Kay v. Copper Cane, LLC
Plaintiff: Barry N. Kay
Defendant: Copper Cane, LLC and Copper Cane, LLC a California corporation doing business as Copper Cane Wines & Provisions
Case Number: 3:2020cv04068
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE RE REASSIGNED CASE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/24/2020 at 10:00 AM to be held telephonic before Judge Richard Seeborg upon reassignment. Case Management Statement due by 9/17/2020.All parties shall appear telephonically and must contact Court Conference at (866) 582-6878 at least one week prior to the Conference to arrange their participation. For a copy of Judge Seeborg's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2020)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Signed by the Clerk on 7/6/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2020)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2020)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Barry N. Kay.. (Kilpela, Edwin) (Filed on 7/6/2020)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Edwin Kilpela.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2020)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Edwin J. Kilpela ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14637582.) filed by Barry N. Kay. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Kilpela, Edwin) (Filed on 6/30/2020)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Barry N. Kay. Service waived by Copper Cane, LLC waiver sent on 6/25/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Carpenter, Todd) (Filed on 6/29/2020)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Copper Cane, LLC. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2020)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/15/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/22/2020 01:30 PM. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2020)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/6/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2020)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Carpenter, Todd) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Copper Cane, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14597836.). Filed byBarry N. Kay. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Jurisdiction, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carpenter, Todd) (Filed on 6/18/2020) Modified on 6/22/2020 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kay v. Copper Cane, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Copper Cane, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Copper Cane, LLC a California corporation doing business as Copper Cane Wines & Provisions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry N. Kay
Represented By: Todd David Carpenter
Represented By: Edwin John Kilpela, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?