Securities and Exchange Commission v. Batchelor et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: John Michael Zukoski and William Alfred Batchelor
Case Number: 3:2020cv02871
Filed: April 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/20/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/13/2020. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/4/2020. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2020)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 05/01/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2020)
April 30, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2020)
April 29, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Securities and Exchange Commission.. (Smyth, Bernard) (Filed on 4/29/2020)
April 28, 2020 Filing 7 Proposed Final Judgment as to John Michael Zukoshi by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Knight, Brian) (Filed on 4/28/2020) Modified on 4/29/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
April 28, 2020 Filing 6 Proposed Final Judgment as to William Alfred Batchelor by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Knight, Brian) (Filed on 4/28/2020) Modified on 4/29/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
April 27, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/27/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/3/2020 01:30 PM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2020)
April 27, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/11/2020. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2020)
April 27, 2020 Filing 3 Consent of Defendant John Michael Zukoski, proposed Final Judgment as to Defendant John Michael Zukoski by Securities and Exchange Commission.(Knight, Brian) (Filed on 4/27/2020) Modified on 4/28/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
April 27, 2020 Filing 2 Consent of Defendant William Alfred Batchelor, proposed Final Judgment as to Defendant William Alfred Batchelor by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Knight, Brian) (Filed on 4/27/2020) Modified on 4/28/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
April 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed bySecurities and Exchange Commission. (Filing Fee Exempt) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Knight, Brian) (Filed on 4/27/2020) Modified on 4/27/2020 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Batchelor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Michael Zukoski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Alfred Batchelor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Brian Patrick Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?