Carlos v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Carlos Segovia
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv04327
Filed: June 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2020 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:20-cv-03397. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 25, 2020 Filing 7 TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of California the electronic record. (ph, )
June 24, 2020 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to MDL 2741 Conditional Transfer Order filed 6/24/2020. (ph, )
June 24, 2020 Filing 6 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel transferring case to Northern District of California. (ph, )
June 17, 2020 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: An initial status report is due by August 24, 2020. Counsel must read the Standing Order entitled "Initial Status Conferences and Joint Initial Status Reports" on the Court's website. The parties must discuss settlement in good faith and make a serious attempt to resolve this case amicably. The parties also must confer as required by Rule 26(f) about the nature, scope, and duration of discovery. The parties must submit two documents to the Court. First, the parties must file the Joint Initial Status Report under Rule 26(f) on the docket. A Word version of the Joint Initial Status Report is available on the Court's website. Second, the parties must submit a Word version of a proposed Scheduling Order under Rule 16(b) to the Court's proposed order inbox. Lead counsel for the parties must participate in filing the initial status report. Plaintiff must serve this Order on all other parties. If the defendant has not been served with process, plaintiff's counsel must contact the Courtroom Deputy at jessica_j_ramos@ilnd.uscourts.gov to reschedule the initial status report deadline. Plaintiff should not file the Joint Initial Status Report before the defendant(s) has been served with process. All counsel of record must read and comply with this Court's Standing Orders on its webpage. Please pay special attention to the Standing Orders about Depositions and Discovery. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
June 12, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Segovia Carlos. Monsanto Company waiver sent on 6/12/2020, answer due 8/11/2020. (Margulis, Ryan)
June 11, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Monsanto Company. (ng, )
June 10, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Steven C. Seeger. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (txl, )
June 9, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Segovia Carlos (Margulis, Ryan)
June 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Segovia Carlos; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17094731.(Margulis, Ryan)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (rc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carlos v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Segovia
Represented By: Ryan Adam Margulis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?