Foote v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Foote
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv03600
Filed: May 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 MEMBER CASE OPENED MDL 2741: Florida Middle, 6:20-cv-00780, Foote v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:20-cv-03600-VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 210 cc: JPMDL (jlgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 29, 2020 Cases associated: Create association to 3:16-md-02741-VC. (jlgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 29, 2020 Filing 11 Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 6:20-cv-00780. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 26, 2020 Filing 10 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: Northern District of California. MDL case number: 2741 (MAA)
May 8, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Jeffrey Foote. (Chambers, G.)
May 8, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Jeffrey Foote. Related case(s): yes (Chambers, G.)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/2/2020. (RN)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 5/6/2020. (GNB) copies e-mailed
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 5/6/2020. (GNB) copies e-mailed
May 6, 2020 Filing 4 POSSIBLE MDL Tag Along case for MDL Case Number 2741, In re: Roundup Product Liability Litigation. Information emailed to MDL Panel on 5/6/20, including cover letter, copy of complaint, and docket sheet. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Docket Sheet) (RDO)
May 6, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Monsanto Company. (RDO)
May 5, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:20-cv-780-Orl-40DCI. (SJB)
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16775208) filed by Jeffrey Foote. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Chambers, G.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foote v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Foote
Represented By: T. Michael Morgan
Represented By: Genevieve Katherine Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?