Huynh v. California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation (CDCR) et al
Plaintiff: Tri Huu Huynh
Defendant: R Binkele, Prison Rape Elimination Act (PREA) Compliance Manager, W L Muniz, PREA Coordinator, Alamo, Salinas Valley State Prison, J. Vinson, California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation (CDCR) and Rakitin
Case Number: 3:2020cv03034
Filed: May 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: PSLC MWD
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2020 Filing 7 Prison Trust Fund Account Statement by Tri Huu Huynh. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2020)
May 28, 2020 CLERK'S NOTICE: The Clerk has received plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is directed to submit within 72 hours and in PDF form a certified Prison Trust Account statement for the plaintiff, Tri Huu Huynh G46762, reflecting the last six months activity, to cdcrfilings@cand.uscourts.gov. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
May 21, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Tri Huu Huynh, CDCR # G46762.The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is directed to submit within 72 hours and in PDF form a certified Prison Trust Account statement for the plaintiff, reflecting the last six months activity, to cdcrfilings@cand.uscourts.gov. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2020)
May 4, 2020 Filing 5 PLEASE DISREGARD- Incorrectly Entered; Case has not been Transferred. Remark: (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2020) Modified on 5/5/2020 (elyS, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2020 Filing 4 Letter from Tri Huu Huynh. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2020)
May 1, 2020 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 6/8/2020. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
May 1, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2020)
May 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alamo, R Binkele, California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation (CDCR), W L Muniz, PREA Coordinator, Prison Rape Elimination Act (PREA) Compliance Manager, Rakitin, Salinas Valley State Prison, J. Vinson (Filing fee IFP Pending.). Filed byTri Huu Huynh. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huynh v. California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation (CDCR) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Binkele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prison Rape Elimination Act (PREA) Compliance Manager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W L Muniz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PREA Coordinator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alamo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salinas Valley State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Vinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation (CDCR)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rakitin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tri Huu Huynh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?