Simon and Simon, PC v. Align Technology, Inc.
Plaintiff: SIMON AND SIMON, PC, Simon and Simon, PC doing business as City Smiles, VIP Dental Spas and Misty Snow
Defendant: Align Technology, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv03754
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Referring Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2022 Filing 171 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant Align Technology, Inc.'s Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed filed by Align Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Sealed Version of Exhibit 3)(Marenberg, Steven) (Filed on 10/18/2022)
October 18, 2022 Filing 170 Joint Discovery Letter BriefRegarding Discovery Requests Seeking Aspects of Plaintiffs' Financial Information filed by Align Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Public Version of Exhibit 3)(Marenberg, Steven) (Filed on 10/18/2022)
October 18, 2022 Filing 169 ***POSTED IN WRONG CASE. PLEASE DISREGARD*** MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17637271.) filed by Misty Snow. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Reichenberg, David) (Filed on 10/18/2022) Modified on 10/18/2022 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
October 18, 2022 Filing 168 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17637097.) filed by Align Technology, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Reichenberg, David) (Filed on 10/18/2022) Modified on 10/18/2022 correcting filer information (dhm, COURT STAFF).
October 18, 2022 Filing 167 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17635746.) filed by Align Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Levine, Mark) (Filed on 10/18/2022)
October 18, 2022 #Electronic filing error. Document filed in wrong case. [err401] Re: #169 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-1763 7271.) filed by Misty Snow (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2022)
October 18, 2022 #Electronic filing error. Wrong filer selected when docketing. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #168 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17637097.) filed by Align Technology, Inc. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2022)
October 17, 2022 Filing 166 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on October 14, 2022 before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson by Simon and Simon, PC, for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Walker, Daniel) (Filed on 10/17/2022)
October 14, 2022 Filing 165 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/14/2022 before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson by Align Technology, Inc., for Court Reporter not listed - San Francisco. (Whalen, Michael) (Filed on 10/14/2022)
October 14, 2022 Filing 164 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson: Discovery Hearing re dispute concerning the attorney-client privilegeheld on 10/14/2022 at 3:00 p.m., by Zoom.Digital Recording Time: By Zoom: 3:00-4:11. Appearances:Plaintiff Misty Snow Counsel:Rio PierceTed WodjickPlaintiff Simon & Simon PC Counsel:April LambertHope BrinnDaniel WalkerDefendant Align Technology Counsel:Steven MarenbergAdam ReichMichael WhalenProceedings: Discovery hearing held. Court's orders are as stated on the record. Counsel may request a transcript or Audio on ECF. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/14/2022) Modified on 10/17/2022: Matter transcribed by Marla Knox. (rjd, COURT STAFF).
October 12, 2022 Filing 163 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING: Zoom Video Camera hearing set for 10/14/2022 at 3:00 PM. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.By COB 10/13/2022, counsel shall email the Courtroom Deputy, Rose Maher, letting her know their appearances for the 10/14/2022 3:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. The parties should be prepared to discuss their dispute concerning the attorney-client privilege. Counsel will join the hearing as an attendee and will be promoted to Panelist to participate in the hearing. Courtroom Deputy Contact Email: Rose_Maher@cand.uscourts.govWebinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/tsh General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and r ebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.go v/zoom/. Zoom Video Camera hearing set for 10/14/2022 at 3:00 PM. (Related documents(s) #154 ) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2022)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER. The motions related to letters of request are referred to Judge Hixson as discovery matters, including dkt. nos. #150 , #154 , and #155 . Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 10/12/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vclc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2022)
October 11, 2022 Filing 161 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Simon and Simon, PC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 10/11/2022)
October 11, 2022 Filing 160 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17613651.) filed by Align Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Doman, Joseph) (Filed on 10/11/2022)
October 11, 2022 Filing 159 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17613613.) filed by Align Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Hughes, John) (Filed on 10/11/2022)
October 11, 2022 Filing 158 NOTICE of Appearance by Samara Hoose (Hoose, Samara) (Filed on 10/11/2022)
October 11, 2022 Filing 157 NOTICE of Appearance by Karma Micaela Giulianelli (Giulianelli, Karma) (Filed on 10/11/2022)
October 7, 2022 Filing 156 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Simon and Simon, PC (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 10/7/2022)
October 7, 2022 Filing 155 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #154 MOTION for Issuance of Letters of Request filed by Simon and Simon, PC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Timothy Z. Lacomb, #2 Proposed Order)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 10/7/2022)
October 7, 2022 Filing 154 MOTION for Issuance of Letters of Request filed by Simon and Simon, PC. Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 10/21/2022. Replies due by 10/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 10/7/2022)
October 4, 2022 Filing 153 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING A FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR 10/17/2022, PROVIDING ZOOM ACCESS, AND REQUIRING ADVANCE REGISTRATION OF COUNSEL. Case Management Statement due by 10/11/2022. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/17/2022, 10:00 AM, via Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at t he hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Thursday, October 13, 2022, by 10:00 a.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2022)
September 30, 2022 Filing 152 Statement of Non-Opposition re #150 MOTION for Issuance of a Letter of Request filed byAlign Technology, Inc.. (Related document(s) #150 ) (Marenberg, Steven) (Filed on 9/30/2022)
September 30, 2022 Filing 151 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 9/30/2022)
September 16, 2022 Filing 150 MOTION for Issuance of a Letter of Request filed by Simon and Simon, PC. Motion Hearing set for 10/27/2022 09:30 AM before Judge Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 9/30/2022. Replies due by 10/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Radice, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 9/16/2022)
September 8, 2022 Filing 149 Transcript of Proceedings held on 06/22/22, before Judge Vince Chhabria. Court Reporter/Transcriber Echo Reporting, Inc., telephone number echoreporting@yahoo.com. Tape Number: FTR 2:38 - 2:47. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (161 in 3:21-cv-03269-VC) Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 9/29/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/11/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/7/2022. (Jauregui, Tara) (Filed on 9/8/2022)
July 25, 2022 Filing 148 NOTICE of Change of Address by David K. Lietz (Lietz, David) (Filed on 7/25/2022)
July 25, 2022 Filing 147 NOTICE of Change of Address by Gary Michael Klinger (Klinger, Gary) (Filed on 7/25/2022)
July 20, 2022 Filing 146 Transcript of Proceedings held on July 1, 2022, before Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, RPR, telephone number joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com, 510-367-3043. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (142 in 3:20-cv-03754-VC) Transcript Order, (141 in 3:20-cv-03754-VC) Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 8/10/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/22/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/18/2022. (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 7/20/2022)
July 18, 2022 Filing 145 Letter Brief re #144 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,, re Search Terms filed bySimon and Simon, PC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Exh 1, #2 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Exh 2, #3 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Exh 3, #4 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Exh 4, #5 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Exh 5, #6 Exhibit Defendant's Exh A)(Related document(s) #144 ) (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/18/2022)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting in part and denying in part (137) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 3:20-cv-03754-VC; granting in part and denying in part (135) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 3:21-cv-03269-VC. The Courts orders that the last two pages of Plaintiffs' Exhibit 3 are sealed. The balance of the motion is denied. The Court orders Plaintiffs to file in the public record those items as to which the Court has denied the request to seal. Plaintiffs shall do this not sooner than five days and not later than 10 days after the date of this order. (tshlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2022)
July 5, 2022 Filing 143 Declaration of Steven A. Marenberg in Support of #137 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byAlign Technology, Inc.. (Related document(s) #137 ) (Marenberg, Steven) (Filed on 7/5/2022)
July 5, 2022 Filing 142 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on July 1, 2022 before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson by Simon and Simon, PC, for Court Reporter Joan Columbini. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/5/2022)
July 5, 2022 Filing 141 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 07/01/2022 before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson by Align Technology, Inc., for Court Reporter Joan Columbini. (Whalen, Michael) (Filed on 7/5/2022)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 140 Discovery Order re: ECF No. 136 in 3:20-cv-03754-VC, ECF No. 134 in 3:21-cv-03269-VC Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Search Terms. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 7/1/2022. (tshlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2022)
July 1, 2022 Filing 139 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson:Discovery Hearing held on 7/1/2022 held at 10:00 a.m. by Zoom.Total Time in Court: 51 minutes. Court Reporter: Joan Columbini. Appearances: Plaintiff Misty Snow Counsel:Rio PierceTed WodjickPlaintiff Simon & Simon PC Counsel:April LambertHope Brinn Daniel Walker Abram MaggardDefendant Align Technology Counsel: Steven MarenbergNoah PinegarAdam ReichMichael WhalenProceedings: Discovery Hearing held re ECF Docket No. 138, argument heard, matter submitted. Court to issue order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/1/2022)
June 28, 2022 Filing 138 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM DISCOVERY HEARING. Zoom Video Camera Discovery hearing re the 6/27/2022 Joint Letter Brief is scheduled for 7/1/2022 at 10:00 AM, before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.By COB, today, 6/30/2022, counsel shall email the Courtroom Deputy, Rose Maher, letting her know their appearances for the 7/1/2022 10:00 a.m. -Discovery Hearing re the 6/27/2022 Joint Discovery Dispute, before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel will join the hearing as an attendee and will be promoted to Panelist to participate in the hearing. Courtroom Deputy Contact Email: Rose_Maher@cand.uscourts.govWebinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/tsh General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Zoom Video Camera Discovery hearing set for 7/1/2022 at 10:00 AM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2022)
June 27, 2022 Filing 137 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Simon and Simon, PC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Joint Letter Discovery Brief Regarding Search Terms [Sealed Version], #3 Exhibit Exh 2 [Sealed Version], #4 Exhibit Exh 3 [Sealed Version], #5 Exhibit Exh 4 [Sealed Version], #6 Exhibit Exh 5 [Sealed Version], #7 Exhibit Exh A [Sealed Version], #8 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 6/27/2022)
June 27, 2022 Filing 136 Letter Brief Regarding Search Terms filed bySimon and Simon, PC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Exh 1, #2 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Exh 2, #3 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Exh 3, #4 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Exh 4, #5 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Exh 5, #6 Exhibit Defendant's Exh A)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 6/27/2022)
June 22, 2022 Filing 135 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vince Chhabria: Further Case Management Conference held via Zoom on 6/22/2022. CASE 21-cv-3269-VC, Snow v. Align Technology, Inc. is REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson for Discovery. (Case 20-cv-3754-VC, Simon and Simon previously referred.)The Court will grant the stipulations from the parties, but will not grant further extensions.Total Time in Court: 9 minutes. Court Reporter: Hearing recorded via Zoom: 2:38 - 2:47. Plaintiff Attorney: April Lambert, John Radice, Daniel Walker, and Hope Brinn for Simon and Simon; Steve Berman, Rio Pierce, and Ted Wojcik for Snow. Defendant Attorney: Steven Marenberg, Noah Pinegar, and Adam Reich for Align. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/22/2022) Modified on 9/6/2022: Matter transcribed by Tara (Bauer) Jauregui (ECHO Reporting). (rjd, COURT STAFF).
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 134 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting Stipulated Request for Limited Extensions of Current Case Schedule. No further extensions will be granted. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-03754-VC, 3:21-cv-03269-VC(vclc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2022)
June 22, 2022 Filing 133 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua P. Davis (Davis, Joshua) (Filed on 6/22/2022)
June 22, 2022 Setting case deadlines pursuant to stipulated case schedule. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vclc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2022)
June 17, 2022 Filing 132 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING THE TIME FOR THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 6/22/2022, AND REQUIRING REGISTRATION OF COUNSEL. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/22/2022, 02:00 PM, via Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Court Appe arances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. If not already provided to the Court, a list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Tuesday, June 21, 2022, by 10:00 a.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www .cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2022)
June 15, 2022 Filing 131 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Simon and Simon, PC. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 6/15/2022)
June 13, 2022 Filing 130 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Limited Extensions of Current Case Schedule filed by Simon and Simon, PC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 6/13/2022)
June 8, 2022 Filing 129 NOTICE of Appearance by Abraham Adam Maggard (Maggard, Abraham) (Filed on 6/8/2022)
May 5, 2022 Filing 128 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, PROVIDING ZOOM ACCESS, AND REQUIRING ADVANCE REGISTRATION OF COUNSEL.The Court will be in trial on 5/18/2022, and therefore needs to reset the date for hearing this matter. Case Management Statement due by 6/15/2022. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/22/2022, 01:00 PM, via Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identifie d by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Thursday, June 16, 2022, by 10:00 a.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2022)
April 4, 2022 Filing 127 NOTICE of Appearance by Hope Brinn (Brinn, Hope) (Filed on 4/4/2022)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 126 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #125 Stipulated Request for Extensions of Case Schedule. (vclc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2022)
March 14, 2022 Filing 125 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Limited Extensions of Current Case Schedule Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 6-1(b), 6-2, and 7-12 filed by Align Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James Pearl, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Declaration pursuant to L.R. 5-1(d)(5))(Pearl, James) (Filed on 3/14/2022)
January 20, 2022 Filing 124 Transcript of Official Recording of Proceedings held on 1/19/22, before Judge Vince Chhabria. Transcriber Belle Ball, CSR, telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (91 in 3:21-cv-03269-VC) Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 2/10/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/22/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/20/2022. (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 1/20/2022)
January 19, 2022 Filing 123 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vince Chhabria: Further Case Management Conference held via Zoom on 1/19/2022.Discovery has started in the Snow matter. Parties believe the case schedule should remain as currently set. The Court is still working on the ruling on the pending motion and expects to get that to the parties shortly. The next CMC is set for May 2022, but if one is needed earlier, the Court will set one after the ruling on the motion.Total Time in Court: 9 minutes. Court Reporter: Hearing recorded via Zoom: 1:08 - 1:17. Plaintiff Attorney: John Radice and Dan Walker for Simon and Simon, Tim LaComb for VIP Dental Spa, and Steve Berman and Rio Pierce for Snow. Defendant Attorney: Adam Reich, Seven Marenberg, James Pearl, and Noah Pinegar. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/19/2022) Modified on 1/19/2022: Matter transcribed by Belle Ball. (rjd, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2022 Filing 122 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Simon and Simon, PC. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/12/2022)
January 4, 2022 Filing 121 CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING THE TIME FOR THE 1/19/2022 FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, PROVIDING ZOOM ACCESS, AND REQUIRING ADVANCE REGISTRATION OF COUNSEL. The Court's normal day and time for hearing Case Management Conferences will now be Wednesdays, at 1:00 p.m., until further notice. Case Management Statement due by 1/12/2022. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/19/2022 at 01:00 PM by Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Court Appearances: Advanced n otice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Thursday, January 13th, 2022, by no later than 10:00AM.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. ( This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(bxs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2022)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 120 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #119 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Murray. (bxs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2022)
December 8, 2021 Filing 119 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-16699043.) filed by Align Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Murray, Michael) (Filed on 12/8/2021)
September 14, 2021 Filing 118 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 9/15/2021. In light of the Joint Case Management Statement filed on 9/8/2021, the Further Case Management Conference previously scheduled for Wednesday, 9/15/2021 is hereby vacated. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bxsS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2021)
September 14, 2021 Set Deadlines/Hearings re #106 : Case Management Statement due by 1/12/2022. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/19/2022 at at 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 5/11/2022. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/18/2022 at 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 9/14/2022. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/21/2022 at 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 1/18/2023. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/25/2023 at 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 5/4/2023. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/11/2023 at 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. Jury Trial set for 11/20/2023 08:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria.(bxsS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2021)
September 8, 2021 Filing 117 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Simon and Simon, PC. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 9/8/2021)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 116 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #115 Proposed Order filed by Align Technology, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 9/7/2021. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2021)
September 7, 2021 Filing 115 Proposed Order Stipulated Order Regarding Discovery of Electronically Stored Information by Align Technology, Inc.. (Marenberg, Steven) (Filed on 9/7/2021)
August 13, 2021 Filing 114 CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING THE FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO 9/15/21, PROVIDING ZOOM ACCESS, AND REQUIRING ADVANCE REGISTRATION OF COUNSEL. Case Management Statement due by 9/8/2021. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/15/2021, 02:00 PM, by Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at th e hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov by Wednesday, September 8th, 2021, no later than 10:00AM.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (bxsS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2021)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting #112 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 8/5/2021. (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2021)
August 3, 2021 Filing 112 NOTICE by Simon and Simon, PC of Withdrawal of Counsel (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 8/3/2021)
June 3, 2021 Filing 111 NOTICE by Simon and Simon, PC of Withdrawal of Counsel (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 6/3/2021)
May 31, 2021 Filing 110 Transcript of the Official Electronic record of Remote Zoom Video Conference Proceedings held on 5/12/2021, before Judge Vince Chhabria. Transcriber Ana Dub, RDR, RMR, CRR, CSR No. 7445, telephone number ana_dub@cand.uscourts.gov; 415-290-1651. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #108 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/30/2021. (Related documents(s) #108 ) (amdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2021)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #101 Motion to Relate Snow Case. (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2021)
May 19, 2021 Filing 108 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/12/2021 before Judge Vince Chhabria by Align Technology, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Reich, Adam) (Filed on 5/19/2021)
May 18, 2021 Filing 107 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/12/2021 before Judge Vince Chhabria by Simon and Simon, PC, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 5/18/2021)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER AS MODIFIED by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #104 Stipulation re Case Schedule. Case Management Statement due by 9/15/2021. Close of Expert Discovery due by 12/5/2022. Close of Fact Discovery due by 7/15/2022. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/22/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - To be determined. Motion Hearing set for 4/13/2023 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - To be determined before Judge Vince Chhabria.(vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2021)
May 13, 2021 Filing 104 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Amended Case Schedule filed by Simon and Simon, PC. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 5/13/2021)
May 12, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson for Discovery (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2021)
May 12, 2021 Filing 105 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vince Chhabria: Further Case Management Conference held via Zoom on 5/12/2021. CASE REFERRED to a randomly assigned Magistrate Judge for Discovery. The parties and Court discussed the limitations on depositions in this case, along with sharing of depositions conducted in the 3Shape case, subject to the approval of the judge overseeing the 3Shape case. Parties were ordered to work with the Magistrate Judge assigned in this district for discovery purposes and coordinate efforts in the 3Shape case in an effort to cut down on extra efforts in both courts. For specific details regarding the discussion, parties may refer to the transcript of this proceeding.Parties are ordered to submit a proposed schedule consistent with what was filed in the CMS, and include further status conferences every 4 months. Also, the MSJ and Daubert briefing should be combined, not separate.Total Time in Court: 31 minutes. Court Reporter: Hearing recorded via Zoom: 2:17 - 2:45 & 2:46 - 2:49. Plaintiff Attorney: Eric Cramer, Joseph Saveri, Daniel Walker, John Radice, April Lambert, and Jennifer Oliver. Defendant Attorney: Seven Marenberg, James Pearl, Noah Pinegar, and Adam Reich. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/12/2021) Modified on 5/19/2021: Matter transcribed by Ana Dub. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 103 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #100 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Kane.(knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2021)
May 10, 2021 Filing 102 Proposed Order re #101 MOTION to Relate Case by Misty Snow. (Pierce, Rio) (Filed on 5/10/2021)
May 10, 2021 Filing 101 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Misty Snow. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rio Pierce, #2 Exhibit A)(Pierce, Rio) (Filed on 5/10/2021)
May 7, 2021 Filing 100 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Mr. Michael J. Kane ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15941142.) filed by Simon and Simon, PC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 5/7/2021)
May 5, 2021 Filing 99 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Simon and Simon, PC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 5/5/2021)
May 4, 2021 Filing 98 CLERK'S NOTICE PROVIDING ZOOM ACCESS AND REQUIRING ADVANCE REGISTRATION OF COUNSEL FOR 5/12/2021 CMC. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/12/2021, 02:00 PM, by Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Court Appearances: Advance d notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Thursday, May 6, 2021, by no later than 10:00 a.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (Thi s is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2021)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #94 Stipulation re Protective Order. (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2021)
April 22, 2021 Filing 96 Answer to Amended Complaint #29 Amended Complaint Defendant Align Technology, Inc.'s Answers to Plaintiffs' Amended Class Action Complaint byAlign Technology, Inc.. (Marenberg, Steven) (Filed on 4/22/2021)
April 20, 2021 Filing 95 NOTICE by Simon and Simon, PC of Firm Name Change (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 4/20/2021)
April 13, 2021 Filing 94 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #92 Order on Stipulation filed by Simon and Simon, PC. (Attachments: #1 Amended Protective Order Redline Over NDCA Standard Order)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 4/13/2021)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #86 Stipulation Regarding Expert Discovery. (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER TO REFILE PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER IN ACCORDANCE WITH STANDING ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria terminating #87 . (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2021)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS. The Case Management Conference scheduled for 4/21/2021 is continued. Case Management Statement due by 5/5/2021. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/12/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 4/8/2021. (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2021)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #89 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Whalen.(knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2021)
March 24, 2021 Filing 89 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Michael C. Whalen ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15744382.) filed by Align Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Whalen, Michael) (Filed on 3/24/2021)
March 19, 2021 Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Michael Reich for Defendant Align Technology, Inc. (Reich, Adam) (Filed on 3/19/2021)
March 11, 2021 Filing 87 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Protective Order filed by Simon and Simon, PC. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 3/11/2021)
March 11, 2021 Filing 86 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Expert Discovery filed by Simon and Simon, PC. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 3/11/2021)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria continuing upcoming Case Management Conference. Revised Case Management Statement due by 4/14/2021. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/21/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2021)
February 23, 2021 Filing 84 Statement OF RECENT DECISION by Simon and Simon, PC, VIP Dental Spas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A)(Rayhill, Kevin) (Filed on 2/23/2021)
February 1, 2021 Filing 83 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING THE FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO 3/10/2021, PROVIDING ZOOM ACCESS, AND REQUIRING ADVANCE REGISTRATION OF COUNSEL. Case Management Statement due by 3/3/2021. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/10/2021, 02:00 PM, by Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at th e hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Thursday, March 4, 2021, by no later than 10:00 a.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2021)
January 26, 2021 Filing 82 NOTICE by Align Technology, Inc. of Withdrawal of Counsel and [Proposed] Order (Counts, Thomas) (Filed on 1/26/2021)
January 6, 2021 Filing 81 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING THE FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO 2/10/2021, PROVIDING ZOOM ACCESS, AND REQUIRING ADVANCE REGISTRATION OF COUNSEL. The Court's normal day and time for hearing Case Management Conferences will now be Wednesdays, at 2:00 p.m., PST, until further notice. Case Management Statement due by 2/3/2021. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/10/2021, 02:00 PM, by Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Thursday, February 4, 2021, by no later than 10:00 a.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This i s a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2021)
January 5, 2021 Filing 80 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Simon and Simon, PC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/5/2021)
December 28, 2020 Filing 79 AUDIO RECORDINGS ORDER (re: Motion hearing of 12/10/2020,,,, ), by Grant Nicholas Margeson of Paul Hastings LLP. Court will send to Rita Elfarissi at ritaelfarissi@paulhastings.com a link to the files requested in this order. ( Filing fee $ 32, receipt number 0971-15370870). (Elfarissi, Rita) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 28, 2020 Filing 78 *** DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR (SEE DOCKET # 79 ) *** . (Margeson, Grant) (Filed on 12/28/2020) Modified on 12/28/2020 (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
December 17, 2020 Filing 77 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/10/2020, before Judge Vince Chhabria. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, RPR, telephone number (510) 367-3043, joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #74 Transcript Order, #75 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 1/7/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/19/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/17/2021. (Related documents(s) #74 , #75 ) (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 12/17/2020)
December 14, 2020 Filing 75 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/10/2020 before Judge Vince Chhabria by Simon and Simon, PC, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 12/14/2020)
December 14, 2020 Filing 74 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/10/2020 before Judge Vince Chhabria by Align Technology, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Margeson, Grant) (Filed on 12/14/2020)
December 10, 2020 Filing 76 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vince Chhabria: Motion Hearing held via Zoom on 12/10/2020 re #52 MOTION to Dismiss CORRECTION OF DOCKET #51 filed by Align Technology, Inc. The Court took the matter under submission and will issue a written order. The case management conference currently scheduled for January 5, 2021, is continued until January 12, 2021, with a case management statement due one week prior. Case Management Statement due by 1/5/2021. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/12/2021, 02:00 PM, by Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Total Time in Court: 39 minutes. Court Reporter: Hearing recorded via Zoom: 10:56 - 11:35. Plaintiff Attorney: Simon and Simon, PC: Eric L. Cramer, Daniel Walker, John Radice, April Lambert, and Keydon Levy; VIP Dental Spas: Jennifer Oliver and Daniel Mogin. Defendant Attorney: Steven Marenberg, James Pearl, and Noah Pinegar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Thursday, January 7, 2021, by no later than 10:00 a.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/10/2020) Modified on 12/17/2020: Matter transcribed by Joan Columbini. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2020 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by Keydon Levy (Levy, Keydon) (Filed on 12/4/2020)
November 27, 2020 Filing 72 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed bySimon and Simon, PC, VIP Dental Spas. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 11/27/2020)
November 12, 2020 Filing 71 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING THE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND MOTION HEARING RE #52 MOTION to Dismiss CORRECTION OF DOCKET #51 . Motion Hearing set for 12/10/2020, 10:00 AM, by Videoconference Only before Judge Vince Chhabria. Case Management Statement due by 12/29/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/5/2021, 02:00 PM, by Videoconference Only. These proceedings will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or partie s who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Not less than 3 court days in advance of the hearing.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by t he court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2020)
November 4, 2020 Filing 70 Transcript of Proceedings held on October 1, 2020, before Judge Vince Chhabria. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, RPR, telephone number (510) 367-3043, joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #61 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 11/25/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/7/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/2/2021. (Related documents(s) #61 ) (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 11/4/2020)
November 3, 2020 Filing 69 CLERK'S NOTICE PROVIDING ZOOM ACCESS AND REQUIRING ADVANCE REGISTRATION OF COUNSEL FOR 12/8/2020 CMC. Case Management Statement due by 12/1/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/8/2020, 02:00 PM, by Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov /vc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Thursday, December 3, 2020, at 10:00 a.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand. uscourts.gov/zoom/. Case Management Statement due by 12/1/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/8/2020, 02:00 PM, by Videoconference Only. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2020)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #67 Stipulation Extending Case Management Conference AS MODIFIED. (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2020)
November 2, 2020 Filing 67 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Case Management Conference filed by Align Technology, Inc.. (Marenberg, Steven) (Filed on 11/2/2020)
October 28, 2020 Filing 66 Certificate of Interested Entities by VIP Dental Spas (Oliver, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/28/2020)
October 28, 2020 Filing 65 Corporate Disclosure Statement by VIP Dental Spas (Oliver, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/28/2020)
October 27, 2020 Filing 64 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING THE HEARING RE #52 MOTION to Dismiss CORRECTION OF DOCKET #51 . Motion Hearing set for 11/19/2020, 10:00 AM, by Videoconference Only before Judge Vince Chhabria. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Court Appearance s: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Monday, November 16, 2020, at 10:00 a.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Motion Hearing set for 11/19/2020, 10:00 AM, by Videoconference Only before Judge Vince Chhabria. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2020)
October 14, 2020 Filing 63 REPLY (re #52 MOTION to Dismiss CORRECTION OF DOCKET #51 ) In Further Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed byAlign Technology, Inc.. (Marenberg, Steven) (Filed on 10/14/2020)
October 6, 2020 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Abigail Heather Wald (Wald, Abigail) (Filed on 10/6/2020)
October 6, 2020 Filing 61 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/01/2020 before Judge Vince Chhabria by Align Technology, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Margeson, Grant) (Filed on 10/6/2020)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting in part and denying in part #43 Motion to Appoint. (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2020)
October 2, 2020 Filing 59 Letter from Joseph R. Saveri re Lead Appointees. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 10/2/2020)
October 1, 2020 Filing 58 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vince Chhabria: Motion Hearing held on 10/1/2020 re #43 First MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Simon and Simon, PC.The Court will issue a written ruling no later than the upcoming hearing on defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs are ordered to submit a list of cases in which interim class counsel was appointed before class certification in antitrust class action cases.Total Time in Court: 18 minutes. Court Reporter: Hearing recorded via Zoom Webinar: 10:15 - 10:33. Plaintiff Attorney: Joseph Saveri, Daniel Walker, Eric Cramer, April Lambert, and John Radice for Simon and Simon; Jennifer Oliver for VIP Dental Spas. Defendant Attorney: Noah Pinegar. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/1/2020) Modified on 10/6/2020: Matter transcribed by Joan Columbini. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
September 30, 2020 Filing 57 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #52 MOTION to Dismiss CORRECTION OF DOCKET #51 ) filed bySimon and Simon, PC. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
September 29, 2020 Filing 56 CLERK'S NOTICE PROVIDING ZOOM ACCESS AND REQUIRING ADVANCE REGISTRATION FOR 10/1/2020 MOTION HEARING. Motion Hearing set for 10/1/2020, 10:00 AM, before Judge Vince Chhabria. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is req uired of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 9/30/2020, at 10:00 a.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Motion Hearing set for 10/1/2020, 10:00 AM, before Judge Vince Chhabria. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #50 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Lietz.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2020)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #49 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Klinger.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2020)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #47 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Lambert.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2020)
September 9, 2020 Filing 52 MOTION to Dismiss CORRECTION OF DOCKET #51 filed by Align Technology, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/5/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 9/30/2020. Replies due by 10/14/2020. (Marenberg, Steven) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 9, 2020 Filing 51 ***PLEASE SEE #52 For Corrected Filing***MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Align Technology, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/5/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 9/23/2020. Replies due by 9/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Kent Alleyne Henry, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Declaration of Thomas A. Counts In Support Of Defendant Align Technology, Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit A)(Marenberg, Steven) (Filed on 9/9/2020) Modified on 9/10/2020 (elyS, COURT STAFF).
September 4, 2020 Filing 50 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14905146.) filed by VIP Dental Spas. (Attachments: #1 DC COGS)(Lietz, David) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 49 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14903969.) filed by VIP Dental Spas. (Attachments: #1 IL COGS)(Klinger, Gary) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
August 31, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Z. LaComb (LaComb, Timothy) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 31, 2020 Filing 47 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for April Lambert ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14879761.) filed by Simon and Simon, PC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Lambert, April) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 29, 2020 Filing 46 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING THE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, PROVIDING ZOOM ACCESS, AND REQUIRING ADVANCE REGISTRATION FOR THE HEARING. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/17/2020, 02:00 PM. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Court Appearanc es: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Not less than 3 court days in advance of the hearing.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/17/2020, 02:00 PM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2020)
August 27, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Jay Mogin (Mogin, Daniel) (Filed on 8/27/2020)
August 27, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Marie Oliver (Oliver, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/27/2020)
August 26, 2020 Filing 43 First MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Simon and Simon, PC. Motion Hearing set for 10/1/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 9/30/2020. Replies due by 10/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rayhill, Kevin) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 26, 2020 Filing 42 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options By Parties and Counsel (Marenberg, Steven) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 26, 2020 Filing 41 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Attachments: #1 ADR Certification Simon and Simon, #2 ADR Certification VIP Dental Spas)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #39 Stipulation Extending Briefing Schedule and Case Management Conference AS MODIFIED. (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 24, 2020 Filing 39 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule And Extending Case Management Conference filed by Align Technology, Inc.. (Marenberg, Steven) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #30 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Ripley.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Radice.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #21 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Pinegar.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Cramer.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #18 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Walker.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Landau.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Rubenstein.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 21, 2020 Filing 31 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(cmfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 21, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14844380.) filed by Simon and Simon, PC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Ripley, Joshua) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 14, 2020 Filing 29 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Align Technology Inc. Filed by Simon and Simon, PC. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 8/14/2020) Modified on 8/27/2020 (elyS, COURT STAFF).
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria denying #27 Stipulation re Judicial Notice. (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2020)
August 3, 2020 Filing 27 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re REQUEST FOR AN ORDER SETTING THE BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANT ALIGN TECHNOLOGY, INC.S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (ECF NO. 25) filed by Simon and Simon, PC. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 GENERAL ORDER FOR PENDING CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE VINCE CHHABRIA. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 7/29/2020. (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 25 Request for Judicial Notice filed byAlign Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven A. Marenberg in Support of Defendant Align Technology, Inc.'s Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Marenberg, Steven) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Align Technology, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/8/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 8/11/2020. Replies due by 8/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thomas A. Counts in Support of Defendant Align Technology, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1)(Marenberg, Steven) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 24, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Correction to add Cert. of Good Standing as an attachment) ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14732970.) Filing fee previously paid on 07/24/2020 filed by Simon and Simon, PC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing (NJ))(Radice, John) (Filed on 7/24/2020)
July 24, 2020 Filing 22 **Please see #23 for corrected Motion*** MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14732970.) filed by Simon and Simon, PC. (Radice, John) (Filed on 7/24/2020) Modified on 7/24/2020 (elyS, COURT STAFF).
July 21, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Noah B. Pinegar ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14715673.) filed by Align Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Pinegar, Noah) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Arthur Marenberg and James M. Pearl (Marenberg, Steven) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 3, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Eric L. Cramer ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14654140.) filed by Simon and Simon, PC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Rayhill, Kevin) (Filed on 7/3/2020)
July 3, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Daniel J. Walker ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14654130.) filed by Simon and Simon, PC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Rayhill, Kevin) (Filed on 7/3/2020)
July 3, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin E. Rayhill (Rayhill, Kevin) (Filed on 7/3/2020)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #13 Stipulation Setting Briefing Schedule. Motions due by 7/28/2020. Oppositions due by 9/4/2020. Replies due by 9/18/2020. (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2020)
June 29, 2020 Filing 15 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Align Technology, Inc. (Counts, Thomas) (Filed on 6/29/2020)
June 29, 2020 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Entities by Align Technology, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate C. Raymond Larkin, Other Affiliate Joseph M. Hogan, Other Affiliate Thomas M. Prescott, Other Affiliate Jennifer Olson, Other Affiliate Joseph Lacob, Other Affiliate George J. Morrow, Other Affiliate John F. Morici, Other Affiliate Kevin J. Dallas, Other Affiliate Andrea L. Saia, Other Affiliate Greg J. Santora, Other Affiliate Susan E. Siegel, Other Affiliate Warren S. Thaler, Other Affiliate Julie Tay, Other Affiliate Anne M. Myong, Other Affiliate Simon Beard, Other Affiliate Julie Coletti, Other Affiliate Stuart Hockridge, Other Affiliate Sreelakshmi Kolli, Other Affiliate Raj Pudipeddi, Other Affiliate Zelko Relic, Other Affiliate Markus Sebastian, Other Affiliate Yuval Shaked, Other Affiliate Emory Wright for Align Technology, Inc.. Purusant to Civil L.R. 3-15 (Counts, Thomas) (Filed on 6/29/2020)
June 29, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Setting a Briefing Schedule for Align Technology, Inc.'s Contemplated Motion to Dismiss filed by Align Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thomas A. Counts in Support Of Joint Stipulation and Request for a [Proposed] Order Setting a Briefing Schedule for Align Technology, Inc.'s Contemplated Motion to Dismiss)(Counts, Thomas) (Filed on 6/29/2020)
June 29, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION Extending Defendant Align Technology, Inc.'s Time to Respond to the Complaint filed by Align Technology, Inc.. (Counts, Thomas) (Filed on 6/29/2020)
June 29, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas A. Counts and Grant N. Margeson (Counts, Thomas) (Filed on 6/29/2020)
June 29, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14632136.) filed by Simon and Simon, PC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Landau, Kevin) (Filed on 6/29/2020)
June 26, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14625328.) filed by Simon and Simon, PC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (NY))(Rubenstein, Daniel) (Filed on 6/26/2020)
June 22, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Simon and Simon, PC (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 6/22/2020)
June 22, 2020 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Entities by Simon and Simon, PC identifying Other Affiliate William Simon, Other Affiliate SIMON AND SIMON, PC d/b/a CITY SMILES for Simon and Simon, PC. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 6/22/2020)
June 22, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by Simon and Simon, PC OF PENDENCY OF OTHER ACTION OR PROCEEDING (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 6/22/2020)
June 8, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Simon and Simon, PC re #1 Complaint, Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 8, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Align Technology, Inc.. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 8, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/2/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/9/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Vince Chhabria. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2020)
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Align Technology, Inc.. Filed by SIMON AND SIMON, PC. b> (Filing fee of $400.00 Paid, Receipt # 971-14548365) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Summons)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 6/5/2020) Modified on 6/6/2020 (bwS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simon and Simon, PC v. Align Technology, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIMON AND SIMON, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simon and Simon, PC doing business as City Smiles
Represented By: Eric L. Cramer
Represented By: Kevin E. Rayhill
Represented By: Joseph R. Saveri
Represented By: Kevin S. Landau
Represented By: John Daniel Radice
Represented By: Steven Noel Williams
Represented By: Daniel Evan Rubenstein
Represented By: April D Lambert
Represented By: Keydon Levy
Represented By: Daniel John Walker
Represented By: Joshua Taylor Ripley
Represented By: Michael Jay Kane
Represented By: Abraham Adam Maggard
Represented By: David K. Lietz
Represented By: Gary Michael Klinger
Represented By: Hope Brinn
Represented By: Joshua P. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VIP Dental Spas
Represented By: Daniel Jay Mogin
Represented By: Timothy Z. LaComb
Represented By: Gary Michael Klinger
Represented By: David K. Lietz
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Oliver
Represented By: Kevin E. Rayhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misty Snow
Represented By: David K. Lietz
Represented By: Gary Michael Klinger
Represented By: Rio S. Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Align Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Grant Nicholas Margeson
Represented By: Noah Pinegar
Represented By: James Pearl
Represented By: Thomas A. Counts
Represented By: Steven Arthur Marenberg
Represented By: Abigail Heather Wald
Represented By: David Reichenberg
Represented By: Adam Michael Reich
Represented By: John M Hughes
Represented By: Joseph W. Doman
Represented By: Karma Micaela Giulianelli
Represented By: Mark Leslie Levine
Represented By: Michael F Murray
Represented By: Michael C Whalen
Represented By: Samara Hoose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?