Mahan v. Kerry, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ashley Mahan
Defendant: Kerry, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv03346
Filed: May 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION JOINT STIPULATION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME FOR AMENDED COMPLAINT AND RESPONSE filed by Kerry, Inc.. (Cox, Christopher) (Filed on 6/22/2020)
June 5, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ashley Mahan. Kerry, Inc. served on 6/1/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Sheehan, Spencer) (Filed on 6/5/2020)
June 2, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Kamesha James, intake specialist for defendant's registered agent, The Corporation Trust Company on 06/01/2020, filed by Ashley Mahan. (Sheehan, Spencer) (Filed on 6/2/2020)
May 22, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Kerry, Inc. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2020)
May 21, 2020 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Sheehan, Spencer) (Filed on 5/21/2020)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting #3 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re Spencer Sheehan. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2020)
May 19, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/13/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/20/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2020)
May 18, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14483053.) filed by Ashley Mahan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit true and correct copy of a certificate of good standing)(Sheehan, Spencer) (Filed on 5/18/2020)
May 18, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/1/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2020)
May 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kerry, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14478734.). Filed byAshley Mahan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reese, Michael) (Filed on 5/18/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mahan v. Kerry, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerry, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Mahan
Represented By: Michael Robert Reese
Represented By: Spencer Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?