Bernstein et al v. United States Department of Housing & Urban Development et al
Plaintiff: Mary Helen Bernstein and Elizabeth Grace Tigano
Defendant: Claudia Lopez, Ben Carson, Cherie Douglas, California Department of Fair Employment & Housing, United States Department of Housing & Urban Development, Kevin Kish and Paul Smith
Case Number: 3:2020cv02983
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR A FURTHER EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR PACER ACCESS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 6/4/2020. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 2, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE filed by Mary Helen Bernstein, Elizabeth Grace Tigano re #15 Notice (Other), #14 Order on Ex Parte Application - PACER REQUESTING ORDER STATING PACER ACCESS GRANTED IN ADDITION TO EFILE ACCESS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bernstein, Mary) (Filed on 6/2/2020)
May 31, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE filed by Mary Helen Bernstein, Elizabeth Grace Tigano re #14 Order on Ex Parte Application - NOTICE COVID 19 EXTENSION CLOSURE UNIVERSITY CAMPUS EXTENSION OF AMENDED COMPLAINT FILING AS WE ARE NOT EVEN ABLE TO BEGIN WORKING ON AMENDED COMPLAINT AT CAMPUS UNTIL AFTER AUGUST 31 2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit notice UOP Covid 19, #2 Exhibit notice UOP Covid 19)(Bernstein, Mary) (Filed on 5/31/2020)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS' FILINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/27/2020. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
May 27, 2020 Filing 13 SECOND REQUEST for Reasonable Accommodation filed by Mary Helen Bernstein, Elizabeth Grace Tigano. Document filed under seal. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2020) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/27/2020: #1 Declaration) (wsnS, COURT STAFF).
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting #6 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing; granting #9 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
May 20, 2020 Filing 11 REQUEST for Reasonable Accommodations filed by Mary Helen Bernstein, Elizabeth Grace Tigano. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2020)
May 20, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge filed by Mary Helen Bernstein, Elizabeth Grace Tigano.(tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2020)
May 20, 2020 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Elizabeth Grace Tigano. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2020)
May 18, 2020 Filing 8 Received Document: Signature Pages re #1 Complaint, by Mary Helen Bernstein, Elizabeth Grace Tigano. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2020)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE: APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND PERMISSION FOR ELECTRONIC CASE FILING. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 IFP Application)(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
May 4, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing; Request for PACER Access to Review Documents/EFile, filed by Mary Helen Bernstein. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2020)
May 1, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/23/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/30/2020 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
April 30, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons filed by Mary Helen Bernstein, Elizabeth Tigano. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2020)
April 30, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST for Service by Certified Mail; REQUEST for Reasonable Accommodations filed by Mary Helen Bernstein, Elizabeth Tigano. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2020)
April 30, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Mary Helen Bernstein. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2020)
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Emotional Distress and Racial Discrimination; Jury Trial Demanded (no process) against California Department of Fair Employment & Housing, Ben Carson, Cherie Douglas, Kevin Kish, Claudia Lopez, Paul Smith, United States Department of Housing & Urban Development, (Filing Fee: Ifpp entered on 4/30/2020). Filed by Elizabeth Tigano, Mary Helen Bernstein. Consent/Declination due by 5/14/2020. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet) (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bernstein et al v. United States Department of Housing & Urban Development et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claudia Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Carson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cherie Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Fair Employment & Housing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Housing & Urban Development
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Kish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Helen Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Grace Tigano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?