Anderson v. Svane et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Anderson
Defendant: Norman Gennaro, Carl Bass, Mikkel Svane, Elena Gomez, Caryn Marooney, Hilarie Koplow-McAdams, Michelle Wilson, Michael Frandsen, Zendesk, Inc., Michael Curtis and Thomas Szkutak
Case Number: 3:2020cv03671
Filed: June 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RELATING CASE. The following cases are related: C19-6968 CRB and C20-3671 CRB. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/27/2020. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2020)
July 27, 2020 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE on October 2, 2020 before the Honorable Charles R. Breyer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2020)
July 13, 2020 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE: A Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/25/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/2/2020 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 7/10/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2020)
July 9, 2020 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2020)
July 8, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Carl Bass, Michael Curtis, Michael Frandsen, Norman Gennaro, Elena Gomez, Hilarie Koplow-McAdams, Caryn Marooney, Mikkel Svane, Thomas Szkutak, Michelle Wilson, Zendesk, Inc... (Jones, Michael) (Filed on 7/8/2020)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order, signed as modified on 6/29/2020, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part #6 Stipulation Accepting Service, Stay Action and Setting Schedule.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2020)
June 24, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 7/8/2020. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2020)
June 23, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Accepting Service, Staying the Action, and Setting Schedule filed by Carl Bass, Michael Curtis, Michael Frandsen, Norman Gennaro, Elena Gomez, Hilarie Koplow-McAdams, Caryn Marooney, Mikkel Svane, Thomas Szkutak, Michelle Wilson, Zendesk, Inc.. (Jones, Michael) (Filed on 6/23/2020)
June 3, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Carl Bass, Michael Curtis, Michael Frandsen, Norman Gennaro, Elena Gomez, Hilarie Koplow-McAdams, Caryn Marooney, Mikkel Svane, Thomas Szkutak, Michelle Wilson, Zendesk, Inc. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2020)
June 3, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/28/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/4/2020 02:00 PM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2020)
June 3, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/17/2020. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2020)
June 2, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Prongay, Robert) (Filed on 6/2/2020)
June 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14531430.). Filed byAnthony Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Prongay, Robert) (Filed on 6/2/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Svane et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norman Gennaro
Represented By: Michael T. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Bass
Represented By: Michael T. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mikkel Svane
Represented By: Michael T. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elena Gomez
Represented By: Michael T. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caryn Marooney
Represented By: Michael T. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilarie Koplow-McAdams
Represented By: Michael T. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Wilson
Represented By: Michael T. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Frandsen
Represented By: Michael T. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zendesk, Inc.
Represented By: Michael T. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Curtis
Represented By: Michael T. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Szkutak
Represented By: Michael T. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Anderson
Represented By: Robert Vincent Prongay
Represented By: Pavithra Rajesh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?