Schneider et al v. YouTube, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Maria Schneider, Pirate Monitor LTD, Uniglobe Entertainment, LLC, and AST Publishing LTD.
Defendant: YouTube, LLC, Google LLC and Alphabet Inc.
Counter Defendant: Pirate Monitor LLC and Gabor Csupo
Case Number: 3:2020cv04423
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Referring Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2023 Filing 226 PLAINTIFFS PROFFER OF EVIDENCE CONCERNING DMCA FACTUAL DISPUTES to #225 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed by Maria Schneider, Uniglobe Entertainment, LLC,, AST Publishing LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36)(Korologos, Philip) (Filed on 1/9/2023) Modified text on 1/10/2023 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
January 9, 2023 Filing 225 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed filed by AST Publishing LTD., Maria Schneider, Uniglobe Entertainment, LLC,. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 PLAINTIFFS PROFFER OF EVIDENCE CONCERNING DMCA FACTUAL DISPUTES, #3 DECLARATION OF JOANNA WRIGHT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS PROFFER OF EVIDENCE CONCERNING DMCA FACTUAL DISPUTES, #4 [SEALED] Ex. 1, #5 [SEALED] Ex. 2, #6 [SEALED] Ex. 3, #7 [SEALED] Ex. 4, #8 [SEALED] Ex. 5, #9 [SEALED] Ex. 6, #10 [SEALED] Ex. 7, #11 [SEALED] Ex. 8, #12 [SEALED] Ex. 9, #13 [SEALED] Ex. 10, #14 [SEALED] Ex. 11, #15 [SEALED] Ex. 12, #16 [SEALED] Ex. 15, #17 [SEALED] Ex. 17, #18 [SEALED] Ex. 19, #19 [SEALED] Ex. 20, #20 [SEALED] Ex. 21, #21 [SEALED] Ex. 22, #22 [SEALED] Ex. 23, #23 [SEALED] Ex. 25, #24 [SEALED] Ex. 26, #25 [SEALED] Ex. 32, #26 [SEALED] Ex. 33, #27 [SEALED] Ex. 34, #28 [SEALED] Ex. 35)(Korologos, Philip) (Filed on 1/9/2023)
January 9, 2023 Filing 224 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #217 Discovery Letter Brief ) filed byGoogle LLC, YouTube, LLC. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 1/9/2023)
January 9, 2023 Filing 223 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #216 Discovery Letter Brief ) filed byGoogle LLC, YouTube, LLC. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 1/9/2023)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER RE SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/5/2023. (jdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2023)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER. For plaintiffs' letter briefs, Dkt. Nos. 216, 217, YouTube is directed to file responsive letters by January 9, 2023, in the format required by the Court's Standing Order for Civil Discovery. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/22/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2022)
December 22, 2022 Filing 220 NOTICE of Joint Submission Regarding Trial Date by Google LLC, YouTube, LLC, Uniglobe Entertainment, LLC, AST Publishing LTD. and Maria Schnieder. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 12/22/2022) Modified on 12/23/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF).
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER. For Dkt. No. 218, plaintiffs are directed to file by January 9, 2023, a proffer of evidence that YouTube: (1) did not expeditiously remove infringing material in response to a takedown notice; (2) otherwise obtained actual or apparent knowledge of specific infringing material and did not expeditiously remove the infringing material; or (3) received direct financial benefit from infringing activity that it has the right and ability to control. The proffer must specifically identify evidence in the record, and may not exceed 10 pages. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/21/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2022)
December 19, 2022 Filing 218 Letter from David H. Kramer on behalf of Defendants as Directed in Docket 188. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 12/19/2022)
December 19, 2022 Filing 217 Discovery Letter Brief filed by AST Publishing LTD.. (Ewing, Randall) (Filed on 12/19/2022)
December 16, 2022 Filing 216 Discovery Letter Brief filed by AST Publishing LTD., Maria Schneider, Uniglobe Entertainment, LLC,. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Exhibit A)(Korologos, Philip) (Filed on 12/16/2022)
December 16, 2022 Filing 215 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by AST Publishing LTD., Maria Schneider, Uniglobe Entertainment, LLC,. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Letter Motion to Compel, #2 Unredacted Exhibit A)(Korologos, Philip) (Filed on 12/16/2022)
December 16, 2022 Filing 214 Transcript of Proceedings held on December 15, 2022, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter Ana Dub, CSR 7445, RDR, RMR, CRR, CCRR, CRG, CCG, telephone number 415-290-1651; ana_dub@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #211 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/16/2023. (Related documents(s) #211 ) (amd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2022)
December 15, 2022 Filing 213 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Motion Hearing held on 12/15/2022. (jdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/15/2022)
December 15, 2022 Filing 212 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on December 15, 2022 before Judge James Donato by Google LLC, YouTube, LLC, for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 12/15/2022)
December 15, 2022 Filing 211 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/15/2022 before Judge James Donato by Maria Schneider, for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Korologos, Philip) (Filed on 12/15/2022)
December 12, 2022 Filing 210 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #199 Discovery Letter Brief ) filed byGoogle LLC, YouTube, LLC. (White, Lauren) (Filed on 12/12/2022)
December 8, 2022 Filing 209 EXHIBITS re #208 Joint Submission Regarding Defendants' Sealing Requests filed by Google LLC, YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 10, #2 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 10, #3 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 11, #4 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 11, #5 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 12, #6 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 12, #7 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 13, #8 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 13, #9 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 14, #10 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 14, #11 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 15, #12 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 15, #13 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit, #14 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 16, #15 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 17, #16 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 17, #17 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 18, #18 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 18, #19 Proposed Order, #20 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #208 ) (Hartman, Catherine) (Filed on 12/8/2022) Modified on 12/9/2022 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
December 8, 2022 Filing 208 Joint Submission Regarding Defendants' Sealing Requests filed by Google LLC, YouTube, LLC, AST Publishing LTD, Maria Schneider, Uniglobe Entertainment, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amy Wu, #2 Declaration of Chenyuan Zhu, #3 Declaration of Arpan Agrawal, #4 Declaration of Catherine Hartman, #5 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1, #7 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 2, #8 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 2, #9 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 3, #10 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 3, #11 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 4, #12 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 4, #13 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 5, #14 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 5, #15 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 6, #16 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 6, #17 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 7, #18 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 7, #19 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 8, #20 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 8, #21 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 9, #22 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 9)(Hartman, Catherine) (Filed on 12/8/2022) Modified on 12/9/2022 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
December 6, 2022 Filing 207 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION re #202 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , #203 Reply to Opposition/Response,,, filed by AST Publishing LTD., Maria Schneider, Uniglobe Entertainment, LLC,. Responses due by 12/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Corrected Redacted Decl of D. Blaisdell, #2 Proposed Order)(Korologos, Philip) (Filed on 12/6/2022)
December 6, 2022 Filing 206 Interim Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by AST Publishing LTD., Maria Schneider, Uniglobe Entertainment, LLC,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Corrected Decl of D. Blaisdell)(Korologos, Philip) (Filed on 12/6/2022)
December 5, 2022 Filing 205 Defendants' Objections to #203 Reply Evidence Pursuant to Civil L.R. 7-3(d)(1) by Google LLC, YouTube, LLC. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 12/5/2022) Modified on 12/6/2022 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
December 1, 2022 Filing 204 Letter from Philip C. Korologos on behalf of the parties responding to the Court's Order (Dkt No. 201). (Korologos, Philip) (Filed on 12/1/2022)
November 28, 2022 Filing 203 REPLY (re #190 MOTION to Certify Class ) filed byAST Publishing LTD., Maria Schneider, Uniglobe Entertainment, LLC,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of D. Blaisdell, #2 Exhibit 58, #3 Exhibit 59, #4 Exhibit 60, #5 Exhibit 61, #6 Exhibit 62, #7 Exhibit 63, #8 Exhibit 64, #9 Exhibit 66, #10 Exhibit 67, #11 Exhibit 68, #12 Exhibit 69, #13 Exhibit 70, #14 Exhibit 71, #15 Exhibit 72, #16 Exhibit 73, #17 Exhibit 74, #18 Exhibit 75, #19 Exhibit 76, #20 Exhibit 77, #21 Exhibit 78, #22 Exhibit 79, #23 Exhibit 80, #24 Exhibit 81, #25 Exhibit 82, #26 Exhibit 83, #27 Exhibit 84, #28 Exhibit 85, #29 Exhibit 86, #30 Exhibit 87, #31 Exhibit 88, #32 Exhibit 89, #33 Exhibit 90, #34 Exhibit 91, #35 Exhibit 92)(Korologos, Philip) (Filed on 11/28/2022)
November 28, 2022 Filing 202 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by AST Publishing LTD., Maria Schneider, Uniglobe Entertainment, LLC,. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Reply Brief, #2 Unredacted Declaration of D. Blaisdell, #3 Unredacted Exhibit 63, #4 Unredacted Exhibit 69, #5 Unredacted Exhibit 70, #6 Unredacted Exhibit 71, #7 Unredacted Exhibit 76, #8 Unredacted Exhibit 82, #9 Unredacted Exhibit 86, #10 Unredacted Exhibit 91)(Korologos, Philip) (Filed on 11/28/2022)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER. The parties are directed to jointly advise the Court by December 5, 2022, whether the hearing on the motion for class certification, Dkt. No. 190, should be continued in light of the amended deadlines in Dkt. No. 196. Signed by Judge James Donato on 11/28/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2022)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER. For plaintiffs' discovery dispute letter, Dkt. No. 199, the Court directs YouTube to file a responsive letter by December 12, 2022, in the format required by the Court's Standing Order for Civil Discovery. Signed by Judge James Donato on 11/21/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2022)
November 18, 2022 Filing 199 Discovery Letter Brief filed by AST Publishing LTD., Maria Schneider, Uniglobe Entertainment, LLC,. (O'Keefe, Carol) (Filed on 11/18/2022)
November 14, 2022 Filing 198 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #190 MOTION to Certify Class ) filed byGoogle LLC, YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thierry Foucu, #2 Declaration of Chenyuan Zhu [Redacted Version], #3 Exhibit A to Zhu Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to Zhu Declaration, #5 Exhibit C to Zhu Declaration, #6 Exhibit D to Zhu Declaration, #7 Exhibit E to Zhu Declaration, #8 Exhibit F to Zhu Declaration, #9 Exhibit G to Zhu Declaration, #10 Exhibit H to Zhu Declaration, #11 Exhibit I to Zhu Declaration, #12 Exhibit J to Zhu Declaration, #13 Exhibit K to Zhu Declaration, #14 Declaration of Paul Harold [Redacted Version], #15 Exhibit 1 to Harold Declaration, #16 Exhibit 2 to Harold Declaration, #17 Exhibit 3 to Harold Declaration, #18 Exhibit 4 to Harold Declaration, #19 Exhibit 5 to Harold Declaration, #20 Exhibit 6 to Harold Declaration, #21 Exhibit 7 to Harold Declaration [Redacted Version], #22 Exhibit 8 to Harold Declaration [Redacted Version], #23 Exhibit 9 to Harold Declaration [Redacted Version], #24 Exhibit 10 to Harold Declaration, #25 Exhibit 11 to Harold Declaration, #26 Exhibit 12 to Harold Declaration, #27 Exhibit 13 to Harold Declaration, #28 Exhibit 14 to Harold Declaration, #29 Exhibit 15 to Harold Declaration, #30 Exhibit 16 to Harold Declaration, #31 Exhibit 17 to Harold Declaration, #32 Exhibit 18 to Harold Declaration, #33 Exhibit 19 to Harold Declaration, #34 Exhibit 20 to Harold Declaration, #35 Exhibit 21 to Harold Declaration, #36 Exhibit 22 to Harold Declaration [Redacted Version], #37 Exhibit 23 to Harold Declaration, #38 Exhibit 24 to Harold Declaration, #39 Exhibit 25 to Harold Declaration, #40 Exhibit 26 to Harold Declaration, #41 Exhibit 27 to Harold Declaration, #42 Exhibit 28 to Harold Declaration [Redacted Version], #43 Exhibit 29 to Harold Declaration [Redacted Version], #44 Exhibit 30 to Harold Declaration [Redacted Version], #45 Exhibit 31 to Harold Declaration [Redacted Version], #46 Exhibit 32 to Harold Declaration, #47 Exhibit 33 to Harold Declaration, #48 Exhibit 34 to Harold Declaration, #49 Exhibit 35 to Harold Declaration, #50 Exhibit 36 to Harold Declaration, #51 Exhibit 37 to Harold Declaration, #52 Exhibit 38 to Harold Declaration)(Kramer, David) (Filed on 11/14/2022)
November 14, 2022 Filing 197 Interim Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Related Documents filed by Google LLC, YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Version of Opposition to Motion for Class Certification, #2 Unredacted Version of Declaration Chenyuan Zhu, #3 Unredacted Version of Declaration Paul Harold, #4 Unredacted Version of Harold Exhibit 7, #5 Unredacted Version of Harold Exhibit 8, #6 Unredacted Version of Harold Exhibit 9, #7 Unredacted Version of Harold Exhibit 22, #8 Unredacted Version of Harold Exhibit 28, #9 Unredacted Version of Harold Exhibit 29, #10 Unredacted Version of Harold Exhibit 30, #11 Unredacted Version of Harold Exhibit 31, #12 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kramer, David) (Filed on 11/14/2022)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER re #190 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Uniglobe Entertainment, LLC,, Maria Schneider, AST Publishing LTD., Set/Reset Deadlines as to #190 MOTION to Certify Class . Responses due by 11/14/2023. Replies due by 11/28/2023. Dispositive Motion due by 3/3/2023. Signed by Judge James Donato on 11/7/2022. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2022)
November 1, 2022 Filing 195 Transcript of Proceedings held on October 13, 2022, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter Ana Dub, CSR 7445, RDR, RMR, CRR, CCRR, CRG, CCG, telephone number 415-290-1651; ana_dub@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #185 Transcript Order, #187 Transcript Order, ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/30/2023. (Related documents(s) #185 , #187 ) (amd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2022)
October 27, 2022 Filing 194 Joint Submission Regarding Defendants' and Non-Party Modern Works' Motion to Seal filed by Google LLC, YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Catherine R. Hartman, #2 Declaration of Joanne Suk, #3 Exhibit Suk Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit Suk Redacted Version of Exhibit 1, #5 Declaration of Waleed Diab, #6 Exhibit Diab Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1, #7 Exhibit Diab Redacted Version of Exhibit 1, #8 Proposed Order, #9 Certificate/Proof of Service as to Dan Coleman, #10 Certificate/Proof of Service as to Opposing Counsel)(Hartman, Catherine) (Filed on 10/27/2022) Modified on 10/28/2022 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 193 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING SEALING. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/26/2022. (jdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2022)
October 21, 2022 Filing 192 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Sealing in Connection with Dkt. Nos. 189 and 190 filed by Google LLC, YouTube, LLC. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 10/21/2022)
October 20, 2022 Filing 191 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Deadlines filed by Google LLC, YouTube, LLC, AST Publishing LTD., Maria Schneider, Uniglobe Entertainment, LLC. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 10/20/2022) Modified on 10/21/2022 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
October 18, 2022 Filing 190 MOTION to Certify Class filed by AST Publishing LTD., Maria Schneider, Uniglobe Entertainment, LLC,. Motion Hearing set for 12/15/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 11/1/2022. Replies due by 11/8/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Philip Korologos, #2 Declaration of Maria Schneider, #3 Declaration of Randall P. Ewing, #4 Declaration of Maxim Lozovsky, #5 Declaration of Namrata Singh Gujral Cooper, #6 Declaration of Demetri Blaisdell, #7 Exhibit 1 - Redacted, #8 Exhibit 2 - Redacted, #9 Exhibit 3 - Redacted, #10 Exhibit 4 - Redacted, #11 Exhibit 5 - Redacted, #12 Exhibit 6 - Redacted, #13 Exhibit 7 - Redacted, #14 Exhibit 8 - Redacted, #15 Exhibit 9 - Redacted, #16 Exhibit 10 - Redacted, #17 Exhibit 11 - Redacted, #18 Exhibit 12 - Redacted, #19 Exhibit 13 - Redacted, #20 Exhibit 14 - Redacted, #21 Exhibit 15 - Redacted, #22 Exhibit 16, #23 Exhibit 17 - Redacted, #24 Exhibit 18 - Redacted, #25 Exhibit 19 - Redacted, #26 Exhibit 20 - Redacted, #27 Exhibit 21 - Redacted, #28 Exhibit 22 - Redacted, #29 Exhibit 23 - Redacted, #30 Exhibit 24 - Redacted, #31 Exhibit 25 - Redacted, #32 Exhibit 26 - Redacted, #33 Exhibit 27 - Redacted, #34 Exhibit 28, #35 Exhibit 29 - Redacted, #36 Exhibit 30 - Redacted, #37 Exhibit 31, #38 Exhibit 32 - Redacted, #39 Exhibit 33, #40 Exhibit 34 - Redacted, #41 Exhibit 35 - Redacted, #42 Exhibit 36, #43 Exhibit 37 - Redacted, #44 Exhibit 38 - Redacted, #45 Exhibit 39 - Redacted, #46 Exhibit 40 - Redacted, #47 Exhibit 41 - Redacted, #48 Exhibit 42 - Redacted, #49 Exhibit 43 - Redacted, #50 Exhibit 44 - Redacted, #51 Exhibit 45 - Redacted, #52 Exhibit 46 - Redacted, #53 Exhibit 47, #54 Exhibit 48 - Redacted, #55 Exhibit 49, #56 Exhibit 50 - Redacted, #57 Exhibit 51, #58 Exhibit 52, #59 Exhibit 53 - Redacted, #60 Exhibit 54 - Redacted, #61 Exhibit 55, #62 Exhibit 56, #63 Exhibit 57, #64 Proposed Order)(Korologos, Philip) (Filed on 10/18/2022)
October 17, 2022 Filing 189 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by AST Publishing LTD., Maria Schneider, Uniglobe Entertainment, LLC,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Unredacted, #2 Exhibit 2 - Unredacted, #3 Exhibit 3 - Unredacted, #4 Exhibit 4 - Unredacted, #5 Exhibit 5 - Unredacted, #6 Exhibit 6 - Unredacted, #7 Exhibit 7 - Unredacted, #8 Exhibit 8 - Unredacted, #9 Exhibit 9 - Unredacted, #10 Exhibit 10 - Unredacted, #11 Exhibit 11 - Unredacted, #12 Exhibit 12 - Unredacted, #13 Exhibit 13 - Unredacted, #14 Exhibit 14 - Unredacted, #15 Exhibit 15 - Unredacted, #16 Exhibit 17 - Unredacted, #17 Exhibit 18 - Unredacted, #18 Exhibit 19 - Unredacted, #19 Exhibit 20 - Unredacted, #20 Exhibit 21 - Unredacted, #21 Exhibit 22 - Unredacted, #22 Exhibit 23 - Unredacted, #23 Exhibit 24 - Unredacted, #24 Exhibit 25 - Unredacted, #25 Exhibit 26 - Unredacted, #26 Exhibit 27 - Unredacted, #27 Exhibit 29 - Unredacted, #28 Exhibit 30 - Unredacted, #29 Exhibit 32 - Unredacted, #30 Exhibit 34 - Unredacted, #31 Exhibit 35 - Unredacted, #32 Exhibit 36 - Unredacted, #33 Exhibit 37 - Unredacted, #34 Exhibit 38 - Unredacted, #35 Exhibit 39 - Unredacted, #36 Exhibit 40 - Unredacted, #37 Exhibit 46 - Unredacted, #38 Exhibit 48 - Unredacted, #39 Exhibit 50 - Unredacted, #40 Exhibit 53 - Unredacted, #41 Exhibit 54 - Unredacted, #42 Unredacted Motion for Class Certification, #43 Proposed Order)(Korologos, Philip) (Filed on 10/17/2022)
October 13, 2022 Filing 188 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing held on 10/13/2022.(jdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/13/2022)
October 13, 2022 Filing 187 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/13/2022 before Judge James Donato by Maria Schneider, for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Korologos, Philip) (Filed on 10/13/2022) Modified on 10/13/2022: Corrected court reporter's name. (rjd, COURT STAFF).
October 13, 2022 Filing 186 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on October 13, 2022 before Judge James Donato by Google LLC, YouTube, LLC, for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 10/13/2022)
October 13, 2022 Filing 185 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/13/2022 before Judge James Donato by Maria Schneider, for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Korologos, Philip) (Filed on 10/13/2022) Modified on 10/13/2022: Added the court reporter's name. (rjd, COURT STAFF).
October 13, 2022 Filing 184 DECLARATION of Maria Schneider in Opposition to #164 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff Maria Schneider, #172 Opposition/Response to Motion,,,, filed byAST Publishing LTD., Maria Schneider, Uniglobe Entertainment, LLC,. (Related document(s) #164 , #172 ) (Korologos, Philip) (Filed on 10/13/2022)
October 3, 2022 Filing 183 PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO #182 DECLARATION OF DAN COLEMAN IN RESPONSE TO #170 PLAINTIFFS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER ANOTHER PARTYS MATERIAL SHOULD BE SEALED filed by AST Publishing LTD., Maria Schneider, Uniglobe Entertainment, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Korologos, Philip) (Filed on 10/3/2022) Modified on 10/4/2022 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
September 30, 2022 Filing 182 Declaration of Dan Coleman (non-party) in Response to Plaintiff's Opposition to defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. #178 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION SEEKING EXTENSION OF TIME FOR NON-PARTY MODERN WORKS PUBLISHING TO SUBMIT DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER MODERN WORKS PUBLISHINGS MATERIAL IN PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOT filed by Dan Coleman. (Related document(s) #178 ) (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2022)
September 22, 2022 Filing 181 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Dwyer (Dwyer, Robert) (Filed on 9/22/2022)
September 21, 2022 Filing 180 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byGoogle LLC, YouTube, LLC. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 9/21/2022)
September 20, 2022 Filing 179 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Expert Discovery Deadlines as to Specific Experts filed by Google LLC, YouTube, LLCAST Publishing LTD, Maria Schneider, Uniglobe Entertainment, LLC. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 9/20/2022) Modified on 9/21/2022 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2022 Filing 178 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION SEEKING EXTENSION OF TIME FOR NON-PARTY MODERN WORKS PUBLISHING TO SUBMIT DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER MODERN WORKS PUBLISHINGS MATERIAL IN PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT SHOULD BE SEALED (DKT. 170-171) re #171 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,, #170 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Maria Schneider. Responses due by 9/26/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Administrative Motion Seeking Extension of Time for Non-Party to Submit Declaration)(Blaisdell, Demetri) (Filed on 9/19/2022)
September 19, 2022 Filing 177 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO REMOVE A FILED DOCUMENT re #170 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Maria Schneider. Responses due by 9/23/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs Administrative Motion to Remove a Filed Document)(Korologos, Philip) (Filed on 9/19/2022)
September 16, 2022 Filing 176 EXHIBITS re #170 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byGoogle LLC, YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #170 ) (Hartman, Catherine) (Filed on 9/16/2022)
September 16, 2022 Filing 175 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #170 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) filed byGoogle LLC, YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Waleed Diab, #2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Waleed Diab [Redacted], #3 Proposed Order)(Hartman, Catherine) (Filed on 9/16/2022)
September 16, 2022 Filing 174 Letter from Philip C. Korologos re: Amended Exhibit 8 that was filed under seal on September 9, 2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8)(Korologos, Philip) (Filed on 9/16/2022)
September 16, 2022 Filing 173 REPLY (re #164 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff Maria Schneider ) filed byGoogle LLC, YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thierry Foucu, #2 Exhibit 1 to Foucu Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Foucu Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Foucu Declaration, #5 Declaration of Lauren Gallo White, #6 Exhibit 1 to White Declaration, #7 Exhibit 2 to White Declaration, #8 Exhibit 3 to White Declaration, #9 Exhibit 4 to White Declaration, #10 Exhibit 5 to White Declaration, #11 Exhibit 6 to White Declaration, #12 Exhibit 7 to White Declaration, #13 Exhibit 8 to White Declaration, #14 Exhibit 9 to White Declaration)(Kramer, David) (Filed on 9/16/2022)
September 9, 2022 Filing 172 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #164 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff Maria Schneider ) filed byMaria Schneider. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Maria Schneider in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Declaration of Demetri Blaisdell in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit 40, #42 Proposed Order Denying Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff Maria Schneider)(Korologos, Philip) (Filed on 9/9/2022)
September 9, 2022 Filing 171 EXHIBITS re #170 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Additional Exhibits 22 - 40 filed byAST Publishing LTD., Gabor Csupo, Pirate Monitor LLC, Maria Schneider, Uniglobe Entertainment, LLC,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Ex 22, #2 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Ex 23, #3 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Ex 24, #4 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Ex 25, #5 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Ex 26, #6 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Ex 27, #7 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Ex 28, #8 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Ex 29, #9 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Ex 30, #10 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Ex 31, #11 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Ex 32, #12 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Ex 33, #13 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Ex 34, #14 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Ex 35, #15 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Ex 36, #16 Exhibit 37, #17 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Ex 38, #18 Exhibit 39, #19 Exhibit 40)(Related document(s) #170 ) (Korologos, Philip) (Filed on 9/9/2022)
September 9, 2022 Filing 170 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by AST Publishing LTD., Gabor Csupo, Pirate Monitor LLC, Maria Schneider, Uniglobe Entertainment, LLC,. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Unredacted Version of Plaintiff Schneider's Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Ex 5, #7 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Ex 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Ex 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Ex 12, #14 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Ex 13, #15 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Ex 14, #16 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Ex 15, #17 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Ex 16, #18 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Ex 17, #19 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Ex 18, #20 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Ex 19, #21 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Ex 20, #22 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Ex 21)(Korologos, Philip) (Filed on 9/9/2022)
September 6, 2022 Filing 169 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #163 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal and to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should be Sealed ) filed byAST Publishing LTD., Gabor Csupo, Pirate Monitor LTD(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Maria Schneider, Uniglobe Entertainment, LLC,. (Korologos, Philip) (Filed on 9/6/2022)
August 31, 2022 Filing 168 Declaration of Dan Coleman in Support of #163 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal and to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should be Sealed filed by Dan Coleman. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (Related document(s) #163 ) Correction of docket 167. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2022)
August 31, 2022 Filing 167 FILED IN ERROR. SEE #168 . Declaration of Dan Coleman in Support of #163 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal and to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should be Sealed filed by Dan Coleman. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(Related document(s) #163 ) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2022) Modified on 9/2/2022 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
August 30, 2022 Filing 166 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #163 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal and to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should be Sealed ) filed byAST Publishing LTD., Gabor Csupo, Pirate Monitor LTD(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Maria Schneider, Uniglobe Entertainment, LLC,. (Korologos, Philip) (Filed on 8/30/2022)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER. For the discovery dispute letters, Dkt. Nos. 156, 159, 161, YouTube will produce (1) the requested takedown notice data from a random sampling of 90 days; (2) the percentage of disputed Content ID claims for the year 2021 where the user selected fair use as the ground for the dispute; (3) the requested Content ID statistics for the United States on August 1 of 2017, 2018, 2019, and 2020; and (4) the requested CMI data from a random sampling of 30 days. The telephonic discovery hearing set for August 30, 2022, is vacated. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/30/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2022)
August 26, 2022 Filing 164 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff Maria Schneider filed by Google LLC, YouTube, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 10/13/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 9/9/2022. Replies due by 9/16/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Joanne Suk, #3 Exhibit 1 to Suk Declaration [Redacted Version], #4 Declaration of Chenyuan Zhu, #5 Exhibit 1 to Zhu Declaration, #6 Declaration of Dan Coleman, #7 Exhibit A to Coleman Declaration, #8 Exhibit B to Coleman Declaration, #9 Exhibit C to Coleman Declaration, #10 Exhibit D to Coleman Declaration, #11 Declaration of Paul N. Harold, #12 Exhibit 1 to Harold Declaration, #13 Exhibit 2 to Harold Declaration, #14 Exhibit 3 to Harold Declaration, #15 Exhibit 4 to Harold Declaration, #16 Exhibit 5 to Harold Declaration, #17 Exhibit 6 to Harold Declaration, #18 Exhibit 7 to Harold Declaration, #19 Exhibit 8 to Harold Declaration, #20 Exhibit 9 to Harold Declaration, #21 Exhibit 10 to Harold Declaration, #22 Exhibit 11 to Harold Declaration, #23 Exhibit 12 to Harold Declaration, #24 Exhibit 13 to Harold Declaration, #25 Exhibit 14 to Harold Declaration, #26 Exhibit 15 to Harold Declaration, #27 Exhibit 16 to Harold Declaration, #28 Exhibit 17 to Harold Declaration, #29 Exhibit 18 to Harold Declaration, #30 Exhibit 19 to Harold Declaration, #31 Exhibit 20 to Harold Declaration, #32 Exhibit 21 to Harold Declaration, #33 Exhibit 22 to Harold Declaration, #34 Exhibit 23 to Harold Declaration, #35 Exhibit 24 to Harold Declaration, #36 Exhibit 25 to Harold Declaration, #37 Exhibit 26 to Harold Declaration)(Kramer, David) (Filed on 8/26/2022)
August 26, 2022 Filing 163 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal and to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should be Sealed filed by Google LLC, YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joanne Suk, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Unredacted Version of Suk Exhibit 1, #4 Unredacted Version of Harold Exhibit 8, #5 Unredacted Version of Harold Exhibit 9, #6 Unredacted Version of Harold Exhibit 13, #7 Unredacted Version of Harold Exhibit 14, #8 Unredacted Version of Harold Exhibit 16, #9 Unredacted Version of Harold Exhibit 20, #10 Unredacted Version of Motion for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff Maria Schneider, #11 Certificate/Proof of Service, #12 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kramer, David) (Filed on 8/26/2022)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER. A telephonic discovery hearing on Dkt. Nos. 156, 159, 161, is set for August 30, 2022, at 1:30 p.m. California time. The parties are directed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 by August 28, 2022, to schedule their appearances. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/24/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2022)
August 22, 2022 Filing 161 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #156 Discovery Letter Brief ) filed byGoogle LLC, YouTube, LLC. (White, Lauren) (Filed on 8/22/2022)
August 22, 2022 Filing 160 Answer to Amended Complaint #99 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Gabor Csupo, Pirate Monitor LLC, Pirate Monitor LTD by YouTube, LLC, Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kramer, David) (Filed on 8/22/2022) Modified on 8/23/2022 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
August 16, 2022 Filing 159 Supplemental Discovery Letter Brief filed by AST Publishing LTD., Maria Schneider, Uniglobe Entertainment, LLC,. (O'Keefe, Carol) (Filed on 8/16/2022)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER. For plaintiffs' discovery dispute letter, Dkt. No. 156, the Court directs YouTube to file a responsive letter by August 22, 2022, in the format required by the Court's Standing Order for Civil Discovery. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/2/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2022)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER RE MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/1/2022. (jdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2022)
July 29, 2022 Filing 156 Discovery Letter Brief filed by AST Publishing LTD., Pirate Monitor LTD, Maria Schneider, Uniglobe Entertainment, LLC,. (O'Keefe, Carol) (Filed on 7/29/2022)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 155 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/14/2022. (jdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2022)
July 10, 2022 Filing 154 Transcript of Proceedings held on July 7, 2022, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter Ana Dub, CSR 7445, RDR, RMR, CRR, CCRR, CRG, CCG, telephone number 415-290-1651; ana_dub@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #151 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/11/2022. (Related documents(s) #151 ) (amd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2022)
July 8, 2022 Filing 152 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 7/7/22 before Judge James Donato by Maria Schneider, for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Korologos, Philip) (Filed on 7/8/2022)
July 7, 2022 Filing 153 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Status Conference held on 7/7/2022. (jdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/7/2022)
July 7, 2022 Filing 151 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on July 7, 2022 before Judge James Donato by Google LLC, YouTube, LLC, for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 7/7/2022)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER. The Court will take up Dkt. Nos. #140 , #142 , #144 , #145 , #146 , #147 , #148 , and #149 at the status conference set for July 7, 2022. No further filings are permitted in advance of the status conference, unless requested by the Court. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/28/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2022)
June 28, 2022 Filing 149 Discovery Letter Brief filed by AST Publishing LTD., Pirate Monitor LTD, Maria Schneider, Uniglobe Entertainment, LLC,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(O'Keefe, Carol) (Filed on 6/28/2022)
June 27, 2022 Filing 148 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #146 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and to Modify Case Schedule ) filed byGoogle LLC, YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David H. Kramer, #2 Proposed Order)(Kramer, David) (Filed on 6/27/2022)
June 27, 2022 Filing 147 Discovery Letter Brief filed by AST Publishing LTD., Pirate Monitor LTD, Maria Schneider, Uniglobe Entertainment, LLC,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(O'Keefe, Carol) (Filed on 6/27/2022)
June 21, 2022 Filing 146 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and to Modify Case Schedule filed by AST Publishing LTD., Maria Schneider, Uniglobe Entertainment, LLC,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Demetri Blaisdell, #2 Proposed Order)(Korologos, Philip) (Filed on 6/21/2022)
June 21, 2022 Filing 145 Letter from David H. Kramer on behalf of Defendants YouTube, LLC and Google LLC . (Kramer, David) (Filed on 6/21/2022)
June 17, 2022 Filing 144 Discovery Letter Brief filed by AST Publishing LTD., Pirate Monitor LTD(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Maria Schneider, Uniglobe Entertainment, LLC,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Korologos, Philip) (Filed on 6/17/2022)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #141 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Katherine R. Hartman. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2022)
June 14, 2022 Filing 142 Discovery Letter Brief filed by AST Publishing LTD., Pirate Monitor LTD(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Maria Schneider, Uniglobe Entertainment, LLC,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Korologos, Philip) (Filed on 6/14/2022)
June 14, 2022 Filing 141 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Catherine Hartman for Defendants YouTube, LLC and Google LLC ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17264405.) filed by Google LLC, YouTube, LLC. (Hartman, Catherine) (Filed on 6/14/2022)
June 10, 2022 Filing 140 Discovery Letter Brief filed by AST Publishing LTD., Pirate Monitor LTD(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Maria Schneider, Uniglobe Entertainment, LLC,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Korologos, Philip) (Filed on 6/10/2022)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER. The request to reschedule the case management conference, Dkt. No. #135 , is denied. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2022)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #137 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Eli B. Richlin. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2022)
June 7, 2022 Filing 137 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Eli B. Richlin for Defendants YouTube, LLC and Google LLC ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17243507.) filed by Google LLC, YouTube, LLC. (Richlin, Eli) (Filed on 6/7/2022)
June 6, 2022 Filing 136 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #135 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Schedule a Case Management Conference ) filed byGoogle LLC, YouTube, LLC. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 6/6/2022)
June 2, 2022 Filing 135 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Schedule a Case Management Conference filed by AST Publishing LTD., Maria Schneider, Uniglobe Entertainment, LLC,. Responses due by 6/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Philip Korologos, #2 Proposed Order)(Korologos, Philip) (Filed on 6/2/2022)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER. The status conference that was set for June 2, 2022, is continued to July 7, 2022, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 11. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/1/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2022)
May 31, 2022 Filing 133 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue June 2, 2022 Status Conference to June 9, 2022 filed by Google LLC, YouTube, LLC. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 5/31/2022)
May 26, 2022 Filing 132 Letter from Philip C. Korologos on behalf of All Parties regarding Agenda for June 2, 2022 Conference . (Korologos, Philip) (Filed on 5/26/2022)
May 2, 2022 Filing 130 Transcript of Proceedings held on 4/28/22, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #128 Transcript Order, #129 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 5/23/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/2/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/1/2022. (Related documents(s) #128 , #129 ) (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 5/2/2022)
May 2, 2022 Filing 129 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on April 28, 2022 before Judge James Donato by Google LLC, YouTube, LLC, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 5/2/2022) Modified on 5/2/2022: Corrected court reporter's name. (rjd, COURT STAFF).
April 29, 2022 Filing 128 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/28/2022 before Judge James Donato by Maria Schneider, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Korologos, Philip) (Filed on 4/29/2022) Modified on 4/29/2022: Corrected court reporter's name. (rjd, COURT STAFF).
April 28, 2022 Filing 131 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Status Conference held on 4/28/2022. (jdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/28/2022)
April 22, 2022 Filing 127 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Google LLC, YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(White, Lauren) (Filed on 4/22/2022)
April 21, 2022 Filing 126 Discovery Letter Brief filed by AST Publishing LTD., Maria Schneider, Uniglobe Entertainment, LLC,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' First RFPs (excerpted), #2 Exhibit B - Defendants' Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' First RFPs (excerpted))(Korologos, Philip) (Filed on 4/21/2022)
March 18, 2022 Filing 125 Letter from Philip C. Korologos Pursuant to the Court's Direction on March 10, 2022. (Korologos, Philip) (Filed on 3/18/2022)
March 18, 2022 Filing 124 Transcript of Proceedings held on 03/10/22, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Echo Reporting, Inc., telephone number echoreporting@yahoo.com. Tape Number: FTR 10:32 - 11:05. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #121 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 4/8/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/18/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/16/2022. (Related documents(s) #121 ) (Jauregui, Tara) (Filed on 3/18/2022)
March 17, 2022 Filing 123 NOTICE of Appearance by David William Walchak (Walchak, David) (Filed on 3/17/2022)
March 14, 2022 Filing 122 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on March 10, 2022 before Judge James Donato by Maria Schneider, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Korologos, Philip) (Filed on 3/14/2022)
March 14, 2022 Filing 121 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on March 10, 2022 before Judge James Donato by Google LLC, YouTube, LLC, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (White, Lauren) (Filed on 3/14/2022)
March 11, 2022 Filing 120 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Motion Hearing held on 3/10/2022. (jdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/10/2022) Modified on 3/15/2022: Matter transcribed by Tara (Bauer) Jauregui (ECHO Reporting). (rjd, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2022 Filing 119 Declaration of David H. Kramer Certifying Compliance with the Court's February 3, 2022 Order [Dkt No. 117] filed byGoogle LLC, YouTube, LLC. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 2/22/2022)
February 22, 2022 Filing 118 Declaration of Phil Korologos Regarding Meet and Confer Pursuant to Court Order dated February 3, 2022 (Dkt. No. 117) filed byAST Publishing LTD., Maria Schneider, Uniglobe Entertainment, LLC,. (Korologos, Philip) (Filed on 2/22/2022)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER. Dkt. Nos. #95 and #97 indicate a breakdown in the discovery process and communications between counsel. Counsel are charged with solving this problem in the first instance. Consequently, the Court orders lead counsel for each party to meet and confer about the discovery issues in an in-person meeting or remote video conference for a minimum of four hours, as stated in the Court's Standing Order for Civil Discovery. The meet and confer must be completed by February 17, 2022. Each lead counsel will file by February 22, 2022, a declaration attesting that he or she complied with this order. If any discovery disputes remain after the meet and confer, a party may file a discovery letter. The telephonic discovery hearing set for February 4, 2022, is vacated. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/3/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2022)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER. In light of a complex civil trial, the discovery hearing is continued to February 4, 2022, at 10:00 a.m., and will take place telephonically. The parties are directed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 by February 2, 2022, to schedule their appearances. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/28/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2022)
January 24, 2022 Filing 115 REPLY (re #103 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint ) filed byGoogle LLC, YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Paul N. Harold, #2 Exhibit 10, #3 Exhibit 11)(Kramer, David) (Filed on 1/24/2022)
January 20, 2022 Filing 114 REPLY (re #100 MOTION to Sever ) Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion to Sever filed byAST Publishing LTD., Maria Schneider, Uniglobe Entertainment, LLC,. (Berezney, Steven) (Filed on 1/20/2022)
January 18, 2022 Filing 113 Certificate of Interested Entities by AST Publishing LTD. (Ewing, Randall) (Filed on 1/18/2022)
January 18, 2022 Filing 112 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by AST Publishing LTD. (Ewing, Randall) (Filed on 1/18/2022)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #107 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Demetri Blaisdell. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2022)
January 10, 2022 Filing 110 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #103 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint ) filed byAST Publishing LTD., Maria Schneider, Uniglobe Entertainment, LLC,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Demetri Blaisdell, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Proposed Order)(Korologos, Philip) (Filed on 1/10/2022)
January 10, 2022 Filing 109 Certificate of Interested Entities by Uniglobe Entertainment, LLC, (Ewing, Randall) (Filed on 1/10/2022)
January 10, 2022 Filing 108 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Uniglobe Entertainment, LLC, (Ewing, Randall) (Filed on 1/10/2022) Modified on 1/11/2022 correcting filer information (dhm, COURT STAFF).
January 10, 2022 Filing 107 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-16787582.) filed by AST Publishing LTD., Pirate Monitor LTD(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Maria Schneider, Uniglobe Entertainment, LLC,. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Blaisdell, Demetri) (Filed on 1/10/2022)
January 6, 2022 Filing 106 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #100 MOTION to Sever ) filed byGoogle LLC, YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Maura L. Rees)(Rees, Maura) (Filed on 1/6/2022)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER. The Court sets a discovery hearing to address Dkt. Nos. #95 and #97 , on February 3, 2022, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 11. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/3/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2022)
December 13, 2021 Filing 104 Request for Judicial Notice re #103 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed byGoogle LLC, YouTube, LLC. (Related document(s) #103 ) (Kramer, David) (Filed on 12/13/2021)
December 13, 2021 Filing 103 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Google LLC, YouTube, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 3/10/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 1/10/2022. Replies due by 1/24/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Paul N. Harold, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Proposed Order)(Kramer, David) (Filed on 12/13/2021)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 102 Order. At the parties' joint request, defendants may file an opposition to the motion to sever by January 6, 2022, and plaintiffs may file a reply by January 20, 2022. The Court will schedule a hearing if warranted. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2021)
December 8, 2021 Filing 101 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #100 MOTION to Sever filed by AST Publishing LTD., Maria Schneider, Uniglobe Entertainment, LLC,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Berezney, Steven) (Filed on 12/8/2021)
December 3, 2021 Filing 100 MOTION to Sever filed by AST Publishing LTD., Maria Schneider, Uniglobe Entertainment, LLC,. Motion Hearing set for 2/3/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 12/17/2021. Replies due by 12/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Declaration Exhibit 2)(Berezney, Steven) (Filed on 12/3/2021)
November 17, 2021 Filing 99 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Google LLC, YouTube, LLC. Filed byMaria Schneider. (Ewing, Randall) (Filed on 11/17/2021)
November 16, 2021 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Close of Expert Discovery due by 8/17/2022. Designation of Experts due by 7/18/2022. Dispositive Motion due by 1/19/2023. Rebuttal Reports due by 8/8/2022. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2021)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 98 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge James Donato on 11/16/2021. (jdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2021)
November 15, 2021 Filing 97 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #95 Discovery Letter Brief ) filed byGoogle LLC, YouTube, LLC. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 11/15/2021)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER. For plaintiffs' discovery dispute letter, Dkt. No. #95 , the Court directs YouTube to file a responsive letter by November 15, 2021, in the format required by the Court's Standing Order for Civil Discovery. Signed by Judge James Donato on 11/1/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2021)
October 29, 2021 Filing 95 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Maria Schneider. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' First RFPs (excerpted), #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Second RFPs (excerpted), #3 Exhibit C - Defendants' R&Os to First RFPs (excerpted), #4 Exhibit D - Defendants' R&Os to Second RFPs (excerpted))(Korologos, Philip) (Filed on 10/29/2021)
September 16, 2021 Filing 94 Letter re Scheduling Proposals. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Proposed Schedule, #2 Exhibit B - Defendants' Proposed Schedule)(Korologos, Philip) (Filed on 9/16/2021)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER.The sealing request, Dkt. No. #76 , is denied. YouTube has indicated it has no objection to the public filing of an unredacted version of Schneider's letter brief. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/25/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2021)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER. The motion for leave to file a first amended complaint, Dkt. No. #87 , is suitable for decision without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-1(b). The hearing that was set for August 26, 2021, is vacated, and the motion is granted in part. This is the first request to amend, and leave should be freely granted under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(2). YouTube has not made a strong showing of undue delay or unfair prejudice under Foman v. Davis, 371 U.S. 178, 182 (1962) as to overcome the presumption in favor of amendment, C.F. ex rel. Farnan v. Capistrano Unified Sch. Dist., 654 F.3d 975, 985 (9th Cir. 2011). Neither the inclusion of Uniglobe and AST as named plaintiffs, nor the other minor changes proposed by Schneider, will substantively alter the putative class definitions or scope of discovery. For the proposed inclusion of 75 additional copyrighted works in the amended complaint, a decision on leave to amend is deferred pending further discussions between the parties on a deadline for the identification and disclosure of works and infringements. The parties should jointly submit a proposed case schedule by September 16, 2021, which includes this deadline. The Court will decide the amendment question after that. Plaintiff should not file an amended complaint until the Court directs. YouTube's pending motion to set a case schedule, Dkt. No. #72 , is denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/25/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2021)
July 26, 2021 Filing 91 PLAINTIFFS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT re #87 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Maria Schneider. (Ewing, Randall) (Filed on 7/26/2021)
July 23, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #87 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 8/26/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2021)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER. At the parties' joint request, Dkt. No. #88 , the hearing on the motion to file an amended complaint is continued to August 26, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 11. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/23/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2021)
July 19, 2021 Filing 89 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #87 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint ) filed byGoogle LLC, YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Maura L. Rees, #2 Exhibit 1 to Rees Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Rees Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Rees Declaration, #5 Declaration of Lauren Gallo White, #6 Exhibit A to White Declaration)(Kramer, David) (Filed on 7/19/2021)
July 15, 2021 Filing 88 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER to Continue Hearing Date for Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint and Related Deadlines filed by Google LLC, YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David H. Kramer)(Kramer, David) (Filed on 7/15/2021)
July 2, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #87 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Responses due by 7/15/2021. Replies due by 7/22/2021. Motion Hearing set for 8/12/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2021)
July 2, 2021 Filing 87 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Maria Schneider. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Ewing, Randall) (Filed on 7/2/2021)
June 21, 2021 Filing 86 DECLARATION OF DAVID H. KRAMER CERTIFYING COMPLIANCE WITH THE COURTS MAY 27, 2021 ORDER [DKT NO. 82] re 82 Order filed by Google LLC, YouTube, LLC. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 6/21/2021)
June 21, 2021 Filing 85 KOROLOGOS DECLARATION REGARDING COURT-ORDERED MEET AND CONFER re 82 Order filed by Pirate Monitor LTD(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Maria Schneider. (Korologos, Philip) (Filed on 6/21/2021)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #83 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Marc A. Wallenstein. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2021)
June 7, 2021 Filing 83 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $317.00, receipt number 0971-16050621) filed by Pirate Monitor LTD, Maria Schneider. (Attachments: #1 DC Certificate of Good Standing)(Wallenstein, Marc) (Filed on 6/7/2021)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER. The letters at Dkt. Nos. 70, 74, 75, 79, 80, and 81, indicate a breakdown in the civility and cooperation expected of all counsel and parties litigating in this District. The lead counsel for each party is ordered to meet and confer about the discovery issues in person via remote access video for a minimum of four hours. The meet and confer must be completed by June 18, 2021. No later than June 21, 2021, each lead counsel will file a declaration attesting to his or her participation in accordance with this order. Counsel and parties are advised that the attorney who files the declaration will be deemed lead counsel for all subsequent purposes, including trial. If any discovery disputes remain after the meet and confer, a party may file a discovery letter. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/27/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2021)
May 14, 2021 Filing 81 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #74 Discovery Letter Brief) filed by Pirate Monitor LTD. (Berezney, Steven) (Filed on 5/14/2021)
May 7, 2021 Filing 80 Second Discovery Letter Brief filed by Maria Schneider. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Plaintiffs' Requests for Production, #2 Exhibit B Defendants' Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Requests for Production)(O'Keefe, Carol) (Filed on 5/7/2021)
April 26, 2021 Filing 79 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #76 First Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) filed by Google LLC, YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kramer, David) (Filed on 4/26/2021)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER. Pirate Monitor is directed to respond to YouTube's discovery dispute letter, Dkt. No. #74 , by May 14, 2021. Signed by Judge James Donato on 4/23/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2021)
April 22, 2021 Filing 77 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Maria Schneider re #76 First Administrative Motion to File Under Seal OKeefe Declaration and Unredacted Motion to Compel (O'Keefe, Carol) (Filed on 4/22/2021)
April 22, 2021 Filing 76 First Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Maria Schneider. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OKeefe Declaration in Support of Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order re Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #3 Redacted Version of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel, #4 Unredacted Version of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel, #5 Exhibit Redacted Version of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Ex A, #6 Redacted Version of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Ex B)(O'Keefe, Carol) (Filed on 4/22/2021)
April 21, 2021 Filing 75 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #70 Discovery Letter Brief) filed by Google LLC, YouTube, LLC. (White, Lauren) (Filed on 4/21/2021)
April 20, 2021 Filing 74 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Google LLC, YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(White, Lauren) (Filed on 4/20/2021)
April 19, 2021 Filing 73 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #72 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Set a Case Schedule with Deadlines for Plaintiff's Identification of Allegedly Infringed Works and Alleged Infringements Pursuant to L.R. 7-11 ) filed by Maria Schneider. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Demetri Blaisdell, #2 Exhibit A, #3 [Proposed] Order)(Korologos, Philip) (Filed on 4/19/2021)
April 15, 2021 Filing 72 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SET A CASE SCHEDULE WITH DEADLINES FOR PLAINTIFFS IDENTIFICATION OF ALLEGEDLY INFRINGED WORKS AND ALLEGED INFRINGEMENTS PURSUANT TO L.R. 7-11 filed by Google LLC, YouTube, LLC. Responses due by 4/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order, #2 Attachment A to Administrative Motion, #3 Declaration of Maura L. Rees, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4)(Kramer, David) (Filed on 4/15/2021)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER. YouTube is directed to respond to plaintiff's discovery dispute letter, Dkt. No. 70, by 4/21/2021. Signed by Judge James Donato on 4/9/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
April 2, 2021 Filing 70 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Maria Schneider. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Requests for Production, #2 Exhibit B - Defendants' Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Requests for Production)(Korologos, Philip) (Filed on 4/2/2021)
March 17, 2021 Filing 69 ANSWER TO DEFENDANTS AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS; JURY TRIAL DEMANDED filed by Gabor Csupo. (Ewing, Randall) (Filed on 3/17/2021)
March 12, 2021 Filing 68 ANSWER to Counterclaim byPirate Monitor LTD(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Ewing, Randall) (Filed on 3/12/2021)
March 8, 2021 Filing 66 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal - Plaintiff Pirate Monitor Ltd's Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to Stipulation Under FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Pirate Monitor LTD (Berezney, Steven) (Filed on 3/8/2021)
March 1, 2021 Filing 65 SUMMONS Returned Executed by YouTube, LLC, Google LLC. Gabor Csupo served on 2/24/2021, answer due 3/17/2021. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 3/1/2021)
March 1, 2021 Filing 64 SUMMONS Returned Executed by YouTube, LLC, Google LLC. Pirate Monitor LLC served on 2/24/2021, answer due 3/17/2021. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 3/1/2021)
February 22, 2021 Filing 63 Summons on Amended Counterclaims Issued as to Gabor Csupo, Pirate Monitor LLC. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2021)
February 19, 2021 Filing 62 Proposed Summons. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 2/19/2021)
February 19, 2021 Filing 61 Proposed Summons. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 2/19/2021)
February 19, 2021 Filing 60 Amended COUNTERCLAIMS against Pirate Monitor LTD, Pirate Monitor LLC, Gabor Csupo. Filed byY ouTube, LLC, Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kramer, David) (Filed on 2/19/2021)
February 17, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Private ADR. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2021)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/17/2021. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2021)
February 12, 2021 Filing 58 STIPULATION and [Proposed Order Selecting Private ADR by Pirate Monitor LTD, Maria Schneider filed by Pirate Monitor LTD, Maria Schneider. (Korologos, Philip) (Filed on 2/12/2021)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER RE DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/4/2021. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2021)
January 28, 2021 Filing 56 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Initial Case Management Conference held on 1/28/2021, Motion Hearing held on 1/28/2021. Total Time in Court: 8 minutes. Court Reporter: Ana Dub. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/28/2021)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER. The motion to dismiss hearing and case management conference set for January 28, 2021, at 10:00 a.m., will be held by Zoom Webinar. Each party should designate a lead counsel to speak at the hearing by emailing the name of their lead counsel to Judge Donato's Courtroom Deputy, Ms. Lisa Clark, at jdcrd@cand.uscourts.gov by January 27, 2021, at 3:00 p.m. California time. The names for lead counsel are needed so that Ms. Clark can identify them during the Zoom hearing when the case is called. All lead counsel must call in fifteen minutes before the hearing to test internet, video, and audio capabilities. All counsel, parties, members of the public, and press may join the webinar using the link or information below: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1617171523?pwd=VWJqM2ZYT1UvNFZ0ZHNZUUhGWTBCZz09 Webinar ID: 161 717 1523 Password: 213597 Or iPhone one-tap : US: +16692545252,,1617171523#,,1#,213597# or +16468287666,,1617171523#,,1#,213597# Or Telephone: Dial (for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): US: +1 669 254 5252 or +1 646 828 7666PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted remote access to court proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings (including those held by telephone or videoconference). See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. Any recording of a court proceeding held by video or teleconference, including "screen-shots" or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. Please see #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom for information on preparing for and participating in a Zoom Webinar. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/25/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2021)
January 21, 2021 Filing 54 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Pirate Monitor LTD, Maria Schneider. (Korologos, Philip) (Filed on 1/21/2021)
January 21, 2021 Filing 53 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER re: Discovery of Electronically Stored Information filed by Pirate Monitor LTD, Maria Schneider. (Korologos, Philip) (Filed on 1/21/2021)
January 14, 2021 Filing 52 REPLY (re #44 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims) in Support of Rule 12(B)(1)&(6) - - [Correction to Docket 51] filed by Pirate Monitor LTD. (Ewing, Randall) (Filed on 1/14/2021)
January 14, 2021 Filing 51 ERRONEOUS ENTRY. REPLACED BY #52 . REPLY (re #44 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims) in Support of Rule 12(B)(1)&(6) filed by Pirate Monitor LTD. (Ewing, Randall) (Filed on 1/14/2021) Modified on 1/22/2021 (mjj2S, COURT STAFF).
January 13, 2021 Filing 50 CLERK'S NOTICE. The case management conference and motion to dismiss hearing on January 21, 2021, are now set for January 28, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2021)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER. Pirate Monitor's reply brief, Dkt. No. 48, exceeds the page limits set by the Court's Standing Order and is stricken. Pirate Monitor may file a new reply brief conformant with the Standing Order by 9:00 a.m. California time on January 14, 2021. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/12/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2021)
January 11, 2021 Filing 48 REPLY (re #44 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims ) in Support of Rule 12(B)(1)&(6) filed byPirate Monitor LTD. (Ewing, Randall) (Filed on 1/11/2021)
December 18, 2020 Filing 47 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #44 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims) filed by Google LLC, YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Paul N. Harold, #2 Exhibit 1)(Kramer, David) (Filed on 12/18/2020)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER. The parties' stipulated protective order is approved, except that in those cases where the stipulated protective order conflicts with the Court's standing orders (e.g., with respect to the filing of discovery motions), the Court's standing orders will control. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/18/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2020)
December 16, 2020 Filing 45 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER for Protective Order for Litigation Involving Patents, Highly Sensitive Confidential Information and/or Trade Secrets filed by Google LLC, YouTube, LLC. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 12/16/2020)
November 20, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE OF MOTION AND RULE 12(B)(1)&(6) MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTERCLAIMS filed by Pirate Monitor LTD. Motion Hearing set for 1/21/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 11/20/2020. Replies due by 1/11/2021. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order)(Berezney, Steven) (Filed on 11/20/2020)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER. The parties' #41 joint request to extend plaintiffs' deadline to respond to defendants' counterclaims is granted. The response is due by November 20, 2020. The opposition is due by December 18, 2020. The reply is due by January 11, 2021. The motion will be heard January 21, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. The initial case management conference set for October 8, 2020, is continued to January 21, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/5/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
October 1, 2020 Filing 42 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Pirate Monitor LTD, Maria Schneider. (Korologos, Philip) (Filed on 10/1/2020)
October 1, 2020 Filing 41 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Time to Respond to Defendants' Answer and Counterclaims re #34 Answer to Complaint, and Counterclaim filed by Pirate Monitor LTD, Maria Schneider. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration)(Wright, Joanna) (Filed on 10/1/2020)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #35 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Brian M. Willen. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2020)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #38 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Philip Korologos. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2020)
September 30, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-15004090) filed by Pirate Monitor LTD, Maria Schneider. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate of Good Standing)(Korologos, Philip) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
September 30, 2020 Filing 37 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Pirate Monitor LTD, Maria Schneider - Civil L.R. 3-15 Certification for Plaintiff Maria Schneider (Berezney, Steven) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
September 30, 2020 Filing 36 REVISED RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND CIVIL L.R. 3-15 CERTIFICATION filed by Pirate Monitor LTD, Maria Schneider (Berezney, Steven) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
September 23, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Brian Willen, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-14978028) filed by Google LLC, YouTube, LLC. (Willen, Brian) (Filed on 9/23/2020)
September 21, 2020 Filing 34 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Trial Demanded, and COUNTERCLAIM against Pirate Monitor LTD filed by Google LLC, YouTube, LLC. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 9/21/2020)
September 21, 2020 Filing 33 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Alphabet Inc. filed by Pirate Monitor LTD, Maria Schneider. (Zelcs, George) (Filed on 9/21/2020)
September 17, 2020 Filing 32 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Zelcs, George) (Filed on 9/17/2020)
September 17, 2020 Filing 31 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options for Defendants YouTube, LLC, Google LLC, and Alphabet Inc. (Rees, Maura) (Filed on 9/17/2020)
August 5, 2020 Filing 30 STIPULATION Extending Defendants' Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, YouTube, LLC. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 8/5/2020)
August 5, 2020 Filing 29 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, YouTube, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Alphabet Inc., Corporate Parent XXVI Holdings Inc. for Google LLC, YouTube, LLC. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 8/5/2020)
August 5, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by David H. Kramer , Maura L. Rees, and Lauren Gallo White for Defendants YouTube, LLC, Google LLC, and Alphabet Inc. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 8/5/2020)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #26 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Joanna Wright. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-14745554) filed by Pirate Monitor LTD, Maria Schneider. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate of Good Standing)(Wright, Joanna) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 22, 2020 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria Schneider, Pirate Monitor LTD. Alphabet Inc. served on 7/17/2020, answer due 8/7/2020. (Schiller, Joshua) (Filed on 7/22/2020)
July 22, 2020 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria Schneider, Pirate Monitor LTD. Google LLC served on 7/17/2020, answer due 8/7/2020. (Schiller, Joshua) (Filed on 7/22/2020)
July 22, 2020 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria Schneider, Pirate Monitor LTD. YouTube, LLC served on 7/17/2020, answer due 8/7/2020. (Schiller, Joshua) (Filed on 7/22/2020)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/8/2020 10:00 AM. Case Management Statement due by 10/1/2020. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/20/2020. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 7/17/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 20 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 16, 2020 Filing 19 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Maria Schneider.. (Berezney, Steven) (Filed on 7/16/2020)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order, signed 7/13/2020, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Tillery.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 13, 2020 Filing 17 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement and Civil L.R. 3-15 Certification filed by Pirate Monitor LTD (Berezney, Steven) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER, signed 7/10/2020, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice O'Keefe. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2020)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER, signed 7/10/2020, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Ewing. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2020)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER, signed 7/10/2020, by Chief MagistrateJudge Joseph C. Spero granting #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Cortazar. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2020)
July 10, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Stephen M. Tillery, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-14678797) filed by Pirate Monitor LTD, Maria Schneider. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A - IL Certificate of Good Standing, #(2) Exhibit B - MO Certificate of Good Standing)(Tillery, Stephen) (Filed on 7/10/2020)
July 9, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael E Klenov (Klenov, Michael) (Filed on 7/9/2020)
July 8, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-14668716) filed by Pirate Monitor LTD, Maria Schneider. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State of New York Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - MO Certificate of Good Standing)(O'Keefe, Carol) (Filed on 7/8/2020)
July 8, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-14668677) filed by Pirate Monitor LTD, Maria Schneider. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - IL Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - FL Certificate of Good Standing)(Ewing, Randall) (Filed on 7/8/2020)
July 8, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, Filing fee previously paid on July 8, 2020) filed by Pirate Monitor LTD, Maria Schneider. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - IL Certificate of Good Standing)(Cortazar, Ryan) (Filed on 7/8/2020)
July 6, 2020 Filing 8 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding copyrights infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2020)
July 6, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Defendants Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, YouTube, LLC. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2020)
July 6, 2020 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/25/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/2/2020 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2020)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order, signed 7/6/2020, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #2 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Zelcs.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2020)
July 2, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/16/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2020)
July 2, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Berezney, Steven) (Filed on 7/2/2020)
July 2, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-14650713) filed by Pirate Monitor LTD, Maria Schneider. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit IL certificate of good standing, #(2) Exhibit DC certificate of good standing)(Zelcs, George) (Filed on 7/2/2020)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; Jury Trial Demanded against Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, and YouTube, LLC, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-14649851). Filed by Maria Schneider, Pirate Monitor LTD. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Berezney, Steven) (Filed on 7/2/2020) Modified on 7/6/2020 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schneider et al v. YouTube, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Schneider
Represented By: George Andrew Zelcs
Represented By: Steven Michael Berezney
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Tillery
Represented By: Joshua I Schiller
Represented By: Michael E Klenov
Represented By: Ryan Z. Cortazar
Represented By: Philip C. Korologos
Represented By: Stephen M. Tillery
Represented By: Randall P. Ewing, Jr.
Represented By: Joanna C Wright
Represented By: Carol L. O'Keefe
Represented By: David William Walchak
Represented By: Demetri Brumis Blaisdell
Represented By: Marc Alfred Wallenstein
Represented By: Robert Dwyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pirate Monitor LTD
Represented By: George Andrew Zelcs
Represented By: Steven Michael Berezney
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Tillery
Represented By: Joshua I Schiller
Represented By: Michael E Klenov
Represented By: Ryan Z. Cortazar
Represented By: Philip C. Korologos
Represented By: Stephen M. Tillery
Represented By: Randall P. Ewing, Jr.
Represented By: Joanna C Wright
Represented By: Carol L. O'Keefe
Represented By: Marc Alfred Wallenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uniglobe Entertainment, LLC,
Represented By: George Andrew Zelcs
Represented By: Philip C. Korologos
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Tillery
Represented By: Carol L. O'Keefe
Represented By: David William Walchak
Represented By: Demetri Brumis Blaisdell
Represented By: Joanna C Wright
Represented By: Joshua I Schiller
Represented By: Michael E Klenov
Represented By: Randall P. Ewing, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Dwyer
Represented By: Ryan Z. Cortazar
Represented By: Steven Michael Berezney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AST Publishing LTD.
Represented By: George Andrew Zelcs
Represented By: Philip C. Korologos
Represented By: Carol L. O'Keefe
Represented By: David William Walchak
Represented By: Demetri Brumis Blaisdell
Represented By: Joanna C Wright
Represented By: Joshua I Schiller
Represented By: Michael E Klenov
Represented By: Randall P. Ewing, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Dwyer
Represented By: Ryan Z. Cortazar
Represented By: Stephen M. Tillery
Represented By: Steven Michael Berezney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YouTube, LLC
Represented By: David H. Kramer
Represented By: Lauren Gallo White
Represented By: Maura Lea Rees
Represented By: Brian M. Willen
Represented By: Catherine R Hartman
Represented By: Eli Bard Richlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google LLC
Represented By: David H. Kramer
Represented By: Lauren Gallo White
Represented By: Maura Lea Rees
Represented By: Brian M. Willen
Represented By: Catherine R Hartman
Represented By: Eli Bard Richlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alphabet Inc.
Represented By: David H. Kramer
Represented By: Lauren Gallo White
Represented By: Maura Lea Rees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Pirate Monitor LLC
Represented By: Philip C. Korologos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Gabor Csupo
Represented By: Randall P. Ewing, Jr.
Represented By: Philip C. Korologos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?