Fink v. The Hanover Insurance Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jesse Fink and Jesse Fink on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated doing business as Toy Boat Dessert Cafe
Defendant: Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company and The Hanover Insurance Group, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv03907
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. The correct event is SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. R e: #17 Certificate of Service filed by Jesse Fink, #16 Certificate of Service filed by Jesse Fink. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2020)
August 4, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Jesse Fink. Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company served on 7/27/20, answer due 8/17/20. (Yegazarian, Nona) (Filed on 8/4/2020) Modified on 8/5/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
August 4, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Jesse Fink . The Hanover Insurance Group, Inc. served on 7/27/20, answer due 8/17/20. (Yegazarian, Nona) (Filed on 8/4/2020) Modified on 8/5/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
July 13, 2020 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 13, 2020 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to The Hanover Insurance Group, Inc.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 9, 2020 Filing 13 Proposed Summons. (Yegazarian, Nona) (Filed on 7/9/2020)
July 9, 2020 Filing 12 Proposed Summons. (Yegazarian, Nona) (Filed on 7/9/2020)
July 9, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Jesse Fink as to The Hanover Insurance Group, Inc.. (Yegazarian, Nona) (Filed on 7/9/2020)
July 9, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Jesse Fink as to Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company. (Yegazarian, Nona) (Filed on 7/9/2020)
June 26, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jesse Fink.. (Yegazarian, Nona) (Filed on 6/26/2020)
June 16, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to The Hanover Insurance Group, Inc.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2020)
June 16, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2020)
June 16, 2020 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/10/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/17/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2020)
June 15, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/29/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2020)
June 12, 2020 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Jesse Fink (Yegazarian, Nona) (Filed on 6/12/2020)
June 12, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Yegazarian, Nona) (Filed on 6/12/2020)
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Yegazarian, Nona) (Filed on 6/12/2020)
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT for Damages and Injunctive Relief; Demand for Jury Trial against The Hanover Insurance Group, Inc., Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-14573836.). Filed by Jesse Fink. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Yegazarian, Nona) (Filed on 6/12/2020) Modified on 6/16/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fink v. The Hanover Insurance Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Fink
Represented By: Nona Yegazarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Fink on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated doing business as Toy Boat Dessert Cafe
Represented By: Todd S. Garber
Represented By: Nona Yegazarian
Represented By: Douglas Gregory Blankinship
Represented By: Nathan Michael Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hanover Insurance Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?