Ikeda v. Baidu, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Roger A. Ikeda
Defendant: Yanhong Li, Baidu, Inc. and Yu Cheng-Chun
Case Number: 3:2020cv02768
Filed: April 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2020)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2020)
April 22, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14399674.) filed by Roger A. Ikeda. (Hood, J) (Filed on 4/22/2020)
April 22, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14399621.) filed by Roger A. Ikeda. (Lieberman, Jeremy) (Filed on 4/22/2020)
April 22, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Baidu, Inc., Yu Cheng-Chun, Yanhong Li. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2020)
April 22, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 7/15/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/22/2020 02:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2020)
April 22, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Lucy H. Koh. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2020)
April 21, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/21/2020)
April 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF THE FEDERAL SECURITIES LAWS against Baidu, Inc., Yu Cheng-Chun, Yanhong Li ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14396386.). Filed byRoger A. Ikeda. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/21/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ikeda v. Baidu, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yanhong Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baidu, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yu Cheng-Chun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger A. Ikeda
Represented By: Jennifer Pafiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?