Eventbrite, Inc. v. M.R.G. Concerts Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Eventbrite, Inc.
Defendant: Matthew Gibbons and M.R.G. Concerts Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2020cv04040
Filed: June 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2020 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Eventbrite, Inc. byMatthew Gibbons, M.R.G. Concerts Ltd.. (Moon, James) (Filed on 8/11/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 21 CLERK'S NOTICE on Reassignment and Setting Initial Case Management Conference. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/18/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/25/2020 at 02:30 PM. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-684-8852Access Code: 5862990The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (Attachments: #1 SI Standing Order, #2 All Judges Standing Order) (tvnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Susan Illston for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 7/27/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2020)
July 27, 2020 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2020)
July 24, 2020 Filing 18 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Eventbrite, Inc... (Cashman, Adam) (Filed on 7/24/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by James Hyeoun Ju Moon (Moon, James) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 16 Refund Status re #12 Application for Refund, #14 Application for Refund, #13 Application for Refund Approved. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 16, 2020 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 7/30/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2020)
July 14, 2020 Filing 14 Application for Refund, Receipt Number 0971-14593292 by Eventbrite, Inc.. (Cashman, Adam) (Filed on 7/14/2020)
July 14, 2020 Filing 13 Application for Refund, Receipt Number 0971-14593279 by Eventbrite, Inc.. (Cashman, Adam) (Filed on 7/14/2020)
July 14, 2020 Filing 12 Application for Refund, Receipt Number 0971-14593260 by Eventbrite, Inc.. (Cashman, Adam) (Filed on 7/14/2020)
July 10, 2020 Filing 11 Refund Status re #7 Application for Refund Declined. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2020)
July 10, 2020 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Entities by M.R.G. Concerts Ltd. (Khoury, Monder) (Filed on 7/10/2020)
July 10, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by M.R.G. Concerts Ltd. (Khoury, Monder) (Filed on 7/10/2020)
July 10, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION For Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Matthew Gibbons, M.R.G. Concerts Ltd.. (Khoury, Monder) (Filed on 7/10/2020)
July 10, 2020 Filing 7 Application for Refund, Receipt Number 0971-14593260, 0971-14593279 and 0971-14593292 by Eventbrite, Inc.. (Cashman, Adam) (Filed on 7/10/2020)
June 19, 2020 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/14/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/21/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2020)
June 19, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Matthew Gibbons, M.R.G. Concerts Ltd.. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2020)
June 18, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/2/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
June 18, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eventbrite, Inc. and Disclosure of Non-Party Interested Parties or Persons (Cashman, Adam) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
June 18, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Cashman, Adam) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT $400.00 paid, receipt no. 0971-14592923 against Matthew Gibbons, M.R.G. Concerts Ltd.. Filed byEventbrite, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cashman, Adam) (Filed on 6/18/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eventbrite, Inc. v. M.R.G. Concerts Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eventbrite, Inc.
Represented By: Adam Seth Cashman
Represented By: Douglas Stephen Tilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Gibbons
Represented By: Monder Khoury
Represented By: James Hyeoun Ju Moon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.R.G. Concerts Ltd.
Represented By: Monder Khoury
Represented By: James Hyeoun Ju Moon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?