Diaz De Leon v. Andrew Saul
Plaintiff: George Diaz De Leon
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 3:2020cv03552
Filed: May 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:1383
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Andrew Saul.. (Roth, Armand) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
June 29, 2020 Summons and waiver emailed to SSA. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2020)
June 24, 2020 Filing 8 Acknowledgment of Receipt by U.S. Marshal re #6 Summons Issued (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2020)
June 12, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by George Diaz De Leon.. (Sackett, Harvey) (Filed on 6/12/2020)
June 1, 2020 Service packet delivered to the U.S. Marshals Post Box in the Clerks Office mailroom. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2020)
June 1, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 usm form, #2 usm form, #3 usm form)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2020)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 28, 2020 Filing 4 SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2020)
May 28, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/11/2020. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2020)
May 27, 2020 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis IFP filed by George Diaz De Leon. (Sackett, Harvey) (Filed on 5/27/2020)
May 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Judicial Review of Decision of Commissioner of Social Security against Andrew Saul. Filed byGeorge Diaz De Leon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sackett, Harvey) (Filed on 5/27/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diaz De Leon v. Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Armand D. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Diaz De Leon
Represented By: Harvey Peter Sackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?