LYNWOOD INVESTMENTS CY LIMITED v. KONOVALOV et al
Plaintiff: LYNWOOD INVESTMENTS CY LIMITED
Defendant: RUNA CAPITAL, INC., F5 Networks, Inc., NGINX, INC. (BVI), ANDREY ALEXEEV, IGOR SYSOEV, NGINX SOFTWARE, INC., EVENTURE CAPITAL PARTNERS II LLC, ANGUS ROBERTSON, GLEB SMIRNOFF, NGINX, INC. (DE), MAXIM DOUNIN, MAXIM KONOVALOV and BV NGINX LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv03778
Filed: June 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2020 Filing 66 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Service Of Individual Defendants and Individual Defendants' Deadline To Respond To Complaint filed by ANDREY ALEXEEV, MAXIM DOUNIN, MAXIM KONOVALOV, ANGUS ROBERTSON, GLEB SMIRNOFF, IGOR SYSOEV. (Brun, David) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 65 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by ANDREY ALEXEEV, MAXIM DOUNIN, MAXIM KONOVALOV, ANGUS ROBERTSON, GLEB SMIRNOFF, IGOR SYSOEV.. (Brun, David) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 64 Certificate of Interested Entities by ANDREY ALEXEEV, MAXIM DOUNIN, MAXIM KONOVALOV, ANGUS ROBERTSON, GLEB SMIRNOFF, IGOR SYSOEV (Brun, David) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew H Dawson Notice of Special Appearance of Matthew H. Dawson - Counsel On Behalf of Maxim Konovalov, Igor Sysoev, Andrey Alexeev, Maxim Dounin, Gleb Smirnoff, and Angus Robertson (Dawson, Matthew) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel R. Diamant Notice of Special Appearance of Samuel R. Diamant - Counsel On Behalf of Maxim Konovalov, Igor Sysoev, Andrey Alexeev, Maxim Dounin, Gleb Smirnoff, and Angus Robertson (Diamant, Samuel) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeanne Adele Fugate Notice of Special Appearance of Jeanne A. Fugate - Counsel On Behalf of Maxim Konovalov, Igor Sysoev, Andrey Alexeev, Maxim Dounin, Gleb Smirnoff, and Angus Robertson (Fugate, Jeanne) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Quyen Le Ta Notice of Special Appearance of Quyen L. Ta - Counsel On Behalf of Maxim Konovalov, Igor Sysoev, Andrey Alexeev, Maxim Dounin, Gleb Smirnoff, and Angus Robertson (Ta, Quyen) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by David Shane Brun Notice of Special Appearance of Shane Brun - Counsel On Behalf of Maxim Konovalov, Igor Sysoev, Andrey Alexeev, Maxim Dounin, Gleb Smirnoff, and Angus Robertson (Brun, David) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia L. Peden (Peden, Patricia) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #56 Stipulation to Extend Page Limits. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 56 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Extend Page Limits for Memorandum of Points and Authorities Related to the F5 Entities Motion To Dismiss filed by F5 Networks, Inc., NGINX SOFTWARE, INC., NGINX, INC. (BVI). (Grant, Jessica) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 3, 2020 Filing 55 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Angus Robertson on 07/17/2020, filed by LYNWOOD INVESTMENTS CY LIMITED. (Pencu, Alexander) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
July 31, 2020 Filing 54 Statement re #35 Supplemental Brief,, #37 Statement,, F5'S UPDATED STATEMENT IN CONNECTION WITH PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER AUTHORIZING ALTERNATE SERVICE OF PROCESS ON FOREIGN DEFENDANTS PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 4(F)(3) by F5 Networks, Inc., NGINX SOFTWARE, INC., NGINX, INC. (BVI). (Grant, Jessica) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 31, 2020 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Akira Tate (Tate, Eric) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 31, 2020 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Jonathan Fox (Fox, Benjamin) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 31, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Joyce Liou (Liou, Joyce) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 31, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Benedict Y. Hur (Hur, Benedict) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 30, 2020 Filing 49 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by F5 Networks, Inc., NGINX SOFTWARE, INC., NGINX, INC. (BVI).. (Grant, Jessica) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 30, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Jacobs (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 30, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica L. Grant (Grant, Jessica) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 30, 2020 Filing 46 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by RUNA CAPITAL, INC... (Hur, Benedict) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Judge Sallie Kim granting #43 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (sklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 30, 2020 Filing 44 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by BV NGINX LLC, EVENTURE CAPITAL PARTNERS II LLC.. (Gunn, Patrick) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 43 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14744958.) filed by LYNWOOD INVESTMENTS CY LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Kim, Austin) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 42 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on NGINX Software, Inc. on 07/08/2020, filed by LYNWOOD INVESTMENTS CY LIMITED. (Affrunti, Brian) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge Sallie Kim granting #40 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (sklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 40 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14705604.) filed by LYNWOOD INVESTMENTS CY LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Geneson, David) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 16, 2020 Filing 39 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 7/30/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2020)
July 16, 2020 Filing 38 Corporate Disclosure Statement by F5 Networks, Inc., NGINX SOFTWARE, INC., NGINX, INC. (BVI) identifying Corporate Parent F5 Networks, Inc for NGINX SOFTWARE, INC., NGINX, INC. (BVI). (Pak, James) (Filed on 7/16/2020)
July 16, 2020 Filing 37 Statement re #35 Supplemental Brief,, #24 Ex Parte Application for an Order Authorizing Alternative Service of Process on Foreign Defendants F5S STATEMENT IN CONNECTION WITH PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER AUTHORIZING ALTERNATE SERVICE OF PROCESS ON FOREIGN DEFENDANTS PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 4(f)(3) by F5 Networks, Inc., NGINX SOFTWARE, INC., NGINX, INC. (BVI). (Attachments: #1 Declaration of D. Nemec)(Pak, James) (Filed on 7/16/2020)
July 16, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by James Y. Pak (Pak, James) (Filed on 7/16/2020)
July 15, 2020 Filing 35 Supplemental Brief re #24 Ex Parte Application for an Order Authorizing Alternative Service of Process on Foreign Defendants, #30 Declaration in Support, #25 Order Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief in Further Support of Ex Parte Application for Alternate Service Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(f)(3) filed byLYNWOOD INVESTMENTS CY LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexander D. Pencu in Further Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(f)(3))(Related document(s) #24 , #30 , #25 ) (Affrunti, Brian) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 15, 2020 Filing 34 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on NGINX INC (DE) on 06/23/2020, filed by LYNWOOD INVESTMENTS CY LIMITED. (Affrunti, Brian) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 15, 2020 Filing 33 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on BV NGINX, LLC on 06/23/2020, filed by LYNWOOD INVESTMENTS CY LIMITED. (Affrunti, Brian) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 15, 2020 Filing 32 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Runna Capital Inc. on 06/23/2020, filed by LYNWOOD INVESTMENTS CY LIMITED. (Affrunti, Brian) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 15, 2020 Filing 31 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Eventure Capital Partners II LLC on 06/23/2020, filed by LYNWOOD INVESTMENTS CY LIMITED. (Affrunti, Brian) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 15, 2020 Filing 30 Declaration of Alesander D. Pencu in Support of #24 Ex Parte Application for an Order Authorizing Alternative Service of Process on Foreign Defendants, #25 Order filed byLYNWOOD INVESTMENTS CY LIMITED. (Related document(s) #24 , #25 ) (Affrunti, Brian) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge Sallie Kim granting #26 Stipulation. (sklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge Sallie Kim granting #27 Ex Parte Application. (sklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 15, 2020 Filing 27 Ex Parte Application re #24 Ex Parte Application for an Order Authorizing Alternative Service of Process on Foreign Defendants, #25 Order for Limited Relief from the Court's Order filed by LYNWOOD INVESTMENTS CY LIMITED. (Affrunti, Brian) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 14, 2020 Filing 26 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND TO EXTEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE filed by LYNWOOD INVESTMENTS CY LIMITED. (Affrunti, Brian) (Filed on 7/14/2020)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Regarding Request For Alternative Service of Process. Signed by Judge Sallie Kim on July 10, 2020. (sklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2020)
July 6, 2020 Filing 24 Ex Parte Application for an Order Authorizing Alternative Service of Process on Foreign Defendants filed by LYNWOOD INVESTMENTS CY LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Affrunti, Brian) (Filed on 7/6/2020)
July 2, 2020 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Gleb Smirnoff on 06/23/2020, filed by LYNWOOD INVESTMENTS CY LIMITED. (Affrunti, Brian) (Filed on 7/2/2020)
July 2, 2020 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on NGINIX, INC. on 06/26/2020, filed by LYNWOOD INVESTMENTS CY LIMITED. (Affrunti, Brian) (Filed on 7/2/2020)
July 1, 2020 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on F5 Networks on 06/22/2020, filed by LYNWOOD INVESTMENTS CY LIMITED. (Affrunti, Brian) (Filed on 7/1/2020)
June 22, 2020 Filing 20 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by LYNWOOD INVESTMENTS CY LIMITED.. (Affrunti, Brian) (Filed on 6/22/2020)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #18 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Christopher Major. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2020)
June 19, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14602027.) filed by LYNWOOD INVESTMENTS CY LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Major, Christopher) (Filed on 6/19/2020)
June 19, 2020 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to BV NGINX LLC, EVENTURE CAPITAL PARTNERS II LLC, F5 Networks, Inc., NGINX, INC. (BVI), NGINX, INC. (DE), RUNA CAPITAL, INC., GLEB SMIRNOFF. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2020)
June 19, 2020 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to ANDREY ALEXEEV, MAXIM DOUNIN, MAXIM KONOVALOV, NGINX SOFTWARE, INC., ANGUS ROBERTSON, IGOR SYSOEV. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2020)
June 18, 2020 Filing 15 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding F5 Networks, Inc. Nos. 4,196,757; 4,200,791; 4,837,175; 5,973,527; 5,973,515 and 5,978,630. (cc: form mailed to register). (Affrunti, Brian) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Alexander D. Pencu. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
June 16, 2020 Filing 13 Summons Returned Unexecuted by LYNWOOD INVESTMENTS CY LIMITED as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Affrunti, Brian) (Filed on 6/16/2020)
June 16, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14584780.) filed by LYNWOOD INVESTMENTS CY LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Pencu, Alexander) (Filed on 6/16/2020)
June 15, 2020 Filing 11 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons Amended Summons Sysoev, #2 Summons Amended Summons Alexeev, #3 Summons Amended Summons Dounin, #4 Summons Amended Summons Robertson, #5 Summons Amended Summons NGINX Software, #6 Summons Amended Summons NGINX BVI, #7 Summons Amended Summons NGINX, Inc. DE, #8 Summons Amended Summons Runa Capital, #9 Summons Amended Summons F5, #10 Summons Amended Summons BV NGINX, #11 Summons Amended Summons EVenture, #12 Summons Amended Summons Smirnoff)(Affrunti, Brian) (Filed on 6/15/2020)
June 12, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to EVENTURE CAPITAL PARTNERS II LLC. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2020)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Jeffrey P. Weingart. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2020)
June 11, 2020 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. (Affrunti, Brian) (Filed on 6/11/2020)
June 11, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey P. Weingart ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14564987.) filed by LYNWOOD INVESTMENTS CY LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Weingart, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/11/2020)
June 10, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to ANDREY ALEXEEV, BV NGINX LLC, MAXIM DOUNIN, EVENTURE CAPITAL PARTNERS II LLC, F5 Networks, Inc., MAXIM KONOVALOV, NGINX SOFTWARE, INC., NGINX, INC. (BVI), NGINX, INC. (DE), ANGUS ROBERTSON. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2020)
June 10, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/7/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/14/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2020)
June 9, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/23/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2020)
June 8, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons Alexeev, #2 Summons Summons Dounin, #3 Summons Summons EVenture Capital, #4 Summons Summons F5 Network, #5 Summons Summons NGINX BVI, #6 Summons Summons NGINX Inc., #7 Summons Summons NGINX LLC, #8 Summons Summons NGINX Software, #9 Summons Summons Robertson, #10 Summons Summons Runa Capital, #11 Summons Summons Sysoev, #12 Summons Summons Smirnoff)(Affrunti, Brian) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 8, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by LYNWOOD INVESTMENTS CY LIMITED identifying Other Affiliate Rambler Internet Holding, LLC for LYNWOOD INVESTMENTS CY LIMITED. re #1 Complaint (Affrunti, Brian) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14554466.). Filed byLYNWOOD INVESTMENTS CY LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Coversheet)(Affrunti, Brian) (Filed on 6/8/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LYNWOOD INVESTMENTS CY LIMITED v. KONOVALOV et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUNA CAPITAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F5 Networks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NGINX, INC. (BVI)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREY ALEXEEV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IGOR SYSOEV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NGINX SOFTWARE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EVENTURE CAPITAL PARTNERS II LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANGUS ROBERTSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLEB SMIRNOFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NGINX, INC. (DE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAXIM DOUNIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAXIM KONOVALOV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BV NGINX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LYNWOOD INVESTMENTS CY LIMITED
Represented By: Brian Michael Affrunti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?