Broadcom Corporation et al v. Netflix, Inc.
Plaintiff: Avago Technologies International Sales PTE Limited and Broadcom Corporation
Defendant: Netflix Inc
Case Number: 3:2020cv04677
Filed: July 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Referring Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 87 MOTION to Dismiss the First, Third, Fourth, and Fifth Claims of the First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Netflix Inc. Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 9/24/2020. Replies due by 10/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jacob, Sharif) (Filed on 9/10/2020) Modified on 9/11/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #85 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Michael D. Karson. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 28, 2020 Filing 85 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Michael Karson ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14875453.) filed by Avago Technologies International Sales PTE Limited, Broadcom Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Karson, Michael) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #78 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Richard L. Wynne, Jr.. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #80 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Vishal Patel. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #79 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Bruce Sostek. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #77 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Adrienne E. Dominguez. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
August 27, 2020 Filing 80 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Vishal Patel ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14869609.) filed by Avago Technologies International Sales PTE Limited, Broadcom Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Patel, Vishal) (Filed on 8/27/2020)
August 27, 2020 Filing 79 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Bruce Sostek ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14869551.) filed by Avago Technologies International Sales PTE Limited, Broadcom Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Sostek, Bruce) (Filed on 8/27/2020)
August 27, 2020 Filing 78 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Richard L. Wynne, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14867715.) filed by Avago Technologies International Sales PTE Limited, Broadcom Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Wynne, Richard) (Filed on 8/27/2020)
August 27, 2020 Filing 77 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Adrienne E. Dominguez ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14867568.) filed by Avago Technologies International Sales PTE Limited, Broadcom Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Dominguez, Adrienne) (Filed on 8/27/2020)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER. For this one occasion, and mainly in light of the transfer to this District, the parties may file over-size briefs. See Dkt. No. 74. The opening brief and opposition brief may be up to 20 pages each, and the reply brief up to 15 pages. The motion by Netflix, Dkt. No. 75, is terminated to allow for refiling with a page length that conforms to this order. The motion will be heard at the initial case management conference set for October 15, 2020. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/21/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 17, 2020 ***Set/Reset Deadlines as to #74 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION To Re-Notice Defendant's Motion to Dismiss on the Pending Briefing re #56 ECF Transfer In - converted docket entry; Responses due by 8/24/2020. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 17, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to Motion Hearing Dkt. 75 set for 9/24/2020 10:00 AM before Judge James Donato. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 75 Renotice motion hearing re #74 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION To Re-Notice Defendant's Motion to Dismiss on the Pending Briefing re #56 ECF Transfer In - converted docket entry, filed byNetflix Inc. (Related document(s) #74 ) (Jacob, Sharif) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 74 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION To Re-Notice Defendant's Motion to Dismiss on the Pending Briefing re #56 ECF Transfer In - converted docket entry, filed by Netflix Inc. Responses due by 8/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Sharif E. Jacob in Support of Defendant's Administrative Motion, #2 Proposed Order)(Jacob, Sharif) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 5, 2020 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by Eduardo E. Santacana (Santacana, Eduardo) (Filed on 8/5/2020)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/15/2020 10:00 AM. Case Management Statement due by 10/8/2020. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/30/2020. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 7/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 29, 2020 Filing 70 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 69 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Netflix Inc.. (Rosen, David) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 68 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Avago Technologies International Sales PTE Limited, Broadcom Corporation.. (Hohn, Christopher) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 27, 2020 Filing 67 NOTICE by Avago Technologies International Sales PTE Limited, Broadcom Corporation of Withdrawal of Counsel (Chien, Cary) (Filed on 7/27/2020)
July 24, 2020 Filing 66 REPLY In Support of Its #48 Motion to Dismiss the First, Third, Fourth and Fifth Claims of the First Amended Complaint by Netflix Inc. (Jacob, Sharif) (Filed on 7/24/2020) Modified TEXT on 7/24/2020 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 14, 2020 Filing 65 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 7/28/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2020)
July 14, 2020 Filing 64 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/6/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/13/2020 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2020)
July 14, 2020 Filing 63 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 8:20-cv-00529. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MINUTES [IN CHAMBERS] Order Regarding Motion to Transfer & Motion to Dismiss by Judge James V. Selna: For the following reasons, the Court GRANTS the motion to transfer venue. The Court finds that oral argument would not be helpful in this matter and VACATES the July 13, 2020 hearing. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; L.R. 7-15. (See document for details.) (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (es)
July 6, 2020 Filing 61 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First, Third, Fourth, and Fifth Claims of the First Amended Complaint #56 filed by Plaintiffs Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited, Broadcom Corporation. (Sostek, Bruce)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER TO CONTINUE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE #59 by Judge James V. Selna. The Court, having considered the parties' Joint Stipulation to continue the Scheduling Conference, hereby ORDERS that the Scheduling Conference is continued to August 24, 2020 at 11:30 a.m., and the parties shall file a Joint Rule 26(f) Report by August 17, 2020. (es)
June 30, 2020 Filing 59 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from July 13, 2020 to August 24, 2020 Re: Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only #15 filed by defendant Netflix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jacob, Sharif)
June 29, 2020 Filing 58 REPLY In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Change Venue to USDC Northern District of California #48 filed by Defendant Netflix, Inc.. (Kamber, Matthias)
June 29, 2020 Filing 57 MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First, Third, Fourth, and Fifth Claims of the First Amended Complaint #56 filed by Defendant Netflix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Jacob, Sharif)
June 29, 2020 Filing 56 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First, Third, Fourth, and Fifth Claims of the First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Netflix, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 7/27/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Jacob, Sharif)
June 29, 2020 Filing 55 REPLY In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First, Third, Fourth and Fifth Claims for Relief #43 filed by Defendant Netflix, Inc.. (Jacob, Sharif)
June 22, 2020 Filing 54 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Change Venue to USDC Northern District of California #48 filed by Plaintiffs Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited, Broadcom Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sostek, Bruce)
June 22, 2020 Filing 53 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First, Third, Fourth and Fifth Claims for Relief #43 filed by Plaintiffs Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited, Broadcom Corporation. (Sostek, Bruce)
June 22, 2020 Filing 52 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Netflix, Inc. amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , filed by Plaintiffs Broadcom Corporation, Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Hohn, Christopher)
June 19, 2020 Filing 51 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Defendant Netflix, Inc. identifying No Company as Corporate Parent. (Jacob, Sharif)
June 10, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First, Third, Fourth and Fifth Claims for Relief #43 , Memorandum in Support of Motion, #44 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (es)
June 9, 2020 Filing 49 MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Change Venue to USDC Northern District of California #48 filed by Defendant Netflix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elena Garnica in Support of Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Matthias Kamber in Support of Memorandum, #3 Declaration of David Ronca in Support of Memorandum)(Kamber, Matthias)
June 9, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Change Venue to USDC Northern District of California filed by Defendant Netflix, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 7/13/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kamber, Matthias)
June 9, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Netflix, Inc.. correcting Notice (Other), #45 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Change Venue to USDC Northern District of California #46 (Hasselberg, Emily)
June 8, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Change Venue to USDC Northern District of California filed by Defendant Netflix, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 7/13/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration Of Elena Garnica In Support Of Defendant Netflix, Inc.s Motion To Transfer Venue Pursuant To Section 1404(A), #2 Declaration Declaration Of Matthias Kamber In Support Of Defendant Netflix, Inc.s Motion To Transfer Venue Pursuant To Section 1404(A), #3 Declaration Declaration Of David Ronca In Support Of Defendant Netflix, Inc.s Motion To Transfer Venue Pursuant To Section 1404(A)) (Kamber, Matthias)
June 8, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE [Proposed] Order In Support Of Defendant Netflix Inc.s Motion To Transfer Venue Pursuant To Section 1404(A) filed by Defendant Netflix, Inc.. Defendant Netflix, Inc.s Notice Of Motion To Transfer Venue Pursuant To Section 1404(A) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order In Support Of Defendant Netflix Inc.s Motion To Transfer Venue Pursuant To Section 1404(A))(Kamber, Matthias)
June 8, 2020 Filing 44 MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First, Third, Fourth and Fifth Claims for Relief #43 filed by Defendant Netflix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Memorandum)(Jacob, Sharif)
June 8, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First, Third, Fourth and Fifth Claims for Relief filed by Defendant Netflix, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 7/13/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Jacob, Sharif)
May 27, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael D. Karson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited, Broadcom Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26570370) #34 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state and/or federal courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. (Thrasher, Lupe)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: GRANTING #36 Non-Resident Attorney Vishal Patel APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff(s) Broadcom Corporation, Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited, designating John V Picone, III as local counsel. (es)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: GRANTING #35 Non-Resident Attorney Richard L. Wynne, Jr. APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff(s) Broadcom Corporation, Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited, designating John V Picone, III as local counsel. (es)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: GRANTING #34 Non-Resident Attorney Michael D Karson APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff(s) Broadcom Corporation, Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited, designating John V Picone, III as local counsel. (es)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: GRANTING #33 Non-Resident Attorney Bruce S Sostek APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff(s) Broadcom Corporation and Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited, designating John V Picone, III as local counsel. (es)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 *NOTE CASE NUMBER* ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: GRANTING #32 Non-Resident Attorney Adrienne E. Dominquez APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff(s) Broadcom Corporation, Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited, designating John V Picone, III as local counsel. (es)
May 26, 2020 Filing 36 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Vishal Patel to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited, Broadcom Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26570594) filed by Plaintiffs Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited, Broadcom Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Picone, John)
May 26, 2020 Filing 35 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Richard L. Wynne, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited, Broadcom Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26570476) filed by Plaintiffs Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited, Broadcom Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Picone, John)
May 26, 2020 Filing 34 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael D. Karson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited, Broadcom Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26570370) filed by Plaintiffs Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited, Broadcom Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Proposed Order) (Picone, John)
May 26, 2020 Filing 33 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Bruce S. Sostek to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited, Broadcom Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26570158) filed by Plaintiffs Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited, Broadcom Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Proposed Order) (Picone, John)
May 26, 2020 Filing 32 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Adrienne E. Dominguez to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited, Broadcom Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26568823) filed by Plaintiffs Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited, Broadcom Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Picone, John)
May 19, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney David J. Rosen on behalf of Defendant Netflix, Inc. (Attorney David J. Rosen added to party Netflix, Inc.(pty:dft))(Rosen, David)
May 12, 2020 Filing 30 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Robert A Van Nest, Jr counsel for Defendant Netflix, Inc.. Adding Robert A. Van Nest as counsel of record for Netflix, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Netflix, Inc.. (Attorney Robert A Van Nest, Jr added to party Netflix, Inc.(pty:dft))(Van Nest, Robert)
May 12, 2020 Filing 29 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Paven Malhotra counsel for Defendant Netflix, Inc.. Adding Paven Malhotra as counsel of record for Netflix, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Netflix, Inc.. (Attorney Paven Malhotra added to party Netflix, Inc.(pty:dft))(Malhotra, Paven)
May 12, 2020 Filing 28 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christina Lee counsel for Defendant Netflix, Inc.. Adding Christina Lee as counsel of record for Defendant Netflix, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Netflix, Inc.. (Attorney Christina Lee added to party Netflix, Inc.(pty:dft))(Lee, Christina)
May 12, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #26 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
May 12, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Emily A. Hasselberg on behalf of Defendant Netflix, Inc. (Attorney Emily A. Hasselberg added to party Netflix, Inc.(pty:dft))(Hasselberg, Emily)
May 12, 2020 Filing 25 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Thomas Edward Gorman counsel for Defendant Netflix, Inc.. Adding Thomas Edward Gorman as counsel of record for Netflix, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Netflix, Inc.. (Attorney Thomas Edward Gorman added to party Netflix, Inc.(pty:dft))(Gorman, Thomas)
May 11, 2020 Filing 24 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Edward Andrew Bayley counsel for Defendant Netflix, Inc.. Adding Edward Andrew Bayley as counsel of record for Netflix, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Netflix, Inc.. (Attorney Edward Andrew Bayley added to party Netflix, Inc.(pty:dft))(Bayley, Edward)
May 11, 2020 Filing 23 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Matthias Kamber counsel for Defendant Netflix, Inc.. Adding Matthias A. Kamber as counsel of record for Netflix, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Counsel for Defendant Netflix, Inc.. (Attorney Matthias Kamber added to party Netflix, Inc.(pty:dft))(Kamber, Matthias)
April 7, 2020 Filing 22 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited, Broadcom Corporation, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #13 served on 3/26/2020. (Picone, John)
April 7, 2020 Filing 21 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Broadcom Corporation, Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited, upon Defendant Netflix, Inc. served on 3/19/2020, answer due 6/8/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System by serving Albert Damante - Agent Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Picone, John)
April 7, 2020 Filing 20 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney John V Picone, III counsel for Plaintiffs Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited, Broadcom Corporation. Filed by Plaintiffs Broadcom Corporation and Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited. (Picone, John)
April 7, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE Letter to Judge Selna filed by Plaintiffs Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited, Broadcom Corporation. (Picone, John)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT #16 , by Judge James V. Selna. Defendant Netflix, Inc. answer due 6/8/2020. (es)
April 7, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney John V Picone, III on behalf of Plaintiffs Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited, Broadcom Corporation (Attorney John V Picone, III added to party Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited(pty:pla), Attorney John V Picone, III added to party Broadcom Corporation(pty:pla))(Picone, John)
April 7, 2020 Filing 16 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to June 8, 2020 filed by Defendant Netflix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Sharif E Jacob added to party Netflix, Inc.(pty:dft))(Jacob, Sharif)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 7/13/2020 at 11:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 7/6/2020. (lb)
March 26, 2020 Filing 14 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited, Broadcom Corporation. (Angell, Jason)
March 19, 2020 Filing 13 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:16-cv-01052 JVS(JCGx). Case transferred from Judge Josephine L. Staton to Judge James V. Selna for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:20-cv-00529 JVS(ADSx). Signed by Judge James V. Selna. (jgu)
March 17, 2020 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Netflix, Inc. (lh)
March 17, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (lh)
March 17, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
March 17, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (lh)
March 13, 2020 Filing 7 Plaintiffs' NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited, Broadcom Corporation, identifying Broadcom, Inc.. (Angell, Jason)
March 13, 2020 Filing 6 Plaintiffs' NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited, Broadcom Corporation, identifying Broadcom Technologies, Inc. (Angell, Jason)
March 13, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiffs Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited, Broadcom Corporation. Broadcom Corp. v. Sony Corp. Related Case(s): 8:16-cv-01052 (Angell, Jason)
March 13, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiffs Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited, Broadcom Corporation. Related Case(s): 8:16-cv-01774 (Angell, Jason)
March 13, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited, Broadcom Corporation. (Angell, Jason)
March 13, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited, Broadcom Corporation. (Angell, Jason)
March 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-25733802 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Broadcom Corporation, Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I) (Attorney Jason S Angell added to party Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited(pty:pla), Attorney Jason S Angell added to party Broadcom Corporation(pty:pla))(Angell, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcom Corporation et al v. Netflix, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avago Technologies International Sales PTE Limited
Represented By: Cary Chien
Represented By: Christopher A Hohn
Represented By: Robert K. Jain
Represented By: Jason S Angell
Represented By: Vishal Patel
Represented By: Richard L Wynne, Jr
Represented By: Adrienne Dominguez
Represented By: Bruce S Sostek
Represented By: Michael D Karson
Represented By: John V Picone, III
Represented By: Bruce Steven Sostek
Represented By: Robert Kumar Jain
Represented By: Adrienne Elizabeth Dominguez
Represented By: Christopher Andrew Hohn
Represented By: Vishal Hemant Patel
Represented By: Richard Lawrence Wynne, Jr.
Represented By: Michael D. Karson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcom Corporation
Represented By: Cary Chien
Represented By: Christopher A Hohn
Represented By: Robert K. Jain
Represented By: Jason S Angell
Represented By: Vishal Patel
Represented By: Richard L Wynne, Jr
Represented By: Adrienne Dominguez
Represented By: Bruce S Sostek
Represented By: Michael D Karson
Represented By: John V Picone, III
Represented By: Bruce Steven Sostek
Represented By: Robert Kumar Jain
Represented By: Adrienne Elizabeth Dominguez
Represented By: Christopher Andrew Hohn
Represented By: Vishal Hemant Patel
Represented By: Richard Lawrence Wynne, Jr.
Represented By: Michael D. Karson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Netflix Inc
Represented By: Emily A. Hasselberg
Represented By: Edward Andrew Bayley
Represented By: Christina Lee
Represented By: Robert A Van Nest, Jr.
Represented By: Matthias Kamber
Represented By: David J Rosen
Represented By: Paven Malhotra
Represented By: Sharif E Jacob
Represented By: Thomas Edward Gorman
Represented By: Emily Ann Hasselberg
Represented By: David Justin Rosen
Represented By: Matthias Andreas Kamber
Represented By: Eduardo E. Santacana
Represented By: Robert Addy Van Nest
Represented By: Sharif E. Jacob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?