Finn et al v. SVC
Appellant: Stephen A. Finn and Winery Rehabilitation, LLC
Appellee: SVC
Case Number: 3:2020cv03132
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Referring Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY - Attorney John D. Fiero terminated. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/02/2020. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2020)
July 1, 2020 Filing 8 Proposed Order ([proposed] Consent Order Granting Substitution of Attorney) by SVC. (Maher, Charles) (Filed on 7/1/2020)
June 29, 2020 Filing 7 Appellant's OPENING BRIEF Appellee Brief due by 7/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Ex. A, #3 Ex. B, #4 Ex. C, #5 Ex. D, #6 Ex. E, #7 Ex. F, #8 Ex. G, #9 Ex. H, #10 Ex. I, #11 Ex. J, #12 Ex. K, #13 Ex. L, #14 Ex. M, #15 Ex. N, #16 Ex. O, #17 Ex. P, #18 Ex. Q, #19 Ex. R, #20 Ex. S, #21 Ex. T, #22 Ex. U, #23 Ex. V, #24 Ex. W, #25 Ex. X, #26 Ex. Y)(Warden, Philip) (Filed on 6/29/2020) Modified on 7/1/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
May 29, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF USBC RECORD ON APPEAL: Bankruptcy Record on Appeal is Available Electronically at https://ecf.canb.uscourts.gov/. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 20, 2020 Filing 5 Case Reassigned to Judge William H. Orrick. Judge Edward M. Chen no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2020)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER. This matter is found to be related to Case No. 3:20-cv-1475-WHO. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/19/2020. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2020)
May 14, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by SVC re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal / Notice of Related Cases and of General Order 44(d)(7) (Fiero, John) (Filed on 5/14/2020)
May 5, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING OF APPEAL & SCHEDULING ORDER. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2020)
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 17-10065. Filed by Stephen A. Finn, Winery Rehabilitation, LLC. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Finn et al v. SVC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Stephen A. Finn
Represented By: Philip S. Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Winery Rehabilitation, LLC
Represented By: Philip S. Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SVC
Represented By: John D. Fiero
Represented By: Charles Patrick Maher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?