Tawfik et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Heidi Tawfik and Hussein Tawfik
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and U.S. Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2020cv02946
Filed: April 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2020 Filing 24 REPLY (re #14 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed bySelect Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Day, Corey) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 1, 2020 Filing 23 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #14 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byHeidi Tawfik, Hussein Tawfik. (Fitzpatrick, Brenna) (Filed on 6/1/2020)
May 27, 2020 Filing 22 REPLY (re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) ) filed byJPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Freed, John) (Filed on 5/27/2020)
May 22, 2020 Filing 21 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank, N.A... (Day, Corey) (Filed on 5/22/2020)
May 20, 2020 Filing 20 Certificate of Interested Entities by Heidi Tawfik, Hussein Tawfik (Fitzpatrick, Brenna) (Filed on 5/20/2020)
May 20, 2020 Filing 19 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Heidi Tawfik, Hussein Tawfik.. (Fitzpatrick, Brenna) (Filed on 5/20/2020)
May 20, 2020 Filing 18 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) ) filed byHeidi Tawfik, Hussein Tawfik. (Fitzpatrick, Brenna) (Filed on 5/20/2020)
May 20, 2020 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING MOTION HEARINGS. Please take notice that Defendant JPMorgan' s Motion #10 to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and Defendant Select Portfolio's Motion #14 to Dismiss are continued to July 9, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. The briefing schedule as to both motions shall remain the same. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2020)
May 20, 2020 Filing 16 CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 6/2/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2020) (ahm, COURT STAFF).
May 19, 2020 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. and U.S. Bank, N.A. shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 6/2/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2020)
May 18, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank, N.A.. Motion Hearing set for 6/25/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 6/1/2020. Replies due by 6/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Proposed Order)(Day, Corey) (Filed on 5/18/2020)
May 18, 2020 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Credit Suisse AG, Corporate Parent Credit Suisse Group AG, Corporate Parent Credit Suisse Holdings (USA) Inc., Other Affiliate SPS Holding Corp. for Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.; Corporate Parent U.S. Bank, N.A. for U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Day, Corey) (Filed on 5/18/2020)
May 18, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Corey Michael Day (Day, Corey) (Filed on 5/18/2020)
May 6, 2020 Filing 11 Request for Judicial Notice re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed byJPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) #10 ) (Freed, John) (Filed on 5/6/2020)
May 6, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Motion Hearing set for 6/18/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 5/20/2020. Replies due by 5/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Freed, John) (Filed on 5/6/2020)
May 5, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 5/19/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2020)
May 4, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A... (Freed, John) (Filed on 5/4/2020)
May 4, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Edward Addiego, III (Addiego, Joseph) (Filed on 5/4/2020)
May 1, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Freed, John) (Filed on 5/1/2020)
May 1, 2020 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Entities by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Freed, John) (Filed on 5/1/2020)
April 30, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. re #3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, 2 Case Assigned by Intake,,, (Freed, John) (Filed on 4/30/2020)
April 30, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/23/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/30/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2020)
April 29, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/13/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2020)
April 29, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Mateo County Superior Court. Their case number is 20CIV01632. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-14421990). Filed byJPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Freed, John) (Filed on 4/29/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tawfik et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heidi Tawfik
Represented By: Matthew David Mellen
Represented By: Brenna Wood Fitzpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hussein Tawfik
Represented By: Matthew David Mellen
Represented By: Brenna Wood Fitzpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Corey Michael Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: John Douglas Freed
Represented By: Joseph Edward Addiego, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Corey Michael Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?