro Reyes, #5 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Mikhail Sergeyevich Sokol, #6 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Levi Antonio Cruz Menjivar, #7 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Paul Batinas, #8 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Walter Cruz-Zavala)(Salceda, Angelica) (Filed on 5/16/2020)
May 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 183 BAIL ORDER NO. 10. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/16/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2020)
May 15, 2020 Filing 190 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vince Chhabria: Status Conference held via Zoom Webinar on 5/15/2020. By Monday, May 18, the government should produce to the plaintiffs information about what the "transferred for removal" status means, as discussed during the status conference. The Court adopted the briefing schedule and page limits described in the defendant's proposed order at Docket No. 175. A further status conference is scheduled for Tuesday, May 19, at 2:00 PM. Total Time in Court: 31 minutes Court Reporter: Hearing recorded via Zoom Webinar, 2:21 PM - 2:52 PM. Plaintiff Attorneys: Emilou Maclean, Angelica Salceda, Martin Schenker, and Genna Beier.Defendant Attorneys: Wendy Garbers, Adrienne Zack, and Shiwon Choe. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/18/2020)
May 15, 2020 Filing 182 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas re #163 Notice (Other),, Reply to Dfts Responses (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply to Defs Opp to Rivera-Giorges, #2 Exhibit Reply to Defs Opp to Abbas, #3 Exhibit Reply to Defs Opp to FRANCISCO ANTONIO MENDOZA CANALES)(Wells, Jordan) (Filed on 5/15/2020)
May 15, 2020 Filing 181 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Notice of Request for Release (Under Seal) by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Release for Abdul Ghaffar Mirzada, #2 Exhibit Request for Release for Dilbagh Singh, #3 Exhibit Request for Release for Egide Ntawangundi, #4 Exhibit Request for Release for Jianhong Ke, #5 Exhibit Request for Release for Junzhen He, #6 Exhibit Request for Release for Myke Jonathan Cux-Jocop, #7 Exhibit Request for Release for Maria Cardenas, #8 Exhibit Request for Release for Mario Joyo Lazo, #9 Exhibit Request for Release for Nuan Ponce-Maradiaga, #10 Exhibit Request for Release for Rajnish Rajnish)(Riordan, Sean) (Filed on 5/15/2020)
May 15, 2020 Filing 180 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas Notice of Request for Release (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Release for Abdul Ghaffar Mirzada, #2 Exhibit Request for Release for Dilbagh Singh, #3 Exhibit Request for Release for Egide Ntawangundi, #4 Exhibit Request for Release for Jianhong Ke, #5 Exhibit Request for Release for Junzhen He, #6 Exhibit Request for Release for Myke Jonathan Cux-Jocop, #7 Exhibit Request for Release for Maria Cardenas, #8 Exhibit Request for Release for Mario Joyo Lazo, #9 Exhibit Request for Release for Nuan Ponce-Maradiaga, #10 Exhibit Request for Release for Rajnish Rajnish)(Riordan, Sean) (Filed on 5/15/2020)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER for Further Information re Deferred Bail Applications. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/15/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2020)
May 15, 2020 Filing 178 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #163 Notice (Other),, Response to Bail Applications (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 163-1, Castro Ramos, #2 Response to ECF 163-2, Rodriguez Rojas, #3 Response to ECF 163-3, Rivera Giorges, #4 Response to ECF 163-4, Bhutta, #5 Response to ECF 163-5, Mendoza Canales, #6 Response to ECF 163-6, Perrusquia Palomares)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 5/15/2020)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 177 BAIL ORDER NO. 9. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/15/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2020)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER Regarding Related Cases. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/15/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2020)
May 15, 2020 Filing 175 Letter Brief Regarding (1) Page Limits and (2) Federal Defendants' Right to Submit Reply in Support of Their Motion to Dissolve the Temporary Restraining Order and to Stay filed byMatthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Choe, Shiwon) (Filed on 5/15/2020)
May 14, 2020 Filing 174 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas re #169 Notice (Other), Replies to Defendants' Responses (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Figueras Reply, #2 Exhibit Andres Salgado Reply, #3 Exhibit Pablo Perez Reply, #4 Exhibit Nguyen Reply)(Riordan, Sean) (Filed on 5/14/2020)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 173 BAIL ORDER NO. 8. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/14/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2020)
May 14, 2020 Filing 172 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, REQUEST FOR RELEASE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Ernesto Rodriguez Magana, #2 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Chunye Raymond So, #3 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Dikshat Dikshat, #4 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Mariano Ramos Lopez, #5 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Gustavo Pureco Calderon, #6 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Asif Masoom Qazi, #7 Exhibit Letter from Atty Filloy in Support of Asif Masoom Qazi, #8 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Jose Eduardo Guerra, #9 Exhibit Letter from Elohim Guerra Huerta in Support of Jose Eduardo Guerra, #10 Exhibit Letter from Kern Regional Center in Support of Jose Eduardo Guerra)(Beier, Genna) (Filed on 5/14/2020)
May 14, 2020 Filing 171 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR RELEASE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Ernesto Rodriguez Magana, #2 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Chunye Raymond So, #3 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Dikshat Dikshat, #4 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Mariano Ramos Lopez, #5 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Gustavo Pureco Calderon, #6 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Asif Masoom Qazi, #7 Exhibit Letter from Atty Filloy in Support of Asif Masoom Qazi, #8 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Jose Eduardo Guerra, #9 Exhibit Letter from Elohim Guerra Huerta in Support of Jose Eduardo Guerra, #10 Exhibit Letter from Kern Regional Center in Support of Jose Eduardo Guerra)(Beier, Genna) (Filed on 5/14/2020)
May 14, 2020 Filing 170 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Unredacted Response to Bail Applications in ECF 153 by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Response to ECF 153-1, Figueras, #2 Unredacted Response to ECF 153-7, Mejia)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 5/14/2020)
May 14, 2020 Filing 169 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #153 Notice (Other),, Response to Bail Applications (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 153-1, Figueras, #2 Response to ECF 153-2, Andres Salgado, #3 Response to ECF 153-3, Pablo Perez, #4 Response to ECF 153-4, Nguyen, #5 Response to ECF 153-5, Tol-Morales, #6 Response to ECF 153-6, Aguilar Domingo, #7 Response to ECF 153-7, Mejia)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 5/14/2020)
May 13, 2020 Filing 168 Declaration of Attorney Hector Vega in Support of #156 Notice (Other), filed byJavier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Related document(s) #156 ) (Beier, Genna) (Filed on 5/13/2020)
May 13, 2020 Filing 167 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas re #165 Notice (Other), Reply to Dfts Responses (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply to Dfts' Response to Bail Application for Julio Buendia Alas, #2 Exhibit Reply to Dfts' Response to Bail Application for Maximo Martinez-Juan)(Beier, Genna) (Filed on 5/13/2020)
May 13, 2020 Filing 166 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #156 Notice (Other), Redacted Response to ECF 156 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of AFOD Pham, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Declaration of Davies)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 5/13/2020)
May 13, 2020 Filing 165 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #137 Notice (Other),, Response to Bail Applications (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 137-1, Martinez Juan, #2 Response to ECF 137-2, Buendia Alas, #3 Response to ECF 137-3, Trujillo-Lopez)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 5/13/2020)
May 13, 2020 Filing 164 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, REQUEST FOR RELEASE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Luis Erasmo Castro Ramos, #2 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Edgar Ismael Rodriguez Rojas, #3 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Alex Rivera-Giorges, #4 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Bhutta Mohammad Abbas, #5 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Francisco Antonio Mendoza Canales, #6 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Oscar Humberto Perrusquia Palomares)(Bernwanger, Bree) (Filed on 5/13/2020)
May 13, 2020 Filing 163 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR RELEASE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Release for Luis Erasmo Castro Ramos, #2 Exhibit Request for Release for Edgar Ismael Rodriguez Rojas, #3 Exhibit Request for Release of Alex Rivera-Giorges, #4 Exhibit Request for Release of Bhutta Mohammad Abbas, #5 Exhibit Request for Release of Francisco Antonio Mendoza Canales, #6 Exhibit Request for Release of Oscar Humberto Perrusquia Palomares)(Bernwanger, Bree) (Filed on 5/13/2020)
May 13, 2020 Filing 162 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Response to ECF 156 by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Pham, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Declaration)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 5/13/2020)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER Granting Protective Order. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/13/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2020)
May 13, 2020 Filing 160 Declaration of Deportation Officer Nancy Gonzalez in Support of #147 Letter Brief filed byMatthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Related document(s) #147 ) (Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 5/13/2020)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 159 BAIL ORDER NO. 7. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/13/2020. (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2020)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER for Response to Docket No. 156. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/13/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2020)
May 13, 2020 Filing 157 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas re #137 Notice (Other),, NOTICE OF IMMIGRATION JUDGE ORDER RELEASING BAIL APPLICANT (Riordan, Sean) (Filed on 5/13/2020)
May 12, 2020 Filing 156 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas re #72 Notice (Other),,, #87 Notice (Other), #97 Order of Released Class Member's Transfer and Request for Adjudication of Bail Application (Beier, Genna) (Filed on 5/12/2020)
May 12, 2020 Filing 155 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas re #151 Notice (Other), Reply to Dfts Responses (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply to Dfts' Response to Bail Application for Carlos Solis Manzanilla, #2 Exhibit Reply to Dfts' Response to Bail Application for Choung Woohn Ahn, #3 Exhibit Reply to Dfts' Response to Bail Application for Leonidez Mendez Hinojosa)(Salceda, Angelica) (Filed on 5/12/2020)
May 12, 2020 Filing 154 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR RELEASE (UNDER SEAL) by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Sealed Request for Release for Raleigh Figueras, #2 Sealed Request for Release for Maria Andres Salgado, #3 Sealed Request for Release for Gilberto Pablo Perez, #4 Sealed Request for Release for Hung Tien Nguyen, #5 Sealed Request for Release for Wildson Tol-Morales, #6 Sealed Request for Release for Mariano Aguilar Domingo, #7 Sealed Request for Release for Edgar Mejia)(MacLean, Emilou) (Filed on 5/12/2020)
May 12, 2020 Filing 153 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR RELEASE (Attachments: #1 Notice of Request for Release for Raleigh Figueras, #2 Notice of Request for Release for Maria Andres Salgado, #3 Notice of Request for Release for Gilberto Pablo Perez, #4 Notice of Request for Release for Hung Tien Nguyen, #5 Notice of Request for Release for Wildson Tol-Morales, #6 Notice of Request for Release for Mariano Aguilar Domingo, #7 Notice of Request for Release for Edgar Mejia)(MacLean, Emilou) (Filed on 5/12/2020)
May 12, 2020 Filing 152 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Unredacted Response to Bail Application ECF 133-3, Mendez Hinojosa by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 5/12/2020)
May 12, 2020 Filing 151 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #133 Notice (Other), Response to Bail Applications (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 133-1, Manzanilla, #2 Response to ECF 133-2, Ahn, #3 Response to ECF 133-3, Mendez Hinojosa)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 5/12/2020)
May 12, 2020 Filing 150 Statement of Opposition re #126 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases ; [PROPOSED] Order by Rachana Duong, Kethikoun Keo. (Hon, Willis) (Filed on 5/12/2020) Modified on 5/13/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
May 12, 2020 Filing 149 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vince Chhabria: Status Conference held via Zoom Webinar on 5/11/2020. The parties may file additional 2-page briefs by May 12 at 10:00 a.m. addressing additional caselaw and providing further factual background on the provision of custodian information and use-restrictions for that information in normal bond proceedings. The Court took under consideration the plaintiffs' request for an extension of the briefing schedule for a preliminary injunction. ICE is ordered to include in their daily updates information about any detainees taken into custody (or transferred into) the two facilities on the previous day. The plaintiffs may now file applications for any detainees. Regarding deferred applications, the Court will provide further guidance in the coming days about information needed to adjudicate those applications. Regarding denied applications, the plaintiffs may file renewed applications (marked as such), but the Court will prioritize adjudicating new applications. Detainees with ERO or IJ bonds may apply for bail like other detainees. The parties are ordered to meet and confer further regarding detainee phone access at the facilities. If disputes remain, a joint letter should be filed by May 13 at 5:00 p.m. ICE is ordered to provide an explanation at the next status conference for why the overall detainee numbers at Yuba County Jail have decreased less than the numbers at Mesa Verde. A further status conference is scheduled for Friday, May 15, at 2:00 PM. Total Time in Court: 1:41 Court Reporter: Hearing recorded via Zoom Webinar, 3:01 PM - 4:42 PM. Plaintiff Attorneys: Emilou MacLean, Angelica Salceda, Martin Schenker, Sean Riordan, and Judah Lakin.Defendant Attorneys: Wendy Garbers, Adrienne Zack, and Shiwon Choe. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/12/2020)
May 12, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Motions due by 5/22/2020. Responses due by 5/27/2020. Replies due by 5/29/2020. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 6/2/2020 10:00 AM. (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2020)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/12/2020. (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2020)
May 12, 2020 Filing 147 Letter Brief filed byMatthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 5/12/2020)
May 12, 2020 Filing 146 Letter (Reply Letter Brief). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Order Granting Protective Order))(Lakin, Judah) (Filed on 5/12/2020)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 145 BAIL ORDER NO. 6. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/12/2020. (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2020)
May 12, 2020 Filing 144 Statement re #126 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases; [PROPOSED] Order by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Hsu, Shining) (Filed on 5/12/2020) Modified on 5/12/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
May 11, 2020 Filing 143 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas re #139 Notice (Other), Reply to Dfts Response (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply to Dfts Opp of Roberto Antonio Ramirez Pineda, #2 Exhibit Reply to Dfts Opp of Jaswinder Singh)(Salceda, Angelica) (Filed on 5/11/2020)
May 11, 2020 Filing 142 RESPONSE re #122 Brief, on Common Issues in Bail Review Process by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Torres Murillo v. Barr)(Choe, Shiwon) (Filed on 5/11/2020)
May 11, 2020 Filing 141 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Unredacted Response to Bail Application ECF 128-1, Ramirez Pineda by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 5/11/2020)
May 11, 2020 Filing 140 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM STATUS CONFERENCE. Status Conference set for 5/15/2020 02:00 PM by Zoom Webinar. For Zoom connection information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/. ADVANCE REGISTRATION OF PARTICIPATING COUNSEL IS REQUIRED. Please register by sending the the names and emails of counsel who will be participating in the conference to vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than noon on Thursday, May 14. Counsel who have pre-registered will receive individualized invitations to participate. Members of the public and press, please click the link or use the information below to join the webinar: https://us02web.zoom.us/j/85332374575?pwd=eWIxbEptUFJvVVYvYlBUaFZVdnhDUT09Meeting ID: 853 3237 4575Password: 971651Dial by your location+1 929 205 6099 US (New York)+1 253 215 8782 US+1 301 715 8592 US+1 312 626 6799 US (Chicago)+1 346 248 7799 US (Houston)+1 669 900 6833 US (San Jose)Find your local number: https://zoom.us/u/ac4JkPfcjoFor important information and guidance on technical preparation, please see #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry g enerated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2020)
May 11, 2020 Filing 139 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #128 Notice (Other),, Response to Bail Applications (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 128-1, Ramirez Pineda, #2 Response to ECF 128-2, Saeturn, #3 Response to ECF 128-3, Singh, #4 Response to ECF 128-4, Fierros Hurtado, #5 Response to ECF 128-5, Lopez Lucas, #6 Response to ECF 128-6, Maldonado Mancia)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 5/11/2020)
May 11, 2020 Filing 138 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, REQUEST FOR RELEASE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Maximo Martinez-Juan, #2 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Julio Cesar Buendia Alas, #3 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Fermin Trujillo-Lopez, #4 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Osvaldo Mohamed Lopez, #5 Exhibit Letter from Sun Street Medical Centers Men's Residential in Support of Osvaldo Mohamed Lopez)(Beier, Genna) (Filed on 5/11/2020)
May 11, 2020 Filing 137 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR RELEASE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Maximo Martinez-Juan, #2 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Julio Cesar Buendia Alas, #3 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Fermin Trujillo-Lopez, #4 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Osvaldo Mohamed Lopez, #5 Exhibit Letter from Sun Street Medical Centers Men's Residential in Support of Osvaldo Mohamed Lopez)(Beier, Genna) (Filed on 5/11/2020)
May 11, 2020 Filing 136 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #120 Notice (Other), Response to Bail Applications (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 120-1, Medina Molina, #2 Response to ECF 120-2, Aguirre-Torres)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 5/11/2020)
May 11, 2020 Filing 135 Letter Brief filed byMatthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 5/11/2020)
May 9, 2020 Filing 134 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Request for Release by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Carlos Solis Manzanilla, #2 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Choung Woohn Ahn, #3 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Leonidez Mendez Hinojosa)(Beier, Genna) (Filed on 5/9/2020)
May 9, 2020 Filing 133 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR RELEASE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Carlos Solis Manzanilla, #2 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Choung Woohn Ahn, #3 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Leonidez Mendez Hinojosa)(Beier, Genna) (Filed on 5/9/2020)
May 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 132 BAIL ORDER NO. 5. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/9/2020. (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2020)
May 9, 2020 Filing 131 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING STATUS CONFERENCE for 5/11/2020 03:00 PM by Zoom Webinar. For Zoom connection, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/. ADVANCE REGISTRATION OF PARTICIPATING COUNSEL IS REQUIRED. Please register by sending the the names and emails of counsel who will be participating in the conference to vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Monday, May 11 at 10:00 AM PDT. Counsel who have pre-registered will receive individualized invitations to participate.Members of the public and press, please click the link or use the information below to join the webinar: https://us02web.zoom.us/j/88329985083?pwd=TEtXRWM4Tk9UckkrNndCbDlYa1Jldz09Meeting ID: 883 2998 5083Password: 971651Dial by your location+1 929 205 6099 US (New York)+1 253 215 8782 US+1 301 715 8592 US+1 312 626 6799 US (Chicago)+1 346 248 7799 US (Houston)+1 669 900 6833 US (San Jose)Find your local number: https://zoom.us/u/ac4JkPfcjoFor important information and guidance on technical preparation, please see #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2020)
May 8, 2020 Filing 130 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas re #127 Notice (Other), Reply to Dfts Response (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply to Dfts' Response to Bail Application for Gustavo Raudales Benegas)(MacLean, Emilou) (Filed on 5/8/2020)
May 8, 2020 Filing 129 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Request for Release by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release Roberto Antonio Ramirez Pineda, #2 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release Yao Xeng Saeturn, #3 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release Jaswinder Singh, #4 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release Victor Fierros Hurtado, #5 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release Esgar Lopez Lucas, #6 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release Walter Maldonado)(Salceda, Angelica) (Filed on 5/8/2020)
May 8, 2020 Filing 128 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas Request for Release (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Release Request for Roberto Antonio Ramirez Pineda, #2 Exhibit Release Request for Yao Xeng Saeturn, #3 Exhibit Release Request for Jaswinder Singh, #4 Exhibit Release Request for Victor Fierros Hurtado, #5 Exhibit Release Request for Esgar Lopez Lucas, #6 Exhibit Release Request for Walter Maldonado)(Salceda, Angelica) (Filed on 5/8/2020)
May 8, 2020 Filing 127 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #112 Notice (Other), Response to Bail Applications (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 112-2, Raudales-Banegas)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 5/8/2020)
May 8, 2020 Filing 126 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 1:20-cv-02864-RMI. Signed by Judge Robert M. Illman on 05/08/2020. (rmilc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2020)
May 8, 2020 Filing 125 Letter Brief Brief re Protective Order for Undocumented Sponsors filed byJavier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Genna Ellis Beier in Support of Brief re Protective Order for, #2 Proposed Order)(Lakin, Judah) (Filed on 5/8/2020) Modified on 5/11/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
May 8, 2020 Filing 124 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 20-cv-03145-KAW. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 5/8/2020. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2020)
May 7, 2020 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING THE ZOOM STATUS CONFERENCE ON 5/11/2020. This proceeding will be a Zoom video conferencing webinar. For Zoom connection information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/. ADVANCE REGISTRATION OF PARTICIPATING COUNSEL IS REQUIRED and must be done by emailing a list of names and emails of counsel who will be participating in the hearing to vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Monday, May 11 at 10:00 AM PDT.Counsel who have pre-registered will receive individualized invitations to participate.Members of the public and press, please click the link or use the information below to join the webinar: https://us02web.zoom.us/j/88329985083?pwd=TEtXRWM4Tk9UckkrNndCbDlYa1Jldz09Meeting ID: 883-2998-5083Password: 971651Dial by your location+1 929 205 6099 US (New York)+1 253 215 8782 US+1 301 715 8592 US+1 312 626 6799 US (Chicago)+1 346 248 7799 US (Houston)+1 669 900 6833 US (San Jose)Find your local number: https://zoom.us/u/ac4JkPfcjoFor important information and guidance on technical preparation, please see #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (Thi s is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2020)
May 7, 2020 Filing 123 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vince Chhabria: Status Conference held via Zoom Webinar on 5/7/2020. The parties are asked to use fewer non-obvious acronyms in future bail applications. ICE is ordered to provide information regarding the reasons for releases from the facilities since the TRO hearing. Class counsel may file a short reply brief by midnight on the day of the government's response to a bail application if counsel already possess information relevant to assertions made in the government's response. The parties are ordered to file information about the criminal histories of proposed custodians under seal. A further status conference is scheduled for Monday, May 11, at 3:00 PM. Total Time in Court: 49 minutes Court Reporter: Hearing recorded via Zoom Webinar, 3:03 PM - 3:52 PM. Plaintiff Attorneys: Emilou Maclean and Angelica Salceda.Defendant Attorneys: Wendy Garbers and Shiwon Choe. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/7/2020)
May 7, 2020 Filing 122 Brief on Common Issues in Bail Review Process filed byJavier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Riordan, Sean) (Filed on 5/7/2020)
May 7, 2020 Filing 121 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #117 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, Order on Stipulation,,, Request for Release by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Jose Medina, #2 Exhibit Sealed Request for Release for Roselia Aguirre)(Salceda, Angelica) (Filed on 5/7/2020)
May 7, 2020 Filing 120 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas Request for Release (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Release Request for Jose Medina, #2 Exhibit Release Request for Roselia Aguirre Torres)(Salceda, Angelica) (Filed on 5/7/2020)
May 7, 2020 Filing 119 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement of Report of Bond Information (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 5/7/2020)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER granting Stipulated Further Protective Order. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/7/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2020)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting Stipulation regarding Sealing and Administrative Motions to File under Seal.(vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2020)
May 7, 2020 Filing 116 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR RELEASE CORRECTION OF DOCKET #85 filed by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Salceda, Angelica) (Filed on 5/7/2020)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 115 BAIL ORDER NO. 4. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/7/2020. (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2020)
May 6, 2020 Filing 114 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR RELEASE CORRECTION OF DOCKET #84 (Salceda, Angelica) (Filed on 5/6/2020)
May 6, 2020 Filing 113 Sixth Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Unredacted Release Requests filed by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unredacted Request of Belkin Peralta Madrid, #2 Exhibit Unredacted Request of Gustavo Raudales Banegas, #3 Exhibit Unredacted Request of Sonia Commandant)(Beier, Genna) (Filed on 5/6/2020)
May 6, 2020 Filing 112 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas Notice of Request for Release (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Belkin Peralta Madrid, #2 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Gustavo Raudales Banegas, #3 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Sonia Commandant)(Beier, Genna) (Filed on 5/6/2020)
May 6, 2020 Filing 111 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #84 Notice (Other), Response to Bail Applications (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 84-A, De Jesus Hernandez, #2 Response to ECF 84-B, Soto Aguilar, #3 Response to ECF 84-C, Rivera, #4 Response to ECF 84-D, Chavez Cos, #5 Response to ECF 84-E, Cruz Flores, #6 Response to ECF 84-F, Singh)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 5/6/2020)
May 6, 2020 Filing 110 AUDIO RECORDINGS ORDER (re: 92 Case Management Conference - Further,,,,,,,,,, 91 Case Management Conference - Further,,,,,,,, 55 Motion Hearing,,, ), by David Jennings. Court will send to Lucy Rollins at lucy.rollins@usdoj.gov a link to the files requested in this order. Fee waived because filer is USAO, FPD or CJA counsel on this case. (Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 5/6/2020)
May 6, 2020 Filing 109 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byMatthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 5/6/2020)
May 6, 2020 Filing 108 STANDARD CONDITIONS OF RELEASE. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/6/2020. (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2020)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 107 BAIL ORDER NO. 3. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/6/2020. (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2020)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 106 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #107 *** BAIL ORDER NO. 3. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/6/2020. (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2020) Modified on 5/6/2020 (vclc1S, COURT STAFF).
May 5, 2020 Filing 105 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Response to Bail Application filed by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Response to ECF 77-4, Mwaura)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 5/5/2020)
May 5, 2020 Filing 104 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #78 Notice (Other),, Response to Bail Applications (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 78-1, Birru, #2 Response to ECF 78-2, Porcayo Garcia, #3 Response to ECF 78-3, Marquez, #4 Response to ECF 78-4, Ayala Alonso, #5 Response to ECF 78-5, Vasquez Cruz)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 5/5/2020)
May 5, 2020 Filing 103 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #77 Notice (Other),, Response to Bail Applications (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 77-1, Parra Rojas, #2 Response to ECF 77-2, Ruiz Tovar, #3 Response to ECF 77-3, Montoya Echeverria, #4 Response to ECF 77-4, Mwaura, #5 Response to ECF 77-5, Singh, #6 Response to ECF 77-6, Buenaventura)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 5/5/2020)
May 5, 2020 Filing 102 RESPONSE re #95 Order PETITIONERS-PLAINTIFFS COMMENTS RE STANDARD CONDITIONS OF RELEASE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Freeman, William) (Filed on 5/5/2020)
May 5, 2020 Filing 101 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vince Chhabria: Case Management Conference held on 5/5/2020 via Zoom Webinar.The Court ordered that bail applications, and responses to bail applications, must be signed by the litigating attorney most responsible for verifying the accuracy of the representations contained in the document. This does not preclude attorneys from making representations on information and belief when necessary. Going forward, bail applications filed after 7:00 PM will be treated as having been filed the following day. Responses to bail applications are due two days after the application was filed, at 5:00 PM. Responses to bail applications filed Friday (or after 7:00 PM on Thursday) are due Monday. Responses to bail applications filed Saturday and Sunday are due Tuesday. ICE is ordered to continue providing, by 5:00 PM every day, a list of all individuals who have been released that day from each facility. That list must specify whether the individual was transferred, deported, released into the community, or discharged in some other way. ICE is also ordered to provide, in that same list, information regarding any individuals whom ICE is in the process of transferring, deporting, releasing, or otherwise discharging from the facilities. The Court will issue orders regarding sealing and standard conditions of release. Contrary to the finalized short-form bail application previously filed, bail applicants do not need to provide information regarding spouses or children, as discussed on the record. Rap sheets and I-213 forms do not need to be transmitted to the Court except in individual circumstances if a party believes the documents are necessary to adjudicate a bail request. The government is ordered to file a report by Thursday, May 7, at 5:00 PM, providing information about any people detained in the facilities as of the date of the TRO hearing who were eligible for release on bond and were kept detained because bond hadnt posted. For each person, the report should include as much relevant information as possible, including how long the person has been detained. Regarding any disputes relating to access to counsel and telephones at the facilities, the parties are ordered to meet and confer, and if necessary they may submit a joint 5-page letter by Thursday in accordance with Judge Chhabria's Civil Standing Order. The Court ordered that ICE is prohibited from seeking information from potential custodians regarding the immigration status of any person in the household. Any of this information provided to the government through the bail process should be designated Attorney's Eyes Only, a designation which also excludes agency counsel from viewing the information. If the parties disagree about the need for a further protective order regarding this information, they may submit a joint 5-page letter. The government is ordered to prioritize providing the medical records for all pro se detainees. Class counsel may file a brief if it wishes regarding common issues that arise in the bail applications. Class counsel should provide the government as much advance notice as possible of the issues it intends to address in the brief. The government may file a response. A further status conference is scheduled for Thursday, May 7, at 3:00 PM. Total Time in Court: 1:43. Court Reporter: Zoom Webinar, 3:06 PM - 4:49 PM. Plaintiff Attorneys: Emilou Maclean, Anglica Salceda, Marty Schenker, and Sean Riordan. Defendant Attorneys: Adrienne Zack, Wendy Garbers, and Shiwon Choe. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/5/2020)
May 5, 2020 Filing 100 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM WEBINAR STATUS CONFERENCE ON 5/7/2020. ADVANCE REGISTRATION OF PARTICIPATING COUNSEL REQUIRED -- SEE BELOW. A status conference is set for 3:00 PM PDT on Thursday, May 7, 2020. For Zoom connection, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/. Pre-registration by counsel with the clerk must be done by emailing a list of names and emails of counsel who will be participating in the hearing to vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than May 6, 2020, at 12:00 PM PDT. Case participants will sent individualized invitations to participate.Members of the public and press, please click the link or use the information below to join the webinar: https://us02web.zoom.us/j/87368284240?pwd=SVlyTEtQaHBVOGlHNkRhRkZySVZVdz09Meeting ID: 873 6828 4240Password: 971651Dial by your location:+1 929 205 6099 US (New York)+1 253 215 8782 US+1 301 715 8592 US+1 312 626 6799 US (Chicago)+1 346 248 7799 US (Houston)+1 669 900 6833 US (San Jose)Find your local number: https://zoom.us/u/ac4JkPfcjoFor important information and guidance on technical preparation, please see #https://www.cand.usco urts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.),(vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2020)
May 5, 2020 Filing 99 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Further Protective Order filed by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Further Stipulated Protective Order)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 5/5/2020)
May 5, 2020 Filing 98 *** DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR (See Docket # 110 ) *** TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 4/28/20, 4/30/20, 5/1/20 before Judge Vince Chhabria by Matthew T. Albence, Nathan Allen, David Jennings, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 5/5/2020) Modified on 5/6/2020 (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 97 BAIL ORDER NO. 2. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/5/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2020)
May 5, 2020 Filing 96 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER JOINT [PROPOSED] SEALING ORDER RE ALL BAIL APPLICATIONS filed by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Freeman, William) (Filed on 5/5/2020)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 95 BAIL ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/5/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2020)
May 5, 2020 Filing 94 SHORT-FORM BAIL APPLICATION (Final Version). Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/5/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2020)
May 4, 2020 Filing 93 ***DISREGARD. DUPLICATE FILING, SEE DOCKET NO. 83.***Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 20-cv- 2966-HSG. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 5/4/2020. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2020) Modified on 5/5/2020 (ndrS, COURT STAFF).
May 4, 2020 Filing 90 STANDARD FOR CONSIDERING BAIL REQUESTS. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/4/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2020)
May 4, 2020 Filing 89 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Response to Bail Application filed by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Response to ECF 73-1, Erazo Herrera)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 5/4/2020)
May 4, 2020 Filing 88 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #73 Notice (Other), Response to Bail Applications (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 73-1, Erazo Herrera, #2 Response to ECF 73-2, Pinheiro)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 5/4/2020)
May 4, 2020 Filing 87 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #72 Notice (Other),,, Response to Bail Applications (Attachments: #1 Response to ECF 72-2, Aguilar Ceja, #2 Response to ECF 72-3, Soto Soto, #3 Response to ECF 72-4, Lara Plascencia, #4 Response to ECF 72-5, Carrillo de Varela, #5 Response to ECF 72-6, Matias Rauda)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 5/4/2020)
May 4, 2020 Filing 86 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #66 Notice (Other), Response to Bail Application (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 5/4/2020)
May 4, 2020 Filing 85 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY. SEE #116 *** Fifth Administrative Motion to File Under Seal NOTICE OF REQUEST TO FILE UNDER SEAL filed by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Salceda, Angelica) (Filed on 5/4/2020) Modified on 5/8/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
May 4, 2020 Filing 84 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY-DOCUMENT LOCKED. SEE #114 *** NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR RELEASE (Salceda, Angelica) (Filed on 5/4/2020) Modified on 5/7/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
May 4, 2020 Filing 83 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases. (hsglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2020)
May 4, 2020 Filing 82 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Tuesday's Case Management Conference, previously set for 1:00 PM PDT, is now set for 3:00 PM PDT, still on 5/5/2020. The information to access the Zoom videoconference has not changed. Case participants have been sent individualized invitations to participate. Members of the public and press should click the link or use the information below to join the webinar: https://us02web.zoom.us/j/86116111630?pwd=d1J1N2pidXBoVlFMUkVqWklHcDQ3UT09Meeting ID: 861 1611 1630Password: 971651Dial by your location+1 929 205 6099 US (New York)+1 253 215 8782 US+1 301 715 8592 US+1 312 626 6799 US (Chicago)+1 346 248 7799 US (Houston)+1 669 900 6833 US (San Jose)Find your local number: https://zoom.us/u/ac4JkPfcjoFor important information and guidance on technical preparation, please see #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zo om/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2020)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER re #67 Joint Proposed Order Re Briefing and Hearing Schedule for Preliminary Injunction. Motion for preliminary injunction due by 5/15/2020 5:00 PM. Responses due by 5/20/2020 5:00 PM. Replies due by 5/22/2020 5:00 PM. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 5/26/2020 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/4/2020. (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2020)
May 3, 2020 Filing 80 Fourth Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Unredacted Release Requests filed by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unredacted Release Request for Eleazar Porcayo Garcia, #2 Exhibit Unredacted Release Request for Lillian Marquez, #3 Exhibit Unredacted Release Request for Maria Ayala, #4 Exhibit Unredacted Release Request for Ricardo Vasquez)(Salceda, Angelica) (Filed on 5/3/2020)
May 3, 2020 Filing 79 Third Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Unredacted Release Requests filed by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unredacted Release Request for Armando Parra-Rojas, #2 Exhibit Unredacted Release Request for Brenda Ruiz Tovar, #3 Exhibit Unredacted Release Request for Juan Fredy Montoya, #4 Exhibit Unredacted Release Request for Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, #5 Exhibit Unredacted Release Request for Pravindar Singh, #6 Exhibit Unredacted Release Request for Ruby Joy Acita Buenaventura)(Salceda, Angelica) (Filed on 5/3/2020)
May 3, 2020 Filing 78 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas Request for Release (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Release Request for Aylaliya Birru, #2 Exhibit Release Request for Eleazar Porcayo Garcia, #3 Exhibit Release Request for Lillian Marquez, #4 Exhibit Release Request for Maria Ayala, #5 Exhibit Release Request for Ricardo Vasquez)(Salceda, Angelica) (Filed on 5/3/2020)
May 3, 2020 Filing 77 NOTICE by Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas Notice of Request for Release (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Release Request for Armando Parra-Rojas, #2 Exhibit Release Request for Brenda Ruiz Tovar, #3 Exhibit Release Request for Juan Fredy Montoya, #4 Exhibit Release Request for Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, #5 Exhibit Release Request for Pravindar Singh, #6 Exhibit Release Request for Ruby Joy Acita Buenaventura)(Salceda, Angelica) (Filed on 5/3/2020)
May 3, 2020 Filing 76 RESPONSE re #62 Brief, #61 Brief, Regarding (1) Burden of Proof for Bail Applications and (2) Magistrate-Judge Authority by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Choe, Shiwon) (Filed on 5/3/2020)
May 2, 2020 Filing 75 Second Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Unredacted Release Requests filed by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unredacted Release Request for Juan Jose Erazo Herrera, #2 Unredacted Release Request for Livia Pinheiro)(Salceda, Angelica) (Filed on 5/2/2020)
May 2, 2020 Filing 74 First Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Unredacted Release Requests filed by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unredacted Request of Alejandra Martinez Valdepena, #2 Exhibit Unredacted Request of Armando Aguilar Ceja, #3 Exhibit Unredacted Request of Delfina Soto, #4 Exhibit Unredacted Request of Jennifer Lara Plascencia, #5 Exhibit Unredacted Request of Maria del Carmen, #6 Exhibit Unredacted Request of Willian Matias Rauda)(Salceda, Angelica) (Filed on 5/2/2020)
May 1, 2020 Filing 92 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vince Chhabria: Case Management Conference held on 5/1/2020.The government was ordered to file a brief addressing magistrate judge jurisdiction over bail applications by Sunday, May 3 at noon. The government was ordered to provide the Court and plaintiffs counsel with updated detainee spreadsheets next Friday, May 8. The government should also provide daily updates on any detainees who have been released. And the government was ordered to provide by Monday, May 4 a list of all detainees who have been ordered released on bond by an immigration judge and who remain in detention because they cannot pay the bond. For now, bail applications are limited to detainees with medical vulnerabilities, detainees with no criminal history, and female detainees. The plaintiffs may file 30 applications per weekday, which the government may respond to within 48 hours. For the first ten applications filed on May 1, the government must respond by Monday, May 4. It must respond to any additional applications by Tuesday, May 5. The plaintiffs may not file reply briefs, but bail determinations will be without prejudice.Although multiple requests can and should be filed at one time, the parties are asked to attach a separate pdf document for each detainee. Compare Dkt. No. 79 (correct) with Dkt. No. 85 (incorrect). The government is ordered to provide information about its capacity to test for Covid-19 at the facilities, and about the length of time needed to obtain test results. The government is ordered to respond to the plaintiffs' discovery requests, and provide responsive documents, by Friday, May 8. If there are any disputes, the parties must meet and confer. An additional case management conference was scheduled for Tuesday, May 5, 2020, at 1:00 PM PDT. {This conference was later rescheduled for 3:00 PM. See Dkt. No. 82.) Total Time in Court: 1:28. Court Reporter: Hearing recorded via Zoom Webinar, 3:07 PM - 4:35 PM. Plaintiff Attorneys: Emi Maclean, Angelica Salceda, and Marty Schenker. Defendant Attorneys: Adrienne Zack and Wendy Garbers. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/5/2020) Modified on 5/5/2020 (knm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/6/2020: Matter was not transcribed (see Docket #110). (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2020 Filing 73 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR RELEASE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Juan Jose Erazo Herrera, #2 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Livia Pinheiro)(Salceda, Angelica) (Filed on 5/1/2020)
May 1, 2020 Filing 72 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR RELEASE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Maria Elena Luna Estrada (AKA Alejandra Martinez Valdepena), #2 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Armando Aguilar Ceja, #3 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Delfina Soto Soto, #4 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Jennifer Lara Plascencia, #5 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Maria del Carmen Carrillo de Varela, #6 Exhibit Request Application for Release for Willian Maria Rauda)(Salceda, Angelica) (Filed on 5/1/2020)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER re I-213 Form Redactions. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/1/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2020)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Approving Class Notice. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/1/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2020)
May 1, 2020 Filing 69 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM WEBINAR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 5/5/2020. ADVANCE REGISTRATION OF PARTICIPATING COUNSEL REQUIRED -- SEE BELOW. A case management conference is set for 1:00 PM PDT on Tuesday, May 5, 2020. Pre-registration by counsel with the clerk in advance of the CMC must be done by sending a list of names & emails of participating counsel to vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than noon on Monday, May 4, 2020. The public and press will join the webinar as attendees and be able to see and hear what is going on throughout all of the proceedings, but will not be able to actually participate in the proceedings. Counsel who have pre-registered with the clerk in advance will receive individualized invitations to participate. The links below are for members of the public and press to use for accessing the hearing on Tuesday, May 5, 2020, at 1:00 PM. Please click the link below to join the webinar: https://us02web.zoom.us/j/86116111630?pwd=d1J1N2pidXBoVlFMUkVqWklHcDQ3UT09Password: 971651Or iPhone one-tap : US: +13126266799,,86116111630# or +13462487799,,86116111630# Or Telephone: Dial(for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): US: +1 312 626 6799 or +1 346 248 7799 or +1 669 900 6833 or +1 929 205 6099 or +1 253 215 8782 or +1 301 715 8592 Webinar ID: 861 1611 1630 Password: 971651 International numbers available: https://us02web.zoom.us/u/kc5AohRVIrOr an H.323/SIP room system: H.323: 162.255.37.11 (US West) or 162.255.36.11 (US East) Meeting ID: 861 1611 1630 Password: 971651 SIP: 86116111630@zoomcrc.com Password: 971651(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.). (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2020)
May 1, 2020 Filing 68 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas PETITIONERS-PLAINTIFFS PROPOSED CLASS NOTICE (Freeman, William) (Filed on 5/1/2020)
May 1, 2020 Filing 67 Proposed Order JOINT [PROPOSED] ORDER RE BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Freeman, William) (Filed on 5/1/2020)
May 1, 2020 Filing 66 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR RELEASE OF JOSE LUIS LOPEZ-GUEVARA (Salceda, Angelica) (Filed on 5/1/2020)
May 1, 2020 Filing 65 Draft Short Form Bail Application Template. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/1/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2020)
May 1, 2020 Filing 64 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement of Proposed Class Notice (Attachments: #1 Proposed Class Notice)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 5/1/2020)
May 1, 2020 Filing 63 Tentative Uniform Conditions of Release. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/1/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2020)
May 1, 2020 Filing 62 Brief PETITIONERS-PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM OF LAW REGARDING STATUTORY AUTHORITY OF MAGISTRATE JUDGES filed byJavier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Freeman, William) (Filed on 5/1/2020)
May 1, 2020 Filing 61 Brief Supplemental Brief on Burden in Bail Assessments filed byJavier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Riordan, Sean) (Filed on 5/1/2020)
April 30, 2020 Filing 91 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vince Chhabria: Case Management Conference held on 4/30/2020. Plaintiffs may file requests for bond on behalf of detainees with medical vulnerabilities and minimal criminal histories Friday, May 1. The government may file responses by Monday, May 4. Although multiple requests can and should be filed at one time, the parties are asked to attach a separate pdf document for each detainee. Compare Dkt. No. 79 (correct) with Dkt. No. 85 (incorrect). The Court grants advance permission to file redacted versions of documents publicly, with unredacted versions under seal. Only extraordinarily sensitive medical information should be redacted and sealed.The parties were ordered to file a stipulated briefing schedule for the preliminary injunction phase as discussed in the hearing.The government was ordered to provide information regarding each detainee's dorm unit and individual attorney by no later than Monday, May 4 at 10:00 AM, and preferably in the spreadsheet to be produced Friday, May 1.The parties were ordered to file a stipulated class notice, or competing class notices, by Friday, May 1 at 2:00 PM.The plaintiffs were ordered to file a brief by noon on Friday, May 1 regarding the necessity of consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction over bail determinations.The plaintiffs were ordered to file a brief by noon on Friday, May 1 regarding the applicable standard for bail determinations. The government's response brief was due Sunday, May 3 at noon.An additional case management conference was scheduled for Friday, May 1, 2020, at 3:00 PM PDT. Total Time in Court: 2:39. Court Reporter: Zoom Webinar. Plaintiff Attorneys: Emilou Maclean, Angelica Salceda, and Marty Schenker. Defendant Attorneys: Adrienne Zack and Wendy Garbers. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/5/2020) Modified on 5/5/2020 (knm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/6/2020: Matter was not transcribed (see Docket #110). (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2020 Filing 60 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM WEBINAR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 5/1/2020. ADVANCE REGISTRATION OF PARTICIPATING COUNSEL REQUIRED -- SEE BELOW. A case management conference is set for 3:00 PM PDT on May 1, 2020. Pre-registration by counsel with the clerk in advance of the hearings must be done by emailing a list of names of counsel who will be participating in the hearing to vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov by no later than Friday, May 1, 2020, at 11:00 AM PDT. The public and press will join the webinar as attendees and be able to see and hear what is going on throughout all of the proceedings, but will not be able to actually participate in the proceedings. Counsel who have pre-registered with the clerk in advance will receive individualized invitations to participate. The links below are for members of the public and press to use for accessing the hearing on Friday, May 1, 2020, at 3:00 PM. Please click the link below to join the webinar: https://us02web.zoom.us/j/82623464991?pwd=SXNYbnVlNEI4WUt0TFl0QmFYajZpQT09Password: 228548Or iPhone one-tap : US: +13462487799,,82623464991# or +16699006833,,82623464991# Or Telephone: Dial(for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): US: +1 346 248 7799 or +1 669 900 6833 or +1 929 205 6099 or +1 253 215 8782 or +1 301 715 8592 or +1 312 626 6799 Webinar ID: 826 2346 4991 Password: 228548 International numbers available: https://us02web.zoom.us/u/khr20rXOuOr an H.323/SIP room system: H.323: 162.255.37.11 (US West) or 162.255.36.11 (US East) Meeting ID: 826 2346 4991 Password: 228548 SIP: 82623464991@zoomcrc.com Password: 228548 (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.). (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2020)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #56 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Bernwanger.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2020)
April 30, 2020 Filing 58 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Freeman, William) (Filed on 4/30/2020)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER re Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 4/30/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2020)
April 29, 2020 Filing 56 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Bree Bernwanger ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14423129.) filed by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Bernwanger, Bree) (Filed on 4/29/2020)
April 29, 2020 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING THE ZOOM WEBINAR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 4/30/2020; REGISTRATION OF COUNSEL IN ADVANCE REQUIRED, SEE BELOW. Case Management Conference set for 4/30/2020 at 4:00 PM by Zoom Webinar. Pre-registration by counsel with the clerk in advance of the hearings must be done by emailing a list of names of counsel who will be participating in the hearing to vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov by no later than Thursday, April 30, 2020, at 11:00 AM PST. The public and press will join the webinar as attendees and be able to see and hear what is going on throughout all of the proceedings, but will not be able to actually participate in the proceedings. Counsel who have pre-registered with the clerk in advance will receive individualized invitations to participate.The links below are for members of the public and press to use for accessing the hearing on Thursday, April 30, 2020, at 4:00 PM. Please click the link below to join the webinar: https://us02web.zoom.us/j/84908264880?pwd=UzZ0ajBlcHdtRkNBOTJPVFVPallFdz09 Password: 725800 Or iPhone one-tap : US: +12532158782,,84908264880# or +13017158592,,84908264880# Or Telephone: Dial(for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): US: +1 253 215 8782 or +1 301 715 8592 or +1 312 626 6799 or +1 346 248 7799 or +1 669 900 6833 or +1 929 205 6099 Webinar ID: 849 0826 4880 Password: 725800 International numbers available: https://us02web.zoom.us/u/kce0pNWcpoOr an H.323/SIP room system: H.323: 162.255.37.11 (US West) or 162.255.36.11 (US East) Meeting ID: 849 0826 4880 Password: 725800 SIP: 84908264880@zoomcrc.com Password: 725800 (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2020)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #52 Stipulated Protective Order. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2020)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria denying #38 Motion to Stay; granting #5 Motion for TRO; granting #6 Motion to Certify Class. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2020)
April 29, 2020 Filing 52 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Protective Order filed by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Protective Order)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 4/29/2020)
April 28, 2020 Filing 55 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vince Chhabria: Motion Hearing held via Zoom Webinar on 4/28/2020 re #38 MOTION to Stay; #6 First MOTION to Certify Class; and #5 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order.The Court heard oral argument and will issue a written order.Total Time in Court: 1 hour 45 minutes. Court Reporter: Hearing recorded via Zoom Webinar. Plaintiff Attorney: Emilou Maclean, Sean Riordan, Jordan Wells, Judah Lakin, Martin Schenker, Timothy Cook. Defendant Attorney: Adrienne Zack, Wendy Garbers. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/28/2020) Modified on 5/6/2020: Matter was not transcribed (see Docket #110). (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
April 28, 2020 Filing 51 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byMatthew T. Albence, Nathan Allen, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 4/28/2020)
April 27, 2020 Set Hearing as to #6 First MOTION to Certify Class , #38 MOTION to Stay re #37 Opposition/Response to Motion , #5 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . Motion Hearing set for 4/28/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Chambers before Judge Vince Chhabria. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2020)
April 27, 2020 Filing 50 REPLY (re #38 MOTION to Stay re #37 Opposition/Response to Motion,,, ) filed byMatthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 4/27/2020)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #44 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Unger.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2020)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #43 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Cook.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2020)
April 27, 2020 Filing 47 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING THE ZOOM WEBINAR HEARING ON 4/28/2020; REGISTRATION OF COUNSEL IN ADVANCE REQUIRED, SEE BELOW. Pre-registration by counsel with the clerk in advance of the hearings must be done by emailing a list of names of counsel who will be participating in the hearing to vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov by no later than Tuesday, April 28, 2020, at 10:00 AM PST. All counsel, public, and press will join the webinar as attendees and be able to see and hear what is going on throughout all of the proceedings, but will not be able to actually participate in the proceedings until the Court switches them over to a participant. Before each case is called, counsel who have pre-registered with the clerk in advance of the hearing will be converted from attendee to participant. Once the hearing ends for their case, they will be switched back to attendee. The links below are for all counsel, members of the public and press to use for accessing the hearing on Tuesday, April 28, 2020, at 2:00 PM PST. Please click the link below to join the webinar: https://us02web.zoom.us/j/81447675132?pwd=K21iUjhjR1FWa2t6cG93cTgrelc5Zz09 Password: 271367 Or iPhone one-tap : US: +12532158782,,81447675132# or +13017158592,,81447675132# Or Telephone: Dial(for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): US: +1 253 215 8782 or +1 301 715 8592 or +1 312 626 6799 or +1 346 248 7799 or +1 669 900 6833 or +1 929 205 6099 Webinar ID: 814 4767 5132 Password: 271367 International numbers available: https://us02web.zoom.us/u/kdLygkbga3 Or an H.323/SIP room system: H.323: 162.255.37.11 (US West) or 162.255.36.11 (US East) Meeting ID: 814 4767 5132 Password: 271367 SIP: 81447675132@zoomcrc.com Password: 271367 (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2020)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER re Hearing. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 4/27/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2020)
April 27, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Amalia Margarete Wille (Wille, Amalia) (Filed on 4/27/2020)
April 27, 2020 Filing 44 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14412259.) filed by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Unger, Francisco) (Filed on 4/27/2020) Modified on 4/27/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
April 27, 2020 Filing 43 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Timothy W. Cook ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14412537.) filed by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Cook, Timothy) (Filed on 4/27/2020)
April 27, 2020 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas re #39 Reply to Opposition/Response,, #40 Opposition/Response to Motion, #41 Reply to Opposition/Response, (Freeman, William) (Filed on 4/27/2020)
April 27, 2020 Filing 41 REPLY (re #6 First MOTION to Certify Class ) filed byJavier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Freeman, William) (Filed on 4/27/2020)
April 27, 2020 Filing 40 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #38 MOTION to Stay re #37 Opposition/Response to Motion,,, ) filed byJavier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Freeman, William) (Filed on 4/27/2020)
April 27, 2020 Filing 39 REPLY (re #5 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ) filed byJavier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Greifinger, MD ISO of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #2 Declaration of Hayden Rodarte ISO of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #3 Rodarte Declaration Exh. A, #4 Rodarte Declaration Exh. B, #5 Rodarte Declaration Exh. C)(Freeman, William) (Filed on 4/27/2020) Modified on 4/27/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
April 25, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION to Stay re #37 Opposition/Response to Motion,,, filed by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Responses due by 5/11/2020. Replies due by 5/18/2020. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 4/25/2020)
April 25, 2020 Filing 37 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #5 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , #6 First MOTION to Certify Class ) and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Stay filed byMatthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Erik Bonnar, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Declaration of Polly Kaiser, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Declaration of Dana Fishburn, First, #6 Declaration of Alexander Pham, #7 Exhibit 1, #8 Exhibit 2, #9 Exhibit 3, #10 Exhibit 4, #11 Exhibit 5, #12 Exhibit 6, #13 Exhibit 7, #14 Declaration of Dana Fishburn, Second, #15 Exhibit 1, #16 Exhibit 2, #17 Exhibit 3, #18 Exhibit 4, #19 Exhibit 5, #20 Exhibit 6)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 4/25/2020)
April 25, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Francisco Ugarte (Ugarte, Francisco) (Filed on 4/25/2020)
April 25, 2020 Filing 35 Declaration of Sandra Hernandez in Support of #5 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [5-1] filed byJavier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas. (Related document(s) #5 ) (Freeman, William) (Filed on 4/25/2020)
April 24, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE by Javier Alfaro, Dung Tuan Dang, Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Jeronimo, Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez, Angel de Jesus Zepeda Rivas re #5 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Notice of Withdrawal of Declaration of Dr. Ranit Mishori (ECF 5-3) (Freeman, William) (Filed on 4/24/2020)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER re Filings. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 4/24/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2020)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #29 Stipulation to Extend Page Limits. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2020)
April 24, 2020 Filing 31 REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Case Management Statement due by 7/15/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/22/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2020)
April 23, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Emilou MacLean (MacLean, Emilou) (Filed on 4/23/2020)
April 23, 2020 Filing 29 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Increase Page Limit filed by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 4/23/2020)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Extending Response Deadlines. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2020)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Requiring Response to Motion for Provisional Class Certification. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 4/22/2020. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2020)
April 22, 2020 Filing 26 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Additional Time to Respond to TRO re #23 Order filed by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Responses due by 4/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 4/22/2020)
April 22, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Angelica Salceda (Salceda, Angelica) (Filed on 4/22/2020)
April 22, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Connor Riordan (Riordan, Sean) (Filed on 4/22/2020)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE TO TRO APPLICATION. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 4/22/2020. (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2020)
April 22, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Adrienne Zack (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 4/22/2020)
April 22, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Martin S. Schenker (Schenker, Martin) (Filed on 4/22/2020)
April 22, 2020 Filing 20 *** DUPLICATE ENTRY *** NOTICE of Appearance by Judah Ben Lakin (Lakin, Judah) (Filed on 4/22/2020) Modified on 4/22/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
April 22, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Judah Ben Lakin (Lakin, Judah) (Filed on 4/22/2020)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 04/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2020)
April 22, 2020 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2020)
April 21, 2020 Filing 16 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement.. (Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 4/21/2020)
April 21, 2020 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Nathan Allen. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2020)
April 21, 2020 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Geo Group, Inc. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2020)
April 21, 2020 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Matthew T. Albence, David Jennings, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2020)
April 21, 2020 Filing 12 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/13/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/20/2020 01:30 PM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2020)
April 21, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Hayden Miles Rodarte (Rodarte, Hayden) (Filed on 4/21/2020)
April 21, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan Samuel Wells FOR PETITIONERS-PLAINTIFFS (Wells, Jordan) (Filed on 4/21/2020)
April 21, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Genna Ellis Beier (Beier, Genna) (Filed on 4/21/2020)
April 21, 2020 Filing 8 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/5/2020. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2020)
April 20, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JAVIER ALFARO, DUNG TUAN DANG, LUCIANO GONZALO MENDOZA JERONIMO, LAWRENCE KURIA MWAURA, BRENDA RUBI RUIZ TOVAR, CORAIMA YARITZA SANCHEZ NUEZ, ANGEL DE JESUS ZEPEDA RIVAS re #6 First MOTION to Certify Class , #2 Proposed Summons, #5 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #1 Complaint, (Freeman, William) (Filed on 4/20/2020)
April 20, 2020 Filing 6 First MOTION to Certify Class filed by JAVIER ALFARO, DUNG TUAN DANG, LUCIANO GONZALO MENDOZA JERONIMO, LAWRENCE KURIA MWAURA, BRENDA RUBI RUIZ TOVAR, CORAIMA YARITZA SANCHEZ NUEZ, ANGEL DE JESUS ZEPEDA RIVAS. Responses due by 4/24/2020. Replies due by 4/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Angel Zepeda, #2 Declaration Declaration of Brenda Rubi Ruiz Tovar, #3 Declaration Declaration of Lawrence Kuria Mwaura, #4 Declaration Declaration of Luciano Gonzalo Mendoza Joronimo, #5 Declaration Declaration of Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nuez, #6 Declaration Declaration of Javier Alfaro, #7 Declaration Declaration Dung Tuan Dang, #8 Declaration Declaration of William S. Freeman in Support of Motion for Class Certification, #9 Declaration Declaration of Bree Bernwanger in Support of Motion for Class Certification, #10 Declaration Declaration of Martin S. Schenker in Support of Motion for Class Certification, #11 Declaration Declaration of Genna Ellis Beier in Support of Motion for Class Certification, #12 Declaration Declaration of Jordan Wells in Support of Motion for Class Certification, #13 Declaration Declaration of Judah Lakin in Support of Motion for Class Certification, #14 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Petitioners-Plaintiffs' Motion for Provisional Class Certification)(Freeman, William) (Filed on 4/20/2020)
April 20, 2020 Filing 5 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by JAVIER ALFARO, DUNG TUAN DANG, LUCIANO GONZALO MENDOZA JERONIMO, LAWRENCE KURIA MWAURA, BRENDA RUBI RUIZ TOVAR, CORAIMA YARITZA SANCHEZ NUEZ, ANGEL DE JESUS ZEPEDA RIVAS. (Attachments: #1 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY - SEE #35 *** Declaration of Sandra Hernandez, #2 Declaration of Robert B. Greifinger, MD, #3 Declaration of Dr. Ranit Mishori (MD, MHS, FAAFP), #4 Declaration of Lisa Knox Regarding Conditions of Confinement at the Mesa Verde ICE Processing Facility, #5 Declaration of Attorney Kathleen Anne Kavanagh Regarding Conditions of Confinement at Yuba County Jail, #6 Declaration of Sean Riordan in Support of Petitioners-Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #7 Proposed Temporary Restraining Order)(Freeman, William) (Filed on 4/20/2020) Modified on 4/27/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
April 20, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Freeman, William) (Filed on 4/20/2020)
April 20, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Freeman, William) (Filed on 4/20/2020)
April 20, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Freeman, William) (Filed on 4/20/2020)
April 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14393143.). Filed byJAVIER ALFARO, LAWRENCE KURIA MWAURA, DUNG TUAN DANG, BRENDA RUBI RUIZ TOVAR, LUCIANO GONZALO MENDOZA JERONIMO, ANGEL DE JESUS ZEPEDA RIVAS, CORAIMA YARITZA SANCHEZ NUEZ. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Freeman, William) (Filed on 4/20/2020) Modified on 4/21/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zepeda Rivas et al v. Jennings et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DUNG TUAN DANG
Represented By: William S. Freeman
Represented By: Amalia Margarete Wille
Represented By: Timothy W. Cook
Represented By: Sean Connor Riordan
Represented By: Jennifer Taylor Friedman
Represented By: Jordan Samuel Wells
Represented By: Genna Ellis Beier
Represented By: Francisco Unger
Represented By: Judah Ben Lakin
Represented By: Kelly Engel Wells
Represented By: Francisco Ugarte
Represented By: Emilou MacLean
Represented By: Stephanie Padilla
Represented By: Bree Ann Bernwanger
Represented By: Hayden Miles Rodarte
Represented By: Angelica Salceda
Represented By: Martin S. Schenker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGEL DE JESUS ZEPEDA RIVAS
Represented By: William S. Freeman
Represented By: Amalia Margarete Wille
Represented By: Timothy W. Cook
Represented By: Sean Connor Riordan
Represented By: Jennifer Taylor Friedman
Represented By: Jordan Samuel Wells
Represented By: Genna Ellis Beier
Represented By: Francisco Unger
Represented By: Judah Ben Lakin
Represented By: Kelly Engel Wells
Represented By: Francisco Ugarte
Represented By: Emilou MacLean
Represented By: Stephanie Padilla
Represented By: Bree Ann Bernwanger
Represented By: Hayden Miles Rodarte
Represented By: Angelica Salceda
Represented By: Martin S. Schenker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAVIER ALFARO
Represented By: William S. Freeman
Represented By: Amalia Margarete Wille
Represented By: Timothy W. Cook
Represented By: Sean Connor Riordan
Represented By: Jennifer Taylor Friedman
Represented By: Jordan Samuel Wells
Represented By: Genna Ellis Beier
Represented By: Francisco Unger
Represented By: Judah Ben Lakin
Represented By: Kelly Engel Wells
Represented By: Francisco Ugarte
Represented By: Emilou MacLean
Represented By: Stephanie Padilla
Represented By: Bree Ann Bernwanger
Represented By: Hayden Miles Rodarte
Represented By: Angelica Salceda
Represented By: Martin S. Schenker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAWRENCE KURIA MWAURA
Represented By: William S. Freeman
Represented By: Amalia Margarete Wille
Represented By: Timothy W. Cook
Represented By: Sean Connor Riordan
Represented By: Jennifer Taylor Friedman
Represented By: Jordan Samuel Wells
Represented By: Genna Ellis Beier
Represented By: Francisco Unger
Represented By: Judah Ben Lakin
Represented By: Kelly Engel Wells
Represented By: Francisco Ugarte
Represented By: Emilou MacLean
Represented By: Stephanie Padilla
Represented By: Bree Ann Bernwanger
Represented By: Hayden Miles Rodarte
Represented By: Angelica Salceda
Represented By: Martin S. Schenker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUCIANO GONZALO MENDOZA JERONIMO
Represented By: William S. Freeman
Represented By: Amalia Margarete Wille
Represented By: Timothy W. Cook
Represented By: Sean Connor Riordan
Represented By: Jennifer Taylor Friedman
Represented By: Jordan Samuel Wells
Represented By: Genna Ellis Beier
Represented By: Francisco Unger
Represented By: Judah Ben Lakin
Represented By: Kelly Engel Wells
Represented By: Francisco Ugarte
Represented By: Emilou MacLean
Represented By: Stephanie Padilla
Represented By: Bree Ann Bernwanger
Represented By: Hayden Miles Rodarte
Represented By: Angelica Salceda
Represented By: Martin S. Schenker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRENDA RUBI RUIZ TOVAR
Represented By: William S. Freeman
Represented By: Amalia Margarete Wille
Represented By: Timothy W. Cook
Represented By: Sean Connor Riordan
Represented By: Jennifer Taylor Friedman
Represented By: Jordan Samuel Wells
Represented By: Genna Ellis Beier
Represented By: Francisco Unger
Represented By: Judah Ben Lakin
Represented By: Kelly Engel Wells
Represented By: Francisco Ugarte
Represented By: Emilou MacLean
Represented By: Stephanie Padilla
Represented By: Bree Ann Bernwanger
Represented By: Hayden Miles Rodarte
Represented By: Angelica Salceda
Represented By: Martin S. Schenker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CORAIMA YARITZA SANCHEZ NUEZ
Represented By: William S. Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coraima Yaritza Sanchez Nunez
Represented By: William S. Freeman
Represented By: Amalia Margarete Wille
Represented By: Timothy W. Cook
Represented By: Sean Connor Riordan
Represented By: Jennifer Taylor Friedman
Represented By: Jordan Samuel Wells
Represented By: Genna Ellis Beier
Represented By: Francisco Unger
Represented By: Judah Ben Lakin
Represented By: Kelly Engel Wells
Represented By: Francisco Ugarte
Represented By: Emilou MacLean
Represented By: Stephanie Padilla
Represented By: Bree Ann Bernwanger
Represented By: Hayden Miles Rodarte
Represented By: Angelica Salceda
Represented By: Martin S. Schenker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [