Mosqueda v. Monsanto Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Otilia Mosqueda
Defendant: Monsanto Company, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv04644
Filed: July 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byMonsanto Company, Inc.. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 7/24/2020)
July 24, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company, Inc.. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 7/24/2020)
July 24, 2020 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company, Inc.. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 7/24/2020)
July 16, 2020 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:20-cv-02921. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 13, 2020 MEMBER CASE OPENED MDL 2741: Northern District of Illinois (Chicago), 1:20-cv-02921, Mosqueda v. Monsanto Company, Inc., Opened in California Northern District as 3:20-cv-04644-VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 220 cc: JPMDL (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 8, 2020 Filing 8 TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of California the electronic record. (lma, )
July 8, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated pursuant to MDL 2741 Conditional Transfer Order filed 7/8/2020. (lma, )
July 8, 2020 Filing 7 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel transferring case to Northern District of California. (lma, )
July 7, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: In light of the pending transfer to the MDL, the status hearing of 07/28/2020 and any deadlines are vacated. Emailed notice (mw, )
June 12, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Monsanto Company, Inc. (ng, )
May 29, 2020 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Initial status hearing set for 07/28/2020 at 9:00 a.m. The parties must file a joint initial status report with the content described in the attached status report requirements by 07/20/2020. Plaintiff must still file the report even if Defendant has not responded to requests to craft a joint report. If not all Defendants have been served, then Plaintiff must complete the part of the report on the progress of service. Also, counsel (or the parties, if proceeding pro se) must carefully review Judge Chang's Case Management Procedures, available online at ilnd.uscourts.gov (navigate to Judges / District Judges / Judge Edmond E. Chang). Because the Procedures are occasionally revised, counsel (or the party, if proceeding pro se) must read them anew even if the counsel or the party has appeared before Judge Chang in other cases. Emailed notice (mw, ) (Attachment(s) #1 Status Report Requirements) .
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket11, )
May 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (gcy, )
May 18, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (txl, )
May 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Otilia Mosqueda; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17017800. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hensley, Bryce)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020 (rc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mosqueda v. Monsanto Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company, Inc.
Represented By: Joe G. Hollingsworth
Represented By: Eric G. Lasker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Otilia Mosqueda
Represented By: Bryce Thomas Hensley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?