Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association v. Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association and The
Defendant: Lupin Inc., Roxane Laboratories, Inc., Lupin Ltd., Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Eurohealth (USA), Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC, Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited, Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC and Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv04667
Filed: July 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:15
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14905483.) filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Vettraino, Bradley) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14905377.) filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Barnes, Lauren) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14905308.) filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Sobol, Thomas) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
August 21, 2020 Filing 22 JOINT STIPULATION Extending Defendants' Response Deadlines re #1 Complaint filed by Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Andrews, Stephen) (Filed on 8/21/2020) Modified on 8/25/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2020 Filing 21 CLERK'S NOTICE clarifying the deadline to register for the 10/14/2020 case management conference.Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Thursday, October 8, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 20 REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Any previously set case management conference hearing dates are vacated. Case Management Statement due by 10/7/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/14/2020, 10:00 AM. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vcCourt Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Thursday, October, 2020, at 10:00 a.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Case Management Statement due by 10/7/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/14/2020, 10:00 AM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020) Modified on 8/18/2020 (ecgS, COURT STAFF).
August 17, 2020 Filing 19 Certificate of Interested Entities by Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC, Other Affiliate Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited for Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Andrews, Stephen) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Darren Andrews (Andrews, Stephen) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eurohealth (USA), Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Roxane Laboratories, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Hikma plc, Other Affiliate Hikma USA for Eurohealth (USA), Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Roxane Laboratories, Inc.. (Burke, Heather) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 12, 2020 Filing 16 JOINT STIPULATION Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 6-1(a) re #1 Complaint filed by Eurohealth (USA), Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Roxane Laboratories, Inc.. (Burke, Heather) (Filed on 8/12/2020) Modified on 8/17/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
August 12, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Jack E. Pace ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14807145.) filed by Eurohealth (USA), Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Roxane Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Burke, Heather) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
August 12, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Kathryn J. Mims ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14807113.) filed by Eurohealth (USA), Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Roxane Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Burke, Heather) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
August 12, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Marie Burke (Burke, Heather) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
August 12, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael John Shipley (Shipley, Michael) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
August 10, 2020 Filing 10 Case Reassigned to Judge Vince Chhabria. Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2020)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RELATING CASES. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 8/7/2020. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
July 31, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING TELEPHONIC CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE.Notice is hereby given that a Telephonic Case Management Conference has been set for October 13, 2020, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. Case Management Statement due by October 6th. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:20-cv-04667-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.). This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929Access Code: 6064255The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. The parties are further advised to ensure that the Court can hear and understand them clearly before speaking at length.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. Case Management Statement due by 10/6/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/13/2020 02:00 PM. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Signed by the Clerk on 7/30/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 29, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association.. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 14, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Eurohealth (USA), Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC, Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited, Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC, Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Lupin Inc., Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Roxane Laboratories, Inc.. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2020)
July 14, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/6/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/13/2020 01:30 PM. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2020)
July 14, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/28/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2020)
July 13, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Eurohealth (USA), Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC, Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited, Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC, Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Lupin Inc., Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Roxane Laboratories, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14685359.). Filed byBlue Cross and Blue Shield Association. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 7/13/2020) Modified on 7/14/2020 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association v. Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Inc.
Represented By: Michael John Shipley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roxane Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Heather Marie Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Darren Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eurohealth (USA), Inc.
Represented By: Heather Marie Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Michael John Shipley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.
Represented By: Heather Marie Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Represented By: Brett Johnston Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
Represented By: Michael John Shipley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association
Represented By: Christina C. Sharp
Represented By: Scott M Grzenczyk
Represented By: Bradley J Vettraino
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Represented By: Lauren G. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The
Represented By: Christina C. Sharp
Represented By: Scott M Grzenczyk
Represented By: Bradley J Vettraino
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Represented By: Lauren G. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?