Carraway v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Samuel E Carraway
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv03599
Filed: May 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 MEMBER CASE OPENED MDL 2741: District of South Carolina, 20-cv-01810-MDL, Carraway v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 20-cv-03599-VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 210 cc: JPMDL (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 29, 2020 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of South Carolina; Case Number 3:20-cv-01810. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 26, 2020 Filing 6 Case transferred to California Northern District per certified copy of Conditional Transfer Order Number 210. The Transferring Clerk's Office hereby attests the record and the docket sheet available through CM/ECF to be the certified list. (asni, )
May 8, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Samuel E Carraway.(asni, )
May 8, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (asni, )
May 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9093274.), filed by Samuel E Carraway. Service due by 8/6/2020(asni, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carraway v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel E Carraway
Represented By: Graham Lee Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?