Kleiner v. Digital Media Academy Corp. Featured Case

Plaintiff sued Defendant Digital Media Academy Corp. d/b/a Digital Media Academy LP after defendant canceled its summer camps due to the COVID-19 pandemic but refused to refund the tuitions and fees paid. Plaintiff alleged that defendant changed its terms and conditions after the fact, and would only offer a credit to future programs.

Plaintiff: Jaquelyn Kleiner
Defendant: Digital Media Academy Corp. doing business as Digital Media Academy LP
Case Number: 3:2020cv04591
Filed: July 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #15 Stipulation. Response due 9/20/2020.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
August 12, 2020 Filing 15 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order To Extend Time For Response To Complaint filed by Digital Media Academy Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Freitas, Robert) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 6, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Judge name or initials are incorrect. Counsel need not re-file the document, but should reference the correct judge name/initials on future filings. Re:[1 3] First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice 20-cv-4591-NC ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14782963.) filed by Jaquelyn Kleiner. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 13 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice 20-cv-4591-NC ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14782963.) filed by Jaquelyn Kleiner. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Cert of Good Standing)(Sauder, Joseph) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/12/2020. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/3/2020. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
July 29, 2020 Filing 11 Case REASSIGNED to Judge Edward M. Chen. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 29, 2020 Filing 10 This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 27, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2020)
July 27, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Digital Media Academy Corp... (Freitas, Robert) (Filed on 7/27/2020)
July 27, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Freitas and Daniel J. Weinberg (Freitas, Robert) (Filed on 7/27/2020)
July 23, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jaquelyn Kleiner.. (Carpenter, Todd) (Filed on 7/23/2020)
July 10, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Digital Media Academy Corp. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2020)
July 10, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/30/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/7/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2020)
July 10, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/24/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2020)
July 9, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Carpenter, Todd) (Filed on 7/9/2020)
July 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Digital Media Academy Corp. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14675355.). Filed byJaquelyn Kleiner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carpenter, Todd) (Filed on 7/9/2020)
July 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Digital Media Academy Corp. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14675355.). Filed byJaquelyn Kleiner. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carpenter, Todd) (Filed on 7/9/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kleiner v. Digital Media Academy Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Digital Media Academy Corp. doing business as Digital Media Academy LP
Represented By: Daniel Justin Weinberg
Represented By: Robert E. Freitas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaquelyn Kleiner
Represented By: Todd David Carpenter
Represented By: Joseph G. Sauder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?